Allen v. NYC Department of Enviornmental Protection
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-00203
District Judge Katherine B. Forrest, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 13, 2019 at 12:48 AM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Lionel Allen, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Phillips & Associates, Attorney at law, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/16/2015 Edward J Kennedy +1 212 248 7431 +1 212 901 2107 ekennedy@tpglaws.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The White Rose Group LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jesse Curtis Rose +1 347 709 2584 +1 800 483 4508 jrose@white-rose-group.com
v.
No Logo City of New York, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Transit Authority

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Alexis Downs +1 212 356 2507 +1 212 356 1148 alexis.downs@nyct.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Public Advocate for the City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jessica Giambrone +1 212 356 2460 +1 212 341 3934 jgiambro@law.nyc.gov
New York City Department Of Environmental Protection New York City Department Of Environmental Protection, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Adam E Collyer +1 212 232 1300 adam.collyer@lewisbrisbois.com

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Transit Authority

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Alexis Downs +1 212 356 2507 +1 212 356 1148 alexis.downs@nyct.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Public Advocate for the City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin Patrick Connolly, Jr. +1 914 469 8890 kconnoll@law.nyc.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY Caroline Jane Maxwell +1 212 294 6700 +1 212 294 4700 cpage@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY John S Schowengerdt +1 212 676 1917 +1 212 788 9776 jschowen@law.nyc.gov
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000e-2e
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
  Entries (149) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: it is hereby stipulated and agreed, by the attorneys for the parties herein that, pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of civil Procedure, the above captioned action is dismissed with prejudice. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 11/17/2017) (js) (Entered: 11/20/2017)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY - DOCUMENT REFERRED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL. Note to Attorney Alexis Downs Document 105 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal, was referred to Judge Katherine B. Forrest for approval. (tro)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 11/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      DOCUMENT REFERRED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) City of New York and without costs to either party pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by City of New York.(Downs, Alexis) Modified on 11/17/2017 (tro). (Entered: 11/16/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Settlement Conference proceeding held on 10/17/2017 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.(rro) (Entered: 10/27/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Settlement Conference held on 10/17/2017 before Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shari Riemer, (518) 581-8973. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/17/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/27/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/25/2018.(rro) (Entered: 10/27/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 11/20/2017. (js)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 10/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              ORDER: On Tuesday, October 17, 2017, Magistrate Judge Freeman informed the Court that the parties to this action reached a settlement in principle. Accordingly, this action is discontinued without costs to any party and without prejudice to restore the action to this Court's calendar if such an application is made not later than Monday, November 20, 2017. Any application to reopen must be filed by the above date; any application to reopen filed thereafter may be denied solely on that basis. All other dates and deadlines in this matter are ADJOURNED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate this action. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 10/18/2017) (js) Modified on 11/27/2017 (js). (Entered: 10/18/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman: Settlement Conference held on 10/17/2017. (aba)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: 100 Letter filed by Lionel Allen. ENDORSEMENT: ORDERED: The Court needs to set a trial date because this could go on and on. We will proceed to trial on January 16, 2018. (This is a hard trial date; inform all witnesses). Report back on the status of settlement on 10/18/17, and the Court will set in limine dates and final pre-trial order dates., ( Ready for Trial by 1/16/2018.) (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 10/02/2017) (ama) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Jesse C. Rose dated October 2, 2017 re: Status of Settlement Negotiations and Scheduled Settlement Conference. Document filed by Lionel Allen.(Rose, Jesse) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman: Settlement Conference held via telephone on 9/19/2017. (aba)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman: Settlement Conference held via telephone on 8/29/2017, ( Settlement Conference set for 9/28/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 17A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman., Telephone Conference set for 9/19/2017 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman). (aba)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 8/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jessica Giambrone on behalf of City of New York. (Giambrone, Jessica) (Entered: 08/29/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so redesignated. (wb)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Referred to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 8/1/2017) (anc) (Entered: 08/02/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 96 Letter filed by New York City Department of Environmental Protection, City of New York. ENDORSEMENT: Ordered: The Court has issued a reference to the Magistrate. If no settlement is reached by Oct. 2, 2017, the Court will set a trial date in December, 2017. The parties are to report on the status not later than 10/2/17. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 8/1/2017) (mro) (Entered: 08/01/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Assistant Corporation Counsel Alexis Downs dated 8/1/2017 re: remaining claim. Document filed by City of New York, New York City Department of Environmental Protection.(Downs, Alexis) (Entered: 08/01/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    ORDER: On July 5, 2017, the mandate of the Second Circuit issued remanding this matter as to plaintiff's failure-to-promote claim. (ECF No. 94.)The Court hereby directs the parties to confer and to submit to the Court not later than Tuesday, August 1, 2017, a joint letter discussing their respective views on how best to proceed to resolution of the remaining claim. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 7/11/2017) (js) (Entered: 07/11/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Transmission of USCA Mandate to the District Judge re: 94 USCA Mandate,. (nd)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to 92 Notice of Appeal, filed by Lionel Allen. USCA Case Number 16-0560-cv. UPON DUE CONSIDERATION, it is HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the judgment of the District Court is AFFIRMED in part and VACATED and REMANDED in part for further proceedings consistent with this order. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 07/05/2017. (nd) (Entered: 07/05/2017)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          TRUE COPY ORDER of USCA as to 92 Notice of Appeal, filed by Lionel Allen. USCA Case Number 16-0560-cv. UPON DUE CONSIDERATION, it is HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the judgment of the District Court is AFFIRMED in part and VACATED and REMANDED in part. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Certified: 06/13/2017. (nd) (Entered: 06/13/2017)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for 92 Notice of Appeal, filed by Lionel Allen were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (nd)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: 92 Notice of Appeal,. (nd)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 2/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                NOTICE OF APPEAL from 91 Clerk's Judgment, 90 Memorandum & Opinion,. Document filed by Lionel Allen. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number 0208-11997192. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Order Appealed From)(Rose, Jesse) (Entered: 02/25/2016)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 1/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  CLERK'S JUDGMENT: It is, ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Opinion & Order dated January 27, 2016, Defendant's motion for summary judgment is granted; accordingly, the case is closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 01/28/2016) (Attachments: # 1 Right to Appeal, # 2 Right to Appeal)(km) (Entered: 01/28/2016)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Transmission to Judgments and Orders Clerk. Transmitted re: 90 Memorandum & Opinion, to the Judgments and Orders Clerk. (lmb)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      OPINION & ORDER re: 64 MOTION for Summary Judgment . filed by New York City Department of Environmental Protection, City of New York. For the reasons set forth above, defendant's motion for summary judgment is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motion at ECF No. 64 and to terminate this action. (As further set forth in this Order) (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 1/27/2016) (lmb) (Entered: 01/27/2016)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 11/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Jesse C. Rose dated November 17, 2015 re: Response to Defendant's Letter Under Your Honor's November 9, 2015 Order. Document filed by Lionel Allen.(Rose, Jesse) (Entered: 11/17/2015)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                          LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Assistant Corporation Counsel Alexis Downs dated 11/12/2015 re: Order dated November 9, 2015 (Doc. 87). Document filed by City of New York, New York City Department of Environmental Protection.(Downs, Alexis) (Entered: 11/12/2015)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER: In his response to defendant's Rule 56.1 Statement, plaintiff objects to the affidavit and exhibits provided by Grace Pigott, Director of Planning and Recruitment for the New York Department of Environmental Protection. (Pl.'s Resp. to Def.'s 56.1 Stmt 111.) Plaintiff states that Ms. Pigott's affidavit and the exhibits, which contain copies of various job postings, are not admissible because Ms. Pigott was not identified as a Rule 26 witness during discovery. (Id.) Not later than Thursday, November 12, 2015, defendant shall address the Rule 26 issue in a letter to the Court. Plaintiff may respond not later than Tuesday, November 17, 2015. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 11/9/2015) (lmb) (Entered: 11/09/2015)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER: The Court intends to decide this case on summary judgment. Accordingly, all dates and deadlines, including the June 23, 2015 conference, are ADJOURNED. