Weltman v. Gates
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Northern District Court, Case No. 1:11-cv-01229
District Judge Patricia A. Gaughan, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 14, 2019 at 2:06 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Robert B. Weltman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Meyers, Roman, Friedberg & Lewis

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lester W. Armstrong +1 216 831 0042 +1 216 831 0542 larmstrong@meyersroman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Seth P. Briskin +1 216 831 0042 +1 216 831 0542 sbriskin@meyersroman.com
v.
No Logo Defense Finance and Accounting Service Agency, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lynne Haddad Buck +1 216 622 3712 +1 216 522 4982 lynne.buck@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 01/03/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 01/03/2013 Lynne Haddad Buck +1 216 622 3712 +1 216 522 4982 lynne.buck@usdoj.gov
Gates, Robert M. Gates, Robert M., Defendant
Officially listed as "Robert M. Gates"
Nacco Industries, Inc. Unknown Role, Nacco Industries, Inc.
Starbucks Corporation Unknown Role, Starbucks Corporation

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lynne Haddad Buck +1 216 622 3712 +1 216 522 4982 lynne.buck@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 01/03/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 01/03/2013 Lynne Haddad Buck +1 216 622 3712 +1 216 522 4982 lynne.buck@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 621
Nature of Suit 790 - Labor: Other
  Entries (38) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Marginal Entry Order: Notice of Termination of Counsel AUSA Kathleen L. Midian is So Ordered. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 1/7/13. (LC,S) re 26 (Entered: 01/07/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Notice of Termination of Counsel filed by Defense Finance and Accounting Service Agency, Robert M. Gates. (Midian, Kathleen) (Entered: 01/03/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/16/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      Judgment Entry: In accordance with the Court's Memorandum of Opinion and Order of this date granting defendants' motion for summary judgment on plaintiff's claims, judgment is hereby entered in this matter in favor of defendants. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 10/16/12. (LC,S) re 24 (Entered: 10/17/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/16/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        Memorandum Opinion and Order: Defendants' motion for summary judgment is granted. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 10/16/12. (LC,S) re 19 (Entered: 10/17/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/30/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Reply in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defense Finance and Accounting Service Agency, Robert M. Gates. Related document(s) 22, 19 . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Thomas Tyler) (Ruiz, David) (Entered: 08/30/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/13/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Opposition to 19 Motion for summary judgment filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Deposition of Allen Siarkowski, # 2 Exhibit Deposition of Kelly Gibson, # 3 Exhibit Declaration of Lester W. Armstrong, Esq., # 4 Exhibit Data on Probationary Employees, # 5 Exhibit E-mail of Thomas Tyler of 3/23/10)(Armstrong, Lester) (Entered: 08/13/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/6/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Order [non-document]: Plaintiff's unopposed motion for a one week enlargement of time to file his memorandum in opposition to Defendant's motion for summary judgment is Granted to 8/13/12. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 8/6/12. (LC,S) re 21
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Motion for extension of time to for Plaintiff to File His Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Robert B. Weltman. (Armstrong, Lester) (Entered: 08/03/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/20/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Order [non-document]: Plaintiff's unopposed motion for a two week enlargement of time to file his memorandum in opposition to Defendant's motion for summary judgment is Granted to 8/6/12. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 7/20/12. (LC,S) re 20
