Clark v. Universal Debt Solutions, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-00183
District Judge ALAN C KAY, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 14, 2019 at 3:21 PM ST (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Universal Debt Solutions, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY David C Farmer +1 808 222 3133 +1 866 559 2922 farmerd001@hawaii.rr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Universal Debt Solutions, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Universal Debt Solutions, Inc.
No Logo Judith Clark, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by 41B Kepola Pl

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY John Harris Paer
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1692
Nature of Suit 480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/25/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Mail Returned as Undeliverable - as to Universal Debt Solutions re 23 . (eps ) (Entered: 09/25/2009)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/8/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    ORDER ADOPTING REPORT OF SPECIAL MASTER 22 .. Signed by JUDGE ALAN C KAY. (eps ) -- "Amended Report of Special Master on Plaintiff's Motion For Award of Supplemental Attorneys' Fees and Expenses" are adopted as the opinion and order of this court. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 09/08/2009)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/11/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - 22 AMENDED REPORT OF SPECIAL MASTER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR AWARD OF SUPPLEMENTAL ATTORNEYS' FEES AND EXPENSES has been served by First Class Mail on 08/11/2009 and Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (eps )
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/11/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        AMENDED REPORT OF SPECIAL MASTER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR AWARD OF SUPPLEMENTAL ATTORNEYS' FEES AND EXPENSES 21 ; 14 . Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E KOBAYASHI. (eps )-- Plaintiff's Motion is HEREBY GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The Court recommends that the district judge award Plaintiff $16,438.24 in attorneys' fees and $440.24 in costs, for a total award of $16,878.48. (Entered: 08/11/2009)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/11/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - 21 REPORT OF SPECIAL MASTER ON PLAINTIFF'SMOTION FOR AWARD OF SUPPLEMENTAL ATTORNEYS' FEES AND EXPENSES has been served by First Class Mail on 8/11/09. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (eps )
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/11/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            REPORT OF SPECIAL MASTER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR AWARD OF SUPPLEMENTAL ATTORNEYS' FEES AND EXPENSES re 14 . Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E KOBAYASHI. (eps )-- The Court therefore RECOMMENDS that the district court tax costs against Defendant and for Plaintiff in the amount of $440.24. Plaintiff's Motion is HEREBY GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The Court recommends that the district judge award Plaintiff $16,438.24 in attorneys' fees and $440.24 in costs, for a total award of $16,878.48. (Entered: 08/11/2009)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/7/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Mail Returned - "Return to Sender. Not at this Address." Mail sent to Universal Debt Solutions, Inc. - EO of 12/3/08: re Motions taken under advisement; sent out by Magistrate courtroom manager. (ecs, ) (Entered: 01/07/2009)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/29/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Plaintiff's REPLY MEMORANDUM in Support of 14 MOTION for Award of Supplemental Attorney Fees and Expenses; Certificate of Service - filed by Judith Clark. (emt, ) (Entered: 12/30/2008)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  CORRECTIVE ENTRY. The entry docket number 17 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Universal Debt Solutions, Inc. was filed incorrectly in this case. The Exhibits were NOT entered as separate PDF attachments. The filing party is cautioned to make entries correctly in future submission, e.g., all parts of a submission shall articulated as separate PDF attachments. No action is required this time. (gls, )
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/19/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Universal Debt Solutions, Inc. re 17 Response in Opposition to Motion (Farmer, David) (Entered: 12/19/2008)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/19/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 14 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Universal Debt Solutions, Inc.. (Farmer, David) (Entered: 12/19/2008)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        STATEMENT of Consultation re 14 filed by Judith Clark. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Certificate of Service)(eps ) (Entered: 12/15/2008)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/3/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          EO: COURT'S ORDER RE: filing deadlines Re: 14 MOTION for Supplemental Attorney Fees and Expenses. Motions Taken Under Advisement: 14 MOTION for Attorney Fees. (JUDGE LESLIE E KOBAYASHI)(wnn, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 12/03/2008)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/2/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            MOTION for Award Of Supplemental Attorney Fees and Expenses -- John Harris Paer appearing for Plaintiff Judith Clark (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Affidavit of Robert N Dockson, # 3 Affidavit of Beth S Reeves, # 4 Affidavit of Karen Wildau, # 5 Declaration of John Harris Paer, # 6 Certificate of Service)(eps ) (Entered: 12/03/2008)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/20/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of 13 Judgment, has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record of John Harris Paer and Universal Debt Solutions on 8/20/2007. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (gab, )
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/20/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                JUDGMENT in favor of Judith Clark against Universal Debt Solutions, Inc. in the amount of $12,000.00 damages together with reasonable attorneys fees of $7,993.83 together with costs of Court in the amount of $350.00, for a total of $20,343.83. (gab, ) (Entered: 08/20/2007)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/16/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of 12 Order on Findings and Recommendations has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record of John Harris Paer and Universal Debt Solutions on 8/16/2007. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (gab, )
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/16/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    ORDER adopting Magistrate's 11 Findings and Recommendations.. Signed by Judge ALAN C KAY on 08/16/2007. (gab, ) (Entered: 08/16/2007)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - 11 Findings and Recommendation, has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record on 7/24/07. (eps )
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT re 6 . Signed by Judge LESLIE E KOBAYASHI on 7/24/07. (eps ) -- Thus, this Court recommends that Plaintiff be awarded judgment in the amount of $12,000.00 damages together with reasonable attorneys fees of $7,993.83 together with costs of Court in the amount of $350.00, for a total of $20,343.83. (Entered: 07/24/2007)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Declaration of John Harris Paer re 9 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(eps ) (Entered: 07/09/2007)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            EP: Motion Hearing held on 7/6/2007 re 6 MOTION for Default Judgment as to filed by Judith Clark. Motions terminated: 6 MOTION for Default Judgment as to filed by Judith Clark. (Court Reporter FTR-Courtroom 7) (Judge LESLIE E KOBAYASHI )(wnn, ) (Entered: 07/06/2007)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/5/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              EO: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 7/2/2007 at 09:00 AM before JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI is Vacated. (Judge LESLIE E KOBAYASHI )(wnn, ) (Entered: 06/05/2007)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/5/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 6 MOTION for Default Judgment as to : Motion Hearing set for 7/6/2007 at 09:00 AM before JUDGE LESLIE E KOBAYASHI. (wnn, ) (Entered: 06/05/2007)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  (Notice of Motion); MOTION for Default Judgment as to by Judith Clark. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support# 2 Declaration of Judith Clark # 3 Declaration of John Harris Paer # 4 Exhibit A# 5 Exhibit B# 6 Certificate of Service)(eps ) (Entered: 06/04/2007)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/15/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    REQUEST For Entry of Default; (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of John Harris Paer # 2 ENTRY of DEFAULT) (eps ) (Entered: 05/16/2007)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/15/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed via Certified Mail on 4/4/07 by Judith Clark. Universal Debt Solutions, Inc. served on 4/13/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(eps ) (Entered: 05/16/2007)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/4/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        Filing fee: $ 350.00, receipt number 238979 (eps ) (Entered: 04/05/2007)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/4/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                          Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00AM on 7/2/2007 before JUDGE LESLIE E KOBAYASHI.. by Judge HELEN GILLMOR. (eps ) (Entered: 04/05/2007)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/4/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            COMPLAINT against Universal Debt Solutions, Inc. (Filing fee $ 350.) filed by Judith Clark. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Summons# 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(eps ) (Entered: 04/05/2007)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                              Statistics

                                                              This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                              Space
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                               
                                                              PlainSite
                                                              Sign Up
                                                              Need Password Help?