Carughi v. The Money Market
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 3:10-cv-00175-BR

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 13, 2019 at 1:33 AM ST (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit Other Personal Property Damage
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Judgment on Counterclaims. Signed on 09/09/2013 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (bb)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law (Trial by Court). Signed on 09/09/2013 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (bb)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/2/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      Temporary Restraining Order-Order to Show Cause. The Temporary Restraining Order issued in this case, dated February 17, 2010 (#6), is hereby continued in full force and effect until the conclusion of the hearing on April 14, 2010 at 1:30 unless otherwise ordered by the court. Signed on 3/2/10 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (ljl)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Granting Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order 3 . Signed on 2/17/10 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (mkk)
          Request RequestSpace LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 2 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?