Echostar Satellite L.L.C. v. Thang
Federal Civil Lawsuit Colorado District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-00469-LTB-MJW

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 13, 2019 at 12:52 PM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 1201
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/18/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER: Upon the Joint Stipulation 18 of Dismissal Subject to the Court's Previous Entry of the Agreed Permanent Injunction, it isORDERED that this action is dismissed with prejudice and without assessment of costs against either party. Each party shall bear its own attorney' fees and costs. Signed by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 8/18/05. (emksl, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/8/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    AGREED PERMANENT INJUNCTION (ORDER) re: 16 Motion for Permanent Injunction Defendants are restrained and enjoined from manufacturing, importing, etc. satellite receivers capable of decrypting EchoStar's satellite signals, access card, etc. Defendant stipulates and agrees to damages in the amount of $100,000 for each future violation. Signed by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 8/8/05. (emksl, )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/29/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      Minute ORDER denying 11 Pla's Motion for Leave to appear telephonically at the initial Scheduling Conf, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/28/05. (erv, )
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/2/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 6/28/2005 03:00 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/1/05. (lam, )
          Request RequestSpace LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 0 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?