Delashaw v. Seattle Times Company
Federal Civil Lawsuit Washington Western District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-00537-JLR

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 8, 2021 at 4:27 PM DT (1.1 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Johnny B. Delashaw, Jr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by harriganleyh.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristin Elizabeth Ballinger +1 206 623 1700 +1 206 623 8717 kristinb@harriganleyh.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tyler Lawrence Farmer +1 206 623 1700 +1 206 623 8717 tylerf@harriganleyh.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Arthur W. Harrigan, Jr. +1 206 623 1700 +1 206 623 8717 arthurh@harriganleyh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by IRWIN SCHWARTZ LAW OFFICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Irwin H. Schwartz +1 206 623 5084 +1623595 +16 623 5951 irwin@ihschwartz.com
v.
No Logo Charles Cobbs, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by MCNAUL, EBEL, NAWROT, HELGREN & VANCE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jehiel I Baer +1 206 467 1816 JBaer@mcnaul.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Malaika M Eaton +1 206 467 1816 meaton@mcnaul.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Somerville

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Q. Somerville +1 205 871 2183 +1 205 871 2184 jqs@somervillellc.com
No Logo Seattle Times Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Summit Law Group PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jessica L Goldman +1 206 676 7000 +1 206 676 7001
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Teresa R Rodela +1 206 676 7000 teresar@summitlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher T Wion +1 206 676 7000 chrisw@summitlaw.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (264) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 4/8/2021, Entered: None Transcript - Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 4/7/2021, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 4/7/2021, Entered: None Transcript Order Form
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 4/4/2021, Entered: None Transcript - Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 4/4/2021, Entered: None Transcript - Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 3/30/2021, Entered: None Transcript - Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 3/5/2021, Entered: None Transcript Order Form
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 2/26/2021, Entered: None Time Schedule Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 2/25/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appeal to Circuit
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 2/17/2021, Entered: None Appeal Number from USCA
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 2/12/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appeal to Circuit
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 1/26/2021, Entered: None JLR Minute Order Setting Trial Date & Related Dates(FORM)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 1/20/2021, Entered: None Judgment by Court
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 1/20/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Judgment
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 1/13/2021, Entered: None Judgment
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 1/13/2021, Entered: None Stipulated Motion
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 1/7/2021, Entered: None 1 - Order
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 12/29/2020, Entered: None JLR Minute Order Setting Trial Date & Related Dates(FORM)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 12/22/2020, Entered: None Redacted Document
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 12/15/2020, Entered: None 1 - Order
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 12/11/2020, Entered: None Sealed Order
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 12/11/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 12/7/2020, Entered: None Surreply
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 12/4/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Reconsideration
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 12/3/2020, Entered: None Statement
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 12/2/2020, Entered: None Reconsideration
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 12/1/2020, Entered: None Notice-Other
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 11/30/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 11/30/2020, Entered: None Surreply
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 11/30/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 11/24/2020, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Association
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 11/23/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 11/20/2020, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 11/18/2020, Entered: None Sealed Order
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 10/31/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Exclude
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 10/16/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 10/16/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 10/14/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 10/12/2020, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 10/12/2020, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 10/12/2020, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 10/12/2020, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 10/12/2020, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 10/12/2020, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 10/12/2020, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 10/12/2020, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 10/12/2020, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 10/12/2020, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 10/12/2020, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 10/12/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 10/7/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 10/7/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 10/6/2020, Entered: None Order on Stipulated Motion
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 8/4/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 8/4/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 8/4/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 8/3/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 8/3/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 8/3/2020, Entered: None Brief
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 8/3/2020, Entered: None Order on Stipulated Motion
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 7/31/2020, Entered: None Unredacted Sealed Document
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 7/31/2020, Entered: None Seal
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 7/31/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 7/31/2020, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 7/31/2020, Entered: None Brief - Reply
