Orbital Publishing Group, Inc. v. Wells
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 1:15-cv-00480-CL

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 13, 2019 at 8:50 PM ST (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit Other Personal Property Damage
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER: Adopting Findings and Recommendation 33 . Defendants' Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs 30 GRANTED IN PART. Defendants are entitled to $20,863.60 in fees and costs. Signed on 4/17/2016 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (rh)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    Findings & Recommendation: Motion for Attorney Fees 30 should be granted in part. Objections to the Findings and Recommendation are due by 4/11/2016. If objections are filed, responses to objections are due 04/25/2016. Please access entire text by document number hyperlink. Signed on 03/24/2016 by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER: Adopting Findings and Recommendation 26 . See formal ORDER. Signed on 1/8/2016 by Chief Judge Ann L. Aiken. (rh)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        Findings & Recommendation: Request for Judicial Notice Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction 9 12 , Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 9 should be granted. Objections to the Findings and Recommendation are due by 1/7/2016. If objections are filed, responses to the objections are due 01/21/2016. Signed on 12/21/2015 by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm)
          Request RequestSpace LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 2 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?