Williams v. United States Postal Service
Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:17-cv-04224
District Judge Michael J. Davis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 15, 2019 at 1:24 AM ST (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Sheree T Williams, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Meshbesher & Spence Ltd

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Andrew L Davick , +1 507 280 8090 +1 507 280 0807 adavick@meshbesher.com
v.
No Logo Ricky Charles Whitaker, Defendant
United States Postal Service United States Postal Service, Defendant
United States of America United States of America, Counter-Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1391
Nature of Suit 350 - Motor Vehicle Personal Injury
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Summons Issued as to United States Postal Service, United States of America, and Ricky Charles Whitaker. (MMP) (Entered: 09/12/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Michael J. Davis per Civil 3rd, 4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. Please use case number 17-cv-4224 (MJD/FLN). (MMP) (Entered: 09/12/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          COMPLAINT against United States Postal Service (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-5713200) filed by Sheree T Williams. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Davick, Andrew) (Entered: 09/12/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 1 time.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?