IPS Ltd v. Aviza Technology Inc
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:06-cv-02200
District Judge Jacqueline H. Nguyen, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 14, 2019 at 7:53 PM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Ips Ltd., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bird, Marella, Boxer, Wolpert, Nessim, Drooks & Lincenberg

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Thomas R Freeman +1 310 201 2100 trf@birdmarella.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Thomas V Reichert +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 tvr@birdmarella.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Ekwan E Rhow +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 erhow@birdmarella.com
v.
No Logo Aviza Technology, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Carr, McClellan, Ingersoll, Thompson & Horn, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY John D. Minton +1 650 342 9600 +1 650 342 7685 jminton@carr-mcclellan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Charles S. Crompton, III +1 415 391 0600 +1 415 395 8095 charles.crompton@lw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Matthew Rawlinson +1 650 463 3076 +1 650 463 2600 matt.rawlinson@lw.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 370 - Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
  Entries (72) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 5/24/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER DISMISSING THE CASE WITH PREJUDICE by Judge Jacqueline H. Nguyen: re Stipulation to Dismiss Case 68 . In accordance with a stipulation by the parties, this Court hereby DISMISSES this action with prejudice. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (ama) (Entered: 05/24/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 5/23/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to settlement filed by Plaintiff IPS Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Dismissing the Case With Prejudice)(Rhow, Ekwan) (Entered: 05/23/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      STATUS REPORT filed by Plaintiff IPS Ltd. (Reichert, Thomas) (Entered: 02/03/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 8/24/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        IN CHAMBERS MINUTE ORDER by Judge Jacqueline H. Nguyen: re Status Report 65 . The Court has reviewed the Plaintiff's Response to the Order to Show Cause ("OSC") filed on August 17, 2010. The OSC is discharged.Plaintiff is ordered to file another status report in six (6) months regarding the status of the case and the bankruptcy proceedings.IT IS SO ORDERED. (ama) (Entered: 08/24/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 8/17/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          STATUS REPORT and Response re OSC filed by Plaintiff IPS Ltd. (Reichert, Thomas) (Entered: 08/17/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 8/12/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SANCTIONS by Judge Jacqueline H. Nguyen: re Minutes of In Chambers Order, 62 . The Court, on its own motion, ORDERS that counsel for plaintiff show cause in writing on or before August 26, 2010, why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to comply with the Court's Order. The Court will consider the filing of the following, on or before the above date, as an appropriate response to this Order to Show Cause: six-month status report pursuant to the Courts Order filed on January 22, 2010 62 . (ama) (Entered: 08/12/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/11/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              SEMI-ANNUAL REPORT of Status Of Arbitration filed by Plaintiff IPS Ltd. (Reichert, Thomas) (Entered: 02/11/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 1/22/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER ON TRANSFER OF CASE TO JUDGE NGUYEN and ORDER RE STATUS by Judge Jacqueline H. Nguyen: re Transferred Case, 61 . This action has been reassigned to the HONORABLE JACQUELINE H. NGUYEN, United States District Judge. Please substitute the initials JHN in place of the initials FMC. The case number will now read: 2:06-cv-02200-JHN-JWJx. Henceforth, it is imperative that the initials JHN be used on all documents to prevent any delays in processing of documents. Judge Nguyen's courtroom deputy clerk is Alicia Mamer and can be reached at (213) 894-2554. Judge Nguyen's courtroom is located on the 16th floor of the Spring Steet Courthouse, Courtroom # 1600. Additional information about Judge Nguyen's procedures will soon be available on her website profile ( at www.cacd.uscourts.gov). The Court hereby advises that this Court will maintain the report schedule previously set. The six-month status report is now past due; please file the report forthwith. (ama) (Entered: 01/22/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/16/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#09-074) approved by Acting Chief Judge George H. King. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDER of Judge Jacqueline Hong-Ngoc Nguyen and with the concurrence of the Case Management and Assignment Committee, this case is transferred from Judge Florence-Marie Cooper to the calendar of Judge Jacqueline H. Nguyen for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge CV 06-02200 JHN(JWJx). (sn) (Entered: 12/23/2009)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/1/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. COrrect event to be used is: Service Documents - Service of Subsequent documents select Proof of Service RE: Miscellaneous Document 59 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (shb) (Entered: 07/02/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/30/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff IPS Ltd (Reichert, Thomas) (Entered: 06/30/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/30/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        STATUS REPORT SEMI-ANNUAL filed by Plaintiff IPS Ltd. (Reichert, Thomas) (Entered: 06/30/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/12/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          NOTICE OF FILING BANKRUPTCY filed by Defendant Aviza Technology Inc. as to Aviza Technology, Inc., Bankruptcy Court case number 09-54511. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Minton, John) (Entered: 06/12/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/12/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            NOTICE OF FILING BANKRUPTCY filed by Defendant Aviza Technology Inc. as to Aviza Technology, Inc., Bankruptcy Court case number 09-54511. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Minton, John) (Entered: 06/12/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              STATUS REPORT Semi-Annual Report to Court Re: Status filed by Plaintiff IPS Ltd. (Reichert, Thomas) (Entered: 12/17/2008)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: your account information (new firm name and address) was not updated in the ECF system RE: Notice of Change of Address, 53 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (vh) (Entered: 08/21/2008)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  NOTICE of Change of Address by John D Minton attorney for Defendant Aviza Technology Inc, changing John D. Minton's address and firm name to Carr, McClellan, Ingersoll, Thompson & Horn Professional Law Corporation, 216 Park Road, Burlingame, CA 94010. Filed by Attorney for Defendant John D. Minton (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Minton, John) (Entered: 08/21/2008)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    STATUS REPORT re Status of Arbitration filed by Plaintiff IPS Ltd. (Reichert, Thomas) (Entered: 08/12/2008)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re SANCTIONS by Judge Florence-Marie Cooper: Response to Order to Show Cause due by 8/22/2008. (ama) (Entered: 08/08/2008)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION 40 by Judge Florence-Marie Cooper: SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (csl) (Entered: 12/21/2007)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          SECOND SEMI-ANNUAL STATUS REPORT filed by Plaintiff IPS Ltd. (se) (Entered: 11/27/2007)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Plaintiff's REPLY in Support of it's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction 40 ; DECLARATIONS of Ekwan E. Rhow and Chuck Kim, filed by Plaintiff IPS, Ltd. (bho) (Entered: 09/28/2007)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              DECLARATION of (1) John D. Minton (2) Jerauld Cutini (3) Craig Bercaw in Support of Aviza Technoloy, Inc.'s Opposition to IPS, LTD.'S MOTION for Preliminary Injunction 40 filed by Defendant Aviza Technology Inc. (mgra) (Entered: 09/25/2007)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                PROOF OF SERVICE of Aviza Technology, Inc.'s Opposition to IPS, LTD.'s Application for Preliminary Injunction and Accompany Documents re Motion Related Document 45, EX PARTE APPLICATION for Preliminary Injunction 44 (see document for further details) filed by defendant Aviza Technology Inc. served on 9/17/2007. (mgra) (Entered: 09/24/2007)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  AVIZA TECHNOLOGY, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO IPS, LTD.'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION re MOTION for Preliminary Injunction 40 filed by Defendant Aviza Technology Inc. (mgra) (Entered: 09/24/2007)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER DENYING EX PARTE APPLICATION by Judge Florence-Marie Cooper: re MOTION for Preliminary Injunction 40 . The Court has read and considered Defendant's Ex Parte Application to Remove from the Court's calendar Plaintiff's Application for Preliminary Injunction (docket #40), together with Plaintiff's Opposition thereto. Defendant's Application is DENIED.(ama) (Entered: 09/17/2007)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/13/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      PLAINTIFF IPS, LTD'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE REQUEST TO REMOVE FROM CALENDAR IPS, LTD'S APPLICATION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by Plaintiff IPS Ltd. (sd) (Entered: 09/14/2007)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        AVIZA TECHNOLOGY, INC.'S EX PARTE REQUEST TO REMOVE FROM CALENDAR IPS, LTD.'S APPLICATION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; DECLARATION OF JOHN D. MINTON filed by DEFENDANT Aviza Technology Inc.(sd) (Entered: 09/17/2007)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/7/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          DECLARATION of WILL KAO, CHARLES KIM, S.I. LEE, KARL MARKET, JEREMY MONTES, TODD NORDSTROM, SEUNG-GYUN PARK, AND BOB TANG IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF IPS, LTD.'S MOTION for Preliminary Injunction 40 filed by Plaintiff IPS Ltd. (sd) (Entered: 09/12/2007)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/7/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction; MEMORNADUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed by PLAINTIFF IPS Ltd.Motion set for hearing on 10/1/2007 at 10:00 AM before Judge Florence-Marie Cooper. (sd) (Entered: 09/12/2007)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              SIX MONTH STATUS REPORT on status of arbitration proceedings filed by Plaintiff IPS Ltd. (bp, ) (Entered: 05/24/2007)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/11/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re SANCTIONS by Judge Florence-Marie Cooper :The Court, on its own motion, ORDERS that counsel for plaintiff show cause in writing on or before May 25, 2007, why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to