Hastings v. Long Term Disability Plan for Go-Getters, Inc.

Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-00042
District Judge Richard D Bennett, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Richard D Bennett
Last Updated January 12, 2019 at 5:22 AM EST (6.3 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Sandra C. Hastings, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY S Mark Tilghman +1 410 742 8176 +1 410 742 3117 mark-sbtlaw@comcast.net
v.
No Logo Dearborn National Life Insurance Company, Defendant

Represented by Foran Glennon Palandech Ponzi & Rudloff PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Michael H. McColl +1 312 863 5000 mmccoll@fgpp.com

Represented by McNamee, Hosea, Jernigan, Kim, Greenan & Lynch, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles H Henderson +1 301 441 2420 +1 301 982 9450 chenderson@mhlawyers.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Paul Lynch +1 301 441 2420 +1 301 982 9450 jlynch@mhlawyers.com
No Logo Fort Dearborn Life Insurance Company, Defendant

Represented by McNamee, Hosea, Jernigan, Kim, Greenan & Lynch, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles H Henderson +1 301 441 2420 +1 301 982 9450 chenderson@mhlawyers.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Paul Lynch +1 301 441 2420 +1 301 982 9450 jlynch@mhlawyers.com
No Logo Go-Getters, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Cockey Brennan and Maloney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Robin R Cockey +1 410 546 1750 +1 410 546 1811 rrcesq@cbmlawfirm.com
No Logo Long Term Disability Plan for Go-Getters, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Medical Life Insurance Company, Defendant

Represented by McNamee, Hosea, Jernigan, Kim, Greenan & Lynch, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles H Henderson +1 301 441 2420 +1 301 982 9450 chenderson@mhlawyers.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Paul Lynch +1 301 441 2420 +1 301 982 9450 jlynch@mhlawyers.com
Attributes
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit 791 - Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
Timeline
  Entries (35) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MARGINAL ORDER granting 30 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Dearborn National Life Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 7/2/2015. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/02/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Dearborn National Life Insurance Company. (Henderson, Charles) (Entered: 07/02/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER denying 25 Plaintiff's Motion to Supplement the Record. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 6/30/2015. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/30/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 6/30/2015. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/30/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY to Response to Motion re 25 MOTION for Discovery to Supplement Record filed by Sandra C. Hastings. (Tilghman, S) (Entered: 02/17/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE to Motion re 25 MOTION for Discovery to Supplement Record filed by Dearborn National Life Insurance Company. Replies due by 2/17/2015. (Henderson, Charles) (Entered: 01/29/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Discovery to Supplement Record by Sandra C. Hastings Responses due by 2/2/2015 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit supplemental records)(Tilghman, S) (Entered: 01/16/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner no longer assigned to case. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Settlement Conference held on 12/3/2014 before Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
PAPERLESS ORDER granting 23 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Michael H McColl. Attorney Michael H McColl will receive a separate email with the previously issued CM/ECF login and password. Signed by Clerk on 10/16/2014. (mrs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael H. McColl ( Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0416-5015593.) by Dearborn National Life Insurance Company (Henderson, Charles) (Entered: 10/15/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER Rescheduling Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 9/15/14. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/15/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/6/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 08/06/2014. (bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/06/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner for Settlement. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 7/30/14 (cags, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/30/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MARGINAL ORDER Granting 18 Intial Report and Request for Revised Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 07/28/2014. (bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/30/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Report re: Deposition hours (Henderson, Charles) (Entered: 07/30/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 11/28/2014. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 7/16/14. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum to Counsel)(bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/17/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Correspondence re: Line Requesting Issuance of Scheduling Order (Henderson, Charles) (Entered: 04/25/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
QC NOTICE: 14 Certificate of Service filed by Sandra C. Hastings was filed incorrectly. **Discovery material is not filed with the Court pursuant to Local Rule 104. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/31/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
(FILED IN ERROR) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sandra C. Hastings (Tilghman, S) Modified on 1/2/2014 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 12/31/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ANSWER to 10 Amended Complaint for Declaratory Judgment by Dearborn National Life Insurance Company.(Lynch, John) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/12/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Summons Issued 21 days as to Long Term Disability Plan for Go-Getters, Inc. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/12/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE by Sandra C. Hastings re 10 Amended Complaint For the clerk to issue summons (Tilghman, S) (Entered: 02/11/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Sandra C. Hastings. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement marked up version of amended complaint)(Tilghman, S) (Entered: 02/11/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/23/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Long Term Disability Plan for Go-Getters, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Dearborn National Life Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Health Care Service Corporation for Long Term Disability Plan for Go-Getters, Inc... (Lynch, John) (Entered: 01/23/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Deficiency Notice Fort Dearborn Life Insurance Company. Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 1/28/2013 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ANSWER to Complaint by Fort Dearborn Life Insurance Company.(Lynch, John) (Entered: 01/17/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Go-Getters, Inc.. (Cockey, Robin) (Entered: 01/14/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Go-Getters, Inc. Responses due by 1/31/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Supporting memorandum, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Cockey, Robin) (Entered: 01/14/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
STANDING ORDER CONCERNING REMOVAL re 1 Notice of Removal, filed by Medical Life Insurance Company, Fort Dearborn Life Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 1/8/2013. (rss, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (2-4) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR WICOMICO COUNTY, MARYLAND. (rss, Deputy Clerk)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Filing of Removal by Fort Dearborn Life Insurance Company, Medical Life Insurance Company re 1 Notice of Removal. (rss, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Writ of Summons Issued as to Fort Dearborn Life Insurance Company. (rss, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
COMPLAINT against Fort Dearborn Life Insurance Company, Go-Getters, Inc., Long Term Disability Plan for Go-Getters, Inc., Medical Life Insurance Company, filed by Sandra C. Hastings. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Non Domestic Case Information Report)(rss, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Wicomico County, Maryland, case number 22-C-12-001847. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 84637020364), filed by Fort Dearborn Life Insurance Company, Medical Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rss, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/8/2013: # 2 Text of Proposed Order) (rss, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 01/08/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 2 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?