United States v. $117,750.00 in United State Currency
Federal Civil Lawsuit Colorado District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-01157-PSF-BNB

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 12, 2019 at 2:13 PM EST (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 881
Nature of Suit Drug Related Seizure of Property
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/6/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Final ORDER of Forteiture and JUDGMENT. Judgment of forfeiture of $90,000 of Defendant $117,750 in United StatesCurrency and Defendant Ford F150 VIN 1FTDX1864VKC87639 shall enter in favor ofthe United States; the United States shall have fu ll and legal title to the forfeited $90,000 and Ford F150 VIN 1FTDX1864VKC87639, and may dispose of them in accordance with law and in accordance with the terms and provisions of the parties' Settlement Agreement; That $27,750 of Defen dant $117,750 in United States Currency shall be returned to claimant James Mosher; and That a Certificate of Reasonable Cause, which this Order constitutes, is GRANTED as to all defendant properties pursuant to 28 U.S.C. ยง 2465. Signed by Judge Phillip S. Figa on 11/06/06. (rlp, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/17/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER the Motion for Extension is GRANTED. The scheduling conference set for October 23, 2006, at 8:30 a.m., and all related deadlines, are VACATED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion for Default Judgment is DENIED ASMOOT. The parties shall file a Motion for Final Order ofForfeiture on or before October 31, 2006. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/17/06.(rlp2, )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/20/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER setting Scheduling Conference for 10/23/2006 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. Signed by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 09/20/06. (rlp, )
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/12/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER granting 9 Motion to Vacate Scheduling Conference. The U.S. to file a status report by 09/05/06. Signed by Judge Phillip S. Figa on 07/12/06. (rlp, )
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/22/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER setting Scheduling Conference for 7/24/2006 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 602 before Judge Phillip S. Figa. Signed by Judge Phillip S. Figa on 06/22/06. (rlp, )
            Request RequestSpace LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 0 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?