comply with the Court's Minutes of October 23, 2006. The Court will consider the filing of the following, on or before the above date, as an appropriate response to this Order to Show Cause: -6-month status report. Pursuant to Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 7.11, oral argument will not be heard in this matter unless so ordered by the Court. The Order to Show Cause will stand submitted upon the filing of counsel's response. Failure to respond to the Court's order may result in the dismissal of the action. (ama, ) (Entered: 05/11/2007)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  NOTICE of arbitration demand filed by defendant Aviza Technology Inc. (bp, ) (Entered: 11/03/2006)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/23/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                    MINUTES OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge Florence-Marie Cooper: The Court conferred with counsel for a scheduling conference. The Court was advised that Judge Ware, in the Northern District of California, has issued an order granting defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration and has instructed the arbitrator to determine which of plaintiff's claims are subject to arbitration. Defendant was directed by this Court to file a Demand for Arbitration no later than November 2, 2006, and to notify the Court that it has been filed. This matter is STAYED, pending a determination of arbitrability by the arbitrator. The Court hereby orders counsel for plaintiff to file a status report forthwith and every 6 months, thereafter, until a request or motion to lift stay is filed. (ama, ) (Entered: 10/24/2006)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/13/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                      MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER RESETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Florence-Marie Cooper : The Court has received the ADR Pilot Program Questionnaire, filed on October 12, 2006. Accordingly, the Scheduling Conference is hereby reset on October 23, 2006 at 9:00 a.m. (ama, ) (Entered: 10/13/2006)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/12/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        ADR PILOT PROGRAM QUESTIONNAIRE filed by attorney Matthew Rawlinson, Thomas V Reichert on behalf of Plaintiff IPS Ltd, Defendant Aviza Technology Inc.(bp, ) (Entered: 10/13/2006)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                          MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Florence-Marie Cooper: The Court has not received the ADR Questionnaire. Accordingly, the Scheduling Conference date of September 11, 2006 is hereby VACATED. It shall be reset upon the filing of that item. Counsel are ORDERED to file same no later than October 12, 2006. (ama, ) (Entered: 09/06/2006)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/1/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan filed; estimated length of trial 14-days. (bp, ) (Entered: 09/05/2006)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/8/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              NOTICE of decision filed by defendant Aviza Technology Inc. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/10/2006)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/20/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER Denying plaintiff IPS' motion for early discovery by Judge Jeffrey W. Johnson, re MOTION for Discovery 10 (bp, ) (Entered: 07/24/2006)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Aviza Technology Inc, re Declaration (non-motion) 28, was served on 7/7/06. (bp, ) (Entered: 07/17/2006)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    DECLARATION of John D. Minton regarding proposed order denying plaintiff IPS' motion for early discovery filed by Defendant Aviza Technology Inc. (bp, ) (Entered: 07/17/2006)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                      MINUTES: This court hereby sets a scheduling conference pursuant to Rule 16, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, on 9/11/06 at 9:00 a.m. Judge Florence-Marie Cooper.Court Reporter: Not present. (bp, ) (Entered: 07/10/2006)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) 1 with JURY DEMAND filed by defendant Aviza Technology Inc.(bp, ) (Entered: 07/03/2006)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Aviza Technology Inc, re REQUEST for Order for status conference 26, was served on 6/29/06. (bp, ) (Entered: 07/11/2006)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            REQUEST for status conference filed by defendant Aviza Technology Inc. (bp, ) (Entered: 07/11/2006)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                              MINUTES: The court has read and considered plaintiff's request for forthwith status conference. The request is DENIED. It appears to the court that defendant's petition to compel arbitration in the Northern District of California, Case No. CV06-80109, is fully briefed. The court will await the ruling on that motion before scheduling a status conference in the instant matter. Judge Florence-Marie Cooper :Court Reporter: Not present. (bp, ) (Entered: 06/30/2006)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                MINUTES: Plaintiff's motion for early expedited discovery. The court confers with counsel and counsel argue. The court DENIES the plaintiff's motion for early expedited discovery. Counsel for defendant shall submit a proposed order, memoralizing the court's ruling, within seven (7) days of the date of this hearing. Judge Florence-Marie Cooper :Court Reporter: Jennifer Lewis. (bp, ) (Entered: 06/30/2006)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/28/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  REQUEST for forthwith status conference filed by plaintiff IPS Ltd. (bp, ) (Entered: 07/11/2006)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/19/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    PLACED IN FILE - NOT USED re settlement agreement submitted by plaintiff IPS Ltd. (bp, )
