Akbar v. American General Finance Corp
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Southern District Court, Case No. 3:06-cv-00314-WHR-MRM

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 11, 2019 at 11:00 PM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1601
Nature of Suit Truth in Lending
  Entries (3) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/22/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER ADOPTING 50 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - it is hereby ORDERED that the clerk enter judgment confirming the arbitration award of $26,624.72 as to Talat and Ronald Akbar. Signed by Judge Walter H Rice on 7/22/2009. (sc1, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/2/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - It is respectfully recommended that the Court should enter judgment confirming the arbitration award as to both Talat and Ronald Akbar. Objections to R&R due by 7/20/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R Merz on 7/2/2009. (kopf1, )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/15/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      DECISION AND ORDER DENYING 14 DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION - The Court has not denied Defendant's right to arbitrate, but merely insists that it exercise that right in the manner required by the contract it drafted. When it has done so, the Court is prepared to stay these proceedings in favor of arbitration. Signed by Judge Michael R Merz on 12/15/06. (dp1)
        Request RequestSpace LREF

        Statistics

        This case has been viewed 0 times.

        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
        Space
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
         
        PlainSite
        Sign Up
        Need Password Help?