(PS) Agard v. Hill
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:10-cv-00323-JFM

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 14, 2019 at 4:40 AM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 2/16/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 2/5/11 pltf's motion for reconsideration 74 is DENIED. (Carlos, K)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/27/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 10/26/2010. Plaintiff's Motions for 56 Summary Judgment and 57 In Limine are GRANTED. Ms. Agard's 64 Request for Judicial Notice is DENIED. Plaintiff is awarded nominal damages in amount of $1.00 and Judgment is entered IN FAVOR of plaintiff. (Marciel, M)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 10/27/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 10/26/2010. The 8/3/2010 49 Findings and Recommendations are DEEMED an Order and defendants' 6/2/2010 34 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. It is DENIED as to plaintiff's libel claim and GRANTED as to plaintiff's intentional interference claim. (Marciel, M)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 10/4/10: Discovery due by 11/1/2010. Dispositive Motions filed by 11/11/2010. Pretrial Conference set for 12/9/2010 at 01:30 PM in 8th floor courtroom (JFM) before Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds. Bench Trial set for 2/7/2011 at 09:00 AM in 8th floor courtroom (JFM) before Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds. (Kaminski, H)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/3/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 8/2/2010 recommending that the 34 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Jennilee Hill, Brett Justin Hill be Denied as to plaintiff's libel claim; and Granted as to plaintiff's intentional inference claim. Objections to F&R due w/in 14 days. (Matson, R)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 05/13/10 ADOPTING in full 27 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 18 Motion to Dismiss. DENIED as to plaintiffs libel claim on the first two statements that plaintiff challenges as false and GRANTED on the third statement that plaintiff challenges as false; DENIED as to plaintiffs intentional inference claim. (Williams, D)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 4/8/2010 RECOMMENDING that Dfts' 18 Motion to Dismiss be granted in part and denied in part. Motion referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.. Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Engbretson, K.)
                Request RequestSpace LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 0 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?