SHORTS v. PARSONS TRANSPORTATION GROUP, INC.
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:09-cv-01571
District Judge Henry H. Kennedy, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 12, 2019 at 12:42 PM EST (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo TIMOTHY SHORTS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by KATOR, PARKS & WEISER, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Michael J. Kator +1 202 898 4800 +1 202 289 1389 mkator@katorparks.com
v.
No Logo Parsons Transportation Group Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Epstein Becker & Green, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Frank Charles Morris, Jr. +1 202 861 1880 +1 202 296 2882 fmorris@ebglaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathleen M. Williams +1 202 861 0900 +1 202 296 2882 kwilliams@ebglaw.com
Citation Family Medical Leave Act of 1993
Nature of Suit 790 - Labor: Other
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
JUDGMENT. The Court orders that this case is dismissed and that plaintiff's claims be submitted to arbitration. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on January 19, 2010. (NP) (Entered: 01/19/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding 3, 4 Motion of Defendant to Dismiss and to Compel Arbitration Pursuant to the Agreed-Upon Employee Dispute Resolution Process. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on January 19, 2010. (NP) (Entered: 01/19/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Henry H. Kennedy. Motion Hearing on 12/14/2009 re 3 MOTION to Dismiss and 4 MOTION to Compel filed by PARSONS TRANSPORTATION GROUP, INC.; Held and taken under advisement. (Court Reporter Annie Shaw) (tr)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/3/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        NOTICE of Hearing: 4 Oral argument on the MOTION to Compel, 3 and MOTION to Dismiss will now be held @ 2:00 PM on Monday, December 14, 2009 in Courtroom 27A before Judge Henry H. Kennedy. (tj)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/24/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          NOTICE: Motion hearing currently scheduled for 11/30/09 @ 3:00pm is hereby CANCELED and shall be rescheduled based upon the availability of the court. (tj)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/20/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            NOTICE of Hearing: Motion Hearing currently scheduled for 11/4/09 @ 12:00 is hereby RESCHEDULED for 11/30/2009 @ 3:00 PM in Courtroom 27A before Judge Henry H. Kennedy. (tj)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/6/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              NOTICE re Notice of Hearing on Motion: Parties will be allowed 15 minutes per side for oral argument. (tj)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/6/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                NOTICE OF HEARING on 4 MOTION to Compel and 3 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion Hearing is set for 11/4/2009 @ 12:00 PM in Courtroom 27A before Judge Henry H. Kennedy. (tj )
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/5/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  REPLY to opposition to motion re 3 MOTION to Dismiss and to Compel Arbitration Pursuant to the Agreed-Upon Employee Dispute Resolution Process filed by PARSONS TRANSPORTATION GROUP, INC.. (Williams, Kathleen) (Entered: 10/05/2009)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/29/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen M. Williams on behalf of PARSONS TRANSPORTATION GROUP, INC. (Williams, Kathleen) (Entered: 09/29/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/28/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Memorandum in opposition to re 4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by TIMOTHY SHORTS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Affidavit of Timothy Shorts), # 2 Exhibit 2 (Letter to Defendant), # 3 Exhibit 3 (Followup letter to Defendant), # 4 Exhibit 4 (E-mail from Defendant), # 5 Exhibit 5 (Second e-mail from Defendant), # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Kator, Michael) (Entered: 09/28/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        MOTION to Compel Arbitration by PARSONS TRANSPORTATION GROUP, INC. (tr)(See Docket Entry 3 to view document. Counsel is reminded to docket all parts of the motion in future filings.) (Entered: 09/15/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          MOTION to Dismiss and to Compel Arbitration Pursuant to the Agreed-Upon Employee Dispute Resolution Process by PARSONS TRANSPORTATION GROUP, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Attachment 1 to Exhibit A, # 4 Attachment 2 to Exhibit A, # 5 Attachment 3 to Exhibit A)(Morris, Frank) (Entered: 09/14/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Corporate Disclosure Statement by PARSONS TRANSPORTATION GROUP, INC.. (Morris, Frank) (Entered: 09/14/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/19/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Summons (1) Issued as to PARSONS TRANSPORTATION GROUP, INC.. (rdj)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/19/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                COMPLAINT against PARSONS TRANSPORTATION GROUP, INC. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616023253) filed by TIMOTHY SHORTS. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rdj) (Entered: 08/19/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 1 time.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?