Time Warner Cable Inc. v. City of Minneapolis
Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:06-cv-00484-MJD-AJB

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 14, 2019 at 8:19 PM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2201
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (3) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/27/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASE(Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Michael J Davis on 07/27/2006. (SMS)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/2/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER denying 7 Motion to Dismiss (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Michael J Davis on 06/02/2006. (SMS)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/2/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER granting 14 Motion for Permanent Injunction Against Retaliation (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Michael J Davis on 06/02/2006. (SMS)
        Request RequestSpace LREF

        Statistics

        This case has been viewed 0 times.

        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
        Space
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
         
        PlainSite
        Sign Up
        Need Password Help?