Koestler v. CashCall, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:06-cv-04536-ADM-JSM

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 13, 2019 at 1:08 AM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1681
Nature of Suit Truth in Lending
  Entries (2) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/13/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER re 16 Stipulation to withdraw Motion to Dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction filed by CashCall, Inc. The parties' request is GRANTED; the Court's March 21, 2007 Order 15 granting CashCall's Motion to Dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiciton is VACATED (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 04/13/2007. (TLU)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/21/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    VACATED, Order #17, 4/13/07. MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 2 Defendant CashCall Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 3/21/20007. (TLU) Modified on 4/16/2007 (jam).
      Request RequestSpace LREF

      Statistics

      This case has been viewed 0 times.

      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
      Space
      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
       
      PlainSite
      Sign Up
      Need Password Help?