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 6/19/2015) (lmb) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kevin Patrick Connolly, Jr on behalf of New York City Department of Environmental Protection. (Connolly, Kevin) (Entered: 06/17/2015)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER: The conference scheduled for Tuesday, June 23, 2015, at 2 p.m. is hereby rescheduled to 4 p.m. on the same day., ( Status Conference set for 6/23/2015 at 04:00 PM before Judge Katherine B. Forrest.) (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 6/15/2015) (lmb) (Entered: 06/15/2015)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER. The conference scheduled for Friday, June 12, 2015, at 9:00 a.m. is hereby rescheduled to Tuesday, June 23, 2015, at 2:00 p.m. The Court will not hear oral argument on the currently pending motion for summary judgment. The Court will resolve this motion in the near future. (Conference set for 6/23/2015 at 02:00 PM before Judge Katherine B. Forrest.) (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 6/11/2015) (rjm) (Entered: 06/11/2015)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      RESPONSE re: 78 Counter Statement to Rule 56.1 . Document filed by City of New York. (Downs, Alexis) (Entered: 06/04/2015)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 64 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by City of New York. (Downs, Alexis) (Entered: 06/04/2015)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/25/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Alexis Downs to RE-FILE Document 79 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 60 Scheduling Order,,, addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Assistant Corporation Counsel Alexis Downs dated 5/22/2015. ERROR(S): No signature or s/. (db)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 5/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Alexis Downs dated 5/22/2015 re: I am writing to request a one-week extension of time for defendant to file a reply in support of its motion for summary judgment. Defendants reply is now due by May 28, 2015. The requested extension would make the reply due by June 4, 2015. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted., ( Replies due by 6/4/2015.) (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 5/23/2015) (lmb) (Entered: 05/26/2015)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                              FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 60 Scheduling Order, addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Assistant Corporation Counsel Alexis Downs dated 5/22/2015. Document filed by City of New York.(Downs, Alexis) Modified on 5/25/2015 (db). (Entered: 05/22/2015)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                COUNTER STATEMENT TO 65 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by Lionel Allen. (Rose, Jesse) (Entered: 05/20/2015)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 64 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Unredacted. Document filed by Lionel Allen. (Rose, Jesse) (Entered: 05/20/2015)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    AFFIRMATION of Jesse C. Rose in Opposition re: 64 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Lionel Allen. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 32, # 2 Exhibit 33, # 3 Exhibit 34, # 4 Exhibit 35, # 5 Exhibit 36, # 6 Exhibit 37, # 7 Exhibit 38, # 8 Exhibit 39, # 9 Exhibit 40)(Rose, Jesse) (Entered: 05/20/2015)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                      MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 74 Letter filed by Lionel Allen. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. Exhibits may be filed in redacted form. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 5/20/2015) (lmb) (Entered: 05/20/2015)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                        LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Jesse C. Rose dated 5/18/2015 re: Request Regarding How to File Documents Subject to Protective Order. Document filed by Lionel Allen.(Rose, Jesse) (Entered: 05/19/2015)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Jesse Curtis Rose to RE-FILE Document 73 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File and to File Redacted Confidential Documents and Information addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Jesse C Rose dated 5/18/2015. Use the event type Letter found under the event list Other Documents. (db)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 5/18/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                            FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File and to File Redacted Confidential Documents and Information addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Jesse C Rose dated 5/18/2015. Document filed by Lionel Allen.(Rose, Jesse) Modified on 5/19/2015 (db). (Entered: 05/18/2015)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 5/18/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              AFFIRMATION of Jesse C. Rose in Opposition re: 64 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Lionel Allen. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 41, # 33 Exhibit 42)(Rose, Jesse) (Entered: 05/18/2015)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 5/18/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Lionel Allen in Opposition re: 64 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Lionel Allen. (Rose, Jesse) (Entered: 05/18/2015)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 5/18/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 64 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Redacted. Document filed by Lionel Allen. (Rose, Jesse) (Entered: 05/18/2015)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 5/18/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    COUNTER STATEMENT TO 65 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by Lionel Allen. (Rose, Jesse) (Entered: 05/18/2015)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Assistant Corporation Counsel Alexis Downs in Support re: 64 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by City of New York, New York City Department of Environmental Protection. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T)(Downs, Alexis) (Entered: 04/21/2015)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - DECLARATION of Assistant Corporation Counsel Alexis Downs in Support re: 64 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by City of New York, New York City Department of Environmental Protection. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T)(Downs, Alexis) Modified on 4/21/2015 (lb). (Entered: 04/21/2015)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 64 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by City of New York, New York City Department of Environmental Protection. (Downs, Alexis) (Entered: 04/21/2015)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by City of New York, New York City Department of Environmental Protection. (Downs, Alexis) (Entered: 04/21/2015)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              MOTION for Summary Judgment . Document filed by City of New York, New York City Department of Environmental Protection.(Downs, Alexis) (Entered: 04/21/2015)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Alexis Downs to RE-FILE Document 62 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, 63 Affirmation in Support of Motion. ERROR(S): Document(s) linked to filing error. (db)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Alexis Downs to RE-FILE Document 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment . ERROR(S): Rule 56.1 Statement is filed separately, using the Event Type found under - Other Answers. (db)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - AFFIRMATION of Assistant Corporation Counsel Alexis Downs in Support re: 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Document filed by City of New York, New York City Department of Environmental Protection. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T)(Downs, Alexis) Modified on 4/21/2015 (db). (Entered: 04/20/2015)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by City of New York, New York City Department of Environmental Protection. (Downs, Alexis) Modified on 4/21/2015 (db). (Entered: 04/20/2015)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Summary Judgment . Document filed by City of New York, New York City Department of Environmental Protection. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Local Rule 56.1 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts)(Downs, Alexis) Modified on 4/21/2015 (db). (Entered: 04/20/2015)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF REDESIGNATION TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The above entitled action has been redesignated to Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger. Please note that this is a reassignment of the designation only. (pgu)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Katherine B. Forrest. Judge Kenneth M. Karas is no longer assigned to the case. (pgu)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER: The Court held a telephonic status conference in this action on March 5, 2015. As stated at that conference: 1. The following shall be the briefing schedule for summary judgment motions: Motions due by 4/20/2015. Responses due by 5/18/2015. Replies due by 5/28/2015. The next conference is set for Friday, June 12, 2015, at 9 a.m. The Court has set aside one hour for the conference. Pretrial Order due by 7/17/2015. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/21/2015 at 01:00 PM before Judge Katherine B. Forrest. Trial shall commence on Monday, July 27, 2015. Settlement discussions must occur in parallel to this schedule (schedule will not be adjourned for settlement discussions). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 3/6/2015) (kl) (Entered: 03/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                Transmission to Case Assignment Clerk. Transmitted re: 59 Order, Set Hearings, Set/Clear Flags, to the Case Assignment Clerk for preparation of notice of case assignment/reassignment. (lmb)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER: This case having recently been reassigned to the undersigned, it is hereby ORDERED that the Order of Reference to a Magistrate Judge, issued December 2, 2014 (ECF No. 42), is VACATED. All matters will proceed before Judge Forrest. The Court will hold a telephonic status conference in this action on Thursday, March 5, 2015, at 2:30 p.m. The parties shall call Chambers (212-805- 0276) from one line at the designated time. The Court will set a schedule at the conference. The Clerk of Court is directed to remove the "PRO-SE" flag from the docket. Plaintiff is no longer proceeding pro se., ( Telephone Conference set for 3/5/2015 at 02:30 PM before Judge Katherine B. Forrest.) (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 3/4/2015) (lmb) (Entered: 03/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kenneth M. Karas: Status Conference held on 2/24/2015. Jesse Rose for Plaintiff. Alexis Downs for Defendant. The Court held a status conference. Defendant will file a letter for a pre-motion conference by March 6, 2015. Plaintiff will respond by March 26, 2015. The next conference is scheduled for April 8, 2015 at 2pm. No court reporter. (Status Conference set for 4/8/2015 at 02:00 PM before Judge Kenneth M. Karas) (lnl)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/18/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lisa Margaret Smith: Settlement Conference held on 02/18/2015, Jesse Rose appearing in person for Plaintiff, and Alexis Downs appearing in person for Defendant. Adjourned. (Court Reporter courtflow) (ldr)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lisa Margaret Smith: Status Conference held on 02/10/2015, Jesse Rose appearing by telephone for Plaintiff, and Alexis Downs appearing by telephone for Defendant. Adjourned to 02/18/2015 at 10:30 AM for an in-person settlement conference. Counsel should either have: full independent settlement authority; principals present; or principals readily available by telephone. (Settlement Conference set for 02/18/2015 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 520, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Magistrate Judge Lisa Margaret Smith.) (ldr)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          RE-SCHEDULING NOTICE: The matter of Allen v. NYC Department of Environmental Protection has been re-scheduled from a telephonic status conference on Friday, 2/6/2015, to a telephonic status conference on Tuesday, 2/10/2015 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Lisa Margaret Smith. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Margaret Smith on 2/5/2015) (mml) (Entered: 02/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER: Definition of Confidential Information: As used herein the following terms shall be defined as follows: (1) any documents in the personnel files of any present or former employee of the City of New York, other than documents in plaintiffs personnel file; (2) any documents, including sound recordings, from any files maintained by any agency of the City of New York, including, but not limited to, the New York City Department of Investigation and the New York City Department of Citywide Administrative Services, concerning an investigation into the conduct of any potential, present or former employee of the City of New York, excluding plaintiffs file; and (3) any disciplinary file maintained by any agency of the City of New York concerning any present or former employee of the City of New York, excluding plaintiff, as set forth in this Order. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Margaret Smith on 1/23/2015) (mml) (Entered: 01/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith from Assistant Corporation Counsel Alexis Downs dated 1/23/2015 re: joint proposed confidentiality order. Document filed by City of New York, New York City Department of Environmental Protection. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Proposed Confidentiality Order)(Downs, Alexis) (Entered: 01/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re: 55 Memo Endorsement, to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. (lnl)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  MEMO ENDORSEMENT on 54 NOTICE of Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. Attorney Edward Joseph Kennedy terminated. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 1/16/2015) (lnl) (Entered: 01/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance. Document filed by Lionel Allen. (Kennedy, Edward) (Entered: 01/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lisa Margaret Smith: Status Conference held on 01/09/2015, Jesse Rose appearing by telephone for Plaintiff, and Alexis Downs appearing by telephone for Defendant. The Court's previous ruling that the Defendant provide to Plaintiff the identity of employees of the Department of Environmental Protection who have been referred for criminal prosecution for work-related misconduct includes providing information from the Department of Investigation. Defendant is required to produce a 30(b)(6) witness to discuss the Department of Investigation's investigation of Plaintiff; this deposition is limited to this topic, and is to be completed by 02/06/2015. Adjourned to 02/06/2015 at 04:30 PM for a telephonic status conference. (Status Conference set for 02/06/2015 at 04:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Lisa Margaret Smith.) (ldr)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith from Jesse C. Rose dated 1/6/15 re: Defendant's Proposed Confidentiality Agreement. Document filed by Lionel Allen. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Rose, Jesse) (Entered: 01/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re: 52 Scheduling Order to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. (mml)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            RE-SCHEDULING NOTICE: The matter of Allen v. NYC Department of Environmental Protection has been re-scheduled from a telephonic status conference on Tuesday, 1/6/2015, to a telephonic status conference on Friday, 1/9/2015 at 10:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Lisa Margaret Smith. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Margaret Smith on 1/5/2015) (mml) (Entered: 01/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith from Assistant Corporation Counsel Alexis Downs dated 12/19/14 re: discovery rulings. Document filed by City of New York. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Downs, Alexis) (Entered: 12/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 2/24/2015 at 03:30 PM before Judge Kenneth M. Karas. (lnl)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Jesse C. Rose dated 12/18/2014 re: Counsel for the Plaintiff Lionel Allen writes to request that this afternoon's conference, scheduled for 2:00 PM before Your Honor be adjourned as unnecessary.. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. The new conference date is February 24, 2015, at 3:30. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 12/18/2014) (lnl) (Entered: 12/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/17/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith from Assistant Corporation Counsel Alexis Downs dated 12/17/14 re: defendant's proposed confidentiality order. Document filed by City of New York. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Downs, Alexis) (Entered: 12/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/17/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith from Assistant Corporation Counsel Alexis Downs dated 12/17/14 re: plaintiff's 12/12/14 letter. Document filed by City of New York. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Downs, Alexis) (Entered: 12/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith from Jesse C. Rose dated December 12, 2014 re: Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice. Document filed by Lionel Allen. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Rose, Jesse) (Entered: 12/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/11/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re: 46 Order to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. (mml)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/11/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: In order to facilitate the progress of pre-trial discovery of this litigation in a just, speedy and inexpensive manner, to insure compliance with the case management plan, and to prevent the accumulation of unresolved discovery issues, the following procedures will be followed for the resolution of discovery disputes. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Margaret Smith on 12/11/2014) (mml) (Entered: 12/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/11/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lisa Margaret Smith: Status Conference held on 12/11/2014, Jesse Rose appearing in person for Plaintiff, and Alexis Downs appearing in person for Defendant. Discovery disputes resolved; see transcript for details. Adjourned to 01/06/2015 at 05:15 PM for a telephonic status conference. (Status Conference set for 01/06/2015 at 05:15 PM before Magistrate Judge Lisa Margaret Smith.) (Court Reporter courtflow) (ldr)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re: 45 MEMO ENDORSEMENT, to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. (lnl)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMO ENDORSEMENT on 41 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Jesse C. Rose dated 11/25/2014. ENDORSEMENT: The discovery deadline is extended 60 more days to allow the Parties to resolve the discovery disputes addressed herein. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 12/8/2014) (lnl) (Entered: 12/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re: 44 Scheduling Notice to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. (mml)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING NOTICE: The matter of Allen v. NYC Department of Environmental Protection has been scheduled for an in-person status conference on Thursday, 12/11/2014 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 520, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Magistrate Judge Lisa Margaret Smith. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Margaret Smith on 12/5/2014) (mml) (Entered: 12/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexis Downs on behalf of City of New York. (Downs, Alexis) (Entered: 12/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re: 42 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. (lnl)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            Vacated as per Judge's Order dated 3/4/2015, Doc. #59 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Lisa Margaret Smith. Motions referred to Lisa Margaret Smith. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 12/1/2014) (lnl) Modified on 3/5/2015 (lmb). (Entered: 12/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Jesse C. Rose dated 11/25/2014. Document filed by Lionel Allen.(Rose, Jesse) (Entered: 11/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re: 40 MEMO ENDORSEMENT, to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. (lnl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 38 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Jesse C. Rose dated 9/26/2014. ENDORSEMENT: The request is granted, but no more such requests will be granted. Any party which is dilatory in meeting its discovery obligations may be sanctioned. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 10/3/2014) (lnl) (Entered: 10/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re: 39 OPINION AND ORDER, to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. (lnl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      OPINION AND ORDER: Defendant's Motion To Dismiss is granted with respect to Plaintiffs§ 1981 claims and denied with respect to Plaintiffs other claims. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully requested to terminate the pending Motion, (see Dkt. No. 29), and to substitute the City of New York for the New York City Department of Environmental Protection as the Defendant in this Action. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 9/30/2014) (See OPINION AND ORDER as set forth) (lnl) (Entered: 09/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Jesse C. Rose dated 9/26/2014. Document filed by Lionel Allen.(Rose, Jesse) (Entered: 09/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re: 37 MEMO ENDORSEMENT, to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. (lnl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 36 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Assistant Corporation Counsel Alexis Downs dated 7/28/14. ENDORSEMENT: Both requests are granted, but only this one time. The new status conference date is October 23, 2014 at 3:30. So Ordered. Discovery due by 9/30/2014. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 7/28/2014) (lnl) (Entered: 07/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Assistant Corporation Counsel Alexis Downs dated 7/28/14. Document filed by New York City Department of Environmental Protection.(Downs, Alexis) (Entered: 07/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexis Downs on behalf of New York City Department of Environmental Protection. (Downs, Alexis) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re: 34 MEMO ENDORSEMENT, to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. (lnl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMO ENDORSEMENT on 33 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery due to defendant's counsel's departure from the New York City Law Department. ENDORSEMENT: Both requests are granted. The new conference date is September 12, 2014, at 11:00. So Ordered. (Discovery due by 7/31/2014. Case Management Conference set for 9/12/2014 at 11:00 AM before Judge Kenneth M. Karas.) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 5/27/2014) (lnl) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery due to defendant's counsel's departure from the New York City Law Department addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Adam E. Collyer, Assistant Corporation Counsel dated May 27, 2014., JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference due to defendant's counsel's departure from the New York City Law Department addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Adam E. Collyer, Assistant Corporation Counsel dated May 27, 2014. Document filed by Lionel Allen, New York City Department of Environmental Protection.(Collyer, Adam) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 29 MOTION to Dismiss the Third Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Lionel Allen. (Rose, Jesse) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 29 MOTION to Dismiss the Third Amended Complaint.. Document filed by New York City Department of Environmental Protection. (Collyer, Adam) (Entered: 01/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Adam E. Collyer in Support re: 29 MOTION to Dismiss the Third Amended Complaint.. Document filed by New York City Department of Environmental Protection. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - EEOC Charge, # 2 Exhibit B - Third Amended Complaint)(Collyer, Adam) (Entered: 01/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss the Third Amended Complaint. Document filed by New York City Department of Environmental Protection.(Collyer, Adam) (Entered: 01/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION SCHEDULING ORDER: At the Pre-Motion Conference held before the Court on November 14, 2013, the Court adopted the following scheduling order: Defendant shall file its motion to dismiss by January 10, 2014. Plaintiff shall file opposition papers by January 31, 2014. Defendant shall file a reply in support of his motion by February 14, 2014. Sur-reply papers will not be accepted unless prior permission of the Court is given. Counsel are reminded that there is a strict page limit, which will be extended only in extreme circumstances. Any pending deadlines found in the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure or in any applicable statute are hereby stayed until the date the motion is due. Courtesy copies are to be served upon counsel by the assigned date. One courtesy copy of all papers also shall be sent to this Court at the time they are served upon opposing counsel. If oral argument is requested, it may be scheduled by the Court. Please wait to hear from the Court to schedule argument. SO ORDERED. Motions due by 1/10/2014. Responses due by 1/31/2014. Replies due by 2/14/2014. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 11/15/2013) The Clerks Office Has Mailed Copies. (lnl) (Entered: 11/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: No additional parties may be joined except with leave of the Court. Amended pleadings may not be filed except with leave of the Court. All Fact Discovery due by 5/31/2014. Depositions due by 5/15/2013. Parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is 1-2 weeks. The next Case Management Conference set for 6/27/2014 at 03:00 PM before Judge Kenneth M. Karas. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 11/14/2013) The Clerks Office Has Mailed Copies. (lnl) (Entered: 11/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Edward Collyer on behalf of New York City Department of Environmental Protection. (Collyer, Adam) (Entered: 10/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Jesse C. Rose dated 9/19/2013 re: I write in regard to the above captioned suit and in response to Defendants' letter dated September 10, 2013. Defendant's request to make a motion to dismiss is unnecessary and should not be permitted. ENDORSEMENT: The Court will hold a pre motion conference on November 14, 2013 at 3:00. All deadlines are stayed until then., ( Pre-Motion Conference set for 11/14/2013 at 03:00 PM before Judge Kenneth M. Karas.) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 10/8/2013) (rj) (Entered: 10/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from John S. Schowengerdt dated 9/10/2013 re: Counsel writes pursuant to the Court's July 26, 2013 Scheduling Order regarding plaintiffs third amended complaint. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiff is to respond to this letter by September 24, 2013. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 9/17/2013) The Clerks Office Has Mailed Copies. (mml) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 17 Amended Complaint against New York City Department of Environmental Protection with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Lionel Allen. Related document: 17 Amended Complaint filed by Lionel Allen.(ft) (fk). (Entered: 08/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/26/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kenneth M. Karas: Pre-Motion Conference held on 7/26/2013. Edward Kennedy for Plaintiff. John Schowengerdt for Defendant. The Court held a pre-motion conference. Plaintiff will submit an amended complaint by August 16, 2013. No court reporter. (Amended Pleadings due by 8/16/2013.) (mml)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/26/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Edward Joseph Kennedy on behalf of Lionel Allen. (Kennedy, Edward) (Entered: 07/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Judge Nelson Stephen Roman is no longer assigned to the case. (pgu)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Judge Edgardo Ramos is no longer assigned to the case. (pgu)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/9/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from John S. Schowengerdt dated 7/9/2013 re: Counsel writes to request an adjournment of the Pre-motion Conference, scheduled for June 11, 2013. ENDORSEMENT: Pre-motion Conference is rescheduled at Defendant's request until July 26, 2013 at 11:30am. SO ORDERED. (Pre-Motion Conference set for 7/26/2013 at 11:30 AM before Judge Nelson Stephen Roman.) (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 7/9/2013) The Clerks Office Has Mailed Copies. (mml) (Entered: 07/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/25/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Stephen Schowengerdt on behalf of New York City Department of Environmental Protection. (Schowengerdt, John) (Entered: 06/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/11/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESCHEDULING NOTICE: The above case previously scheduled for pre-motion conference on 6/20/2013 is hereby rescheduled until 7/11/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 218, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Edgardo Ramos. The Clerk's Office Has Mailed Copies. (mml) (Entered: 06/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/10/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying 12 Motion to Appoint Counsel. ENDORSEMENT: This application is Denied as Moot. See Notice of Appearance (doc. 14). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 6/10/2013) The Clerks Office Has Mailed Copies. (mml) (Entered: 06/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/31/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO E-MAIL PDF. Note to Attorney Jesse C. Rose, Esq. for noncompliance with Section 14.3 of the S.D.N.Y. Electronic Case Filing Rules & Instructions. E-MAIL the PDF for Document 17 Amended Complaint to: caseopenings@nysd.uscourts.gov. (ft)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/31/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 4 Amended Complaint against New York City Department of Environmental Protection with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Lionel Allen. Related document: 4 Amended Complaint filed by Lionel Allen.