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 7/31/2020, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 7/31/2020, Entered: None Declaration (non motion)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 7/31/2020, Entered: None Brief - Reply
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 7/31/2020, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 7/31/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 7/31/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 7/31/2020, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 7/31/2020, Entered: None Seal
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 7/28/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 7/28/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 7/28/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 7/28/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 7/28/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 7/28/2020, Entered: None Unredacted Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 7/28/2020, Entered: None Brief
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 7/28/2020, Entered: None Seal
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 7/28/2020, Entered: None Stipulated Motion
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 7/27/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 7/27/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 7/27/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 7/27/2020, Entered: None Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 7/27/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 7/24/2020, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 7/24/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 7/24/2020, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 7/24/2020, Entered: None Reply (non motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 7/22/2020, Entered: None Notice of Joinder into Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 7/20/2020, Entered: None Praecipe to Attach Document
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 7/20/2020, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 7/20/2020, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 7/20/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 7/20/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 7/20/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 7/20/2020, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 7/20/2020, Entered: None Declaration (non motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 7/20/2020, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 7/20/2020, Entered: None Response (non motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 7/20/2020, Entered: None Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 7/20/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 7/20/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 7/20/2020, Entered: None Stipulated Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 7/20/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 7/20/2020, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 7/20/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 7/14/2020, Entered: None 1 - Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 7/14/2020, Entered: None 1 - Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 7/13/2020, Entered: None Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 7/10/2020, Entered: None Notice of Motion Re-Noted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 7/9/2020, Entered: None Notice of Joinder into Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 7/9/2020, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 7/9/2020, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 7/9/2020, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 7/9/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 7/9/2020, Entered: None Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 7/9/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 7/9/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 7/9/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 7/9/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 7/9/2020, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 7/8/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 7/8/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 7/8/2020, Entered: None Exclude
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 7/8/2020, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 7/8/2020, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 7/8/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 7/8/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 7/8/2020, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 7/8/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 7/8/2020, Entered: None Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 7/8/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Over-length Motions and Briefs
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 7/2/2020, Entered: None File Over-length Motions and Briefs
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 6/26/2020, Entered: None Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 6/22/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 6/19/2020, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 6/19/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 6/19/2020, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 6/18/2020, Entered: None Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 6/18/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 6/18/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 6/18/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 6/17/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 6/17/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 6/17/2020, Entered: None 3 - Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 6/17/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 6/16/2020, Entered: None Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 6/13/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 6/13/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 6/13/2020, Entered: None Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 6/12/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 6/12/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 6/12/2020, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 6/11/2020, Entered: None Sealed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 6/8/2020, Entered: None 1 - Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 6/2/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 6/1/2020, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 6/1/2020, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 5/28/2020, Entered: None 1 - Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 5/28/2020, Entered: None 1 - Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 5/21/2020, Entered: None Unredacted Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 5/4/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 5/4/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 5/4/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 4/17/2020, Entered: None Notice-Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 4/10/2020, Entered: None 1 - Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 3/26/2020, Entered: None Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 3/20/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 3/20/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 3/20/2020, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 3/18/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 3/16/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 3/16/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 3/3/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Intervene
