DIRENZO v. IMMIGRATION
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-05595-FLW

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo MASSIMILIANO DIRENZO, Petitioner
v.
No Logo Immigration & Naturalization Service, Respondent
Office Camden
Filed 11/26/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 530 - Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Burlington
Terminated 3/5/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 3 Filed: 4/6/2004, Entered: 4/6/2004 Mail Returned
Mail (Document #2, Order) Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to MASSIMILIANO DIRENZO. (mfs, )
    LREF
    Legal Document 2 Filed: 3/5/2004, Entered: 3/8/2004 Order Dismissing CaseCourt Filing
    ORDER directing Clerk to deem Petition WITHDRAWN and to close the file. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 3/5/04. (mfs, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: 1/28/2004 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER directing to Petitioner to either remit the $5.00 filing fee or submit an IFP application within 30 days or the Petition will be withdrawn . Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 1/28/04. (mfs, )
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 11/26/2003, Entered: 12/1/2003 Petition Received
        Petition Received under 28:2241 with motion for immediate deportation, no filing fee, no application for IFP. (mfs)
          LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 6 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?