Hernandez v.Schneider National, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:06-cv-02197-SMM

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 12, 2019 at 11:47 PM EST (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit Personal Injury: Motor Vehicle
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/18/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 31 STIPULATION to extend deadlines. Discovery due by 8/29/2008. Dispositive motions due by 10/10/2008. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/5/2008 04:00 PM before Judge Stephen M McNamee. See order for further details. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 04/18/08. (DNH)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/11/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER granting 26 Motion to waive personal appearance at the Preliminary Pretrial Conference. Dfts are granted leave to appear telephonically at the Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 11/05/07 at 10:00 a.m. Counsel for dft shall initiate a conference call and calling Judge McNamee's chambers (602-322-7555) no later than 9:55 a.m. (local time). Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 10/11/07.(DNH)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER granting Plaintiff's 24 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically by calling Judge McNamee's chambers (602-322-7555) no later than 9:55 a.m. (local time). FURTHER ORDERED that it is the responsibility of Pla and his counsel to arrange for an interpreter. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 10/10/07.(DNH)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER granting 15 Motion for Extension of Time for Service of Process. Plaintiffs shall have until 07/09/07 to accomplish service upon Lopez in accordance with Rule 4(e) of the Federal Rules and Rule 4.2 of the Arizona Rules. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 05/07/07.(DNH)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/7/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER granting 8 Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Summons and Complaint. Plaintiff shall have through 03/14/07 to complete service upon Rafael Lopez. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 12/07/06.(DNH)
            Request RequestSpace LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 3 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?