Comcast of Maine/New Hampshire, Inc. v. Slater
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Hampshire District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-00142-JM

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 13, 2019 at 8:46 PM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 47 U.S.C. § 553
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (2) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/13/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER re Show Cause Hearing. Comcast and counsel have shown cause why they should not be sanctioned under Rule 11. Signed by Judge James R. Muirhead. (jgb, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/18/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER Mr. Shapiro is sanctioned and fined $500.00 for his late appearance and being unprepared. Mr. McLaughlin is fined $1,000.00 for failing to appear as ordered. Notice of Compliance Deadline set for 9/29/2006 for payment of fines and show cause statements by counsel. Rule 11 Sanction Hearing set for 10/11/2006 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge James R. Muirhead. Signed by Judge James R. Muirhead. (jgb, )
      Request RequestSpace LREF

      Statistics

      This case has been viewed 0 times.

      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
      Space
      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
       
      PlainSite
      Sign Up
      Need Password Help?