ECKERT, et al v. CAMDEN COUNTY, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-03388-FLW-AMD

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo LINDA ECKERT, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space CHARLENE CATHCART +1 856 546 9000
No Logo ROBERT W. ECKERT, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space CHARLENE CATHCART +1 856 546 9000
v.
No Logo Camden County, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com
No Logo CAMDEN COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com
No Logo John Doe, Defendant
No Logo JOHN MOE, Defendant
No Logo John Roe, Defendant
No Logo KEVIN RAFTERY, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com
No Logo MICHAEL W. MCLAUGHLIN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com
No Logo STEVEN KUDATZKY, Arbitrator

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space STEVEN KARL KUDATZKY +1 856 988 3131 skudatzky@comcast.net
Office Camden
Filed 7/17/2003
Jury Demand Both
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Camden
Terminated 6/2/2004
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags 12BP, ARBITRATION, CLOSED, SCHEDO
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 15 Filed: 6/2/2004, Entered: 6/2/2004 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal with prejudice and without costs. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 6/2/04. (ar1, )
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 6/2/2004, Entered: 6/2/2004 Terminated Case
    ***Civil Case Terminated. (ar1, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 14 Filed: 5/26/2004, Entered: 5/26/2004 Order Referring Case to ArbitrationCourt Filing
      ORDER Appointing Arbitrator STEVEN KUDATZKY, ESQ.; Arbitration Hearing set for 7/13/2004 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Chief Judge John W. Bissell on 5/26/04. (mfs, )
        LREF
        Legal Document 13 Filed: 3/26/2004, Entered: 3/29/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
        AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER IN ARBITRATION CASE: Discovery due by 6/1/2004. Arbitration to be scheduled for a date in July 2004.Signed by Judge Ann Marie Donio on 3/26/04. (sb)
          LREF
          Legal Document 12 Filed: 1/7/2004, Entered: 1/8/2004 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
          ORDER granting [8] Motion for Leave to File an amended complaint. All references to "Kevin Raffery" in the complaint are stricken, and shall now reflect Kevin Rafferty. Pltf. may file the amended complaint within 20 days.. Signed by Judge Ann Marie Donio on 1/7/04. (ar1, )
            LREF
            Legal Document 11 Filed: 1/5/2004, Entered: 1/8/2004 OrderCourt Filing
            CONSENT ORDER to amend caption to reflect the correct spelling of KEVIN RAFTERY . Signed by Judge Ann Marie Donio on 1/5/04. (ar1, )
              LREF
              Blank 10 Filed: 12/22/2003, Entered: 12/24/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
              AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER in ARBITRATION CASE setting Discovery cutoff on 3/31/04; By copy of this orde, the clerk will be requested to schedule the arbitration for a date in May 2004. (signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio)(NM) (db)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 12/22/2003, Entered: 12/23/2003 Status Conference
                Status conference held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on December 22, 2003. (jm1)
                  LREF
                  Blank 9 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: 12/2/2003 Certification
                  CERTIFICATION of Charlene Cathcart, Esquire on behalf of LINDA ECKERT, ROBERT W. ECKERT supporting [8-1] motion for leave to file an amended complaint. (Exhibits Annexed) (ar1)
                    LREF
                    Blank 8 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: 12/2/2003, Terminated: 1/7/2004 Motion for Leave to FileCourt Filing
                    Notice of MOTION for leave to file an amended complaint by LINDA ECKERT, ROBERT W. ECKERT [8-1] motion referred to Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio, Motion set for 1/9/04 on [8-1] motion . (PO Subm)(Cert of Mailing) (ar1)
                      LREF
                      Blank 7 Filed: 9/24/2003, Entered: 9/25/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                      SCHEDULING ORDER in arbitration case setting Amending of pleadings on 12/1/03; Discovery cutoff 1/30/04; Status conference 10:30 12/22/03; and setting arbitration for a date in March 2004. (signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio)(NM) (sb)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 9/23/2003, Entered: 9/24/2003 Scheduling Conference
                        Scheduling conference held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on September 23, 2003. (jm1)
                          LREF
                          Blank 6 Filed: 9/18/2003, Entered: 9/18/2003 Substitution of Attorney
                          Substitute attorney for CAMDEN COUNTY, CAMDEN COUNTY SHERIF, MICHAEL W. MCLAUGHLIN, KEVIN RAFFERY; Terminated attorney MARYLOU GARTY; Added WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE (sb)
                            LREF
                            Blank 5 Filed: 8/8/2003, Entered: 8/8/2003 Answer
                            ANSWER to Complaint by CAMDEN COUNTY, CAMDEN COUNTY SHERIF, MICHAEL W. MCLAUGHLIN, KEVIN RAFFERY; jury demand (sb)
                              LREF
                              Blank 4 Filed: 7/24/2003, Entered: 7/24/2003 Application and Clerk's Order to extend time to an
                              APPLICATION by CAMDEN COUNTY, CAMDEN COUNTY SHERIF and Clerk's Order extending time to answer. Answer due 8/8/03 (sb)
                                LREF
                                Blank 3 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: 7/21/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER, setting scheduling conference for 2:00 9/23/03 (signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio) (NM) (gg)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 2 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: 7/21/2003 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                  NOTICE of Allocation and Assignment filed. ( Camden - Judge Freda L. Wolfson - Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio) (NM) (gg)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: 7/21/2003 Case Referred to Arbitration
                                    CASE REFERRED to arbitration (gg)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 1 Filed: 7/17/2003, Entered: 7/21/2003 Complaint
                                      COMPLAINT filed in Superior Court Camden County on or about May 19, 2003-CAM-L-2950-03; jury demand (gg)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 1 Filed: 7/17/2003, Entered: 7/21/2003 Notice of Removal
                                        NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CAMDEN COUNTY, CAMDEN COUNTY SHERIF, MICHAEL W. MCLAUGHLIN filed with the following State Court proceedings annexed: Complaint, etc. FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 299481 (gg)
                                          LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 159 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?