Ono v. Dias
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:14-cv-00327
District Judge LESLIE E KOBAYASHI, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 11, 2019 at 11:05 PM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Craig Inagaki, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Estate Planning Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Cheryl A. Kinoshita +1 808 521 9200 +1 808 540 5077 ckinoshita@cades.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Paul M. Saito +5219 521 521 9200 +5405 540 540 5073 psaito@cades.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pauahi Tower

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elijah Yip +1 808 892 3370 +1 808 892 3340 eyip@luminatelaw.com
No Logo Harry Ono, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Estate Planning Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Cheryl A. Kinoshita +1 808 521 9200 +1 808 540 5077 ckinoshita@cades.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Paul M. Saito +5219 521 521 9200 +5405 540 540 5073 psaito@cades.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pauahi Tower

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elijah Yip +1 808 892 3370 +1 808 892 3340 eyip@luminatelaw.com
No Logo Stephen Leong, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Estate Planning Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Cheryl A. Kinoshita +1 808 521 9200 +1 808 540 5077 ckinoshita@cades.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Paul M. Saito +5219 521 521 9200 +5405 540 540 5073 psaito@cades.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pauahi Tower

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elijah Yip +1 808 892 3370 +1 808 892 3340 eyip@luminatelaw.com
v.
No Logo DOE CORPORATIONS 1-10, Defendant
No Logo Doe Entities 1-10, Defendant
No Logo Harold Dias, Jr., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gill, Zukeran & Sgan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY T. Anthony Gill tgill@gzsattorneys.com
No Logo International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gill, Zukeran & Sgan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY T. Anthony Gill tgill@gzsattorneys.com
No Logo John Does 1-10, Defendant
No Logo Local Union 1186 of the International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Sean Kim +5381 538 538 1812 +5994 599 599 4623 seankimlaw@gmail.com
No Logo Thomas E Perez, Intervenor

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Thomas A. Helper +5412 541 541 2850 Tom.Helper@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 0401
Nature of Suit 790 - Labor: Other
  Entries (91) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 6/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Pursuant to the Stipulation To Dismiss (ECF NO. 92 ) STAY LIFTED on 06/24/2015. (eps ) (Entered: 06/24/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 6/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    STIPULATION FOR (1) DISMISSAL OF ALL CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO RULE 41(a)(1)(A)(ii); AND (2) VACATION OF THE ORDER DENYING AS MOOT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; AND GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS AND HAROLD DIAS, JR.'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION DATED SEPTEMBER 30, 2014 AND ORDER signed by JUDGE LESLIE E KOBAYASHI submitted on behalf of Plaintiffs Craig Inagaki, Stephen Leong, Harry Ono. (eps ) (Entered: 06/24/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      EP: Status Conference Re-9th CCA recently issued Order[ECF No. 89] Discussion Held. Counsel have reached a Settlement in this case.Joint Stipulation will be submitted to Judge Kobayashi to Dismiss the case and also Dismiss or Vacate the Order issued by the Judge in this action. The Stipulation to be submitted to Judge Kobayashi by 6/26/2015. (Court Reporter one.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(lls, )No COS issued for this docket entry (Entered: 06/22/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        EO: Status Conference Re-9th CCA recently issued Order [ECF No. 89] set for 6/19/2015 at 11:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. The Status conference-Re-Stay set for 6/26/2015 is hereby VACATED. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(lls, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 06/12/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          USCA ORDER as to Case Number CA 15-15733 The parties' joint motion to dismiss this appeal is granted. The motion to remand is denied as unnecessary. Dismissal of the appeal invests the district court with jurisdiction to hear the parties' joint motion to dismiss this action and to vacate its order. The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees on appeal. A copy of this order shall serve as and for the mandate of this court. (eps)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 06/12/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Attorney Appeal Packet CA 15-15733 re 83 (Attachments: # 1 Instructions For Civil Appeals, # 2 Letter Re Court Reporters, # 3 Instructions Transcript Designation & Ordering Form, # 4 Transcript Designation & Ordering Form, # 5 Docket Sheet)(eps )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 05/05/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - The District Court Clerk's Office has submitted the Filing Fee Receipt to the 9CCA via electronic notice re 86 Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (eps)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                USCA Case Number CA 15-15733 - RECEIPT #HI014722, $505.00 remitted by Sherman Dunn Cohen Leifer (eps) (Entered: 04/16/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 4/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  USCA Case Number CA 15-15733 TIME SCHEDULE ORDER (eps ) (Entered: 04/14/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 4/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    USCA Case Number CA 15-15733 Payment of the $505 docketing and filing fees is past due(eps ) (Entered: 04/14/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 4/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      USCA Case Number CA 15-15733 TEXT ENTRY ORDER In case no. 14-80188 on 4-13-2015: