Riggan v. Werner Enterprises, Inc
Federal Civil Lawsuit Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:07-cv-00519-SMM

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 13, 2019 at 12:31 AM EST (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit Personal Injury: Motor Vehicle
  Entries (3) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice per parties stipulation 20 . Parties to bear their own costs and fees. Vacating the status conference of 11/5/07.. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 11/1/07. (DMT, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER Upon parties' 18 STIPULATION to Continue Deadline to File Stipulation for Dismissal, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties have until October 31, 2007 to file a stipulation for dismissal. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 10/12/07. (SAT)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER granting 9 Motion to Continue Rule 16 Preliminary Conference. Preliminary Pretrial Conference reset for 8/20/2007 03:00 PM before Judge Stephen M McNamee. That all of the provisions of the Courts Order Setting Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference (Dkt.6), with the exception of the date changed above, remain in full force and effect.. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 7/30/07.(DMT, )
        Request RequestSpace LREF

        Statistics

        This case has been viewed 5 times.

        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
        Space
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
         
        PlainSite
        Sign Up
        Need Password Help?