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Unopposed Motion for extension of Time to File Memorandum in Opposition of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment until August 6, 2012 filed by Plaintiff Robert B. Weltman. (Armstrong, Lester) (Entered: 07/18/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/19/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Motion for summary judgment filed by Defense Finance and Accounting Service Agency, Robert M. Gates. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support, # 2 Exhibit A - Deposition Transcript of Plaintiff dated April 20, 2012, # 3 Exhibit A-1 - Deposition Transcript of Plaintiff dated February 11, 2010, # 4 Exhibit A-2 - Amended Complaint in Marx v. Stechow, et al, # 5 Exhibit A-3 - May 14, 2007, Judgment Entry against Plaintiff and co-defendants, # 6 Exhibit A-4 - August 13-15, 2008, Email exchanges between Mr. Siarkowski and Plaintiff, # 7 Exhibit A-5 - October 14, 2008, email exchange between Mr. Siarkowski, Ms. Gibson, Ms. Sikora and Plaintiff, # 8 Exhibit A-6 - December 3, 2008, Email exchange between Plaintiff and Mr. Siarkowski, # 9 Exhibit B-1 - April 8, 2009, Termination During Probationary Period Memorandum, # 10 Exhibit B-2 - March 20, 2008, Letter from DFAS to Plaintiff, # 11 Exhibit B-3 - June 3, 2008, Civilian Performance Plan, # 12 Exhibit B-4 - EEO Declaration of Allen Siarkowski, # 13 Exhibit B-5 - October 30, 2008, Email between Ms. Gibson and Plaintiff, # 14 Exhibit B-6 - November 24, 2008, Quarterly Performance/Feedback Discussion, # 15 Exhibit B-7 - December 3 2008, Letter of Warning to Plaintiff, # 16 Exhibit B-8 - Plaintiff's DFAS Training History, # 17 Exhibit B-9 - EEO Declaration of Kelly Gibson, # 18 Exhibit B-10 - EEO Declaration of Lou Ockunzzi, # 19 Exhibit B-11 - January 31, 2009 Quarterly Performance/Feedback Discussion, # 20 Exhibit B-12 - February 9, 2009, Civilian Performance Plan, # 21 Exhibit B-13 - September 23, 2009 EEO Declaration of Melissa Sikora, # 22 Exhibit C - June 19, 2012 Declaration of Allen Siarkowski, # 23 Exhibit C-1 - October 9, 2008, Email exchange between Mr. Siarkowski and Ms. Sikora, # 24 Exhibit November 3, 2008, Email between Ms. Gibson, Mr. Siarkowski and Ms. Sikora, # 25 Exhibit C-3 - November 3, 2008, Email between Ms. Gibson, Plaintiff, and Mr. Siarkowski, # 26 Exhibit C-4 - December 31, 2008 Email from Ms. Gibson to Mr. Siarkowski, # 27 Exhibit C-5 - January 9, 2009, Email exchange between Ms. Sikora, Mr. Siarkowski, and Ms. Gibson, # 28 Exhibit C-6 - January 26, 2009 Email exchange between Ms. Gibson, Mr. Siarkowski and Ms. Sikora, # 29 Exhibit C-7 - February 8, 2009 Email exchange between Mr. Siarkowski and Ms. Gibson, # 30 Exhibit C-8 - March 24, 2009 Email exchange between Mr. Siarkowski, Ms. Gibson, Ms. Murray, # 31 Exhibit D - June 19, 2012 Declaration of Kelly Gibson, # 32 Exhibit E - June 19, 2012 Declaration of Thomas Tyler)(Ruiz, David) (Entered: 06/19/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Order [non-document]Defendants' unopposed motion for a two business day extension of time to file dispositive motion is granted to 6/19/12. 18 Approved by Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 6/15/12.(D,MB)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Unopposed Motion for extension of time until June 19, 2012 to Dispositive Motion filed by Defense Finance and Accounting Service Agency, Robert M. Gates. (Ruiz, David) (Entered: 06/14/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/9/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Order [non-document]: Stipulated Motion for Extension of Dispositive Motion Deadline and to Reschedule Settlement Conference is Granted to 6/15/12. The Court reminds counsel that this case is assigned to the standard track. Settlement Conference of 6/18/12 is cancelled. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 5/9/12. (LC,S) re 17
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/9/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Motion for extension of Dispositive Motion Deadline until June 21, 2012, Motion for conference/hearing (Settlement) to be Rescheduled filed by Defense Finance and Accounting Service Agency, Robert M. Gates. (Ruiz, David) (Entered: 05/09/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/10/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Notice of Service of Third Notice of Deposition of Robert Weltman filed by Defense Finance and Accounting Service Agency, Robert M. Gates. (Ruiz, David) (Entered: 04/10/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/23/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Order [non-document]: Order of 3/21/12 is corrected as follows: Non-expert discovery deadline is extended to 4/23/12 and dispositive motion deadline is extended to 5/22/12. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 3/23/12. (LC,S)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/21/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Order [non-document]: Plaintiff's Second Motion to Extend Discovery Cutoff Date and Time for Filing Dispositive Motions is GRANTED. However, there absolutely will be no further extensions. Non-expert discovery deadline is 4/1/12. Dispositive motion deadline is 5/1/12. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 3/21/12. (LC,S) re 15
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/20/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Second Motion for extension of Discovery Cutoff Date and Time for Filing Dispositive Motions until April 23, 2012 and May 22, 2012 filed by Plaintiff Robert B. Weltman. (Armstrong, Lester) (Entered: 03/20/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/6/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        Stipulated Protective Order and Sealing Order. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 3/6/12. (LC,S) (Related Doc # 13 ) (Entered: 03/06/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/6/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Joint Motion for protective order filed by Defense Finance and Accounting Service Agency, Robert M. Gates, Plaintiff Robert B. Weltman. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ruiz, David) (Entered: 03/06/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/25/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Order [non-document]: Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Discovery Cutoff Date and Time for Filing Dispositive Motion is Granted by 60 days. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 1/25/12. (LC,S) re 12
