Leitzen v. Teva Pharmaceutical USA, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:11-cv-03049
District Judge Ruben Castillo, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 15, 2019 at 2:54 AM ST (2.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Kenneth E. Leitzen, Sr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Espinosa & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert M. Fagan +1 815 233 5800 fagan@prodigy.net

Toggle Switch Represented by RYNEARSON AND SUESS, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Victor H. Essen +1 314 421 4430 +1 314 421 4431 vessen@rssclaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Rynearson, Suess, Schnurbusch & Champion LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Debbie S Champion +1 314 421 4430
No Logo Theresa J. Leitzen, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Espinosa & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert M. Fagan +1 815 233 5800 fagan@prodigy.net

Toggle Switch Represented by RYNEARSON AND SUESS, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Victor H. Essen +1 314 421 4430 +1 314 421 4431 vessen@rssclaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Rynearson, Suess, Schnurbusch & Champion LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Debbie S Champion +1 314 421 4430
v.
Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Russell Jason Chibe +1 312 569 1494 +1 312 569 3494 russell.chibe@dbr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY John Dames +1 312 977 1510 +1 312 977 1511 john.dames@dbr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William V Essig +1 312 977 1510 +1 312 977 1511 william.essig@dbr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Todd Vinson +1 312 569 1496 +1 312 569 3496 todd.vinson@dbr.com
No Logo Janssen, L.P., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Russell Jason Chibe +1 312 569 1494 +1 312 569 3494 russell.chibe@dbr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY John Dames +1 312 977 1510 +1 312 977 1511 john.dames@dbr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William V Essig +1 312 977 1510 +1 312 977 1511 william.essig@dbr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Todd Vinson +1 312 569 1496 +1 312 569 3496 todd.vinson@dbr.com
No Logo Johnson & Johnson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Russell Jason Chibe +1 312 569 1494 +1 312 569 3494 russell.chibe@dbr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY John Dames +1 312 977 1510 +1 312 977 1511 john.dames@dbr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William V Essig +1 312 977 1510 +1 312 977 1511 william.essig@dbr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Todd Vinson +1 312 569 1496 +1 312 569 3496 todd.vinson@dbr.com
No Logo Johnson & Johnson Pharmaceutical Research & Development, L.L.C., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Russell Jason Chibe +1 312 569 1494 +1 312 569 3494 russell.chibe@dbr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY John Dames +1 312 977 1510 +1 312 977 1511 john.dames@dbr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William V Essig +1 312 977 1510 +1 312 977 1511 william.essig@dbr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Todd Vinson +1 312 569 1496 +1 312 569 3496 todd.vinson@dbr.com
No Logo Ortho-McNeil Janssen Scientific Affairs, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Russell Jason Chibe +1 312 569 1494 +1 312 569 3494 russell.chibe@dbr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY John Dames +1 312 977 1510 +1 312 977 1511 john.dames@dbr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William V Essig +1 312 977 1510 +1 312 977 1511 william.essig@dbr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Todd Vinson +1 312 569 1496 +1 312 569 3496 todd.vinson@dbr.com
Ortho-mcneil-janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Ortho-mcneil-janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Russell Jason Chibe +1 312 569 1494 +1 312 569 3494 russell.chibe@dbr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY John Dames +1 312 977 1510 +1 312 977 1511 john.dames@dbr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William V Essig +1 312 977 1510 +1 312 977 1511 william.essig@dbr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Todd Vinson +1 312 569 1496 +1 312 569 3496 todd.vinson@dbr.com
No Logo Teva Parenteral Medicines, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ulmer & Berne, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth R Craycraft, Jr. +1 513 698 5084 kcraycraft@ulmer.com
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Teva Pharmaceutical USA, Inc."