Respondents' motion to extend time to file the opposition to the petition for permission to appeal is granted. The opposition has been filed. Petitioners' motion for leave to file a reply in support of the petition for permission to appeal is granted. The petition for permission to appeal pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b) is granted. Within 14 days after the date of this order, petitioners shall perfect the appeal in accordance with Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 5(d). Local Union 1186, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers's motion to be added as a party is denied. See 18 U.S.C. § 1292(b); In re Benny, 812 F.2d 1133, 1136 (9th Cir. 1987) ("The timely filing of a petition for leave to appeal following district court certification pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b) is jurisdictional."); cf. Farley Transp. Co. v. Santa Fe Trail Transp. Co., 778 F.2d 1365, 1370 (9th Cir. 1985) (notice of appeal cannot be amended to add parties as appellants after the time period for appeal has expired).(eps ) (Entered: 04/14/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        USCA Case Number CA 14-80188 : ORDER Respondents' motion to extend time to file the opposition to the petition for permission to appeal is granted. The opposition has been filed.Petitioners' motion for leave to file a reply in support of the petition for permission to appeal is granted.(eps) (Entered: 04/14/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 12/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          USCA Memo re receipt of Petition for Permission to Appeal under 1292(b). USCA No. 14-80188. (ecs, )No COS issued for this docket entry (Entered: 12/30/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 12/24/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            EO: re 79 The following dates are hereby vacated: 6/30/15, 10:00am, Settlement Conference, Judge Chang; 9/15/15, 9:00am, Final Pretrial Conference, Judge Chang; and 10/27/15, 9:00am, Non Jury Trial, Judge Kobayashi. Status Conference Re: Stay set for 6/26/2015 09:00 AM before JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. (JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(sna, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 12/24/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS AND HAROLD DIAS, JR.'S MOTION TO CERTIFY ORDER FOR INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL AND TO STAY PROCEEDINGS re 57 Motion to Stay; re 59 Motion for Joinder Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 12/23/2014. (eps)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 12/23/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 12/4/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                ORDER GRANTING THOMAS E. PEREZ'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE 67 Motion to Intervene. Signed by JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG on 12/04/2014. (eps)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 12/04/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  STATEMENT of No Position re 67 MOTION to Intervene Motion of Thomas E. Perez, Secretary of Labor, for Leave to Intervene and Certificate of Service filed by Craig Inagaki, Stephen Leong, Harry Ono. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Yip, Elijah) (Entered: 12/02/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    REPLY re 57 MOTION to Stay Proceedings and to Certify Order for Interlocutory Appeal filed by Harold Dias, Jr, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers. (Gill, T.) (Entered: 12/01/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Harold Dias, Jr, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers [RE: DEFENDANT HAROLD DIAS, JR.S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS] (Gill, T.) (Entered: 11/26/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Harold Dias, Jr, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers [RE: DEFENDANT HAROLD DIAS, JR.S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS] (Gill, T.) (Entered: 11/26/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Harold Dias, Jr, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers [RE: DEFENDANT INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS] (Gill, T.) (Entered: 11/26/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Harold Dias, Jr, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers [RE: DEFENDANTS HAROLD DIAS, JR. AND INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS PRIVILEGE LOG] (Gill, T.) (Entered: 11/26/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Harold Dias, Jr, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers [RE: DEFENDANT INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS] (Gill, T.) (Entered: 11/26/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 67 : Motion of Thomas E. Perez, Secretary of Labor, for Leave to Intervene set for 12/23/2014 09:30 AM before JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. (sna, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry. (Entered: 11/21/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  STATEMENT of No Opposition re 67 MOTION to Intervene Motion of Thomas E. Perez, Secretary of Labor, for Leave to Intervene and Certificate of Service filed by Local Union 1186 of the International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers. (Kim, Sean) (Entered: 11/21/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    STATEMENT of No Opposition re 67 MOTION to Intervene Motion of Thomas E. Perez, Secretary of Labor, for Leave to Intervene and Certificate of Service filed by Harold Dias, Jr, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers. (Gill, T.) (Entered: 11/20/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      MOTION to Intervene Motion of Thomas E. Perez, Secretary of Labor, for Leave to Intervene and Certificate of Service Thomas A. Helper appearing for Intervenor Thomas E Perez (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Table of Contents, # 3 Table of Authorities)(Helper, Thomas) (Entered: 11/20/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 57 MOTION to Stay Proceedings and to Certify Order for Interlocutory Appeal, 59 MOTION for Joinder re 57 MOTION to Stay Proceedings and to Certify Order for Interlocutory Appeal and Certificate of Service filed by Craig Inagaki, Stephen Leong, Harry Ono. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Elijah Yip, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Yip, Elijah) (Entered: 11/19/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          EO: re 62 After considering the arguments contained in the November 10, 2014 letter briefs submitted by counsel, the Court denies Mr. Yip's request and grants Mr. Gill's request as follows. Defendant International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers shall produce all responsive non-privileged documents and provide complete detailed responses to Plaintiffs' discovery requests by November 26, 2014. It appears that Defendant IBEW and their counsel are proceeding in good faith, that the request for extension of time is not being made for the purpose of hindrance or delay and that the extension of time is not unduly prejudicial to Plaintiffs. IT IS SO ORDERED. (JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(sna, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 11/12/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            EO: Discovery Dispute. Counsel have met and conferred. No agreement reached. Letter briefs to be faxed to Judge Chang's chambers by 3:00pm on 11/10/14. Mr. Yip and Mr. Gill have been notified. (JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(sna, )No COS issued for this docket entry (Entered: 11/10/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Local Union 1186 of the International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers RE DEFENDANT LOCAL 1186, INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS (1) FIRST AMENDED REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS AND (2) FIRST AMENDED REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (Kim, Sean) (Entered: 11/07/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Harold Dias, Jr, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers RE: Defendant Harold Dias' Response to Plaintiffs' First Amended Request for Answers to Interrogatories (Gill, T.) (Entered: 11/07/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  MOTION for Joinder re 57 MOTION to Stay Proceedings and to Certify Order for Interlocutory Appeal and Certificate of Service Sean Kim appearing for Defendant Local Union 1186 of the International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers (Kim, Sean) (Entered: 11/07/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    EO: COURT'S ORDER re 57 MOTION to Stay Proceedings and to Certify Order for Interlocutory Appeal. (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI)(wnn, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 11/05/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      MOTION to Stay Proceedings and to Certify Order for Interlocutory Appeal T. Anthony Gill appearing for Defendants Harold Dias, Jr, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers (Gill, T.) (Entered: 11/05/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        INITIAL DISCLOSURE by Craig Inagaki, Stephen Leong, Harry Ono. (Yip, Elijah) (Entered: 11/03/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          INITIAL DISCLOSURE by Harold Dias, Jr, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers. (Gill, T.) (Entered: 11/03/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            INITIAL DISCLOSURE by Local Union 1186 of the International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers. (Kim, Sean) (Entered: 11/03/2014)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Craig Inagaki, Stephen Leong, Harry Ono (Re Plaintiffs' First Amended Notice of Taking Deposition Upon Written Interrogatories) [Damien Kim]. (Yip, Elijah) (Entered: 10/24/2014)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER:. Signed by JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG on 10/20/2014. (eps)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 10/20/2014)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  EP: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held on 10/20/2014. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Order to be issued. Bench Trial set for 10/27/2015 09:00 AM before JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/15/2015 09:00 AM before JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Settlement Conference set for 6/30/2015 10:00 AM before JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Motions due by 5/27/2015. Discovery due by 8/28/2015. (In Chambers - no record, 9:00-9:20am.) (JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(sna, )No COS issued for this docket entry (Entered: 10/20/2014)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    Return of Service on Subpoena Damien Kim was served on October 9, 2014 (Yip, Elijah) (Entered: 10/14/2014)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/13/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      ANSWER to 1 Complaint and Certificate of Service by Local Union 1186 of the International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers.(Kim, Sean) (Entered: 10/13/2014)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        Scheduling Conference Statement . (Gill, T.) (Entered: 10/10/2014)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Harold Dias, Jr, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers.(Gill, T.) (Entered: 10/10/2014)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            Scheduling Conference Statement and Certificate of Service. (Kim, Sean) (Entered: 10/09/2014)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              REPORT of Planning Meeting . (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Yip, Elijah) (Entered: 10/09/2014)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                Scheduling Conference Statement . (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Yip, Elijah) (Entered: 10/09/2014)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Craig Inagaki, Stephen Leong, Harry Ono (re: Plaintiffs' Notice of Taking Deposition Upon Written Interrogatories [Damien Kim]) (Yip, Elijah) (Entered: 10/08/2014)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Craig Inagaki, Stephen Leong, Harry Ono (re: Plaintiffs' Amended First Request for Production of Documents to Defendant Harold Dias, Jr.) (Yip, Elijah) (Entered: 10/08/2014)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Craig Inagaki, Stephen Leong, Harry Ono (re: Plaintiffs' Amended First Request for Answers to Interrogatories to Defendant Harold Dias, Jr.) (Yip, Elijah) (Entered: 10/08/2014)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Craig Inagaki, Stephen Leong, Harry Ono (re: Plaintiffs' Amended First Request for Admissions to Defendant Harold Dias, Jr.) (Yip, Elijah) (Entered: 10/08/2014)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Craig Inagaki, Stephen Leong, Harry Ono (re: Plaintiffs' Amended First Request for Admissions to Local Union 1186 of the International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers) (Yip, Elijah) (Entered: 10/08/2014)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Craig Inagaki, Stephen Leong, Harry Ono (re Plaintiffs' Amended First Request for Admissions to International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers) (Yip, Elijah) (Entered: 10/08/2014)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Craig Inagaki, Stephen Leong, Harry Ono (re Plaintiffs' Amended First Request for Production of Documents to the International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers) (Yip, Elijah) (Entered: 10/08/2014)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Craig Inagaki, Stephen Leong, Harry Ono (re Plaintiffs' Amended First Request for Production of Documents to Local Union 1186 of the International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers) (Yip, Elijah) (Entered: 10/08/2014)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  ORDER DENYING AS MOOT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; AND GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS AND HAROLD DIAS, JR.'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION re 4 Motion ; 16 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 09/30/2014. (eps)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 09/30/2014)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/4/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM re 16 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Harold Dias, Jr, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers. (Gill, T.) (Entered: 09/04/2014)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 16 MOTION to Dismiss and Local Union 1186's Joinder in Motion to Dismiss; and Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion For a Preliminary Injunction filed by Craig Inagaki, Stephen Leong, Harry Ono. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Blane Mitsunami, # 2 Declaration of Celeste Kuuipo Lacuesta, # 3 Declaration of Allan Los Banos, # 4 Declaration of Dean Kaohu, # 5 Declaration of Gerald Yuh, # 6 Exhibit 12, # 7 Exhibit 13, # 8 Exhibit 14, # 9 Exhibit 15, # 10 Certificate of Service)(Yip, Elijah) (Entered: 08/28/2014)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/11/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Harry Ono, Stephen Leong, Craig Inagaki. International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers served on 7/23/2014, answer due 8/13/2014. (Yip, Elijah) (Entered: 08/11/2014)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/11/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Harry Ono, Stephen Leong, Craig Inagaki. Local Union 1186 of the International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers served on 7/23/2014, answer due 8/13/2014. (Yip, Elijah) (Entered: 08/11/2014)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/11/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Harry Ono, Stephen Leong, Craig Inagaki. Harold Dias, Jr served on 7/23/2014, answer due 8/13/2014. (Yip, Elijah) (Entered: 08/11/2014)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              EO: COURT ORDER VACATING HEARING AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON JURISDICTIONAL ISSUE. (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI)(wnn, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 08/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                Joinder re 16 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Harold Dias, Jr., International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Certificate of Service filed by Local Union 1186 of the International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers. (Kim, Sean) (Entered: 08/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/6/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Craig Inagaki, Stephen Leong, Harry Ono Plaintiffs' First Request For Admissions to Defendant International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers (Yip, Elijah) (Entered: 08/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/6/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Craig Inagaki, Stephen Leong, Harry Ono Plaintiffs' First Request For Admissions to Defendant Local Union 1186 of The International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers (Yip, Elijah) (Entered: 08/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/6/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Craig Inagaki, Stephen Leong, Harry Ono Plaintiffs' First Request For Admissions to Defendant Harold Dias, Jr. (Yip, Elijah) (Entered: 08/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/6/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Craig Inagaki, Stephen Leong, Harry Ono Plaintiffs' First Request For Answers to Interrogatories to Defendant International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers (Yip, Elijah) (Entered: 08/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/6/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Craig Inagaki, Stephen Leong, Harry Ono Plaintiffs' First Request For Answers to Interrogatories to Defendant Harold Dias, Jr. (Yip, Elijah) (Entered: 08/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/6/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Craig Inagaki, Stephen Leong, Harry Ono Plaintiffs' First Request For Production of Documents and Things to Defendant International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers (Yip, Elijah) (Entered: 08/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/6/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Craig Inagaki, Stephen Leong, Harry Ono Plaintiffs' First Request For Production of Documents and Things to Defendant Local Union 1186 of The International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers (Yip, Elijah) (Entered: 08/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/6/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Craig Inagaki, Stephen Leong, Harry Ono Plaintiffs' First Request For Production of Documents and Things to Defendant Harold Dias, Jr. (Yip, Elijah) (Entered: 08/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/6/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION of The Parties Regarding Handling of Ballots. Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 8/6/14. (gab, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 08/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/6/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Harold Dias, Jr, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers re 16 MOTION to Dismiss (Gill, T.) (Entered: 08/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/6/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 16 MOTION to Dismiss : Motion Hearing set for 10/6/2014 at 11:15 AM before JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. (wnn, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry. (Entered: 08/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/6/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss T. Anthony Gill appearing for Defendants Harold Dias, Jr, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum Memorandum in Support, # 2 Declaration Declaration of Mowrey, # 3 Declaration Declaration of Dias)(Gill, T.) (Entered: 08/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/1/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          EO: terminating 9 Motion to Shorten time to hear Motion. (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI)(wnn, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 08/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/31/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            EO: Regarding 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Motion Hearing set for 10/6/2014 at 11:15 AM is moved up to 9/8/2014 at 10:30 AM before JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI)(wnn, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 07/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              EP: Status Conference held on 7/30/2014. (Court Reporter Cynthia Ott) (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI)(wnn, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 07/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                EP: Status Conference held on 7/22/2014. Further Status Conference set for 7/30/2014 at 03:15 PM before JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. (Court Reporter Cynthia Ott) (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI)(wnn, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 07/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  Submission of EXHIBIT "3" to 4 Plaintiffs' MOTION for a Preliminary Injunction - filed by Craig Inagaki, Stephen Leong, Harry Ono. DISC RETAINED (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 3, # 2 Certificate of Service)(emt, ) (Entered: 07/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    EO: Status Conference set for 7/22/2014 at 03:30 PM before JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI)(wnn, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 07/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time to hear Motion re 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Elijah Yip appearing for Plaintiffs Craig Inagaki, Stephen Leong, Harry Ono (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Paul M. Saito, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Certificate of Service)(Yip, Elijah) (Entered: 07/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 10/6/2014 at 11:15 AM before JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. (wnn, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry. (Entered: 07/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          Summons Issued as to Harold Dias, Jr., International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, and Local Union 1186 of the International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers. (afc) (Entered: 07/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet: (Attachments: NOTICE TO PARTIES REGARDING SERVICE PURSUANT TO RULE 4 OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE and: # 1 AO 398 form: Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, # 2 AO 399 form: Waiver of the Service of Summons) (afc) (Entered: 07/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00AM on 10/20/2014 before JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 7/21/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Corporate Disclosure Memo) (afc) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO: re CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (Entered: 07/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ( MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) Elijah Yip appearing for Plaintiffs Craig Inagaki, Stephen Leong, Harry Ono (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion, # 2 Declaration of Stephen Leong, # 3 Declaration of Craig Inagaki, # 4 Declaration of Harry Ono, # 5 Declaration of Gerald Yuh, # 6 Exhibit 1, # 7 Exhibit 2, # 8 Exhibit 3, # 9 Exhibit 4, # 10 Exhibit 5, # 11 Exhibit 6, # 12 Exhibit 7, # 13 Exhibit 8, # 14 Exhibit 9, # 15 Exhibit 10, # 16 Exhibit 11, # 17 Certificate of Service)(Yip, Elijah) Event modified on 7/23/2014 to a Motion for TRO (ecs, ). (Entered: 07/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Case Assignment to U.S. District Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi and U.S. Magistrate Judge Kevin S.C. Chang. Please reflect Civil case number CV 14-00327-LEK-KSC on all further pleadings. (afc)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry. (Entered: 07/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    Summons (Proposed) (Yip, Elijah) (Entered: 07/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-1420007.), filed by Harry Ono, Stephen Leong, Craig Inagaki. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Yip, Elijah) (Entered: 07/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?