Maus v. Toder
Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:09-cv-00628-PAC-JJK

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 12, 2019 at 10:30 AM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit Truth in Lending
  Entries (3) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 46 Motion for Summary Judgment (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Patrick A. Conmy on 1/19/10. (MM)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/27/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER denying 3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Patrick A. Conmy on 7/27/09. (MM)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/7/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER granting 28 Motion to Set Aside Default; granting 28 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Steven M. Maus answer due 7/10/2009.; denying 15 Motion for Default Judgment (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Patrick A. Conmy on 7/7/09. (MM)
        Request RequestSpace LREF

        Statistics

        This case has been viewed 0 times.

        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
        Space
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
         
        PlainSite
        Sign Up
        Need Password Help?