Leif's Auto Collision Centers, LLC v. American Family Insurance Group, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 3:06-cv-01485-PK

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 12, 2019 at 6:36 AM ST (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit Other Personal Property Damage
  Entries (3) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/22/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
OPINION & ORDER: Defendant's Motion for Attorney Fees 25 and Bill of Costs 29 are Denied. Signed on 10/22/07 by Judge Paul Papak. (gm)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/26/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER: Adopting the Magistrate's Findings and Recommendation 21 : This action is Dismissed with prejudice under FRCP 41(a)(2). Signed on 7/26/07 by Judge Garr M. King. (gm)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      Findings & Recommendation: This action should be dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2) and a judgment should be prepared. American Family's request for attorney fees and costs reasonably incurred should be addressed upon the filing by American Family of a separate post-judgment motion for attorney fees and cost bill. Objections to the Findings and Recommendation are due by 7/23/2007. Response to Objections to the Findings and Recommendation are due by 8/6/2007. Signed on 7/6/07 by Judge Paul Papak. (gm)
        Request RequestSpace LREF

        Statistics

        This case has been viewed 1 time.

        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
        Space
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
         
        PlainSite
        Sign Up
        Need Password Help?