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/19/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      PLACED IN FILE - NOT USED re proposed order submitted by plaintiff IPS Ltd. (bp, )
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/19/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                        MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER DENYING APPLICATION by Judge Florence-Marie Cooper: The Court has read and considered plaintiff's Application to File Settlement Agreement Under Seal. No good cause having been shown, the Application is DENIED. (ama, ) (Entered: 06/19/2006)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          IPS' SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF ON ITS MOTION for Discovery 10 filed by plaintiffs' IPS Ltd. (bp, ) (Entered: 06/22/2006)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            OBJECTION to Aviza's citation of unpublished opinion in violation of circuit rule 36-3 filed by Plaintiff IPS Ltd. (bp, ) (Entered: 06/22/2006)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff IPS Ltd, objection to Aviza's citation of unpublished opinion, etc., was served on 6/15/06. (bp, ) (Entered: 06/22/2006)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/15/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                RESPONSE IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to Seal 13 filed by defendant Aviza Technology Inc. (bp, ) (Entered: 06/19/2006)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/15/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS by Judge Florence-Marie Cooper: re MOTION to Stay Case 7 . The Court has read and considered the moving, opposition, and reply documents filed in connection with this motion. The Court deems the matter appropriate for decision without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing set for June 19, 2006, is removed from the Court's calendar. For the reasons set forth, the Court DENIES Defendant's Motion.(ama, ) (Entered: 06/15/2006)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION to Stay Case 7 filed by defendant Aviza Technology Inc. (bp, ) (Entered: 06/15/2006)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/5/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      APPLICATION to file settlement agreement under seal filed by plaintiff IPS Ltd. Lodged proposed order and settlement agreement under seal. (bp, ) (Entered: 06/08/2006)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/5/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        OPPOSITION to MOTION to Stay Case 7 filed by plaintiff IPS Ltd. (bp, ) (Entered: 06/08/2006)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/2/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          JOINT STIPULATION ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION for Discovery 10 filed by defendant Aviza Technology Inc. (bp, ) (Entered: 06/05/2006)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/2/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Early and Expedited Discovery filed by plaintiff IPS Ltd. Motion set for hearing on 6/29/2006 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey W. Johnson. (bp, ) (Entered: 06/05/2006)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/23/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Aviza Technology Inc, re Declaration (Motion related) 8, MOTION to Stay Case 7, was served on 5/22/06. (bp, ) (Entered: 05/24/2006)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/23/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of John D. Minton in support of MOTION to Stay Case 7 filed by defendant Aviza Technology Inc. (bp, ) (Entered: 05/24/2006)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/23/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay proceedings filed by defendant Aviza Technology Inc. Motion set for hearing on 6/19/2006 at 10:00 AM before Judge Florence-Marie Cooper. (bp, ) (Entered: 05/24/2006)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/3/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    FIRST STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint. Aviza Technology Inc answer due 5/24/2006. filed by defendant Aviza Technology Inc. (bp, ) (Entered: 05/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/3/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by plaintiff IPS Ltd, upon Aviza Technology Inc served on 4/13/2006, answer due 5/3/2006. The Summons and Complaint were served by personal service, by federal statute, upon Subrata Chatterji, vice president. Due Dilligence declaration not attached. Original Summons not returned. (bp, ) (Entered: 05/04/2006)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/3/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Aviza Technology Inc. (bp, ) (Entered: 05/04/2006)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/11/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE TO PARTIES OF ADR PILOT PROGRAM filed.(rrey, ) (Entered: 04/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/11/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff IPS Ltd. (rrey, ) (Entered: 04/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/11/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              20 Day Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 as to Aviza Technology Inc. (rrey, )
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/11/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT against defendant Aviza Technology Inc.(Filing fee $ 350) Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff IPS Ltd.(rrey, ) (Entered: 04/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?