Complete Distribution Services, Inc. v. All States Transport, LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 3:13-cv-00800-SI

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 13, 2019 at 10:33 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 49 U.S.C. § 14706
Nature of Suit Interstate Commerce
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Opinion and Order - Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration (Dkt. 99 ) is DENIED. Signed on 11/2/2015 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    OPINION and ORDER - Plaintiff CDS's Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. 86 ) is DENIED. Signed on 9/29/2015 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 3/25/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      OPINION and ORDER - As supplemented in this opinion, the Court ADOPTS IN PART the Findings and Recommendation, Dkt. 65 , except for Parts IV.D and IV.E. CDS's motion to dismiss AST's counterclaim for negligence and to strike certa in affirmative defenses (Dkt. 46 ) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. AST's counterclaim for negligence is DISMISSED. AST's affirmative defenses of negligence and fault of others are STRICKEN. CDS's fourth claim for relief is DISMISSED. Signed on 3/25/2015 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        Findings & Recommendation: Plaintiff's motion to dismiss Defendant's counterclaim for negligence and to strike certain affirmative defenses 46 should be granted in part and denied in part. Signed on 11/21/14 by Magistrate Judge Dennis J. Hubel. (gm)
          Request RequestSpace LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 2 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?