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/25/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Motion for extension of Discovery Cut-off until April 1, 2012 and time for filing disposition motions until 5/1/2012 filed by Plaintiff Robert B. Weltman. (Armstrong, Lester) Modified text added on 1/25/2012 (E,P). (Entered: 01/25/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Minutes/Order [non-document]: Settlement Conference was converted to a Telephone Conference. Settlement Conference is set 6/18/12 at 9:30 a.m. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 1/6/12. Time: 30 mins. (LC,S)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  Notice to take Deposition of Troy Marshall on January 4, 2012 filed by Robert B. Weltman. (Armstrong, Lester) (Entered: 12/14/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/15/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Minutes/Order [non-document]: Status Conference was held. Settlement Conference is set 1/6/2012 at 10:30 a.m. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 11/15/11. (LC,S) Time: 30 mins.
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/10/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      Joint Status Report filed by Defense Finance and Accounting Service Agency, Robert M. Gates. Related document(s) 7 .(Midian, Kathleen) (Entered: 11/10/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/1/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        Notice of Service of Defendant's Initial Disclosures filed by Defense Finance and Accounting Service Agency, Robert M. Gates. (Ruiz, David) (Entered: 09/01/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          Answer to 1 Complaint, filed by Defense Finance and Accounting Service Agency, Robert M. Gates. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - EEOC Decision, # 2 Exhibit B - DFAS Final Order)(Ruiz, David) (Entered: 08/22/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            Case Management Conference Plan/Order.Case is assigned to the standard track. Status Conference set for 11/15/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 19B before Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. Discovery due by 8/1/2012. Parties to be Joined and Pleading Amendments due by 10/15/2011, Dispositive Motions due by 3/1/2012, (C,KA) (Entered: 08/22/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              Joint Report of Parties' Planning Meeting, parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Defense Finance and Accounting Service Agency, Robert M. Gates. Related document(s) 3 .(Ruiz, David) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/9/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                Attorney Appearance as Co-Counsel by Kathleen Lucille Midian filed by on behalf of Defense Finance and Accounting Service Agency, Robert M. Gates. (Midian, Kathleen) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/9/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  Attorney Appearance by David Augustin Ruiz filed by on behalf of Defense Finance and Accounting Service Agency, Robert M. Gates. (Ruiz, David) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                    Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference set on 8/19/2011 at 9:00 a.m. to be held telephonically by Hon. Patricia A. Gaughan. Signed by Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 7/08/11. (D,MB) (Entered: 07/08/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/15/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued for service upon Defense Finance and Accounting Service Agency, Robert M. Gates. (Attachments: # 1 Magistrate Consent Form) (C,B) (Entered: 06/15/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/14/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge White. (C,B)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/14/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          Judge Patricia A. Gaughan assigned to case. (C,B)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/14/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 350, Receipt number 0647-4759444. Filed by Robert B. Weltman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons) (Armstrong, Lester) (Entered: 06/14/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                              Statistics

                                                                              This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                              Space
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                               
                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                              Need Password Help?