Allen v. Nelnet, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Colorado District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-00586-REB-KLM

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 11, 2019 at 8:59 PM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER APPROVING AND ADOPTING 51 United States Magistrate Judge Report and Recommendations. Granting 42 Dft Nelnet, Inc., Motion for Summary Judgment on all claims asserted in Pla's Complaint; That the plaintiff's objections 52 , filed June 29, 2007, to the Magistrate Judge's recommendation are OVERRULED and DENIED; That the plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED with prejudice; That judgment SHALL ENTER in favor of the defendant, Nelnet, Inc., and against the plaintiff, Diana Allen; and That the defendant is AWARDED its costs to be taxed by the Clerk of the Court pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 54(d)(1) and D.C.COLO.LCivR. 54.1. Signed by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/24/07.(erv, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/19/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 42 Dft Nelnet, Inc. MOTION for Summary Judgment On All Claims Asserted in Plaintiff's Complaint, be GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan on 6/19/07. (erv, )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER denying 7 Pla's Motion to Remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan on 1/31/07.(erv, )
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/13/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan : Holding in Abeyance ruling on 7 Motion to Remand to the Original Jurisdiction; granting 31 Motion to Compel Pla to Answer Certain Interrogatories and to Produce Documents; Motion Hearing held on 12/13/2006. (Court Reporter FTR Ellen E. Miller.) (erv, )
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/2/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER denying 28 Dfts Motion to Compel Pla to appear for Deposition in DenverDfts may depose Pla in Alamosa. Discovery Deadline is extended to 12/1/06 for the purpose of taking the deposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe for Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan on 11/2/06.(erv, )
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/6/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            MINUTE ORDER denying 17 MOTION to Vacate (Hearing) Order setting Scheduling/Planning Conference by Plaintiff by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan on 6/6/06. (dln, )
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/16/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 12 MOTION to Vacate Order setting Scheduling/Planning Conference by Plaintiff. Scheduling Conference RESET to 6/15/06 at 10:00 a.m. by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan on 5/16/06. (dln, )
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/25/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                ORDER setting Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 6/2/2006 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan on 4/24/06. (dln, )
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 0 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?