Baggett v. B&B Auto Tire & Towing
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 6:10-cv-06004-TC

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 12, 2019 at 2:05 AM ST (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit Other Personal Property Damage
  Entries (2) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/8/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER: Adopting Findings and Recommendation 11 . Signed on 6/8/10 by U.S. District Judge Michael R. Hogan. (ljb)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    Findings & Recommendation: This case should be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Order granting Application for Leave to Proceed IFP 9 subject to further review by the Court. Objections to the Findings and Recommendation are due by 5/3/2010. Signed on 4/19/10 by Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Coffin. (ljb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/27/2010: # 1 Corrected attachment) (ljb).
      Request RequestSpace LREF

      Statistics

      This case has been viewed 2 times.

      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
      Space
      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
       
      PlainSite
      Sign Up
      Need Password Help?