In Re: Scientific Atl Sec v. Scientific-Atlanta
Federal Civil Lawsuit Georgia Northern District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-01950
District Judge Richard W. Story, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 14, 2019 at 11:15 AM EST (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Alexander Petersen, Plaintiff

Represented by Chitwood Harley Harnes LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Martin D Chitwood , +1 404 873 3900 +1 404 876 4476 MChitwood@chitwoodlaw.com

Represented by Keller Rohrback LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Juli E. Farris +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384 jfarris@kellerrohrback.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Elizabeth A. Leland +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384 bleland@kellerrohrback.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, Lynn Lincoln Sarko +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384 lsarko@kellerrohrback.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, Michael Dean Woerner +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384 mwoerner@kellerrohrback.com

Represented by KING & SPALDING (GA)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Meryl W. Roper +1 404 572 4600 +1 404 572 5100 mroper@kslaw.com

Represented by Law Office of David A. Bain, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 10/02/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 10/02/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 10/02/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 10/02/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 10/02/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 10/02/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, T David Andrew Bain +1 404 724 9990 +1 404 724 9986 dbain@bain-law.com

Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Peter Edward Seidman +1 212 613 5625 +1 212 868 1229 pseidman@milberg.com
TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED Belinda L. Williams +1 212 594 5300 bwilliams@milberg.com

Represented by The Antonino Firm, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/2 lauren@antoninofirm.com
No Logo ALL PLAINTIFFS, Plaintiff

Represented by ALL PLAINTIFFS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space All Plaintiffs
No Logo Harris Holdings, LLC, Plaintiff

Represented by Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Steven G. Hall +1 404 577 6000 sghall@bakerdonelson.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Linda Ann Klein +1 404 577 6000 lklein@bakerdonelson.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Kevin A. Stine +1 404 577 6000 +1 404 238 9607 kstine@bakerdonelson.com

Represented by Chitwood Harley Harnes LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Craig Gordon Harley +1 404 873 3900 +1 404 876 4476 CHarley@chitwoodlaw.com

Represented by Keller Rohrback LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, Michael Dean Woerner +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384 mwoerner@kellerrohrback.com

Represented by KING & SPALDING (GA)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Meryl W. Roper +1 404 572 4600 +1 404 572 5100 mroper@kslaw.com

Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/2 Robert R. Adler +1 561 361 5000 radler@milbergweiss.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Peter Edward Seidman +1 212 613 5625 +1 212 868 1229 pseidman@milberg.com
TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED Belinda L. Williams +1 212 594 5300 bwilliams@milberg.com

Represented by Office of Curtis V. Trinko

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Curtis V. Trinko +1 212 490 9550

Represented by Saxena White, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Christopher Steven Jones +1 561 394 3399 +1 561 394 3382 CJones@saxenawhite.com
No Logo Hugh Petersen, III, Plaintiff

Represented by Chitwood Harley Harnes LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Martin D Chitwood , +1 404 873 3900 +1 404 876 4476 MChitwood@chitwoodlaw.com

Represented by Keller Rohrback LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Juli E. Farris +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384 jfarris@kellerrohrback.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Elizabeth A. Leland +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384 bleland@kellerrohrback.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, Lynn Lincoln Sarko +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384 lsarko@kellerrohrback.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, Michael Dean Woerner +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384 mwoerner@kellerrohrback.com

Represented by KING & SPALDING (GA)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Meryl W. Roper +1 404 572 4600 +1 404 572 5100 mroper@kslaw.com

Represented by Law Office of David A. Bain, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 10/02/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 10/02/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 10/02/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 10/02/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 10/02/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 10/02/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, T David Andrew Bain +1 404 724 9990 +1 404 724 9986 dbain@bain-law.com

Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Peter Edward Seidman +1 212 613 5625 +1 212 868 1229 pseidman@milberg.com
TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED Belinda L. Williams +1 212 594 5300 bwilliams@milberg.com

Represented by The Antonino Firm, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/2 lauren@antoninofirm.com
No Logo Janice E. Dieu, Plaintiff

Represented by Chitwood Harley Harnes LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Martin D Chitwood , +1 404 873 3900 +1 404 876 4476 MChitwood@chitwoodlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Craig Gordon Harley +1 404 873 3900 +1 404 876 4476 CHarley@chitwoodlaw.com

Represented by Keller Rohrback LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Juli E. Farris +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384 jfarris@kellerrohrback.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Elizabeth A. Leland +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384 bleland@kellerrohrback.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, Lynn Lincoln Sarko +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384 lsarko@kellerrohrback.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, Michael Dean Woerner +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384 mwoerner@kellerrohrback.com

Represented by Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/22/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 11/22/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 11/22/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 11/22/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 11/22/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 11/22/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 11/2 Lauren Wagner Pederson +1 610 667 7706

Represented by KING & SPALDING (GA)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Meryl W. Roper +1 404 572 4600 +1 404 572 5100 mroper@kslaw.com

Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/2 Robert R. Adler +1 561 361 5000 radler@milbergweiss.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Peter Edward Seidman +1 212 613 5625 +1 212 868 1229 pseidman@milberg.com
TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED Belinda L. Williams +1 212 594 5300 bwilliams@milberg.com

Represented by Office of Curtis V. Trinko

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Curtis V. Trinko +1 212 490 9550

Represented by Saxena White, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Christopher Steven Jones +1 561 394 3399 +1 561 394 3382 CJones@saxenawhite.com

Represented by The Antonino Firm, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/2 lauren@antoninofirm.com
No Logo Kalford C. Fadem, Plaintiff

Represented by Chitwood Harley Harnes LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Craig Gordon Harley +1 404 873 3900 +1 404 876 4476 CHarley@chitwoodlaw.com

Represented by Dyer & Schuman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Kip B. Shuman +1 303 861 3003

Represented by Dyer and Berens LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Jeffrey A Berens +1 303 861 1764 +1 303 395 0393 jeff@dyerberens.com

Represented by HOLZER HOLZER & FISTEL LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Corey D Holzer +1 770 392 0090 +1 770 392 0029 cholzer@holzerlaw.com

Represented by Keller Rohrback LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, Michael Dean Woerner +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384 mwoerner@kellerrohrback.com

Represented by Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/21/2001, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Sean M. Handler, Esq. +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 ecf_filings@ktmc.com
TERMINATED: 12/21/2001, LEAD ATTORNEY Marc A Topaz +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 ecf_filings@sbclasslaw.com

Represented by KING & SPALDING (GA)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Meryl W. Roper +1 404 572 4600 +1 404 572 5100 mroper@kslaw.com

Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/2 Robert R. Adler +1 561 361 5000 radler@milbergweiss.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Peter Edward Seidman +1 212 613 5625 +1 212 868 1229 pseidman@milberg.com
TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED Belinda L. Williams +1 212 594 5300 bwilliams@milberg.com

Represented by Office of Curtis V. Trinko

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Curtis V. Trinko +1 212 490 9550

Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Paul Jeffrey Geller +1 561 750 3000 +1 561 750 3364 pgeller@rgrdlaw.com

Represented by Saxena White, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Christopher Steven Jones +1 561 394 3399 +1 561 394 3382 CJones@saxenawhite.com
No Logo Lawrence L. Dieu, Plaintiff

Represented by Chitwood Harley Harnes LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Martin D Chitwood , +1 404 873 3900 +1 404 876 4476 MChitwood@chitwoodlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Craig Gordon Harley +1 404 873 3900 +1 404 876 4476 CHarley@chitwoodlaw.com

Represented by Keller Rohrback LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Juli E. Farris +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384 jfarris@kellerrohrback.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Elizabeth A. Leland +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384 bleland@kellerrohrback.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, Lynn Lincoln Sarko +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384 lsarko@kellerrohrback.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, Michael Dean Woerner +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384 mwoerner@kellerrohrback.com

Represented by Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/22/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 11/22/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 11/22/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 11/22/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 11/22/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 11/22/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 11/2 Lauren Wagner Pederson +1 610 667 7706

Represented by KING & SPALDING (GA)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Meryl W. Roper +1 404 572 4600 +1 404 572 5100 mroper@kslaw.com

Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/2 Robert R. Adler +1 561 361 5000 radler@milbergweiss.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Peter Edward Seidman +1 212 613 5625 +1 212 868 1229 pseidman@milberg.com
TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED Belinda L. Williams +1 212 594 5300 bwilliams@milberg.com

Represented by Office of Curtis V. Trinko

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Curtis V. Trinko +1 212 490 9550

Represented by Saxena White, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Christopher Steven Jones +1 561 394 3399 +1 561 394 3382 CJones@saxenawhite.com

Represented by The Antonino Firm, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/2 lauren@antoninofirm.com
No Logo Lennie W. Bible, Plaintiff

Represented by Chitwood Harley Harnes LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Craig Gordon Harley +1 404 873 3900 +1 404 876 4476 CHarley@chitwoodlaw.com

Represented by Federman & Sherwood

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY William Bernard Federman +1 405 235 1560 +1 405 239 2112 wbf@federmanlaw.com

Represented by HOLZER HOLZER & FISTEL LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Corey D Holzer +1 770 392 0090 +1 770 392 0029 cholzer@holzerlaw.com

Represented by Keller Rohrback LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, Michael Dean Woerner +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384 mwoerner@kellerrohrback.com

Represented by KING & SPALDING (GA)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Meryl W. Roper +1 404 572 4600 +1 404 572 5100 mroper@kslaw.com

Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/2 Robert R. Adler +1 561 361 5000 radler@milbergweiss.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Peter Edward Seidman +1 212 613 5625 +1 212 868 1229 pseidman@milberg.com
TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED Belinda L. Williams +1 212 594 5300 bwilliams@milberg.com

Represented by Office of Curtis V. Trinko

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Curtis V. Trinko +1 212 490 9550

Represented by Office of Marc S. Henzel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Marc S. Henzel +1 610 660 8000

Represented by Saxena White, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Christopher Steven Jones +1 561 394 3399 +1 561 394 3382 CJones@saxenawhite.com

Represented by Spector Roseman & Kodroff

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jeffrey L. Kodroff +1 215 496 0300

Represented by Stull, Stull & Brody

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Aaron Lee Brody +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022
No Logo Mary Jo Goolsby, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Alfred Glenn Yates, Jr. +1 412 391 5164 +1 412 471 1033 yateslaw@aol.com

Represented by Chitwood Harley Harnes LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Martin D Chitwood , +1 404 873 3900 +1 404 876 4476 MChitwood@chitwoodlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Craig Gordon Harley +1 404 873 3900 +1 404 876 4476 CHarley@chitwoodlaw.com

Represented by Finkelstein & Krinsk LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Gregory A. Hartlett +1 619 238 1333
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jeffrey R. Krinsk +1 519 238 1333 +1 619 238 5425 jrk@classactionlaw.com

Represented by Keller Rohrback LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, Michael Dean Woerner +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384 mwoerner@kellerrohrback.com

Represented by Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/22/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 11/22/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 11/22/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 11/22/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 11/22/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 11/22/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 11/2 Lauren Wagner Pederson +1 610 667 7706

Represented by KING & SPALDING (GA)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Meryl W. Roper +1 404 572 4600 +1 404 572 5100 mroper@kslaw.com

Represented by Lockridge Grindal Nauen, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Karen Hanson Riebel +1 612 339 6900 +1 612 339 0981 khriebel@locklaw.com

Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/2 Robert R. Adler +1 561 361 5000 radler@milbergweiss.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Peter Edward Seidman +1 212 613 5625 +1 212 868 1229 pseidman@milberg.com
TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED Belinda L. Williams +1 212 594 5300 bwilliams@milberg.com

Represented by Office of Curtis V. Trinko

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Curtis V. Trinko +1 212 490 9550

Represented by Saxena White, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Christopher Steven Jones +1 561 394 3399 +1 561 394 3382 CJones@saxenawhite.com

Represented by The Antonino Firm, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/2 lauren@antoninofirm.com
No Logo Milton Cyntje, Plaintiff

Represented by Brower Piven

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Charles J. Piven +1 410 332 0030 +1 410 685 1300

Represented by Chitwood Harley Harnes LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Martin D Chitwood , +1 404 873 3900 +1 404 876 4476 MChitwood@chitwoodlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Craig Gordon Harley +1 404 873 3900 +1 404 876 4476 CHarley@chitwoodlaw.com

Represented by Keller Rohrback LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, Michael Dean Woerner +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384 mwoerner@kellerrohrback.com

Represented by Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/22/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 11/22/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 11/22/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 11/22/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 11/22/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 11/22/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 11/2 Lauren Wagner Pederson +1 610 667 7706

Represented by KING & SPALDING (GA)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Meryl W. Roper +1 404 572 4600 +1 404 572 5100 mroper@kslaw.com

Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/2 Robert R. Adler +1 561 361 5000 radler@milbergweiss.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Peter Edward Seidman +1 212 613 5625 +1 212 868 1229 pseidman@milberg.com
TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED Belinda L. Williams +1 212 594 5300 bwilliams@milberg.com

Represented by Office of Curtis V. Trinko

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Curtis V. Trinko +1 212 490 9550

Represented by Saxena White, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Christopher Steven Jones +1 561 394 3399 +1 561 394 3382 CJones@saxenawhite.com

Represented by The Antonino Firm, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/2 lauren@antoninofirm.com

Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Frederick Taylor Isquith, Sr +1 212 545 4600 +1 212 545 4653 isquith@whafh.com
No Logo Peter Kaltman, Plaintiff

Represented by Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY James Abram Harrod, III +1 212 759 4600 +1 212 486 2093 jim.harrod@blbglaw.com

Represented by Chitwood Harley Harnes LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Martin D Chitwood , +1 404 873 3900 +1 404 876 4476 MChitwood@chitwoodlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Craig Gordon Harley +1 404 873 3900 +1 404 876 4476 CHarley@chitwoodlaw.com

Represented by Keller Rohrback LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, Michael Dean Woerner +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384 mwoerner@kellerrohrback.com

Represented by Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/22/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 11/22/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 11/22/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 11/22/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 11/22/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 11/22/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 11/2 Lauren Wagner Pederson +1 610 667 7706

Represented by KING & SPALDING (GA)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Meryl W. Roper +1 404 572 4600 +1 404 572 5100 mroper@kslaw.com

Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/2 Robert R. Adler +1 561 361 5000 radler@milbergweiss.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Peter Edward Seidman +1 212 613 5625 +1 212 868 1229 pseidman@milberg.com
TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED Belinda L. Williams +1 212 594 5300 bwilliams@milberg.com

Represented by Office of Curtis V. Trinko

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Curtis V. Trinko +1 212 490 9550

Represented by Saxena White, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Christopher Steven Jones +1 561 394 3399 +1 561 394 3382 CJones@saxenawhite.com

Represented by The Antonino Firm, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/2 lauren@antoninofirm.com

Represented by Wolf, Popper, Ross, Wolf & Jones, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Marian P. Rosner +1 212 759 4600 +1 212 486 2093 mrosner@wolfpopper.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Carl L. Stine +1 212 759 4600 + 212 486 2093 cstine@wolfpopper.com
No Logo Pond Equities, Plaintiff

Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Sandy A Liebhard +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 liebhard@bernlieb.com

Represented by Chitwood Harley Harnes LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Martin D Chitwood , +1 404 873 3900 +1 404 876 4476 MChitwood@chitwoodlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Craig Gordon Harley +1 404 873 3900 +1 404 876 4476 CHarley@chitwoodlaw.com

Represented by Keller Rohrback LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, Michael Dean Woerner +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384 mwoerner@kellerrohrback.com

Represented by Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/22/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 11/22/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 11/22/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 11/22/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 11/22/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 11/22/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 11/2 Lauren Wagner Pederson +1 610 667 7706

Represented by KING & SPALDING (GA)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Meryl W. Roper +1 404 572 4600 +1 404 572 5100 mroper@kslaw.com

Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/2 Robert R. Adler +1 561 361 5000 radler@milbergweiss.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Peter Edward Seidman +1 212 613 5625 +1 212 868 1229 pseidman@milberg.com
TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED Belinda L. Williams +1 212 594 5300 bwilliams@milberg.com

Represented by Office of Curtis V. Trinko

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Curtis V. Trinko +1 212 490 9550

Represented by Saxena White, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Christopher Steven Jones +1 561 394 3399 +1 561 394 3382 CJones@saxenawhite.com

Represented by The Antonino Firm, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/2 lauren@antoninofirm.com
No Logo Robert A. Rovner, Plaintiff