(ft) (sdi). (Main Document 17 replaced on 11/13/2013) (fk). (Entered: 06/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/30/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Jesse C. Rose dated 5/29/2013 re: Counsel requests leave to file a Second Amended Complaint. ENDORSEMENT: The application is granted. Plaintiff is directed to file the Second Amended Complaint by May 31, 2013. (Amended Pleadings due by 5/31/2013.) (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 5/30/2013) The Clerks Office Has Mailed Copies. (mml) (Entered: 05/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Lionel L. Allen dated 5/25/2013 re: Plaintiff requests an extension until June 1, 2013 to reply to the defendants, (New York City Department of Environmental Protection) motion to dismiss. ENDORSEMENT: The application is granted. The Pre-Motion Conference is rescheduled until June 20, 2013 at 10:30am. Plaintiff's response to Defendant's pre-motion letter is now due June 13, 2013. (Pre-Motion Conference set for 6/20/2013 at 10:30 AM before Judge Edgardo Ramos.) (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 5/29/2013) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (mml) (Entered: 05/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jesse Curtis Rose on behalf of Lionel Allen (Rose, Jesse) (Entered: 05/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Caroline M. Page dated 5/1/2013 re: Counsel writes to request a premotion conference regarding defendants' anticipated motion to dismiss pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6). ENDORSEMENT: Pre-motion Conference is scheduled for June 5, 2013 at 11:30am. Plaintiff to state position in writing (not to exceed 3 pages) by May 29, 2013. SO ORDERED. (Pre-Motion Conference set for 6/5/2013 at 11:30 AM before Judge Edgardo Ramos.) (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 5/16/2013) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (mml) (Entered: 05/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/9/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION FOR THE COURT TO REQUEST COUNSEL. Document filed by Lionel Allen.(sc) (Entered: 05/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Caroline Jane Maxwell on behalf of NYC Department of Enviornmental Protection (Maxwell, Caroline) (Entered: 05/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying 9 Motion to Amend. ENDORSEMENT: Motion is Denied without prejudice. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 3/25/2013) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (mml) (Entered: 03/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/12/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Amend 4 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Lionel Allen. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(fk) (Entered: 03/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FRCP 4 Service Package Hand Delivered to U.S.M.: Package hand delivered to U.S.M. on 3/4/2013. (vj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS ISSUED as to NYC Department of Enviornmental Protection. (vj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re: USM-285 Forms Received from Plaintiff. (vj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FRCP 4 (Information Package Mailed) to plaintiff at the address noted on the complaint/court's docket on 02/22/2013 via Federal Express AIRBILL # 801747339380. The information package included: Initial Case Memo Letter, a copy of the Order Granting In Forma Pauperis Application (IFP), United States Marshal (U.S.M.-285) forms (One For Each Defendant), change of address postcards, Judge's individual rules, instructions on how to file a motion and opposition, instructions on filing an amended complaint, application for counsel, a consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge, and affirmation of service forms. (vj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER OF SERVICE: The Court directs the Clerk of Court to issue a summons in this action. Plaintiff is directed to serve the summons and amended complaint on Defendant within 120 days of the issuance of the summons. If within those 120 days, Plaintiff has neither served Defendant nor requested an extension of time to do so, the Court may dismiss the claims against Defendant under Rules 4 and 41 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure for failure to prosecute. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 2/19/2013) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (mml) (Entered: 02/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Mailed notice re: 6 Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment to the attorney(s) of record. (pgu)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. (pgu)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (pgu) (Entered: 02/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without payment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. § 1915. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 2/13/2013) (js) (Entered: 02/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 2 Complaint against NYC Department of Enviornmental Protection with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Lionel Allen. Related document: 2 Complaint filed by Lionel Allen.(sc) (Entered: 01/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Pro Se Acknowledgment Letter Mailed: Pro Se acknowledgment letter mailed to the plaintiff via USPS to the address noted on the Complaint on 1/24/13. (laq) (Entered: 01/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Case Designated ECF. (laq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT against NYC Department of Enviornmental Protection. Document filed by Lionel Allen.(laq) (Entered: 01/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Lionel Allen.(laq) (Entered: 01/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 8 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?