GOODMAN-DEANGELIS v. DON C. TAYLOR ASSOC.
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-05060-RBK-AMD

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo VERONICA GOODMAN-DEANGELIS, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo DON C. TAYLOR ASSOC., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com
Office Camden
Filed 10/24/2003
Jury Demand Both
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Camden
Terminated 7/26/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, SCHEDO
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 15 Filed: 7/26/2004, Entered: 7/27/2004 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of Dismissal by deft. DON C. TAYLOR ASSOC. & pltf. Veronica Goodman-DeAngelis. (js)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 7/26/2004, Entered: 7/27/2004 Terminated Case
    ***Civil Case Terminated. (js)
      LREF
      Legal Document 14 Filed: 6/1/2004, Entered: 6/1/2004 Order on Motion to Appoint CounselCourt Filing
      ORDER denying [10] Motion to Appoint Counsel . Signed by Judge Ann Marie Donio on 6/1/04. (js)
        LREF
        Legal Document 13 Filed: 6/1/2004, Entered: 6/1/2004 Letter
        Letter from pltf. Veronica Goodman-DeAngelis, Re: Pro Bono Appl. (js)
          LREF
          Legal Document 12 Filed: 5/20/2004, Entered: 5/24/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
          SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 7/19/2004. Discovery due by 10/7/2004. Dispositive Motions due by 10/29/2004. Signed by Judge Ann Marie Donio on 05/20/04. (db)
            LREF
            Legal Document 11 Filed: 5/19/2004, Entered: 5/20/2004 Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ann Marie Donio : Scheduling Conference held on 5/19/2004. (Tape #0048.) (ar1, )
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 5/19/2004, Entered: 5/20/2004 Scheduling Conference
              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ann Marie Donio : Scheduling Conference held on 5/19/2004. (jm1, )
                LREF
                Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/20/2004, Entered: 4/21/2004, Terminated: 6/1/2004 Motion to Appoint Counsel
                MOTION to Appoint Pro Bono Counsel by pltf. VERONICA GOODMAN-DEANGELIS. (js)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 9 Filed: 4/20/2004, Entered: 4/21/2004 Application for Pro Bono Counsel
                  Application for Pro Bono Counsel by pltf. VERONICA GOODMAN-DEANGELIS. (js)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 4/20/2004, Entered: 4/21/2004 set/reset motion and R&R; deadlines/hearings
                    Setting Deadlines as to [10] MOTION to Appoint Pro Bono Counsel. Motion Hearing set for 5/21/2004 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. PLEASE BE ADVISED THIS MOTION WILL BE DECIDED ON THE PAPERS UNLESS OTHERWISE NOTIFIED BY THE COURT. (js) Modified on 4/21/2004 (js).
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 8 Filed: 4/12/2004, Entered: 4/12/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER, Initial Conference set for 5/19/2004 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio.. Signed by Judge Ann Marie Donio on 4/12/04. (th, )
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 7 Filed: 4/1/2004, Entered: 4/12/2004 Answer
                        ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by DON C. TAYLOR ASSOC..(th, )
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/25/2004, Entered: 3/29/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by pltf. VERONICA GOODMAN-DEANGELIS. DON C. TAYLOR ASSOC. served on 3/18/2004, answer due 4/7/2004. (js)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 3/9/2004, Entered: 3/9/2004 Summons Issued
                            Summons Issued to the USM for service as to DON C. TAYLOR ASSOC..Days Due - 20. (gg, )
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 5 Filed: 3/5/2004, Entered: 3/9/2004 Complaint
                              COMPLAINT against DON C. TAYLOR ASSOC. JURY DEMAND, filed by VERONICA GOODMAN-DEANGELIS.(gg)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 4 Filed: 3/5/2004, Entered: 3/9/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER Plaintiff's application to proceed IFP is Granted; Clerk is directed to file the complaint; and Clerk is directed to issue summons to the USM for service.. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 03/05/04. (gg, )
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 3 Filed: 3/2/2004, Entered: 3/3/2004 Motion for Reconsideration
                                  MOTION for Reconsideration of [2] Order by pltf. VERONICA GOODMAN-DEANGELIS. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit (IFP Appl))(js)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/2/2004, Entered: 3/3/2004 set/reset motion and R&R; deadlines/hearings
                                  Setting Deadlines as to [3] MOTION for Reconsideration [2] Order. Motion Hearing set for 4/2/2004 before Judge Robert B. Kugler. PLEASE BE ADVISED THAT THIS MOTION WILL BE DECIDED ON THE PAPERS UNLESS OTHERWISE NOTIFIED BY THE COURT. (js)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 2 Filed: 11/10/2003, Entered: 11/12/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                    ORDER Denying [1-2] application to proceed IFP (signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler) (NM) (gg)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 1 Filed: 11/10/2003, Entered: 11/12/2003 Application/Petition
                                      APPLICATION to proceed in forma pauperis by VERONICA GOODMAN-DEANGELIS (gg)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 10/24/2003, Entered: 10/30/2003 Complaint Received
                                        Complaint Received with an application to proceed IFP. (gg)
                                          LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 454 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?