Represented by Berger & Montague PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Carole A. Broderick +1 215 875 3000 +1 215 875 4604 cbroderick@bm.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Sherrie R. Savett +1 215 875 3000 +1 215 875 4604 ssavett@bm.net

Represented by Chitwood Harley Harnes LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Martin D Chitwood , +1 404 873 3900 +1 404 876 4476 MChitwood@chitwoodlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Craig Gordon Harley +1 404 873 3900 +1 404 876 4476 CHarley@chitwoodlaw.com

Represented by Keller Rohrback LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, Michael Dean Woerner +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384 mwoerner@kellerrohrback.com

Represented by Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/22/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 11/22/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 11/22/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 11/22/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 11/22/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 11/22/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 11/2 Lauren Wagner Pederson +1 610 667 7706

Represented by KING & SPALDING (GA)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Meryl W. Roper +1 404 572 4600 +1 404 572 5100 mroper@kslaw.com

Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/2 Robert R. Adler +1 561 361 5000 radler@milbergweiss.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Peter Edward Seidman +1 212 613 5625 +1 212 868 1229 pseidman@milberg.com
TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED Belinda L. Williams +1 212 594 5300 bwilliams@milberg.com

Represented by Office of Curtis V. Trinko

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Curtis V. Trinko +1 212 490 9550

Represented by Saxena White, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Christopher Steven Jones +1 561 394 3399 +1 561 394 3382 CJones@saxenawhite.com

Represented by The Antonino Firm, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/2 lauren@antoninofirm.com
No Logo Rochelle Phillips, Plaintiff

Represented by Abraham, Fruchter & Twersky, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jack W. Fruchter +1 212 279 5050 +1 212 279 3655 jfruchter@aftlaw.com

Represented by Chitwood Harley Harnes LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Martin D Chitwood , +1 404 873 3900 +1 404 876 4476 MChitwood@chitwoodlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Craig Gordon Harley +1 404 873 3900 +1 404 876 4476 CHarley@chitwoodlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Gregory E Keller +1 404 873 3900 +1 404 876 4476 gkeller@chitwoodlaw.com

Represented by Keller Rohrback LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, Michael Dean Woerner +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384 mwoerner@kellerrohrback.com

Represented by Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/22/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 11/22/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 11/22/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 11/22/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 11/22/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 11/22/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 11/2 Lauren Wagner Pederson +1 610 667 7706

Represented by KING & SPALDING (GA)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Meryl W. Roper +1 404 572 4600 +1 404 572 5100 mroper@kslaw.com

Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/2 Robert R. Adler +1 561 361 5000 radler@milbergweiss.com
TERMINATED: 03/20/2007 Steven G. Schulman +1 212 792 4175 +1 212 792 4176 sschulman@sg-schulman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Peter Edward Seidman +1 212 613 5625 +1 212 868 1229 pseidman@milberg.com
TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, TERMINATED Belinda L. Williams +1 212 594 5300 bwilliams@milberg.com

Represented by Office of Curtis V. Trinko

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Curtis V. Trinko +1 212 490 9550

Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/24/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY Samuel Howard Rudman +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 srudman@rgrdlaw.com

Represented by Saxena White, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Christopher Steven Jones +1 561 394 3399 +1 561 394 3382 CJones@saxenawhite.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Maya Saxena +1 561 394 3399 +1 561 394 3382 msaxena@saxenawhite.com

Represented by STUEVE AND SIEGEL, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Darren T. Kaplan +1 212 755 0022 +1 212 755 0005 kaplan@stuevesiegel.com

Represented by The Antonino Firm, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/2 lauren@antoninofirm.com

Represented by Vianale & Vianale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/24/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY Kenneth Vianale +1 561 392 4750 +1 561 392 4775 kvianale@vianalelaw.com
v.
No Logo James F. McDonald, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Kathleen D. Zylan +1 770 236 4226 kzylan@bellsouth.net

Represented by Alston & Bird, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/03/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/03/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/03/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY Susan Hurd +1 404 881 7572 +1 404 253 8268 susan.hurd@alston.com
TERMINATED: 02/03/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/03/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/03/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY Kelly C.. Wilcove +1 404 881 7000 +1 404 881 7777 kwilcove@alston.com

Represented by Benesch Friedlander Coplan & Arnoff - Chicago

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY J. Erik Connolly +1 312 558 5600 econnolly@beneschlaw.com

Represented by Hartman Simons & Wood LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/03/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/03/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/03/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY Irene B. Vanderels +1 770 980 4404 +1 678 391 9948 ivanderels@hssw.com

Represented by Strickland Brockington Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Oscar N. Persons +1 678 347 2200 +1 678 347 2210 oscar.persons@sbllaw.com

Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Robert L. Michels +1 312 558 5255 +1 312 558 5700 rmichels@winston.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY DANIEL K. WEBB +1 312 558 5600 +1 312 558 5700 dwebb@winston.com
No Logo Scientific Atlanta, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Kathleen D. Zylan +1 770 236 4226 kzylan@bellsouth.net

Represented by Alston & Bird, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/03/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/03/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/03/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY Susan Hurd +1 404 881 7572 +1 404 253 8268 susan.hurd@alston.com
TERMINATED: 02/03/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/03/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/03/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY Kelly C.. Wilcove +1 404 881 7000 +1 404 881 7777 kwilcove@alston.com

Represented by Benesch Friedlander Coplan & Arnoff - Chicago

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY J. Erik Connolly +1 312 558 5600 econnolly@beneschlaw.com

Represented by Hartman Simons & Wood LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/03/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/03/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/03/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY Irene B. Vanderels +1 770 980 4404 +1 678 391 9948 ivanderels@hssw.com

Represented by Strickland Brockington Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Oscar N. Persons +1 678 347 2200 +1 678 347 2210 oscar.persons@sbllaw.com

Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Robert L. Michels +1 312 558 5255 +1 312 558 5700 rmichels@winston.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY DANIEL K. WEBB +1 312 558 5600 +1 312 558 5700 dwebb@winston.com
No Logo Wallace G. Haislip, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Kathleen D. Zylan +1 770 236 4226 kzylan@bellsouth.net

Represented by Alston & Bird, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/03/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/03/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/03/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY Susan Hurd +1 404 881 7572 +1 404 253 8268 susan.hurd@alston.com
TERMINATED: 02/03/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/03/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/03/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY Kelly C.. Wilcove +1 404 881 7000 +1 404 881 7777 kwilcove@alston.com

Represented by Benesch Friedlander Coplan & Arnoff - Chicago

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY J. Erik Connolly +1 312 558 5600 econnolly@beneschlaw.com

Represented by Hartman Simons & Wood LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/03/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/03/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/03/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY Irene B. Vanderels +1 770 980 4404 +1 678 391 9948 ivanderels@hssw.com

Represented by Strickland Brockington Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Oscar N. Persons +1 678 347 2200 +1 678 347 2210 oscar.persons@sbllaw.com

Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Robert L. Michels +1 312 558 5255 +1 312 558 5700 rmichels@winston.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY DANIEL K. WEBB +1 312 558 5600 +1 312 558 5700 dwebb@winston.com
No Logo Arthur N. Park, Movant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Alfred Glenn Yates, Jr. +1 412 391 5164 +1 412 471 1033 yateslaw@aol.com

Represented by Finkelstein & Krinsk LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jeffrey R. Krinsk +1 519 238 1333 +1 619 238 5425 jrk@classactionlaw.com
No Logo David Byers, Movant
No Logo Fellows LaBriola, LLP, Movant
No Logo Fremont Investment Advisors, Movant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY David Richard Trainor +1 615 336 0771 davidtrainor@hotmail.com

Represented by Schiffrin & Barroway, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Andrew L. Barroway +1 610 667 7056 + 610 667 7056
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Stuart L. Berman +1 610 667 7706
No Logo Hale Group, Movant
No Logo Hugh Petersen, Movant

Represented by Chitwood Harley Harnes LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Martin D Chitwood , +1 404 873 3900 +1 404 876 4476 MChitwood@chitwoodlaw.com

Represented by Keller Rohrback LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Juli E. Farris +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384 jfarris@kellerrohrback.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Elizabeth A. Leland +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384 bleland@kellerrohrback.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, Lynn Lincoln Sarko +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384 lsarko@kellerrohrback.com

Represented by Law Office of David A. Bain, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 10/02/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 10/02/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 10/02/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 10/02/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 10/02/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 10/02/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, T David Andrew Bain +1 404 724 9990 +1 404 724 9986 dbain@bain-law.com

Represented by The Antonino Firm, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/2 lauren@antoninofirm.com
No Logo Jack Graeber, Movant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Ware Killorin +1 404 873 3900 +1 404 876 4476 rwk@bellsouth.net

Represented by Chitwood Harley Harnes LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Martin D Chitwood , +1 404 873 3900 +1 404 876 4476 MChitwood@chitwoodlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Craig Gordon Harley +1 404 873 3900 +1 404 876 4476 CHarley@chitwoodlaw.com

Represented by Faruqi & Faruqi, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY James Milligan Wilson, Jr. +1 212 983 9330 +1 212 983 9331 jwilson@faruqilaw.com

Represented by Keller Rohrback LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Juli E. Farris +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384 jfarris@kellerrohrback.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Elizabeth A. Leland +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384 bleland@kellerrohrback.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, Lynn Lincoln Sarko +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384 lsarko@kellerrohrback.com

Represented by KING & SPALDING (GA)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Meryl W. Roper +1 404 572 4600 +1 404 572 5100 mroper@kslaw.com

Represented by Law Office of David A. Bain, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 10/02/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 10/02/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 10/02/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 10/02/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 10/02/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 10/02/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, T David Andrew Bain +1 404 724 9990 +1 404 724 9986 dbain@bain-law.com

Represented by The Antonino Firm, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/2 lauren@antoninofirm.com
No Logo Janis Palmer, Movant
No Logo Jeanne Hale, Movant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Alfred Glenn Yates, Jr. +1 412 391 5164 +1 412 471 1033 yateslaw@aol.com

Represented by Chitwood Harley Harnes LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Martin D Chitwood , +1 404 873 3900 +1 404 876 4476 MChitwood@chitwoodlaw.com

Represented by Keller Rohrback LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Juli E. Farris +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384 jfarris@kellerrohrback.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Elizabeth A. Leland +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384 bleland@kellerrohrback.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, Lynn Lincoln Sarko +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384 lsarko@kellerrohrback.com

Represented by KING & SPALDING (GA)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Meryl W. Roper +1 404 572 4600 +1 404 572 5100 mroper@kslaw.com

Represented by Law Office of David A. Bain, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 10/02/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 10/02/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 10/02/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 10/02/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 10/02/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 10/02/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, T David Andrew Bain +1 404 724 9990 +1 404 724 9986 dbain@bain-law.com

Represented by The Antonino Firm, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/2 lauren@antoninofirm.com
No Logo Kathryn Herani, Movant

Represented by Chitwood Harley Harnes LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Martin D Chitwood , +1 404 873 3900 +1 404 876 4476 MChitwood@chitwoodlaw.com

Represented by Keller Rohrback LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Juli E. Farris +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384 jfarris@kellerrohrback.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Elizabeth A. Leland +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384 bleland@kellerrohrback.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, Lynn Lincoln Sarko +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384 lsarko@kellerrohrback.com

Represented by Law Office of David A. Bain, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 10/02/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 10/02/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 10/02/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 10/02/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 10/02/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 10/02/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, T David Andrew Bain +1 404 724 9990 +1 404 724 9986 dbain@bain-law.com

Represented by The Antonino Firm, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/2 lauren@antoninofirm.com
No Logo Randolph J. Schaubs, Movant

Represented by Cauley Geller Bowman & Coates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Steven E Cauley +1 501 312 8500 + 501 312 8505
LEAD ATTORNEY Howard K. Coates, Jr. +1 561 750 3000

Represented by Holzer Holzer & Cannon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Gilbert Senon Holzer +1 770 392 0090

Represented by HOLZER HOLZER & FISTEL LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Corey D Holzer +1 770 392 0090 +1 770 392 0029 cholzer@holzerlaw.com

Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Jack Reise +1 561 750 3000 +7503 750 750 3364 jreise@rgrdlaw.com
No Logo Roger Hale, Movant

Represented by Chitwood Harley Harnes LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Martin D Chitwood , +1 404 873 3900 +1 404 876 4476 MChitwood@chitwoodlaw.com

Represented by Keller Rohrback LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Juli E. Farris +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384 jfarris@kellerrohrback.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Elizabeth A. Leland +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384 bleland@kellerrohrback.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, Lynn Lincoln Sarko +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384 lsarko@kellerrohrback.com

Represented by KING & SPALDING (GA)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Meryl W. Roper +1 404 572 4600 +1 404 572 5100 mroper@kslaw.com

Represented by Law Office of David A. Bain, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 10/02/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 10/02/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 10/02/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 10/02/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 10/02/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 10/02/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, T David Andrew Bain +1 404 724 9990 +1 404 724 9986 dbain@bain-law.com

Represented by The Antonino Firm, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/22/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/2 lauren@antoninofirm.com
No Logo Sharon Shapiro, Movant
No Logo Steven W. Dailey, Movant
No Logo Vigilant Investors LP, Movant

Represented by Drew Eckl & Farnham, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY David L. Rusnak +1 404 926 4686 RusnakD@deflaw.com

Represented by KING & SPALDING (GA)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Meryl W. Roper +1 404 572 4600 +1 404 572 5100 mroper@kslaw.com

