Reyes v. Crystal Farms Refrigerated Distribution Company
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-02250
District Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 30, 2019 at 11:05 PM DT (1.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Marilyn Reyes, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Levin-Epstein & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua Levin-Epstein +1 212 792 0046 +1 212 563 7108 joshua@levinepstein.com
v.
No Logo Crystal Farms Refrigerated Distribution Company, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 367 - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: None Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
        SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 10/3/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 11B South before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 7/25/2018. (Marino, Janine) (Main Document 7 replaced on 7/25/2018) (Marino, Janine).
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/5/2018, Entered: None waiver of service executed
          WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Marilyn Reyes. All Defendants. (Sheehan, Spencer)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
            NOTICE of Appearance by Spencer I. Sheehan on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Sheehan, Spencer)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: None Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
              This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: None Clerks Notice of Rule 73
                In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: None Summons issued
                  Summons Issued as to Crystal Farms Refrigerated Distribution Company. (Bowens, Priscilla)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                    COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-10360034 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Marilyn Reyes. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) Proposed Summons) (Levin-Epstein, Joshua)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Case assigned to Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 3 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?