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 3/3/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 3/3/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 3/3/2020, Entered: None Unredacted Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 3/2/2020, Entered: None Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 3/2/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 3/2/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 3/2/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 3/2/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 3/2/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 3/2/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 3/2/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 3/2/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 3/2/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 3/2/2020, Entered: None Intervene
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 3/2/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 3/2/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 3/2/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 2/19/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 2/19/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 2/14/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 2/14/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 2/6/2020, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 2/6/2020, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 2/6/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 2/6/2020, Entered: None Proposed Order (Unsigned)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 2/6/2020, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 2/6/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 2/6/2020, Entered: None Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 1/30/2020, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 11/1/2019, Entered: None Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 10/18/2019, Entered: None Notice of Unavailability
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 10/18/2019, Entered: None Notice of Unavailability
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 9/18/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 8/28/2019, Entered: None Amended Answer to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 8/27/2019, Entered: None Order on Stipulated Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 8/26/2019, Entered: None Stipulated Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AGREEMENT REGARDING DISCOVERY OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION AND ORDER re 48 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None Answer to amended complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: None protective orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROTECTIVE ORDER re parties' 45 Stipulated Motion, by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: None Stipulated Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: None Order to Show CauseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 42 Stipulated Protected Order. Parties directed to show cause within seven (7) days why the court can enter a protective order that relates to disclosures in the MQAC Proceeding, and why section of the stipulated protective order complies with Local Rule 26(c). Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: None Answer to amended complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: None stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Protective Order by parties re 41 Order, (Attachments: # 1 Model Stipulated Protective Order Redline)(Harrigan, Arthur) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying the parties' 40 stipulated motion for entry of their agreed protective order. The motion is denied without prejudice to re-filing in a manner that comports with the court's local rules. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) (Entered: 08/31/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: None stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Protective Order by parties (Harrigan, Arthur) (Entered: 08/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting in part and denying in part the Times' 27 Motion to Dismiss and denying Dr. Cobbs' 30 Motion to Dismiss signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TH) (Entered: 08/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Sur-Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SURREPLY filed by Plaintiff Johnny B. Delashaw, Jr re 30 MOTION to Dismiss CORRECTED, 27 MOTION to Dismiss (Harrigan, Arthur) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Intent to File a Surreply re 36 Reply to Response to Motion, 35 Reply to Response to Motion ; filed by Plaintiff Johnny B. Delashaw, Jr. (Harrigan, Arthur) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY, filed by Defendant Charles Cobbs, TO RESPONSE to 30 MOTION to Dismiss CORRECTED (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Eaton, Malaika) (Entered: 08/03/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY, filed by Defendant Seattle Times Company, TO RESPONSE to 27 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Goldman, Jessica) (Entered: 08/03/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Johnny B. Delashaw, Jr, to 30 MOTION to Dismiss CORRECTED. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A)(Harrigan, Arthur) (Entered: 07/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Johnny B. Delashaw, Jr, to 27 MOTION to Dismiss . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment A)(Harrigan, Arthur) (Entered: 07/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES by Judge James L. Robart; Length of Trial: *12-14 days*. Jury Trial is set for 12/2/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 14106 before Judge James L. Robart. Joinder of Parties due by 8/14/2018, Amended Pleadings due by 6/5/2019, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 6/5/2019, Motions due by 7/5/2019, Discovery completed by 8/5/2019, Dispositive motions due by 9/3/2019, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 10/3/2019, Motions in Limine due by 10/21/2019, Pretrial Order due by 11/12/2019, Deposition Designations due by 11/13/2019, Pretrial Conference set for 11/18/2019 at 02:00 PM before Judge James L. Robart. Trial briefs to be submitted by 11/25/2019, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 11/25/2019. (AD) (Entered: 07/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: None Joint Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 12-14 days. (Harrigan, Arthur) (Entered: 07/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss CORRECTED, filed by Defendant Charles Cobbs. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/3/2018, (Eaton, Malaika) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Defendant Charles Cobbs. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/3/2018, (Eaton, Malaika) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None Order on Stipulated Motion to SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER to Seal Plaintiff's Amended Complaint re parties' 26 Stipulated Motion. The Court orders the clerk to seal Dr. Delashaw's original Amended Complaint (Dkt. # 20 ). Dr. Delashaw's corrected Amended Complaint (Dkt. # 25 ) is Plaintiff's operative complaint. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TH) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Defendant Seattle Times Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/3/2018, (Goldman, Jessica) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None Stipulated Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Stipulated MOTION to Seal Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Johnny B. Delashaw, Jr. Noting Date 7/9/2018, (Harrigan, Arthur) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: None Praecipe-Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PRAECIPE re 20 Amended Complaint, for Libel, Defamation by Implication, Tortious Interference With Business Relationship and/or Expectancy, Unfair Business Practices in Violation of RCW 19.86 et seq. and Civil Conspiracy by Plaintiff Johnny B. Delashaw, Jr (Attachments: # 1 Complaint)(Harrigan, Arthur) (Entered: 07/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER finding as moot Defendant Cobb's 19 Motion to Dismiss Complaint; no further briefing or hearing shall occur. The Court's finding is without prejudice to any party's right to respond as that party deems appropriate based on Dr. Delashaw's amended complaint. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) (Entered: 07/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: None stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER to Moot Charles Cobbs' Motion to Dismiss by parties re 19 MOTION to Dismiss (Harrigan, Arthur) (Entered: 06/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re: 21 Stipulated Motion. The Court strikes Seattle Times' motion to dismiss Dr. Delashaw's complaint (Dkt. # 17 ), subject to the Seattle Times' right to renew its motion or file a response the Seattle Times deems to be appropriate based on Dr. Delashaw's amended complaint. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) (Entered: 06/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: None stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER to Strike Seattle Times Company's Motion to Dismiss by parties re 17 MOTION to Dismiss (Harrigan, Arthur) (Entered: 06/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 20 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED AMENDED COMPLAINT For Libel, Defamation by Implication, Tortious Interference With Business Relationship and/or Expectancy, Unfair Business Practices in Violation of RCW 19.86 et seq. and Civil Conspiracy against All Defendants, filed by Johnny B. Delashaw, Jr.(Harrigan, Arthur) Modified on 7/9/2018 to seal per 28 Stipulation and Order (TH). (Entered: 06/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Defendant Charles Cobbs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/6/2018, (Eaton, Malaika) (Entered: 06/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/7/2018, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate McClatchy Company for Seattle Times Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Seattle Times Company (Goldman, Jessica) (Entered: 06/07/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/7/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Defendant Seattle Times Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment A, # 2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/29/2018, (Goldman, Jessica) (Entered: 06/07/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Teresa R Rodela on behalf of Defendant Seattle Times Company. (Rodela, Teresa) (Entered: 06/01/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: None Order on Stipulated MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 14 Stipulated Motion to Extend Initial Scheduling Deadlines. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 6/18/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/2/2018, Joint Status Report due by 7/9/2018. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) (Entered: 05/15/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: None Stipulated Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Stipulated MOTION Extending Initial Scheduling Deadlines, filed by Defendant Seattle Times Company. Noting Date 5/14/2018, (Goldman, Jessica) (Entered: 05/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re 12 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney John Q Somerville for Defendant Charles Cobbs, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 05/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: None Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY John Q. Somerville FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Charles Cobbs (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5315972 (Eaton, Malaika) (Entered: 05/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE TO FILER: re 8 Notice of Appearance. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (PM) (Entered: 05/01/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Malaika M Eaton on behalf of Defendant Charles Cobbs. (Eaton, Malaika) (Entered: 04/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                WAIVER of the Service of Summons sent 04/10/2018 of Charles Cobbs by Plaintiff Johnny B. Delashaw, Jr (Harrigan, Arthur) (Entered: 04/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jessica L Goldman on behalf of Defendant Seattle Times Company. (Goldman, Jessica) (Entered: 04/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge James L. Robart. Joint Status Report due by 6/1/2018, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 5/11/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 5/25/2018. (AD) (Entered: 04/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jessica L Goldman on behalf of Defendant Seattle Times Company. (Goldman, Jessica) (Entered: 04/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff Johnny B. Delashaw, Jr (Harrigan, Arthur) (Entered: 04/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Irwin H. Schwartz on behalf of Plaintiff Johnny B. Delashaw, Jr. (Schwartz, Irwin) (Entered: 04/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            WAIVER of the Service of Summons - Seattle Times Company; mailed on 4/10/2018, by Plaintiff Johnny B. Delashaw, Jr (Harrigan, Arthur) Modified on 4/13/2018 to add date waiver was sent (PM). (Entered: 04/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Charles Cobbs, Seattle Times Company. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(ST) (Entered: 04/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT for Libel, Defamation By Implication, Tortious Interference With Business Relationship and/or Expectancy, Unfair Business Practices in Violation of RCW 19.86 et seq. and Civil Conspiracy against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-5276747) Attorney Arthur W. Harrigan, Jr added to party Johnny B. Delashaw, Jr(pty:pla), filed by Johnny B. Delashaw, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Seattle Times Company, # 3 Summons Charles Cobbs)(Harrigan, Arthur) (Entered: 04/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 10 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?