Represented by Strull Strull & Brody

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jules Brody +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 687 7230
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a)
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (548) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 484 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Appeal Record Received re: 453 Notice of Appeal. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 10-15910-FF. (kac) (Entered: 10/24/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 483 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Certified copy of JUDGMENT of USCA AFFIRMING the decision of the District Court re: 453 Notice of Appeal filed by Jack Graeber. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 10-15910-FF. (kac) (Entered: 10/10/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 482 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      USCA Opinion received re: 453 Notice of Appeal filed by Jack Graeber. In accordance with FRAP 41(b), the USCA mandate will issue at a later date. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 10-15910-FF. (kac) (Entered: 09/07/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 481 Filed: 7/21/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Stuart L. Berman re 478 Order. (cem) (Entered: 07/22/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 480 Filed: 7/18/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Andrew L. Barroway re 478 Order. (cem) (Entered: 07/19/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 479 Filed: 7/7/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Costs Taxed in amount of $ 90,607.45 against Plaintiffs. (cem) (Entered: 07/07/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/7/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to Aaron L. Brody, Andrew L. Barroway, Carl L. Stine, Charles J. Piven, Gilbert Senon Holzer, Gregory A. Hartlett, James Harrod, Jeffrey L. Kodroff, Jeffrey R. Krinsk, Jules Brody, Kip B. Shuman, Marc S. Henzel, Marian P. Rosner, Sandy A. Liebhard, Steven E. Cauley, Stuart L. Berman, re 478 Order. (cem)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 478 Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                ORDER regarding the Defendants' 459 Bill of Costs and Plaintiffs' Objections 472 to the Bill of Costs. After reviewing the submissions, the Court grants the following: Total costs are taxed against Plaintiffs in the sum of $90,607.45. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 7/6/11. (cem) (Entered: 07/07/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Submission of 459 Bill of Costs, submitted to District Judge Richard W. Story. (cem)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 477 Filed: 4/28/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re: 453 Notice of Appeal filed by Jack Graeber. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 10-15910-FF. (kac) (Entered: 05/02/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 476 Filed: 4/27/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      REPLY in Opposition to 472 Defendants' Bill of Costs filed by Jack Graeber. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Roper, Meryl) Modified on 4/28/2011 to correct docket entry to reflect efiled pleading. (cem) (Entered: 04/27/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 475 Filed: 4/21/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re: 453 Notice of Appeal. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 10-15910-FF. (kac) (Entered: 04/21/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/19/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Submission of 464 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to 459 Defendants' Bill of Costs, submitted to District Judge Richard W. Story. (cem)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 473 Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            RESPONSE re 472 to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Bill of Costs filed by Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald, Scientific-Atlanta, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A-Cisco Ironport Brief, # 3 Exhibit B-Plaintiffs First Request for Production)(Connolly, J.) Modified on 4/18/2011 to delete duplicate text. (cem) (Entered: 04/15/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 474 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              FORTHWITH LETTER from USCA re: 453 Notice of Appeal filed by Jack Graeber. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 10-15910-FF. Appeal Record due by 4/25/2011. (kac) (Entered: 04/20/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 472 Filed: 3/15/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                RESPONSE re 459 Bill of Costs Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Bill of Costs filed by Jack Graeber. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Declaration of Meryl W. Roper in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Bill of Costs, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Meryl W. Roper)(Roper, Meryl) (Entered: 03/15/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 471 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Steven E. Cauley re Clerks Certificate of Mailing of 464 Order. (cem) (Entered: 02/15/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 470 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    USCA Acknowledgment of COR re: 453 Notice of Appeal filed by Jack Graeber. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 10-15910-FF. (kac) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 469 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Andrew L. Barroway re Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to the 464 Order. (cem) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 468 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Kip B. Shuman re Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to the 464 Order. (cem) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 467 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Stuart L. Berman re Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to 464 Order. (cem) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 466 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Certified copy of CORRECTED CERTIFICATE OF READINESS of Record on Appeal transmitted to USCA re: 453 Notice of Appeal. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 10-15910-FF. (kac) (Entered: 01/31/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 465 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Certified copy of CERTIFICATE OF READINESS of Record on Appeal transmitted to USCA re: 453 Notice of Appeal. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 10-15910-FF. (Attachments: # 1 Part 2)(kac) (Entered: 01/31/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                CERTIFICATE OF READINESS of Record on Appeal re: 453 Notice of Appeal filed by Jack Graeber. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 10-15910-FF. (kac)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/27/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to Aaron L. Brody, Andrew L. Barroway, Carl. L. Stine, charles J. Piven, Gilbert Senon Holzer, Gregory A. Hartlett, James Harrod, Jeffrey L. Kodroff, Jeffrey R. Krinsk, Jules Brody, Kop B. Shuman, Marc S. Henzel, Marian P. Rosner, Sandy A. Liebhard, Steven E. Cauley and Stuart L. Berman re 464 Order. (cem)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 464 Filed: 1/27/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER granting 462 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to File Objections to 459 Defendants' Bill of Costs. 1. Plaintiffs shall have until March 15, 2011 in which to file objections to Defendants' bill of costs. 2. Defendants shall have until April 15, 2011 in which to file a response to Plaintiffs' objections to Defendants' bill ofcosts. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 1/27/11. (cem) (Entered: 01/27/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 462 Filed: 1/26/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To File Objections to Defendants' Bill of Costs re: 460 Response (Non-Motion), Response (Non-Motion), Response (Non-Motion), 459 Bill of Costs by Jack Graeber. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Harley, Craig) (Entered: 01/26/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 463 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        Manual filing of a CD containing Plaintiff's Summary Judgment Briefing and Exhibits filed by plaintiffs. (cem) (Entered: 01/27/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          Set COR deadline re: 461 Transcript Order Form. Certificate of Readiness due on 1/31/2011.(kac)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 461 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM re 453 Notice of Appeal,. (Harley, Craig) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 460 Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              RESPONSE re 459 Bill of Costs in support filed by Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald, Scientific-Atlanta, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Index, # 2 Exhibit A- Itemization of Costs of the Clerk, # 3 Exhibit B, Part 1- Itemization of Deposition-Related Costs, # 4 Exhibit B, Part 2- Itemization of Deposition-Related Costs, # 5 Exhibit C- Itemization of Non-Deposition Court Reporter Costs, # 6 Exhibit D- Itemization of Witness Costs, # 7 Exhibit E- Itemization of Copy and Discovery Costs, # 8 Exhibit F- Itemization of Docket Fees)(Michels, Robert) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 459 Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                BILL OF COSTS by Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald, Scientific-Atlanta, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- Affidavit)(Michels, Robert) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  Clerks Approval re 457 Application for Refund of Fees paid online, 458 Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (mmc)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 458 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    Application for Refund of Fees paid online through Pay.gov for receipt number 113E-3050015. (Harley, Craig) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 457 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      INCORRECT PDF ATTACHED - ATTORNEY TO REFILE Application for Refund of Fees paid online through Pay.gov for receipt number 113E-3050015. (Harley, Craig) Modified on 1/14/2011 (fmm). (Entered: 01/14/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 456 Filed: 1/4/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        USCA Acknowledgment of 453 Notice of Appeal filed by Jack Graeber. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 10-15910-F. (kac) (Entered: 01/05/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 455 Filed: 12/21/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          Transmission of Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal, Judgment, Order and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: 453 Notice of Appeal. (kac) (Entered: 12/21/2010)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 454 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting 452 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Defendants to file their bill of costs be extended by 30 days to January 19,2011. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 12/16/2010. (tcc) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 453 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 451 Clerk's Judgment, 450 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Motion in Limine,,,,,,,, by Jack Graeber. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 113E-3050015. Transcript Order Form due on 1/3/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Harley, Craig) (Entered: 12/17/2010)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 452 Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time TO FILE BILL OF COSTS by Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald, Scientific-Atlanta, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Connolly, J.) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 451 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of defendants against plaintiffs. (pdw)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist-- (Entered: 11/19/2010)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/18/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    Civil Case Terminated. (pdw)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 450 Filed: 11/18/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER: Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 412 420 is GRANTED. Defendants' Motion to Strike and Motion in Limine Concerning Inadmissible Evidence of Collateral Government Proceedings 439 and 445 is DENIED as moot, with leave to re-file as necessary. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 11/18/2010. (pdw) (Entered: 11/19/2010)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        Submission of 439 MOTION to Strike and MOTION in Limine Concerning Inadmissible Evidence of Collateral Government Proceedings, submitted to District Judge Richard W. Story. (pdw)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/13/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          Submission of 439 MOTION to Strike and MOTION in Limine Concerning Inadmissible Evidence of Collateral Government Proceedings,submitted to District Judge Richard W. Story. (pdw)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 449 Filed: 8/12/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL REPLY BRIEF re 439 MOTION to Strike MOTION in Limine Concerning Inadmissible Evidence of Collateral Government Proceedings filed by Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald, and Scientific-Atlanta, Inc. (pdw) Modified on 8/12/2010 to attach sealed document(pdw). (Entered: 08/12/2010)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 448 Filed: 8/12/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              NOTICE Of Filing Under Seal of Reply in Support of Motion to Strike and Motion in Limine Concerning Inadmissible Evidence of Collateral Government Proceedings by Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald, Scientific-Atlanta, Inc. (Michels, Robert) (Entered: 08/12/2010)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 447 Filed: 8/11/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                Plaintiff's Rule 56.1 Statement of Material Facts (Public Version) re 446 Reply Brief to 412 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald, Scientific-Atlanta, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23, # 25 Exhibit 24, # 26 Exhibit 25, # 27 Exhibit 26, # 28 Exhibit 27, # 29 Exhibit 28, # 30 Exhibit 29, # 31 Exhibit 30, # 32 Exhibit 31, # 33 Exhibit 32, # 34 Exhibit 33, # 35 Exhibit 34, # 36 Exhibit 35, # 37 Exhibit 36, # 38 Exhibit 37, # 39 Exhibit 38, # 40 Exhibit 39, # 41 Exhibit 40, # 42 Exhibit 41, # 43 Exhibit 42, # 44 Exhibit 43, # 45 Exhibit 44, # 46 Exhibit 45, # 47 Exhibit 46, # 48 Exhibit 47, # 49 Exhibit 48, # 50 Exhibit 49, # 51 Exhibit 50, # 52 Exhibit 51, # 53 Exhibit 52, # 54 Exhibit 53, # 55 Exhibit 54, # 56 Exhibit 55, # 57 Exhibit 56, # 58 Exhibit 57, # 59 Exhibit 58, # 60 Exhibit 59, # 61 Exhibit 60, # 62 Exhibit 61, # 63 Exhibit 62, # 64 Exhibit 63, # 65 Exhibit 64, # 66 Exhibit 65, # 67 Exhibit 66, # 68 Exhibit 67, # 69 Exhibit 68, # 70 Exhibit 69, # 71 Exhibit 70, # 72 Exhibit 71, # 73 Exhibit 72, # 74 Exhibit 73, # 75 Exhibit 74, Part 1, # 76 Exhibit 74, Part 2, # 77 Exhibit 75, # 78 Exhibit 76, # 79 Exhibit 77, # 80 Exhibit 78, # 81 Exhibit 79, # 82 Exhibit 80, # 83 Exhibit 81, # 84 Exhibit 82, # 85 Exhibit 83, # 86 Exhibit 84, # 87 Exhibit 85, # 88 Exhibit 86, # 89 Exhibit 87, # 90 Exhibit 88, # 91 Exhibit 89, # 92 Exhibit 90, # 93 Exhibit 91, # 94 Exhibit 92, # 95 Exhibit 93, # 96 Exhibit 94, # 97 Exhibit 95, # 98 Exhibit 96, # 99 Exhibit 97)(Michels, Robert) Modified on 8/12/2010 to correct document link(pdw). (Entered: 08/11/2010)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 446 Filed: 8/11/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  REPLY BRIEF re 412 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Public Version) filed by Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald, Scientific-Atlanta, Inc.. (Michels, Robert) (Entered: 08/11/2010)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 445 Filed: 8/11/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    MOTION to Strike and, MOTION in Limine Concerning Inadmissible Evidence of Collateral Government Proceedings (Public Version) by Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald, Scientific-Atlanta, Inc.. (Michels, Robert) (Entered: 08/11/2010)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 444 Filed: 7/28/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      NOTICE Of Filing of Errata Sheet by Plaintiffs in re: 426 Response in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (Harley, Craig) Modified on 7/29/2010 to create document link (pdw). (Entered: 07/28/2010)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 443 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT RESPONSE in Opposition re 439 MOTION to Strike and MOTION in Limine Concerning Inadmissible Evidence of Collateral Government Proceedings filed by Plaintiffs. (pdw) Modified on 7/27/2010 to attach sealed document(pdw). (Entered: 07/27/2010)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 442 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          NOTICE Of Filing Under Seal of Plaintiffs' Opposition to "Defendants' Motion to Strike and Motion In Limine Concerning Inadmissible Evidence of Collateral Government Proceedings" by Jack Graeber (Harley, Craig) (Entered: 07/26/2010)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document  Filed: 7/15/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            Submission of 412 MOTION for Summary Judgment (SEALED VERSION), and 420 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Redacted Public Version), submitted to District Judge Richard W. Story. (pdw)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 441 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL REPLY MEMORANDUM re 412 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald, with Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Statement of Material Facts and Exhibits 1-97. (pdw) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/15/2010: # 1 Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Statement of Material Facts, Part 1, # 3 Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Statement of Material Facts, Part 2, # 4 Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Statement of Material Facts, Part 3, # 10 Exhibit List, # 11 Exhibit 1, Part 1, # 12 Exhibit 1, Part 2, # 13 Exhibit 1, Part 3, # 14 Exhibit 1, Part 4, # 15 Exhibit 1, Part 6, # 16 Exhibit 2, Part 1, # 17 Exhibit 2, Part 2, # 18 Exhibit 2, Part 3, # 19 Exhibit 2, Part 4, # 20 Exhibit 2, Part 5, # 21 Exhibit 3, Part 1, # 22 Exhibit 3, Part 2, # 23 Exhibit 3, Part 3, # 24 Exhibit 4, Part 1, # 25 Exhibit 4, Part 2, # 26 Exhibit 4, Part 3, # 27 Exhibit 4, Part 4, # 28 Exhibit 4, Part 5, # 29 Exhibit 5, Part 1, # 30 Exhibit 5, Part 2, # 31 Exhibit 5, Part 3, # 32 Exhibit 5, Part 4, # 33 Exhibit 5, Part 5, # 34 Exhibit 6, Part 1, # 35 Exhibit 6, Part 2, # 36 Exhibit 6, Part 3, # 37 Exhibit 7, # 38 Exhibit 8, # 39 Exhibit 9, # 40 Exhibit 10, # 41 Exhibit 11, # 42 Exhibit 12, # 43 Exhibit 13, # 44 Exhibit 14, # 45 Exhibit 15, # 46 Exhibit 16, # 47 Exhibit 17, # 48 Exhibit 18, # 49 Exhibit 19, # 50 Exhibit 20, # 51 Exhibit 21, # 52 Exhibit 22, # 53 Exhibit 23, # 54 Exhibit 24, # 55 Exhibit 25, # 56 Exhibit 26, Part 1, # 57 Exhibit 26, Part 2, # 58 Exhibit 26, Part 3, # 59 Exhibit 27, Part 1, # 60 Exhibit 27, Part 2, # 61 Exhibit 27, Part 3, # 62 Exhibit 27, Part 4, # 63 Exhibit 28, # 64 Exhibit 29, Part 1, # 65 Exhibit 29, Part 2, # 66 Exhibit 29, Part 3, # 67 Exhibit 29, Part 4, # 68 Exhibit 29, Part 5, # 69 Exhibit 30, # 70 Exhibit 31, # 71 Exhibit 32, Part 1, # 72 Exhibit 32, Part 2, # 73 Exhibit 32, Part 3, # 74 Exhibit 32, Part 4, # 75 Exhibit 33, Part 1, # 76 Exhibit 33, Part 2, # 78 Exhibit 33, Part 3, # 79 Exhibit 33, Part 4, # 80 Exhibit 34, # 81 Exhibit 35, # 82 Exhibit 36, # 83 Exhibit 37, # 84 Exhibit 38, # 85 Exhibit 39, # 86 Exhibit 40, # 87 Exhibit 41, # 88 Exhibit 42, # 89 Exhibit 43, Part 1, # 90 Exhibit 43, Part 2, # 91 Exhibit 43, Part 3, # 92 Exhibit 43, Part 4, # 93 Exhibit 43, Part 5, # 94 Exhibit 44, Part 1, # 95 Exhibit 44, Part 2, # 96 Exhibit 44, Part 3, # 97 Exhibit 44, Part 4, # 98 Exhibit 44, Part 5, # 99 Exhibit 45, # 100 Exhibit 46, Part 1, # 101 Exhibit 46, Part 2, # 102 Exhibit 47, # 103 Exhibit 48, # 104 Exhibit 49, # 105 Exhibit 50, # 106 Exhibit 51, Part 1, # 107 Exhibit 51, Part 2, # 108 Exhibit 52) (pdw). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/15/2010: # 109 Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, # 110 Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Statement of Material Facts, Part 1, # 111 Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Statement of Material Facts, Part 2, # 112 Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Statement of Material Facts, Part 3, # 118 Exhibit List, # 119 Exhibit 1, Part 1, # 120 Exhibit 1, Part 2, # 121 Exhibit 1, Part 3, # 122 Exhibit 1, Part 4, # 123 Exhibit 1, Part 6, # 124 Exhibit 2, Part 1, # 125 Exhibit 2, Part 2, # 126 Exhibit 2, Part 3, # 127 Exhibit 2, Part 4, # 128 Exhibit 2, Part 5, # 129 Exhibit 3, Part 1, # 130 Exhibit 3, Part 2, # 131 Exhibit 3, Part 3, # 132 Exhibit 4, Part 1, # 133 Exhibit 4, Part 2, # 134 Exhibit 4, Part 3, # 135 Exhibit 4, Part 4, # 136 Exhibit 4, Part 5, # 137 Exhibit 5, Part 1, # 138 Exhibit 5, Part 2, # 139 Exhibit 5, Part 3, # 140 Exhibit 5, Part 4, # 141 Exhibit 5, Part 5, # 142 Exhibit 6, Part 1, # 143 Exhibit 6, Part 2, # 144 Exhibit 6, Part 3, # 145 Exhibit 7, # 146 Exhibit 8, # 147 Exhibit 9, # 148 Exhibit 10, # 149 Exhibit 11, # 150 Exhibit 12, # 151 Exhibit 13, # 152 Exhibit 14, # 153 Exhibit 15, # 154 Exhibit 16, # 155 Exhibit 17, # 156 Exhibit 18, # 157 Exhibit 19, # 158 Exhibit 20, # 159 Exhibit 21, # 160 Exhibit 22, # 161 Exhibit 23, # 162 Exhibit 24, # 163 Exhibit 25, # 164 Exhibit 26, Part 1, # 165 Exhibit 26, Part 2, # 166 Exhibit 26, Part 3, # 167 Exhibit 27, Part 1, # 168 Exhibit 27, Part 2, # 169 Exhibit 27, Part 3, # 170 Exhibit 27, Part 4, # 171 Exhibit 28, # 172 Exhibit 29, Part 1, # 173 Exhibit 29, Part 2, # 174 Exhibit 29, Part 3, # 175 Exhibit 29, Part 4, # 176 Exhibit 29, Part 5, # 177 Exhibit 30, # 178 Exhibit 31, # 179 Exhibit 32, Part 1, # 180 Exhibit 32, Part 2, # 181 Exhibit 32, Part 3, # 182 Exhibit 32, Part 4, # 183 Exhibit 33, Part 1, # 184 Exhibit 33, Part 2, # 186 Exhibit 33, Part 3, # 187 Exhibit 33, Part 4, # 188 Exhibit 34, # 189 Exhibit 35, # 190 Exhibit 36, # 191 Exhibit 37, # 192 Exhibit 38, # 193 Exhibit 39, # 194 Exhibit 40, # 195 Exhibit 41, # 196 Exhibit 42, # 197 Exhibit 43, Part 1, # 198 Exhibit 43, Part 2, # 199 Exhibit 43, Part 3, # 200 Exhibit 43, Part 4, # 201 Exhibit 43, Part 5, # 202 Exhibit 44, Part 1, # 203 Exhibit 44, Part 2, # 204 Exhibit 44, Part 3, # 205 Exhibit 44, Part 4, # 206 Exhibit 44, Part 5, # 207 Exhibit 45, # 208 Exhibit 46, Part 1, # 209 Exhibit 46, Part 2, # 210 Exhibit 47, # 211 Exhibit 48, # 212 Exhibit 49, # 213 Exhibit 50, # 214 Exhibit 51, Part 1, # 215 Exhibit 51, Part 2, # 216 Exhibit 52, # 217 Exhibit 53, # 218 Exhibit 54, # 219 Exhibit 55, Part 1, # 220 Exhibit 55, Part 2, # 221 Exhibit 55, Part 3, # 222 Exhibit 55, Part 4, # 223 Exhibit 55, Part 5, # 224 Exhibit 55, Part 6, # 225 Exhibit 55, Part 7, # 226 Exhibit 56, Part 1, # 227 Exhibit 56, Part 2, # 228 Exhibit 56, Part 3, # 229 Exhibit 57, # 230 Exhibit 58, Part 1, # 231 Exhibit 58, Part 2, # 233 Exhibit 58, Part 3, # 234 Exhibit 58, Part 4, # 235 Exhibit 58, Part 5, # 236 Exhibit 58, Part 6, # 237 Exhibit 58, Part 7, # 238 Exhibit 59, # 239 Exhibit 60, Part 1, # 240 Exhibit 60, Part 2, # 241 Exhibit 61, # 242 Exhibit 62, # 244 Exhibit 63, Part 1, # 245 Exhibit 63, Part 2, # 246 Exhibit 63, Part 3, # 247 Exhibit 64, # 248 Exhibit 65, # 249 Exhibit 66, Part 1, # 250 Exhibit 66, Part 2, # 251 Exhibit 66, Part 3, # 252 Exhibit 66, Part 4, # 253 Exhibit 66, Part 5, # 254 Exhibit 66, Part 6, # 255 Exhibit 66, Part 7, # 256 Exhibit 67, # 257 Exhibit 68, # 258 Exhibit 69, # 259 Exhibit 70, Part 1, # 260 Exhibit 70, Part 2, # 261 Exhibit 70, Part 3, # 262 Exhibit 70, Part 4, # 263 Exhibit 70, Part 5, # 264 Exhibit 70, Part 6, # 265 Exhibit 71, # 266 Exhibit 72, # 267 Exhibit 73, # 268 Exhibit 74, # 269 Exhibit 75, # 270 Exhibit 76, # 271 Exhibit 77, # 272 Exhibit 78, Part 1, # 273 Exhibit 78, Part 2, # 274 Exhibit 78, Part 3, # 275 Exhibit 78, Part 4, # 276 Exhibit 78, Part 5, # 277 Exhibit 79, Part 1, # 278 Exhibit 79, Part 2, # 279 Exhibit 79, Part 3, # 280 Exhibit 79, Part 4, # 281 Exhibit 80, # 282 Exhibit 81, # 283 Exhibit 82, # 284 Exhibit 83, # 285 Exhibit 84, # 286 Exhibit 85, # 287 Exhibit 86, Part 1, # 288 Exhibit 86, Part 2, # 289 Exhibit 86, Part 3, # 290 Exhibit 87, # 291 Exhibit 88, # 292 Exhibit 89, # 293 Exhibit 90, # 298 Exhibit 91, Part 1, # 299 Exhibit 91, Part 2, # 300 Exhibit 91, Part 3, # 301 Exhibit 91, Part 4, # 302 Exhibit 92, # 303 Exhibit 93, # 304 Exhibit 94, # 305 Exhibit 95, # 306 Exhibit 96, # 307 Exhibit 97) (pdw). Modified on 7/15/2010 to attach sealed documents (pdw). (Entered: 07/13/2010)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 440 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                FILED UNDER SEAL NOTICE Of Filing Under Seal by Defendants: ONE CD-ROM RECEIVED BY THE CLERK, Containing 441 Defendants' Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, and Exhibits 1-97 (pdw) Modified on 7/15/2010 to add text(pdw). (Entered: 07/09/2010)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 439 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL Defendants' MOTION to Strike and MOTION in Limine Concerning Inadmissible Evidence of Collateral Government Proceedings by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald. (pdw) Modified on 7/9/2010 (pdw). (Entered: 07/09/2010)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 438 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    NOTICE Of Filing Under Seal of Defendants' Motion to Strike and Motion in Limine Concerning Inadmissible Evidence of Collateral Government Proceedings under seal pursuant to the Stipulated Order Regarding Confidential Information dated January 25, 2005 by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald (Michels, Robert) (Entered: 07/09/2010)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 437 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      NOTICE Of Filing Under Seal of Defendants' Reply Memorandum In Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment; Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Rule 56.1 Statement of Material Facts; and Exhibits to Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Rule 56.1 Statement of Material Facts by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald (Michels, Robert) (Entered: 07/09/2010)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 436 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER granting the 433 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Defendants' Reply Brief shall not exceed 95 pages. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 7/6/10. (aaq) (Entered: 07/08/2010)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 435 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 433 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald. (Michels, Robert) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 434 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 433 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Jack Graeber. (Roper, Meryl) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 433 Filed: 7/2/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages with Brief In Support by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald. (Attachments: # 1 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limits, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Connolly, J.) Modified on 7/6/2010 to correct all caps text (pdw). (Entered: 07/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 6/22/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                Mail Returned as Undeliverable, marked "Return to Sender. Not Deliverable as Addressed. Unable to Forward." Mail sent to Gilbert Senon Holzer re 428 Order on Motion for Extension of Time. (pdw) (Entered: 06/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to attorney Steven E. Cauley re 428 Order on Motion for Extension of Time returned "Moved - Mr. Cauley in jail". (pdw) (Entered: 06/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 430 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    Mail Returned as Undeliverable, mail marked "Return to Sender Not Deliverable as Addressed." Mail sent to Kip B. Shuman re 428 Order (gar) (Entered: 06/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 429 Filed: 5/25/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      Mail Returned as Undeliverable, mail marked "Return to Sender Not Deliverable as Addressed." Mail sent to Andrew L. Barroway re 428 Order (gar) (Entered: 05/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 428 Filed: 5/17/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 427 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re 412 Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendants' reply in further support of their motion for summary judgment shall be filed and served no later than 7/9/2010. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 5/17/2010. (gar) (Entered: 05/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 427 Filed: 5/13/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply in Further Support of Motion for Summary Judgment re: 412 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Connolly, J.) (Entered: 05/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 426 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE Of Filing Under Seal by Jack Graeber 1) Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, 2) Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Rule 56.1 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, 3) Plaintiffs' Rule 56.1 Statement of Material Facts, 4) Exhibit List to Plaintiffs' Rule 56.1 Statement of Material Facts with Corresponding Exhibits, 5) Declaration of Craig G. Harley (Harley, Craig) (Entered: 04/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 425 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              Mail Returned as Undeliverable, mail marked "This is wrong address." Mail sent to Steven E. Cauley re 390 Notice of Hearing on Motion. (gar) (Entered: 04/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 424 Filed: 3/22/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                Mail Returned as Undeliverable, mail marked "Return to Sender Not Deliverable as Addressed." Mail sent to Kip B. Shuman re 422 Order (gar) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 423 Filed: 3/22/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  Mail Returned as Undeliverable, mail marked "Return to Sender Not Deliverable as Addressed." Mail sent to Andrew L. Barroway re 422 Order (gar) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 422 Filed: 3/12/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 421 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs' brief in opposition to the 412 motion for summary judgment shall be filed and served no later than 4/30/2010 and shall not exceeded 125 pages in length and any reply brief in further support of Defendants' motion for summary judgment shall be filed and served within 35 days of the filing of Plaintiffs' opposition brief. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 3/12/2010. (gar) (Entered: 03/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 421 Filed: 3/11/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time File Opposition and for Leave to Exceed Page Limits re: 412 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Desper, Juli) Modified on 3/12/2010 to remove duplicative wording (gar). (Entered: 03/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/22/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        Submission of 412 MOTION for Summary Judgment, submitted to District Judge Richard W. Story. (gar)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 420 Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Summary Judgment (Redacted Public Version) with Brief In Support by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support, # 2 Statement of Material Facts, # 3 Declaration of J. Erik Connolly, # 4 Exhibit List, # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit 2, # 7 Exhibit 3, # 8 Exhibit 4, # 9 Exhibit 5, # 10 Exhibit 6, # 11 Exhibit 7, # 12 Exhibit 8, # 13 Exhibit 9, # 14 Exhibit 10, # 15 Exhibit 11, Part 1, # 16 Exhibit 11, Part 2, # 17 Exhibit 12, Part 1, # 18 Exhibit 12, Part 2, # 19 Exhibit 13, Part 1, # 20 Exhibit 13, Part 2, # 21 Exhibit 14, Part 1, # 22 Exhibit 14, Part 2, # 23 Exhibit 15, # 24 Exhibit 16, # 25 Exhibit 17, # 26 Exhibit 18, # 27 Exhibit 19, # 28 Exhibit 20, # 29 Exhibit 21, # 30 Exhibit 22, # 31 Exhibit 23, # 32 Exhibit 24, # 33 Exhibit 25, # 34 Exhibit 26, # 35 Exhibit 27, # 36 Exhibit 28, # 37 Exhibit 29, # 38 Exhibit 30, # 39 Exhibit 31, # 40 Exhibit 32, # 41 Exhibit 33, # 42 Exhibit 34, # 43 Exhibit 35, # 44 Exhibit 36, # 45 Exhibit 37, # 46 Exhibit 38, # 47 Exhibit 39, # 48 Exhibit 40, # 49 Exhibit 41, # 50 Exhibit 42, # 51 Exhibit 43, # 52 Exhibit 44, # 53 Exhibit 45, # 54 Exhibit 46, # 55 Exhibit 47, # 56 Exhibit 48, # 57 Exhibit 49, # 58 Exhibit 50, # 59 Exhibit 51, # 60 Exhibit 52, # 61 Exhibit 53, # 62 Exhibit 54, # 63 Exhibit 55, # 64 Exhibit 56, # 65 Exhibit 57, # 66 Exhibit 58, # 67 Exhibit 59, # 68 Exhibit 60, # 69 Exhibit 61, # 70 Exhibit 62, # 71 Exhibit 63, # 72 Exhibit 64, # 73 Exhibit 65, # 74 Exhibit 66, # 75 Exhibit 67, # 76 Exhibit 68, # 77 Exhibit 69, # 78 Exhibit 70, # 79 Exhibit 71, # 80 Exhibit 72, # 81 Exhibit 73, # 82 Exhibit 74, # 83 Exhibit 75, # 84 Exhibit 76, # 85 Exhibit 77, # 86 Exhibit 78, # 87 Exhibit 79, # 88 Exhibit 80, # 89 Exhibit 81, # 90 Exhibit 82, # 91 Exhibit 83, # 92 Exhibit 84, # 93 Exhibit 85, # 94 Exhibit 86, # 95 Exhibit 87, # 96 Exhibit 88, # 97 Exhibit 89, # 98 Exhibit 90, # 99 Exhibit 91, # 100 Exhibit 92, # 101 Exhibit 93, # 102 Exhibit 94, # 103 Exhibit 95, # 104 Exhibit 96, # 105 Exhibit 97, # 106 Exhibit 98, # 107 Exhibit 99, # 108 Exhibit 100, # 109 Exhibit 101, # 110 Exhibit 102, # 111 Exhibit 103, # 112 Exhibit 104, # 113 Exhibit 105, # 114 Exhibit 106, # 115 Exhibit 107, # 116 Exhibit 108, # 117 Exhibit 109, # 118 Exhibit 110, # 119 Exhibit 111, # 120 Exhibit 112, # 121 Exhibit 113, # 122 Exhibit 114, # 123 Exhibit 115, # 124 Exhibit 116, # 125 Exhibit 117, # 126 Exhibit 118, # 127 Exhibit 119, # 128 Exhibit 120, # 129 Exhibit 121, # 130 Exhibit 122, # 131 Exhibit 123, # 132 Exhibit 124, # 133 Exhibit 125, # 134 Exhibit 126, # 135 Exhibit 127, # 136 Exhibit 128, # 137 Exhibit 129, # 138 Exhibit 130, # 139 Exhibit 131, # 140 Exhibit 132, # 141 Exhibit 133, # 142 Exhibit 134, # 143 Exhibit 135, # 144 Exhibit 136, # 145 Exhibit 137, # 146 Exhibit 138, # 147 Exhibit 139, # 148 Exhibit 140, # 149 Exhibit 141, # 150 Exhibit 142, # 151 Exhibit 143, # 152 Exhibit 144, # 153 Exhibit 145, # 154 Exhibit 146, # 155 Exhibit 147, # 156 Exhibit 148, # 157 Exhibit 149, # 158 Exhibit 150, # 159 Exhibit 151, # 160 Exhibit 152, # 161 Exhibit 153, # 162 Exhibit 154, # 163 Exhibit 155, # 164 Exhibit 156, # 165 Exhibit 157, # 166 Exhibit 158, # 167 Exhibit 159, # 168 Exhibit 160, # 169 Exhibit 161, # 170 Exhibit 162, # 171 Exhibit 163, # 172 Exhibit 164, # 173 Exhibit 165, # 174 Exhibit 166, # 175 Exhibit 167, # 176 Exhibit 168, # 177 Exhibit 169, # 178 Exhibit 170, # 179 Exhibit 171, # 180 Exhibit 172, # 181 Exhibit 173, # 182 Exhibit 174, # 183 Exhibit 175, # 184 Exhibit 176, # 185 Exhibit 177, # 186 Exhibit 178, # 187 Exhibit 179, # 188 Exhibit 180, # 189 Exhibit 181, # 190 Exhibit 182, # 191 Exhibit 183, # 192 Exhibit 184, # 193 Exhibit 185, # 194 Exhibit 186, # 195 Exhibit 187, # 196 Exhibit 188, # 197 Exhibit 189, # 198 Exhibit 190, # 199 Exhibit 191, # 200 Exhibit 192, # 201 Exhibit 193, # 202 Exhibit 194, # 203 Exhibit 195, # 204 Exhibit 196, # 205 Exhibit 197, # 206 Exhibit 198, # 207 Exhibit 199, # 208 Exhibit 200, # 209 Exhibit 201, # 210 Exhibit 202, # 211 Exhibit 203, # 212 Exhibit 204, # 213 Exhibit 205, # 214 Exhibit 206, # 215 Exhibit 207, # 216 Exhibit 208, # 217 Exhibit 209, # 218 Exhibit 210, # 219 Exhibit 211, # 220 Exhibit 212, # 221 Exhibit 213, # 222 Exhibit 214, # 223 Exhibit 215, # 224 Exhibit 216, # 225 Exhibit 217, # 226 Exhibit 218, # 227 Exhibit 219, # 228 Exhibit 220)(Connolly, J.) --Please refer to http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain the Notice to Respond to Summary Judgment Motion form contained on the Court's website.-- (Entered: 02/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 418 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            Mail Returned as Undeliverable, mail marked "Return to Sender." Mail sent to Steven E. Cauley re 410 Order (gar) (Entered: 02/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 419 Filed: 2/8/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              Mail Returned as Undeliverable, mail marked "Return to Sender." Mail sent to Andrew L. Barroway re 410 Order (gar) (Entered: 02/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 417 Filed: 2/4/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                Mail Returned as Undeliverable, mail marked "Return to Sender." Mail sent to Steven E. Cauley re 410 Order (gar) (Entered: 02/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 416 Filed: 2/3/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  Mail Returned as Undeliverable, mail marked "Return to Sender." Mail sent to Kip B. Shuman re 410 Order (gar) (Entered: 02/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 414 Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    Mail Returned as Undeliverable, mail marked " Return to Sender." Mail sent to Andrew L. Barroway and Stuart L. Berman re 410 Order (gar) Modified on 2/2/2010 to correct names (gar). (Entered: 02/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 415 Filed: 2/1/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      Mail Returned as Undeliverable, mail marked "Forward Time Exp Rtn to Send." Mail sent to Gilbert Senon Holzer re 410 Order (gar) (Entered: 02/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 413 Filed: 1/28/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        Mail Returned as Undeliverable, mail marked, "Return to Sender Attempted Not Known." Mail sent to Kip Shuman re 406 Order. (gar) (Entered: 01/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/26/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          FILED UNDER SEAL One CD received containing re 411 Notice of Manual Filing, 412 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Exhibits to Statement of Material Facts. (gar)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 412 Filed: 1/26/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            FILED UNDER SEAL MOTION for Summary Judgment with Brief In Support by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald. (gar) --Please refer to http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain the Notice to Respond to Summary Judgment Motion form contained on the Court's website.-- (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/26/2010: # 1 Brief in Support, # 2 Statement of Material Facts Part 1 of 2, # 3 Statement of Material Facts Part 2 of 2, # 4 Declaration of J. Erik Connolly) (gar). (Verified on 1/26/2010 by rvb) (Entered: 01/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 411 Filed: 1/26/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE Of Filing Under Seal by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald (gar) (Entered: 01/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 410 Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER directing the parties to file Motions for Summary Judgment and supporting documents no later than 1/26/2010. Any brief in opposition to a motion for summary judgment shall be due no later than 60 days thereafter; any reply briefs in further support of a motion for summary judgment shall be due no later than 35 days following the deadline for opposition briefs. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 1/25/2010. (gar) (Entered: 01/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 409 Filed: 1/22/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER Extending Time to File Motions for Summary Judgment. (Connolly, J.) Modified on 1/25/2010 to remove all capitalization from docket text(gar). (Entered: 01/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 408 Filed: 1/20/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF REQUIREMENT TO FILE ELECTRONICALLY pursuant to Standing Order 04-01 as to Charles J. Piven re 407 Notice of Change of Address. (gar) (Entered: 01/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 407 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Change of Address for Charles J. Piven, counsel for Milton Cyntje (gar) (Entered: 01/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 406 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 404 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Defendants' brief supporting their motion for summary judgment is not to exceed 125 pages. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 1/19/2010. (gar) (Entered: 01/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 405 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 404 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Jack Graeber. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Roper, Meryl) (Entered: 01/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404 Filed: 1/15/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages with Brief In Support by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Connolly, J.) (Entered: 01/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 12/8/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              Mail Returned as Undeliverable, mail marked "Return to Sender." Mail sent to Andrew L. Barroway and Stuart L. Berman re 398 Order (gar) (Entered: 12/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 402 Filed: 12/8/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                Mail Returned as Undeliverable, mail marked "Forward Time Exp Rtn to Send." Mail sent to Kip B. Shuman re 395 Order (gar) (Entered: 12/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 12/7/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Mail Returned as Undeliverable, mail marked " Forward Time Exp Rtn to Send." Mail sent to Kip B. Shuman re 398 Order (gar) (Entered: 12/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 12/3/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Mail Returned as Undeliverable, mail marked "Return to Sender, Not Deliverable as Addressed." Mail sent to Stuart L. Berman, Andrew L. Barroway re 398 Order (gar) (Entered: 12/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 11/30/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Aaron L. Brody and Jules Brody re 398 Order. (gar) (Entered: 12/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 11/25/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 397 Motion for Extension of Time to File Motions for Summary Judgment. Motions for Summary Judgment shall be filed and served no later than 1/22/2010 Any brief in opposition to a motion for summary for judgment shall be filed and served no later than 60 days thereafter. Any reply briefs in further support of a motion for summary judgment shall be filed and served no later than 35 days following the deadlines for opposition briefs. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 11/25/2009. (gar) (Entered: 11/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 11/25/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motions for Summary Judgment by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Connolly, J.) (Entered: 11/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 11/24/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Motion to Exclude Proceedings held on November 17, 2009, before Judge Richard W. Story. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sharon D. Upchurch, Telephone number 404-215-1354. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/15/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/28/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/22/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Filing Transcript) (kac) (Entered: 11/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 11/24/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying Plaintiff's 332 Motion to Exclude Testimony of Ronald J. Gilson. Defendants' 336 and 341 Motion to Exclude Testimony of Edward A. Heirs III is GRANTED. Defendants' 337 and 340 Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Steven L. Henning is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Defendants' 338 and 342 Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Scott D. Hakala is DENIED. Motions for Summary Judgment, if any, shall be filed in accordance with the 389 Briefing Schedule entered by the Court on 9/10/2009. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 11/24/2009. (gar) (Entered: 11/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 11/20/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Mail Returned as Undeliverable, mail marked "Not Deliverable as Addressed, Unable to Forward." Mail sent to Stuart L. Berman re 390 Notice of Hearing on Motion. (gar) (Entered: 11/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 11/17/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard W. Story: Motion Hearing held on 11/17/2009. 332 MOTION to Exclude TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. 336 MOTION to Exclude TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. 337 MOTION to Exclude TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. 338 MOTION to Exclude TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. 340 MOTION to Exclude TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. 341 MOTION to Exclude TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. 342 MOTION to Exclude TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. (Court Reporter Sharon Upchurch)(gar) (Entered: 11/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 11/6/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Mail Returned as Undeliverable, mail marked "Return to Sender Not Deliverable as Addressed." Mail sent to Andrew L. Barroway re 390 Notice of Hearing on Motion (gar) (Entered: 11/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 10/27/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Mail Returned as Undeliverable, mail marked "Forward Time Exp Rtn to Send." Mail sent to Kip B. Shuman. (gar) (Entered: 10/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/21/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to Roger Hale, Jeanne Hale, Kathryn Herani, Randolph J. Schaubs, Vigilant Investors LP, Kalford C. Fadem, Pond Equities, Peter Kaltman, Harris Holdings, LLC, Robert A. Rovner, Rochelle Phillips, Lennie W. Bible, Milton Cyntje, Lawrence L. Dieu, Janice E. Dieu, Mary Jo Goolsby, Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald, Hugh Petersen, III, Alexander Petersen, Fellows LaBriola, LLP, Sharon Shapiro, Steven W. Dailey, David Byers, Janis Palmer, Fremont Investment Advisors, Hale Group, Arthur N. Park, Jack Graeber re 390 Notice of Hearing on Motion,, (rag)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 10/21/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re: 341 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Edward A. Hirs III, 338 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Scott D. Hakala, 337 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Steven L. Henning, 340 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Steven L. Henning, 336 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Edward A. Hirs III, 332 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Ronald J. Gilson, 342 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Scott D. Hakala Motion Hearing set for 11/5/2009 at 01:30 PM in ATLA Courtroom 2105 before Judge Richard W. Story. (rag) (Entered: 10/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 9/10/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 383 Motion to Amend Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 9/9/2009. (gar) (Entered: 09/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/4/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Submission of 383 MOTION to Amend Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule, submitted to District Judge Richard W. Story. (gar)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 9/4/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re 383 MOTION to Amend Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule filed by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald. (Connolly, J.) (Entered: 09/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 9/3/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FILED UNDER SEAL REPLY in Support re 368 Notice of Objection to the Admissibility of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Expert Declarations, filed by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald. (gar) (Verified on 9/4/2009 by rvb) (Entered: 09/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 9/3/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE Of Filing Under Seal Defendants' Reply in Support of Notice of Objection to the Admissibility of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Expert Declarations by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald (gar) (Entered: 09/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 9/3/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE Of Filing UNDER SEAL of Defendants' Reply in Support of Notice of Objection to the Admissibility of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Expert Declarations by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald (Connolly, J.) (Entered: 09/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 9/3/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 383 MOTION to Amend Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule filed by Jack Graeber. (Roper, Meryl) (Entered: 09/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 9/1/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Amend Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule Judgment by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Connolly, J.) Modified on 9/1/2009 to remove capitalization from docket text (gar). (Entered: 09/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 381 Motion for Approval of Notice to Class of Pendency of Class Action. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 8/31/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Pendency of Class Action, # 2 Summary Notice of Pendency of Class Action) (gar) (Entered: 08/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 8/28/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION Approval of Notice to Class of Pendency of Class Action with Brief In Support by Jack Graeber. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Brief)(Roper, Meryl) (Entered: 08/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 8/19/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald re 368 Objection, Memorandum of Law in Support of Notice of Objection to the Admissibility of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Expert Delcarations (Michels, Robert) (Entered: 08/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 8/19/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 338 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Scott D. Hakala, 342 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Scott D. Hakala (Redacted public version) filed by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald. (Michels, Robert) (Entered: 08/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 8/19/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 340 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Steven L. Henning (Redacted Public Version) filed by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald. (Michels, Robert) (Entered: 08/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 8/19/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 341 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Edward A. Hirs III (Redacted Public Version) filed by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Michels, Robert) (Entered: 08/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 8/17/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE Of Filing Plaintiffs' 375 Response in Opposition to Notice of Objection to the Admissibility of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Expert Declarations under seal by Jack Graeber, (Roper, Meryl) Modified on 8/17/2009 to link to correct document (gar). (Entered: 08/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 8/17/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FILED UNDER SEAL RESPONSE in Opposition re 368 Notice of Objection to the Admissibility of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Expert Declarations, filed by Kalford C. Fadem, Pond Equities, Peter Kaltman, Harris Holdings, LLC, Robert A. Rovner, Rochelle Phillips, Lennie W. Bible, Milton Cyntje, Lawrence L. Dieu, Janice E. Dieu, Mary Jo Goolsby, Hugh Petersen, III, Alexander Petersen. (gar) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/17/2009: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Part 1, # 5 Exhibit 4 - Part 2, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7) (gar). (Verified on 8/17/2009 by rvb) (Entered: 08/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Mail Returned as Undeliverable, mail marked " Return to Sender, Not Deliverable as Addressed." Mail sent to Steven E. Cauley re 360 Order. (gar) (gar). (Entered: 08/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Mail Returned as Undeliverable, mail marked "Forward Time Exp." Mail sent to Kip B. Shuman re 360 Order. (gar) (Entered: 08/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 8/4/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Mail Returned as Undeliverable, mail marked "Not Deliverable as Addressed, Return to Sender." Mail sent to Andrew L. Barroway and Stuart L. Berman re 360 Order (gar) (Entered: 08/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/3/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Submission of 332 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Ronald J. Gilson, 336 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Edward A. Hirs III, 337 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Steven L. Henning, 338 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Scott D. Hakala, 340 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Steven L. Henning, 341 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Edward A. Hirs III, 342 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Scott D. Hakala, submitted to District Judge Richard W. Story. (gar)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FILED UNDER SEAL REPLY in Support re 336 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Edward A. Hirs III filed by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald. (gar) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/30/2009: # 1 Exhibit List, # 2 Exhibit A, # 6 Exhibit B - 1 of 3, # 7 Exhibit B - 2 of 3, # 8 Exhibit B - 3 of 3, # 9 Exhibit C - 1 of 3, # 10 Exhibit C - 2 of 3, # 11 Exhibit C - 3 of 3) (Verified on 7/30/2009 by rvb) (Entered: 07/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FILED UNDER SEAL REPLY in Support re 338 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Scott D. Hakala filed by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald. (gar) (Verified on 7/30/2009 by rvb) (Entered: 07/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FILED UNDER SEAL REPLY BRIEF in Support re 337 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Steven L. Henning filed by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald. (gar) (Verified on 7/30/2009 by rvb) (Entered: 07/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FILED UNDER SEAL NOTICE of OBJECTION to the Admissibility of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Expert Declarations by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald. (gar) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/30/2009: # 1 Memorandum of Law in Support) (gar). (Verified on 7/30/2009 by rvb) (Entered: 07/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FILED UNDER SEAL DECLARATION of Meryl W. Roper in Support re 366 Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Testimony of Ronald J. Gilson by Kalford C. Fadem, Pond Equities, Peter Kaltman, Harris Holdings, LLC, Robert A. Rovner, Rochelle Phillips, Lennie W. Bible, Milton Cyntje, Lawrence L. Dieu, Janice E. Dieu, Mary Jo Goolsby, Hugh Petersen, III, Alexander Petersen. (gar) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/29/2009: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B) (gar). (Verified 7/29/2009 by rvb) (Entered: 07/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FILED UNDER SEAL REPLY in Support re 332 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Ronald J. Gilson filed by Kalford C. Fadem, Pond Equities, Harris Holdings, LLC, Robert A. Rovner, Rochelle Phillips, Lennie W. Bible, Milton Cyntje, Lawrence L. Dieu, Janice E. Dieu, Mary Jo Goolsby, Hugh Petersen, III, Alexander Petersen. (gar) (Verified on 7/29/2009 by rvb) (Entered: 07/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE Of Filing Under Seal of Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Testimony of Ronald J. Gilson, and Declaration of Meryl W. Roper in Support by Jack Graeber (Roper, Meryl) (Entered: 07/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE Of Filing Under Seal of Defendants' Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Edward A. Hirs III; Exhibits to Defendants' Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Edward A. Hirs III by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald (Connolly, J.) (Entered: 07/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE Of Filing Under Seal of Defendants' Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Steven J. Henning by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald (Connolly, J.) (Entered: 07/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE Of Filing Under Seal of Defendants' Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Scott D. Hakala by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald (Connolly, J.) (Entered: 07/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE Of Filing Under Seal of Defendants' Notice of Objection to the Admissibility of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Expert Declarations and Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Support of Notice of Objection to the Admissibility of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Expert Declarations by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald (Connolly, J.) (Entered: 07/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 7/27/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 355 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages as follows, Defendants' replies in support of this Motions to bar Dr. Henning and Mr. Hirs shall not exceed 30 pages; Defendants' reply in support of the Motion to bar Dr. Hakala shall not exceed 40 pages; and Plaintiffs' request for leave to file sur-reply briefs is DENIED.. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 7/27/2009. (gar) (Entered: 07/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 7/27/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 332 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Ronald J. Gilson (Redacted Public Version) filed by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Michels, Robert) (Entered: 07/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/27/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Submission of 355 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages, submitted to District Judge Richard W. Story. (gar)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 7/27/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re 355 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order (Amended))(Connolly, J.) (Entered: 07/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 7/24/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 355 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Jack Graeber. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Roper, Meryl) (Entered: 07/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 7/24/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROPOSED ORDER re: 355 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages. (Connolly, J.) (Entered: 07/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 7/23/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages with Brief In Support by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion)(Connolly, J.) (Entered: 07/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 7/13/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Stuart L. Berman re 352 Order on Motion to Seal marked Return to Sender, Not Deliverable as Addressed. (ekb) (Entered: 07/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 7/8/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Kip B. Shuman re 352 Order on Motion to Seal marked Forward Time Exp, Rtn to Sender. (ekb) (Entered: 07/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 6/30/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 350 Motion For Leave to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 6/30/09. (ekb) (Entered: 07/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 6/30/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ---FILED UNDER SEAL--- RESPONSE in Opposition re 332 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Ronald J. Gilson filed by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald. (ekb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/30/2009: # 1 Exhibit List, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit A continued, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C) (ekb). Modified on 6/30/2009 (ekb).(verified by gar on 6/30/09) (Entered: 06/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 6/30/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Uncontested MOTION For Leave to File Documents Under Seal with Brief In Support by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald. (ekb) (Entered: 06/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 6/29/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ---FILED UNDER SEAL--- RESPONSE in Opposition re 338 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Scott D. Hakala filed by Kalford C. Fadem, Pond Equities, Peter Kaltman, Harris Holdings, LLC, Robert A. Rovner, Rochelle Phillips, Lennie W. Bible, Milton Cyntje, Lawrence L. Dieu, Janice E. Dieu, Mary Jo Goolsby, Hugh Petersen, III, Alexander Petersen. (ekb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/30/2009: # 1 Declaration of Meryl W. Roper, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit A continued, # 4 Exhibit A continued, # 5 Exhibit A continued, # 6 Exhibit A continued, # 7 Exhibit A continued, # 8 Exhibit B, # 9 Exhibit C, # 10 Exhibit C continued, # 11 Exhibit C continued, # 12 Exhibit C continued, # 13 Exhibit D, # 14 Exhibit E, # 15 Exhibit F, # 16 Exhibit G, # 17 Exhibit H, # 18 Exhibit I, # 19 Exhibit J, # 20 Exhibit K, # 21 Exhibit L, # 22 Exhibit M, # 23 Exhibit N, # 24 Exhibit O, # 25 Exhibit P, # 26 Exhibit Q, # 27 Exhibit R, # 28 Exhibit S, # 29 Exhibit T, # 30 Exhibit U, # 31 Exhibit V, # 32 Exhibit W, # 33 Exhibit X, # 34 Exhibit Y, # 35 Exhibit Z, # 36 Exhibit AA, # 37 Exhibit BB, # 38 Exhibit CC, # 39 Exhibit DD, # 40 Exhibit EE, # 41 Exhibit EE continued, # 42 Exhibit EE continued, # 43 Exhibit FF, # 44 Exhibit GG, # 45 Exhibit HH, # 46 Exhibit II, # 47 Exhibit JJ, # 48 Exhibit KK, # 49 Exhibit LL, # 50 Exhibit MM, # 51 Exhibit NN, # 52 Exhibit NN continued, # 53 Exhibit OO, # 54 Exhibit PP) (ekb). Modified on 6/30/2009 (ekb). (verified by gar on 6/30/09) (Entered: 06/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 6/29/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ---FILED UNDER SEAL--- RESPONSE in Opposition re 337 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Steven L. Henning filed by Kalford C. Fadem, Pond Equities, Peter Kaltman, Harris Holdings, LLC, Robert A. Rovner, Rochelle Phillips, Lennie W. Bible, Milton Cyntje, Lawrence L. Dieu, Janice E. Dieu, Mary Jo Goolsby, Hugh Petersen, III, Alexander Petersen. (ekb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/30/2009: # 1 Declaration of Meryl W. Roper, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit A continued, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit D continued, # 8 Exhibit D continued, # 9 Exhibit D continued, # 10 Exhibit D continued, # 11 Exhibit D continued, # 12 Exhibit D continued, # 13 Exhibit D continued, # 14 Exhibit E, # 15 Exhibit F, # 16 Exhibit G, # 17 Exhibit H, # 18 Exhibit I, # 19 Exhibit J, # 20 Exhibit K, # 21 Exhibit L, # 22 Exhibit M, # 23 Exhibit N, # 24 Exhibit O, # 25 Exhibit P, # 26 Exhibit Q, # 27 Exhibit R, # 28 Exhibit S, # 29 Exhibit T, # 30 Exhibit U, # 31 Exhibit V, # 32 Exhibit W, # 33 Exhibit X, # 34 Exhibit Y, # 35 Exhibit Z, # 36 Exhibit AA, # 37 Exhibit BB, # 38 Exhibit CC, # 39 Exhibit DD, # 40 Exhibit EE) (ekb). Modified on 6/30/2009 (ekb). (verified by gar 6/30/09) (Entered: 06/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 6/29/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ---FILED UNDER SEAL--- RESPONSE in Opposition re 336 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Edward A. Hirs III filed by Kalford C. Fadem, Pond Equities, Peter Kaltman, Harris Holdings, LLC, Robert A. Rovner, Rochelle Phillips, Lennie W. Bible, Milton Cyntje, Lawrence L. Dieu, Janice E. Dieu, Mary Jo Goolsby, Hugh Petersen, III, Alexander Petersen. (ekb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/30/2009: # 1 Declaration of Meryl W. Roper, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit A continued, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit G continued, # 11 Exhibit H, # 12 Exhibit I) (ekb). Modified on 6/30/2009 (ekb). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/30/2009: # 13 Exhibit J, # 14 Exhibit J continued, # 15 Exhibit J continued) (ekb). Modified on 6/30/2009 (ekb). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/30/2009: # 16 Exhibit K, # 17 Exhibit K continued, # 18 Exhibit K continued) (ekb). (verified by ank on 6/30/09) (Entered: 06/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 6/29/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE Of Filing Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Edward A. Hirs III and Declaration of Meryl W. Roper in Support by Jack Graeber (Roper, Meryl) (Entered: 06/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 6/29/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE Of Filing Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Steven L. Henning and Declaration of Meryl W. Roper in Support by Jack Graeber (Roper, Meryl) (Entered: 06/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 6/29/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE Of Filing Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Scott D. Hakala and Declaration of Meryl W. Roper in Support by Jack Graeber (Roper, Meryl) (Entered: 06/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 6/8/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Andrew L. Barroway re 339 Order on Motion to Seal marked Return to Sender, No Deliverable as Addressed. (ekb) (Entered: 06/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/8/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                EVENT ENTERED IN ERROR Submission of 338 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Scott D. Hakala, 337 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Steven L. Henning, 336 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Edward A. Hirs III, 332 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Ronald J. Gilson, submitted to District Judge Richard W. Story. (ekb) Modified on 6/8/2009 to terminate submission as it is premature per 326 Scheduling Order (ekb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 6/5/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Scott D. Hakala (Redacted Public Version) with Brief In Support by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law in Support, # 2 List of Exhibits, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit 12, # 15 Exhibit 13)(Michels, Robert) Modified on 6/8/2009 to correct event type and remove all capitalization used in text (ekb). (Entered: 06/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 6/5/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Edward A. Hirs III (Redacted Public Version) with Brief In Support by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald. (Attachments: # 1 MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT, # 2 EXHIBIT LIST, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J (part 1), # 13 Exhibit J (part 2), # 14 Exhibit J (part 3), # 15 Exhibit K, # 16 Exhibit L, # 17 Exhibit M, # 18 Exhibit N)(Michels, Robert) Modified on 6/5/2009 to correct event type and remove all capitalization used in text (ekb). (Entered: 06/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 6/5/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Steven L. Henning (Redacted Public Version) with Brief In Support by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, # 2 Exhibit List, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit 12, # 15 Exhibit 13, # 16 Exhibit 14, # 17 Exhibit 15)(Michels, Robert) Modified on 6/5/2009 to correct event type and remove all capitalization used in text (ekb). (Entered: 06/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 5/18/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 335 Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 5/18/09. (ekb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/18/2009: # 1 Corrected PDF Attached) (ekb). (Entered: 05/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 5/15/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ---FILED UNDER SEAL--- MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Scott D. Hakala with Brief In Support by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald. (ekb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/18/2009: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Appendix of Exhibits, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 1 continued, # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5, # 9 Exhibit 6, # 10 Exhibit 7, # 11 Exhibit 8, # 12 Exhibit 9, # 13 Exhibit 10, # 14 Exhibit 11, # 15 Exhibit 12, # 16 Exhibit 13) (ekb). Modified on 5/18/2009 (ekb). (Entered: 05/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 5/15/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ---FILED UNDER SEAL--- MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Steven L. Henning with Brief In Support by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald. (ekb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/18/2009: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit List, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 1 continued, # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5, # 9 Exhibit 6, # 10 Exhibit 7, # 11 Exhibit 8, # 12 Exhibit 9, # 13 Exhibit 10, # 14 Exhibit 11, # 15 Exhibit 12, # 16 Exhibit 13, # 17 Exhibit 14, # 18 Exhibit 15) (ekb). Modified on 5/18/2009 (ekb). (Entered: 05/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 5/15/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ---FILED UNDER SEAL--- MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Edward A. Hirs III with Brief In Support by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald. (ekb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/18/2009: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit List, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit A continued, # 5 Exhibit A continued, # 6 Exhibit B, # 7 Exhibit C, # 8 Exhibit D, # 9 Exhibit E, # 10 Exhibit F, # 11 Exhibit G, # 12 Exhibit H, # 13 Exhibit I, # 14 Exhibit J, # 15 Exhibit K, # 16 Exhibit L, # 17 Exhibit M, # 18 Exhibit N) (ekb). Modified on 5/18/2009 (ekb). (Entered: 05/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 5/15/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Uncontested MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal with Brief In Support by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald. (ekb) (Entered: 05/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 5/15/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE Of Filing Under Seal of Declaration of Juli E. Farris in Support of Motion to Exclude Testimony of Ronald J. Gilson by Jack Graeber (Harley, Craig) (Entered: 05/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 5/15/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE Of Filing Under Seal of Motion to Exclude Testimony of Ronald J. Gilson and Memorandum in Support by Jack Graeber (Harley, Craig) (Entered: 05/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 5/15/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ---FILED UNDER SEAL--- MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Ronald J. Gilson with Brief In Support by Kalford C. Fadem, Pond Equities, Peter Kaltman, Harris Holdings, LLC, Robert A. Rovner, Rochelle Phillips, Lennie W. Bible, Milton Cyntje, Janice E. Dieu, Mary Jo Goolsby, Hugh Petersen, III, Alexander Petersen. (ekb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/18/2009: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Declaration of Juli E. Farris, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E) (ekb). Modified on 5/18/2009 (ekb). (Entered: 05/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 5/11/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 330 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 05/11/2009. (RWS) (Entered: 05/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 5/8/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Uncontested MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages with Brief In Support by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law in Support)(Connolly, J.) Modified on 5/11/2009 to correct docket text (ekb). (Entered: 05/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 5/1/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Steven E. Cauley re 326 Scheduling Order marked Return to Sender, Not Deliverable as Addressed. (ekb) (Entered: 05/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Mail Returned as Undeliverable, mail marked "Return to Sender." Mail sent to Kip B. Shuman re 326 Scheduling Order. (gar) (Entered: 04/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 4/23/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Mail Returned as Undeliverable, mail marked "Return to Sender Not Deliverable as Addressed." Mail sent to Stuart L. Berman and Andrew L. Barroway re 326 Scheduling Order. (gar) (Entered: 04/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 4/14/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CONSENT SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER. Motions objecting to expert testimony based upon Daubert shall be filed and served no later than 5/15/2009. Any brief in opposition to a motion objecting to expert testimony based upon Daubert shall be filed and served no later than 6/29/2009. Any reply brief in further support of a motion objecting to expert testimony based upon Daubert shall be filed and served no later than 7/29/2009. Motions for summary judgment shall be filed and served no later than 10/15/2009. Any brief in opposition to a motion for summary judgment shall be filed and served no later than 12/15/2009. Any reply briefs in further support of a motion for summary judgment shall be filed and served no later than 1/20/2010. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 4/14/09. (ekb) (Entered: 04/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 4/14/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER Consent Scheduling and Discovery Order re: 59 Order. (Roper, Meryl) (Entered: 04/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 3/2/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Steven E. Cauley re 317 Order marked Return to Sender, Not Deliverable as Addressed. (ekb) (Entered: 03/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 3/2/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Steven E. Cauley re 319 Order marked Return to Sender, Not Deliverable as Addressed. (ekb) (Entered: 03/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 2/20/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Stuart L. Berman re 319 Order marked Return to Sender, Not Deliverable as Addressed. (ekb) (Entered: 02/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 2/18/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Gilbert Senon Holzer re 319 Order marked Return to Sender, Not Deliverable as Addressed. (ekb) (Entered: 02/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 2/17/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Stuart L. Berman re 317 Order marked Return to Sender, Not Deliverable as Addressed. (ekb) (Entered: 02/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 2/10/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CONSENT SCHEDULING and DISCOVERY ORDER extending the deadline through 3/31/2009 for completing depositions of the parties' experts. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 2/10/09. (ekb) (Entered: 02/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 2/9/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER Extending Expert Deposition Deadlines re: 314 Order. (Roper, Meryl) (Entered: 02/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 2/3/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 316 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kelly C. Wilcove; Irene E. Baker and Susan Elaine Hurd of Alston & Bird LLP terminated. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 2/3/09. (ekb) Modified on 2/4/2009 to correct docket text (ekb). (Entered: 02/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 1/27/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Oscar N. Persons by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Persons, Oscar) Modified on 1/27/2009 to correct event type (ekb). (Entered: 01/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 9/30/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER DENYING 308 Motion for Leave to Serve Certain Specific Additional Discovery and GRANTING, nunc pro tunc to 7/17/2008, 312 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief and Memorandum in Support. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 9/30/2008. (sjk) (Entered: 09/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CONSENT SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 8/7/2008. (sjk) (Entered: 08/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER Consent Scheduling and Discovery Order. (Edelstein, Meryl) (Entered: 08/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Submission of 312 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief to District Judge Richard W. Story. (sjk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief with Brief In Support by Jack Graeber. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-Supplemental Brief)(Edelstein, Meryl) Modified on 7/18/2008 to correct double wording in docket text (sjk). (Entered: 07/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Submission of 308 MOTION for Discovery (to Serve Certain Specific Additional Discovery) to District Judge Richard W. Story. (sjk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY BRIEF re 308 MOTION for Discovery (to Serve Certain Specific Additional Discovery) filed by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald. (Michels, Robert) Modified on 7/8/2008 to correct text to more accurately reflect e-filed document (sjk). (Entered: 07/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 308 MOTION for Discovery (to Serve Certain Specific Additional Discovery) filed by David Byers, Steven W. Dailey, Fellows LaBriola, LLP, Sharon Shapiro (Weimer, Kevin) Modified on 6/24/2008 to remove extraneous, duplicative text (sjk). (Entered: 06/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 308 MOTION for Discovery (to Serve Certain Specific Additional Discovery) filed by Jack Graeber. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-F)(Edelstein, Meryl) Modified on 6/20/2008 (sjk). (Entered: 06/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 6/9/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Discovery (to Serve Certain Specific Additional Discovery) with Brief In Support by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List to Motion, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Motion, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Motion, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Motion, # 5 Exhibit 4 to Motion, # 6 Exhibit 5 to Motion, # 7 Exhibit 6 to Motion, # 8 Exhibit 7 to Motion, # 9 Brief Memorandum in Support of Motion, # 10 Exhibit List to Memorandum in Support, # 11 Exhibit A to Memorandum in Support, # 12 Exhibit B to Memorandum in Support, # 13 Exhibit C to Memorandum in Support, # 14 Exhibit D to Memorandum in Support)(Michels, Robert) (Entered: 06/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Jack Graeber.(Killorin, Robert) (Entered: 05/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER: Fact discovery is extended through 5/31/2008, with the understanding that some depositions may take place after 5/31/2008 but will not affect the remaining schedule. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 4/29/2008. (sjk) (Entered: 04/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald.(Connolly, J.) (Entered: 04/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE to Take Deposition of Trey Haydon filed by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald (Connolly, J.) (Entered: 04/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER Scheduling and Discovery Order re: 266 Order to Extend Time for Discovery. (Edelstein, Meryl) (Entered: 04/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 4/24/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE to Take Deposition of Dave Byers, Steve Dailey, Chastity Harsh, Janis Palmer, Sharon Shapiro filed by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald (Connolly, J.) (Entered: 04/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 4/24/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald.(Connolly, J.) (Entered: 04/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED ANSWER to 35 Amended Complaint by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald (Connolly, J.) Modified on 4/8/2008 to correct text to more accurately reflect e-filed document (sjk). (Entered: 04/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING 298 Motion to Amend Answer. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 4/4/2008. (sjk) (Entered: 04/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 4/2/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Amend 55 Answer to Complaint by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Connolly, J.) (Entered: 04/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Kalford C. Fadem, Pond Equities, Peter Kaltman, Harris Holdings, LLC, Robert A. Rovner, Rochelle Phillips, Lennie W. Bible, Milton Cyntje, Lawrence L. Dieu, Janice E. Dieu, Mary Jo Goolsby, Hugh Petersen, III, Alexander Petersen of Withdrawal for Belinda L. Williams (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Seidman, Peter) (Entered: 03/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 3/27/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Jack Graeber Civil Subpoena issued to Michael Mukasey out of the E.D. of Missouri (Killorin, Robert) (Entered: 03/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 3/26/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Jack Graeber Plaintiffs' Responses to Defendants' Interrogatories to Plaintiffs (Edelstein, Meryl) (Entered: 03/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Kalford C. Fadem, Pond Equities, Peter Kaltman, Harris Holdings, LLC, Robert A. Rovner, Rochelle Phillips, Lennie W. Bible, Milton Cyntje, Lawrence L. Dieu, Janice E. Dieu, Mary Jo Goolsby, Hugh Petersen, III, Alexander Petersen of Firm Name Change (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Seidman, Peter) (Entered: 03/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Jack Graeber of Discovery (Killorin, Robert) Modified on 3/26/2008 to correct double wording in docket text (sjk). (Entered: 03/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CONSENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 3/21/2008. (sjk) (Entered: 03/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Jack Graeber Certificate of Service of Discovery (Killorin, Robert) (Entered: 03/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 3/20/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER Regarding Presumptive Authenticity and Presumptive Business Records Per Rule 803(6) F.R.E.. (Harley, Craig) (Entered: 03/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 3/19/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Jack Graeber Certificate of Service of Discovery (Edelstein, Meryl) (Entered: 03/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery (Subpoena in a Civil Case (directed at Richard J. Wallace)) by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald.(Connolly, J.) Modified on 3/7/2008 to correct use of all capitals in docket text (sjk). (Entered: 03/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Jack Graeber.(Edelstein, Meryl) (Entered: 02/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Interrogatories to Plaintiffs by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald.(Connolly, J.) Modified on 2/29/2008 to correct use of all capitals in docket text (sjk). (Entered: 02/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 2/27/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING 284 Motion for Leave to Serve Additional Interrogatories. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 2/27/2008. (sjk) (Entered: 02/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 2/22/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Serve Additional Interrogatories by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Connolly, J.) Modified on 2/25/2008 to correct use of all capitals in docket text (sjk). (Entered: 02/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 2/22/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald.(Connolly, J.) Modified on 2/25/2008 to correct use of all capitals in text (sjk). (Entered: 02/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING 281 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael Woerner. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 2/21/2008. (sjk) (Entered: 02/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: 281 APPLICATION for Admission of Michael Woerner Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E0000000001533677). Attorney Michael Woerner for Kalford C. Fadem, Pond Equities, Peter Kaltman, Harris Holdings, LLC, Robert A. Rovner, Rochelle Phillips, Lennie W. Bible, Milton Cyntje, Lawrence L. Dieu, Janice E. Dieu, Mary Jo Goolsby, Hugh Petersen, III and Alexander Petersen added. (cdg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION for Admission of Michael Woerner Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E0000000001533677)by Jack Graeber. (Edelstein, Meryl) (Entered: 02/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER re 278 Motion to Prevent Plaintiffs from Unilaterally Violating Rule 30(d)(1). Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 2/19/2008. (sjk) (Entered: 02/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 2/18/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 278 MOTION Defendant's Motion to Prevent Plaintiffs From Unilaterally Violating Rule 30(D)(1) Concerning Time Limits on Depositions of Third-Party Witnesses filed by Jack Graeber. (Harley, Craig) (Entered: 02/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Prevent Plaintiffs From Unilaterally Violating Rule 30(D)(1) Concerning Time Limits on Depositions of Third-Party Witnesses by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald. (Connolly, J.) Modified on 2/19/2008 to correct double wording in docket text (sjk). (Entered: 02/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 2/12/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald.(Connolly, J.) (Entered: 02/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 2/12/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Jack Graeber.