Emmis Television Broadcasting, LP v. TravelCenters of America, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 3:06-cv-01004-PK

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 12, 2019 at 6:03 AM ST (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit Other Personal Property Damage
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
OPINION & ORDER: Granting in Part Plaintiff's Bill of Costs 78 : Defendants are ordered to reimburse Emmis in the amount of $4,027.91 for costs incurred in litigating this action. Signed on 10/19/07 by Judge Paul Papak. (gm)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 9/27/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    Opinion & Order: Plaintiff is Ordered to reimburse Defendants in the amount of $662.00 for expenses incurred by Defendants' expert witness in connection with his deposition by Plaintiff's counsel. Signed on 9/27/07 by Judge Paul Papak. (gm)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 9/27/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law: This Court concludes that Defendants are liable to Plaintiff in the amount of $203,594.86 plus post-judgment interest calculated in accordance with the provisions of 28 U.S.C. ยง 1961. Plaintiff is additionally entitled to recover its costs reasonably incurred herein. Judgment will be entered separately. Signed on 9/27/07 by Judge Paul Papak. (gm)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/15/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        OPINION & ORDER: Defendant's Motion in Limine Regarding the Proper Measure of Damages 32 is granted. The proper measure of damages to be applied at trial is the difference between the fair market value of Emmis's van and equipment immediately before and immediately after the July 12, 2005, incident at TCA's gas station. Emmis is precluded from offering evidence or argument at trial that there is no fair market value for the property or that the fair market value will not fully compensate Emmis for the damage to its van or equipment. Signed on 6/15/07 by Judge Paul Papak. (gm)
          Request RequestSpace LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 2 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?