CSC Holdings, Inc. v. Cella
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:04-cv-05690-DRH-ARL

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 12, 2019 at 5:40 PM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 47 U.S.C. § 605
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (2) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/22/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: The Court hereby adopts the Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge Lindsay, awarding Plaintiff a total of $3,295.75. The Clerk of the Court is directed to Close this case. Ordered by Judge Denis R. Hurley on 02/22/2006. (Hurley, Denis)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/30/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. See attacted report for details. Signed by Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on January 30, 2006. c/ecf(Miller, Dina)
      Request RequestSpace LREF

      Statistics

      This case has been viewed 0 times.

      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
      Space
      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
       
      PlainSite
      Sign Up
      Need Password Help?