(Edelstein, Meryl) (Entered: 02/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Jack Graeber.(Edelstein, Meryl) (Entered: 02/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Ware Killorin on behalf of Jack Graeber (Killorin, Robert) (Entered: 02/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING 272 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Robert L. Michels. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 2/4/2008. (sjk) (Entered: 02/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: 272 APPLICATION for Admission of Robert L. Michels Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E0000000001510056). Attorney Robert L. Michels for Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip and James F. McDonald added. (pb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION for Admission of Robert L. Michels Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E0000000001510056)by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald. (Hurd, Susan) (Entered: 02/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE to Take Deposition of Kevin Eicher, Joe Quane, Mark Palazzo, Jim Lysaker, Tom Nilson, Tom Robey, Allen Ecker, Dave Hansen, Charlie Kinamon, Pat McCabe, James F. McDonald, Robert Beebe, Dale Freeman, Becky Sizemore, Wallace G. Haislip, John Wharton, Ward Dickson filed by Jack Graeber (Edelstein, Meryl) (Entered: 01/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 1/10/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Jack Graeber.(Edelstein, Meryl) (Entered: 01/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Jack Graeber.(Edelstein, Meryl) (Entered: 01/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Jack Graeber.(Edelstein, Meryl) (Entered: 01/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 12/17/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Roger Hale, Jeanne Hale, Kathryn Herani, Hugh Petersen, III, Jack Graeber of Discovery (Edelstein, Meryl) Modified on 12/18/2007 to correct double wording in docket text (sjk). (Entered: 12/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CONSENT ORDER extending time for Discovery. Merits Discovery ends on 3/31/2008. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 11/5/2007. (sjk) (Entered: 11/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER for Extension of Time for Discovery Period. (Hurd, Susan) (Entered: 11/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 10/26/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Dan K. Webb on behalf of Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald (Webb, Dan) (Entered: 10/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 10/26/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by J. Erik Connolly on behalf of Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald (Connolly, J.) (Entered: 10/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING 259 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of J. Erik Connolly. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 9/26/2007. (sjk) (Entered: 09/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING 260 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Dan K. Webb. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 9/26/2007. (sjk) (Entered: 09/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: 260 APPLICATION for Admission of Dan K. Webb Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 1354833), 259 APPLICATION for Admission of J. Erik Connolly Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 1354801). Attorney Dan K. Webb for Scientific-Atlanta, Inc. and Wallace G. Haislip, J. Erik Connolly for Scientific-Atlanta, Inc.,Wallace G. Haislip,James F. McDonald added. (pb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION for Admission of Dan K. Webb Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 1354833)by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald. (Hurd, Susan) (Entered: 09/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION for Admission of J. Erik Connolly Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 1354801)by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald. (Hurd, Susan) (Entered: 09/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Kalford C. Fadem, Pond Equities, Peter Kaltman, Harris Holdings, LLC, Robert A. Rovner, Rochelle Phillips, Lennie W. Bible, Milton Cyntje, Lawrence L. Dieu, Janice E. Dieu, Mary Jo Goolsby, Hugh Petersen, III, Alexander Petersen of Firm Name Change (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Williams, Belinda) Modified on 9/13/2007 to correct double wording in docket text (sjk). (Entered: 09/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 9/7/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING 151 Motion to Certify Class. The Court hereby appoints as class representatives in this action Alexander Peterson, Hugh G. Peterson, III, Jack Graeber, Roger Hale, and Vigilant Investors LP. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 9/7/2007. (sjk) (Entered: 09/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER ROGATORY to Compel Evidence from Rogers Cable. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 9/5/2007. (sjk) (Entered: 09/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING 254 Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 9/5/2007. (sjk) (Entered: 09/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory to Rogers Cable with Brief In Support by Roger Hale, Jeanne Hale, Vigilant Investors LP, Hugh Petersen, III, Alexander Petersen, Jack Graeber. (Attachments: # 1 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Issuance of Letter Rogatory to Rogers Cable# 2 Exhibit A - Proposed Letter Rogatory to Compel Evidence from Rogers Cable# 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Edelstein, Meryl) (Entered: 09/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 6/12/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 151 MOTION to Certify Class (Supplemental Authority) filed by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hurd, Susan) (Entered: 06/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 5/17/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report on the Production of Documents and Merits Discovery by Jack Graeber. (Edelstein, Meryl) (Entered: 05/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 5/4/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE re 250 Response (Non-Motion) by Jack Graeber. (Harley, Craig) Modified on 5/7/2007 to correct document link, to correct double wording in docket text, and to correct text to more accurately reflect the nature of the e-filed document (sjk). (Entered: 05/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 4/20/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE re 246 Response in Support of Motion, to Plaintiffs' Expert Report in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hurd, Susan) (Entered: 04/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 4/9/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 248 Motion for Leave to File Response to Plaintiffs' Newly Submitted Expert Opinions on Class Certification. Defendants' Response will be due not later than April 20, 2007. Plaintiffs may file a reply to Defendants' response not later than May 4, 2007. Said responses shall be no longer than fifteen (15) pages, excluding exhibits. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 4/9/07. (dfb) (Entered: 04/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 4/6/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Response to Plaintiffs' Newly Submittted Expert Opinions on Class Certification with Brief In Support by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Hurd, Susan) (Entered: 04/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 4/4/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 151 MOTION to Certify Class (Supplemental Authority) filed by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hurd, Susan) (Entered: 04/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/22/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Submission of 151 MOTION to Certify Class to District Judge Richard W. Story. (sjk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 3/20/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY BRIEF re 151 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Jack Graeber. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Cryolife Class Certification Order# 2 Exhibit B Profit Recovery Order# 3 Exhibit C Vellrath Expert Report# 4 Exhibit D Valujet Slip Opinion# 5 Exhibit E Vigilant Transcript)(Harley, Craig) Modified on 3/21/2007 to correct text to more accurately reflect e-filed document (sjk). (Entered: 03/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 3/20/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re 243 Notice of Substitution of Counsel, 244 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) filed by Kalford C. Fadem, Pond Equities, Peter Kaltman, Harris Holdings, LLC, Robert A. Rovner, Rochelle Phillips, Lennie W. Bible, Milton Cyntje, Lawrence L. Dieu, Janice E. Dieu, Mary Jo Goolsby, Hugh Petersen, III, Alexander Petersen (Williams, Belinda) (Entered: 03/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 3/20/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Kalford C. Fadem, Pond Equities, Peter Kaltman, Harris Holdings, LLC, Robert A. Rovner, Rochelle Phillips, Lennie W. Bible, Milton Cyntje, Lawrence L. Dieu, Janice E. Dieu, Mary Jo Goolsby, Hugh Petersen, III, Alexander Petersen Notice of Firm Name Change (Williams, Belinda) (Entered: 03/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 3/20/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DOCUMENT FILING ERROR. COUNSEL NEEDS TO FILE APPROPRIATE PHV MATERIALS Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel. Belinda L. Williams replacing attorney Robert R. Adler and Steven G. Schulman. (Williams, Belinda) Modified on 3/21/2007 (sjk). (Entered: 03/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 2/8/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CONSENT ORDER. Plaintiffs shall serve their reply brief in further support of their 151 MOTION to Certify Class sixty (60) days from the date of service of Defendants' Opposition Memorandum. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 2/08/07. (dfb) (Entered: 02/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 2/6/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER Plaintiffs shall serve their reply brief in further support of their Motion for Class Certification sixty (60) days from the date of service of Defendants' Opposition Memorandum. (Edelstein, Meryl) (Entered: 02/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 1/24/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT (Joint) on Production of Electronic Documents by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald. (Hurd, Susan) (Entered: 01/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/23/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Undeliverable Electronic Mail re: 237 Order on Application for Admission PHV, 239 Order, 238 Order on Application for Admission PHV. Mail returned for Robert R. Adler due to no longer employed with the firm. (aar)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 1/22/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CONSENT ORDER extending page length. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 1/22/2007. (sjk) (Entered: 01/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 1/22/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING 231 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Belinda L. Williams. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 1/22/2007. (sjk) (Entered: 01/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 1/22/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING 232 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Peter E. Seidman. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 1/22/2007. (sjk) (Entered: 01/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 1/19/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DEPOSITION of ELLIOT J. BLUMBERG taken on 11/27/2006 by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, and James F. McDonald.(sjk) (Entered: 01/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 1/19/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 151 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Cox Affidavit# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7)(Hurd, Susan) (Entered: 01/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 1/19/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE Of Filing Elliot Blumberg Deposition by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald (Hurd, Susan) (Entered: 01/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 1/18/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CONSENT ORDER extending time for response re 151 MOTION to Certify Class to 1/19/2007. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 1/18/2007. (sjk) (Entered: 01/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 1/18/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER for Page Extension. (Hurd, Susan) (Entered: 01/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 1/17/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION for Admission of Peter E. Seidman Pro Hac Viceby Kalford C. Fadem, Pond Equities, Peter Kaltman, Harris Holdings, LLC, Robert A. Rovner, Rochelle Phillips, Lennie W. Bible, Milton Cyntje, Lawrence L. Dieu, Janice E. Dieu, Mary Jo Goolsby, Hugh Petersen, III, Alexander Petersen.Filing Fee received $150.00, Receipt #560446. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(hfm) (Entered: 01/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 1/17/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION for Admission of Belinda L. Williams Pro Hac Viceby Kalford C. Fadem, Pond Equities, Peter Kaltman, Harris Holdings, LLC, Robert A. Rovner, Rochelle Phillips, Lennie W. Bible, Milton Cyntje, Lawrence L. Dieu, Janice E. Dieu, Mary Jo Goolsby, Hugh Petersen, III, Alexander Petersen.Filing Fee received $150.00, Receipt #560447. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(hfm) (Entered: 01/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 1/12/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER For Extension of Time to File Opposition to Class Certification. (Long, Robert) (Entered: 01/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 12/4/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Jack Graeber Notice of Withdrawal (Edelstein, Meryl) (Entered: 12/04/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 11/16/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CONSENT ORDER on Schedule for Class Certification Discovery and Briefing. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 11/15/2006. (sjk) (Entered: 11/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 11/15/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER on Schedule for Class Certification Disocvery and Briefing. (Hurd, Susan) (Entered: 11/15/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 11/10/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE to Take Deposition of Alexander Petersen filed by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald (Hurd, Susan) (Entered: 11/10/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 11/10/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE to Take Deposition of Roger Hale filed by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald (Hurd, Susan) (Entered: 11/10/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 11/10/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE to Take Deposition of Vigilant Investors filed by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald (Hurd, Susan) (Entered: 11/10/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 11/10/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE to Take Deposition of Hugh G. Petersen III filed by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald (Hurd, Susan) (Entered: 11/10/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 11/1/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jack Graeber filed by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald (Hurd, Susan) Modified on 11/2/2006 to correct text to more accurately reflect e-filed document (sjk). (Entered: 11/01/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 10/6/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT on Production of Hard-Copy Documents by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald. (Hurd, Susan) (Entered: 10/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 10/2/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel. Martin D. Chitwood replacing attorney David Andrew Bain. (Chitwood, Martin) (Entered: 10/02/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 9/27/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING 149 Motion to Substitute Party. Hugh Petersen, III, represented by Lauren S. Antonino, Lynn Lincoln Sarko, Martin D. Chitwood, Juli Farris Desper, David Andrew Bain, and Elizabeth A. Leland and Alexander Petersen, represented by Lynn Lincoln Sarko, Juli Farris Desper, Lauren S. Antonino, Martin D. Chitwood, David Andrew Bain, and Elizabeth A. Leland added. Hugh Petersen terminated; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 191 Motion to Compel. Plaintiffs shall file a response to Defendants' request for information concerning proposed representatives' prior experience serving or attempting to serve as Rule 23 class representatives within 10 days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 9/27/2006. (sjk) (Entered: 09/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint STATUS REPORT by Lennie W. Bible, Milton Cyntje, Janice E. Dieu, Lawrence L. Dieu, Kalford C. Fadem, Mary Jo Goolsby, Harris Holdings, LLC, Peter Kaltman, Rochelle Phillips, Pon Equities, Robert A. Rovner Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald. (Hurd, Susan) Modified on 8/18/2006 to correct double wording and to add filers (sjk). (Entered: 08/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Lennie W. Bible, Milton Cyntje, Janice E. Dieu, Lawrence L. Dieu, Kalford C. Fadem, Mary Jo Goolsby, Harris Holdings, LLC, Peter Kaltman, Rochelle Phillips, Pond Equities, and Robert A. Rovner.(Edelstein, Meryl) Modified on 8/18/2006 to correct filer (sjk). (Entered: 08/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT JOINT by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc.. (Hurd, Susan) (Entered: 06/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Amended Certificate of Interested Persons by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc.. (Hurd, Susan) (Entered: 06/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 6/8/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATED ORDER Regarding Inadvertent Production of Privileged Documents. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 6/5/2006. (sjk) (Entered: 06/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 6/6/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by James M. Wilson, Jr on behalf of Jack Graeber (Wilson, James) (Entered: 06/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 5/25/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER Stipulated Order Regarding Inadvertent Production of Privileged Documents. (Hurd, Susan) (Entered: 05/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 4/28/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference Proceedings held on 3/30/2006 before Judge Richard W. Story. Court Reporter: Sharon D. Upchurch. (sjk) (Entered: 04/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER DIRECTING the parties to provide a status report to the Court within 60 days. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 3/30/2006. (sjk) (Entered: 03/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard W. Story : Status Conference held on 3/30/2006. (Court Reporter Sharon Upchurch.)(rag) (Entered: 03/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 3/8/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING 204 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Darren T. Kaplan. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 3/8/2006. (sjk) (Entered: 03/13/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 3/8/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING 205 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Gregory E. Keller. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 3/8/2006. (sjk) (Entered: 03/13/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 3/3/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION for Admission of Gregory E. Keller Pro Hac Viceby Rochelle Phillips.Fee received: $150.00, Receipt #548209. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(sjk) (Entered: 03/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 3/3/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION for Admission of Darren T. Kaplan Pro Hac Viceby Rochelle Phillips.Fee received: $150.00, Receipt #548209. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(sjk) (Entered: 03/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 2/22/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel. Martin D. Chitwood replacing attorney Lauren S. Antonino. (Chitwood, Martin) (Entered: 02/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 2/9/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Status Conference: Status Conference set for 3/30/2006 09:30 AM in Chambers 2121 before Judge Richard W. Story. (rag) (Entered: 02/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 12/22/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER setting Status Conference for 2/3/2006, at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 2105 before Judge Richard W. Story. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 12/22/2005. (sjk) (Entered: 12/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/22/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Submission of 200 Proposed Consent Order to District Judge Richard W. Story. (sjk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 12/21/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER AND SECOND AMENDED RULE 26(f) REPORT ON DISCOVERY SCHEDULE. (Wilcove, Kelly) (Entered: 12/21/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 11/22/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER directing the parties that on or before 12/21/2005, the parties shall report to the Court the Defendants' estimate of the date by which they believe they can substantially complete production of hard-copy documents and electronic data responsive to Plaintiffs' First Set of Document Requests. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 11/22/2005. (sjk) (Entered: 11/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/22/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Submission of 198 Proposed Consent Order to District Judge Richard W. Story. (sjk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 11/21/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER And Amended Rule 26(f) Report on Discovery Schedule. (Wilcove, Kelly) (Entered: 11/21/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 10/17/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald.(Hurd, Susan) (Entered: 10/17/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 10/3/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY BRIEF re 191 MOTION to Compel Responses to Defendants' First Request for Documents and Interrogatories filed by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Wilcove, Kelly) (Entered: 10/03/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/28/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Submission of 191 MOTION to Compel Responses to Defendants' First Request for Documents and Interrogatories to District Judge Richard W. Story. (sjk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 9/19/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE Of Filing Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing Original Discovery by Jack Graeber (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit J# 11 Exhibit K# 12 Exhibit L)(Harley, Craig) (Entered: 09/19/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 9/19/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 191 MOTION to Compel Responses to Defendants' First Request for Documents and Interrogatories Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel Discovery in Connection with Plaintiffs' Proposed Class Certification filed by Jack Graeber. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Harley, Craig) (Entered: 09/19/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 9/12/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Jack Graeber of Discovery Relating to Plaintiffs' Third Request for the Prodcution of Documents (Harley, Craig) (Entered: 09/12/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 9/2/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE Of Filing Original Discovery and Request for Plaintiffs to File Original Discovery by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit J# 11 Exhibit K# 12 Exhibit L)(Wilcove, Kelly) (Entered: 09/02/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 9/2/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Compel Responses to Defendants' First Request for Documents and Interrogatories by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip, James F. McDonald. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel FILED UNDER SEAL # 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit D# 6 Exhibit E# 7 Exhibit F# 8 Exhibit G# 9 Exhibit H# 10 Exhibit I)(Wilcove, Kelly) Modified on 9/6/2005 to correct double wording and to indicate that Memorandum of Law was filed under seal (sjk). Modified on 12/11/2006 to attach sealed documents. (dfb) (Entered: 09/02/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 8/19/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER giving the parties 3 months from the date of this Report to report back to the Court regarding the discovery schedule in this case. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 8/19/2005. (sjk) (Entered: 08/19/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 8/19/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CONSENT ORDER regarding case deadlines. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 8/19/2005. (sjk) (Entered: 08/19/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/19/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Submission of 186 Proposed Consent Order and 188 Proposed Consent Order to District Judge Richard W. Story. (sjk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 8/18/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER and Rule 26(f) Report on Discovery Schedule. (Baker, Irene) (Entered: 08/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 8/17/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF REQUIREMENT TO FILE ELECTRONICALLY pursuant to Standing Order 04-01 as to Craig Gordon Harley and Oscar N. Persons. (sjk) (Entered: 08/17/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 8/17/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER. (sjk) (Entered: 08/17/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 7/13/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jack Graeber of Discovery (Edelstein, Meryl) (Entered: 07/13/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 7/13/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jack Graeber of Discovery (Edelstein, Meryl) (Entered: 07/13/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 7/5/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Vigilant Investors' L.P.'s Answers to Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Vigilant Investors and Plaintiff's Verification (Edelstein, Meryl) (Entered: 07/05/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 7/5/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Vigilant Investors' L.P.'s Answers to Defendants' First Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff Vigilant Investors (Edelstein, Meryl) (Entered: 07/05/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 7/5/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Alexander Petersen's Answers to Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Alexander Petersen and Plaintiff's Verification (Edelstein, Meryl) (Entered: 07/05/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 7/5/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Alexander Petersen's Answers to Defendants' First Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff Alexander Petersen (Edelstein, Meryl) (Entered: 07/05/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 7/5/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Hugh G. Petersen III's Answers to Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Hugh G. Petersen III and Plaintiff's Verification (Edelstein, Meryl) (Entered: 07/05/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 7/5/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Hugh G. Petersen III's Answers to Defendants' First Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff Hugh G. Petersen III (Edelstein, Meryl) (Entered: 07/05/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 7/5/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Jack Graeber Answer to Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Jack Graeber and Plaintiff's Verification (Edelstein, Meryl) (Entered: 07/05/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 7/5/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Jack Graeber's Answers to Defendants' First Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff Jack Graeber (Edelstein, Meryl) (Entered: 07/05/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 7/5/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Sam Harris' Answers to Defendants' First Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff Sam Harris (Edelstein, Meryl) (Entered: 07/05/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 7/5/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Sam Harris' Answers to Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Sam Harris and Plaintiff's Verification (Edelstein, Meryl) (Entered: 07/05/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 7/5/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Sam Harris' Answers to Defendants' First Seet of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Sam Harris and Plaintiff's Verification (Edelstein, Meryl) (Entered: 07/05/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 6/22/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CONSENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 6/22/05. (rag) (Entered: 06/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/21/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Submission of 171 Proposed Consent Order, submitted to District Judge Richard W. Story. (dcs)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 6/20/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER. (dcs) (Entered: 06/21/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 5/27/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 111 Motion to Compel and GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 130 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 5/27/2005. (sjk) (Entered: 05/31/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 5/24/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Irene E. Baker on behalf of Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip and James F. McDonald. (sjk) (Entered: 05/24/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 5/24/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly C. Wilcove on behalf of Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip and James F. McDonald. (sjk) (Entered: 05/24/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 5/20/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc. of Service of Discovery to Vigilant Investors (Baker, Irene) (Entered: 05/20/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 5/20/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc. of Service of Discovery to Sam Harris (Baker, Irene) (Entered: 05/20/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 5/20/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc. of Service of Discovery to Roger Hale (Baker, Irene) (Entered: 05/20/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 5/20/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc. of Service of Discovery to Jack Graeber (Baker, Irene) (Entered: 05/20/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 5/20/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc. of Service of Discovery to Hugh Petersen III (Baker, Irene) (Entered: 05/20/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 5/20/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc. of Service of Discovery to Alexander Petersen (Baker, Irene) (Entered: 05/20/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 5/18/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 157 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Robert R. Adler. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 5/18/2005. (sjk) (Entered: 05/19/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 5/17/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing Redacted Version of 153 Reply Brief in Support of their Cross-Motion for Protective Order by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip and James F. McDonald. (sjk) (Entered: 05/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/5/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Submission of 149 MOTION to Substitute Party Hugh Petersen, Jr. and 151 MOTION to Certify Class to District Judge Richard W. Story. (sjk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 5/3/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing 158 (Redacted) Reply Brief in Support of 111 Motion to Compel and in Opposition to 130 Cross-Motion for a Protective Order by Kalford C. Fadem, Pond Equities, Peter Kaltman, Harris Holdings, LLC, Robert A. Rovner, Rochelle Phillips, Lennie W. Bible, Milton Cyntje, Lawrence L. Dieu, Janice E. Dieu, and Mary Jo Goolsby. (sjk) (Entered: 05/04/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 5/3/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY BRIEF in Support of their 111 First MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and in Opposition to 130 CROSS-MOTION for Protective Order filed by Kalford C. Fadem, Pond Equities, Peter Kaltman, Harris Holdings, LLC, Robert A. Rovner, Rochelle Phillips, Lennie W. Bible, Milton Cyntje, Lawrence L. Dieu, Janice E. Dieu and Mary Jo Goolsby. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, and # 5 Exhibit E)(sjk) (Entered: 05/04/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION for Admission of Robert R. Adler Pro Hac Viceby Kalford C. Fadem, Pond Equities, Peter Kaltman, Harris Holdings, LLC, Robert A. Rovner, Rochelle Phillips, Lennie W. Bible, Milton Cyntje, Lawrence L. Dieu, Janice E. Dieu and Mary Jo Goolsby.Filing Fee received: $150.00; Receipt #536377. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(sjk) (Entered: 05/03/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 4/26/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING 155 Emergency Motion to Seal 153 Reply Brief. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 4/26/2005. (sjk) (Entered: 04/26/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 4/25/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EMERGENCY MOTION to Seal 153 Reply Brief by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip and James F. McDonald. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(sjk) (Entered: 04/26/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 4/25/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CONSENT ORDER allowing Defendants up to 25 pages in their Reply in Support of 130 CROSS-MOTION for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 4/25/2005. (sjk) (Entered: 04/26/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 4/22/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY in Support of 130 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip and James F. McDonald. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B and # 3 Certificate of Service)(sjk) Modified on 4/26/2005 to restrict viewing privileges (sjk). Modified on 4/26/2005 (sjk). (---FILED UNDER SEAL---) (Entered: 04/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 4/21/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER re: 111 First MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and 130 CROSS-MOTION for Protective Order. (sjk) (Entered: 04/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 4/15/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Certify Class with Brief In Support by Jack Graeber. (Attachments: # 1 Brief # 2 Exhibit A to Brief# 3 Errata B to Brief# 4 Exhibit C to Brief# 5 Exhibit D to Brief# 6 Exhibit E to Brief# 7 Exhibit F to Brief)(Harley, Craig) (Entered: 04/15/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 4/15/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Hugh Petersen, Jr. by Jack Graeber. (Harley, Craig) (Entered: 04/15/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 4/15/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Substitute Party Hugh Petersen, Jr. with Brief In Support by Jack Graeber. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Harley, Craig) (Entered: 04/15/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 4/15/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING 146 Motion for Extension of Time to provide privilege designations in accordance with 100 Order. Defendants shall serve their privilege designations by 5/3/2005. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 4/15/2005. (sjk) (Entered: 04/15/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 4/14/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Motion re 146 MOTION for Extension of Time to provide privilege designations re: 100 Order on Motion for Protective Order, Order on Motion to Quash, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,,,,, Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time filed by Jack Graeber. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Harley, Craig) (Entered: 04/14/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 4/13/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to provide privilege designations in accordance with 100 Order by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip and James F. McDonald. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order and # 2 Exhibit B)(sjk) (Entered: 04/14/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 4/6/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Change of FIRM Name for Meryl W. Edelstein, counsel for Rochelle Phillips (Edelstein, Meryl) Modified on 4/7/2005 to correct attorney's entry(cdg). (Entered: 04/06/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 4/5/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY BRIEF in Support of their 111 MOTION to Compel Production and in Opposition to 130 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Kalford C. Fadem, Pond Equities, Peter Kaltman, Harris Holdings, LLC, Robert A. Rovner, Rochelle Phillips, Lennie W. Bible, Milton Cyntje, Lawrence L. Dieu, Janice E. Dieu and Mary Jo Goolsby. (---FILED UNDER SEAL---) (sjk) (Entered: 04/06/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 4/5/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE Of Filing Under Seal Plaintiffs' Reply Brief in Support of their Motion to Compel and Opposition to Defendants' Cross-Motion for a Protective Order by Kalford C. Fadem, Pond Equities, Peter Kaltman, Harris Holdings, LLC, Robert A. Rovner, Rochelle Phillips, Lennie W. Bible, Milton Cyntje, Lawrence L. Dieu, Janice E. Dieu and Mary Jo Goolsby. (sjk) (Entered: 04/06/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 4/5/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Howard K. Coates, Jr. re 135 Order on Motion for Extension of Time. (sjk) (Entered: 04/06/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/4/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Submission of 130 MOTION for Protective Order to District Judge Richard W. Story. (sjk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 3/29/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE Of Filing Redacted Version of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' 111 Motion to Compel and (in support of) 130 Cross-Motion for Protective Order by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip and James F. McDonald. (Attachments: # 1 Redacted Opposition, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C and # 5 Exhibit D)(sjk) (Entered: 04/04/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 3/28/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Curtis V. Trinko re 135 Order on Motion for Extension of Time. (sjk) (Entered: 04/04/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 3/25/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Kalford C. Fadem, Pond Equities, Peter Kaltman, Harris Holdings, LLC, Robert A. Rovner, Rochelle Phillips, Lennie W. Bible, Milton Cyntje, Lawrence L. Dieu, Janice E. Dieu and Mary Jo Goolsby. (sjk) (Entered: 03/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 3/22/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY filed by Kalford C. Fadem, Pond Equities, Peter Kaltman, Harris Holdings, LLC, Robert A. Rovner, Rochelle Phillips, Lennie W. Bible, Milton Cyntje, Lawrence L. Dieu, Janice E. Dieu and Mary Jo Goolsby (epm) (Entered: 03/23/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 3/21/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to CURTIS V. TRINKO; re 126 Proposed/Consent Order (epm) (Entered: 03/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 3/17/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to HOWARD K. COATES JR. re 127 Order (epm) (Entered: 03/21/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 3/17/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting Defendants' 134 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall serve their privilege designations re: the paper production made to date by E&Y and a related privilege log by March 24, 2005 and shall serve their privilege designations and related log entries for the electronic files received to date from E&Y by March 31, 2005. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 03/17/05. (dfb) (Entered: 03/17/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 3/16/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time in which to provide their priveledge designations associated with the production of documents from third-party Ernst & Young LLC with Proposed Order filed by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip and James F. McDonald. (epm) (Entered: 03/17/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 3/10/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY filed by Kalford C. Fadem, Pond Equities, Peter Kaltman, Harris Holdings, LLC, Robert A. Rovner, Rochelle Phillips, Lennie W. Bible, Milton Cyntje, Lawrence L. Dieu, Janice E. Dieu and Mary Jo Goolsby (epm) (Entered: 03/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 3/8/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to CURTIS V. TRINKO; re 125 Order (epm) (Entered: 03/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 3/8/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CROSS-MOTION for Protective Order filed by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip and James F. McDonald. (--FILED UNDER SEAL--) (epm) Modified on 3/9/2005 to note document sealed (epm). (Entered: 03/09/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 3/8/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition to 111 First MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., Wallace G. Haislip and James F. McDonald. (--FILED UNDER SEAL--)(epm) Modified on 3/9/2005 to note document sealed (epm). (Entered: 03/09/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 3/8/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING 126 Proposed Amended Consent Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 3/8/05. (epm) (Entered: 03/09/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 3/7/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to HOWARD K. COATES JR.; re 125 Order (epm) (Entered: 03/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 3/1/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to CURTIS V. TRINKO re 122 Order, (epm) (Entered: 03/09/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 2/25/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROPOSED AMENDED CONSENT SCHEDULING ORDER. (epm) (Entered: 03/01/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 2/24/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING 123 Proposed/Consent Order. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 2/24/05. (epm) (Entered: 02/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)