Toggle Switch Represented by Ulmer & Berne, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth R Craycraft, Jr. +1 513 698 5084 kcraycraft@ulmer.com
No Logo Teva Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ulmer & Berne, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth R Craycraft, Jr. +1 513 698 5084 kcraycraft@ulmer.com
No Logo Teva Women's Health, Inc., Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ulmer & Berne, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth R Craycraft, Jr. +1 513 698 5084 kcraycraft@ulmer.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit 365 - Personal Injury: Product Liability
  Entries (32) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/25/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MINUTE entry before Honorable Ruben Castillo: Debbie S. Champion's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice 26 is granted. Mailed notice (gcy, ) (Entered: 05/26/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/25/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    MINUTE entry before Honorable Ruben Castillo: Plaintiffs' motion for remand [14 is granted. The case is hereby remanded to the Circuit Court of Lee County, Illinois. Motion hearing set for 6/1/2011 is vacated. Mailed notices (gcy, ) (Entered: 05/26/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/25/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen, L.P., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Pharmaceutical Research & Development, L.L.C., Ortho-McNeil Janssen Scientific Affairs, LLC, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Russell Jason Chibe (Chibe, Russell) (Entered: 05/25/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/25/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen, L.P., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Pharmaceutical Research & Development, L.L.C., Ortho-McNeil Janssen Scientific Affairs, LLC, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Benjamin Todd Vinson (Vinson, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/25/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/25/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen, L.P., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Pharmaceutical Research & Development, L.L.C., Ortho-McNeil Janssen Scientific Affairs, LLC, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by William Victor Essig (Essig, William) (Entered: 05/25/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/25/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Ortho-McNeil Janssen Scientific Affairs, LLC, Janssen, L.P., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Johnson & Johnson Pharmaceutical Research & Development, L.L.C., Johnson & Johnson by John Dames (Dames, John) (Entered: 05/25/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/25/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6035554. (Debbie, Champion) (Entered: 05/25/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/24/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                ATTORNEY Appearance for Kenneth E. Leitzen, Sr, Theresa J. Leitzen and Kenneth E. Leitzen, Jr. by Victor H. Essen, II (Essen, Victor) (Docket Text Modified by Clerks Office.) Modified on 5/25/2011 (ea, ). (Entered: 05/24/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/24/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Designation of Local Counsel by Kenneth E. Leitzen, Sr, Theresa J. Leitzen Designation of Local Counsel (Essen, Victor) (Entered: 05/24/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/24/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Plaintiffs' Jury Demand by Kenneth E. Leitzen, Sr, Theresa J. Leitzen (Fagan, Robert) (Entered: 05/24/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/24/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      EXHIBIT by Plaintiffs Kenneth E. Leitzen, Sr, Theresa J. Leitzen EXHIBIT B-2 In Support of Leave to file Second Amended Complaint regarding MOTION by Plaintiffs Kenneth E. Leitzen, Sr, Theresa J. Leitzen for leave to file Second Amended Complaint 13 (Fagan, Robert) (Entered: 05/24/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/24/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        EXHIBIT by Plaintiffs Kenneth E. Leitzen, Sr, Theresa J. Leitzen EXHIBIT B-1 In Support of Leave to file Second Amended Complaint regarding MOTION by Plaintiffs Kenneth E. Leitzen, Sr, Theresa J. Leitzen for leave to file Second Amended Complaint 13 (Fagan, Robert) (Entered: 05/24/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/24/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          NOTICE of Motion by Robert M. Fagan for presentment of motion for leave to file 13, motion to remand 14 before Honorable Ruben Castillo on 6/1/2011 at 09:45 AM. (Fagan, Robert) (Entered: 05/24/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            EXHIBIT C In Support of Motion For Leave to file Second Amended Complaint by Kenneth E. Leitzen, Sr, Theresa J. Leitzen (Fagan, Robert) Modified on 5/23/2011 (ea, ). (Entered: 05/20/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              EXHIBIT A In Support of Leave to file Second Amended Complaint by Kenneth E. Leitzen, Sr, Theresa J. Leitzen (Fagan, Robert) Modified on 5/23/2011 (ea, ). (Entered: 05/20/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                MEMORANDUM by Kenneth E. Leitzen, Sr, Theresa J. Leitzen in support of motion for leave to file 13 second amended complaint (Fagan, Robert) (Entered: 05/20/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  MEMORANDUM by Kenneth E. Leitzen, Sr, Theresa J. Leitzen in support of motion to remand 14 (Fagan, Robert) (Entered: 05/20/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    MOTION by Plaintiffs Kenneth E. Leitzen, Sr, Theresa J. Leitzen to remand case to the Illinois Fifteenth Judicial Circuit, Lee County (Fagan, Robert) (Entered: 05/20/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      MOTION by Plaintiffs Kenneth E. Leitzen, Sr, Theresa J. Leitzen for leave to file Second Amended Complaint (Fagan, Robert) (Entered: 05/20/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        AMENDED complaint by Kenneth E. Leitzen, Sr, Theresa J. Leitzen against All Plaintiffs (Fagan, Robert) (Entered: 05/20/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Kenneth E. Leitzen, Sr, Theresa J. Leitzen by Robert M. Fagan (Fagan, Robert) (Entered: 05/20/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/19/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            MINUTE entry before Honorable Ruben Castillo: Victor Hugo Essen, II's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice 10 is granted. Mailed notice (tlm) (Entered: 05/20/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/19/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6017382. (Essen, Victor) (Entered: 05/19/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/10/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                MINUTE entry before Honorable Ruben Castillo:After a careful review of this recently removed state court complaint, said complaint is dismissed without prejudice to the filing of a timely motion to remand or the filing of a proper amended federal complaint. The parties should exhaust all settlement possibilities prior to filing any further pleadings.Mailed notice (rao, ) (Entered: 05/10/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  Corporate Disclosure STATEMENT by Teva Women's Health, Inc. (Craycraft, Kenneth) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Corporate Disclosure STATEMENT by Teva Pharmaceutical USA, Inc. (Craycraft, Kenneth) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      Corporate Disclosure STATEMENT by Teva Pharmaceuticals, LLC (Craycraft, Kenneth) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        Corporate Disclosure STATEMENT by Teva Parenteral Medicines, Inc. (Craycraft, Kenneth) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Teva Parenteral Medicines, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical USA, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Teva Women's Health, Inc. by Kenneth R Craycraft, Jr (Craycraft, Kenneth) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            AFFIDAVIT of Regan N. Merkel regarding notice of removal, 1 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit State Court Docket, # 2 Exhibit Letter to Regan Merkel)(Craycraft, Kenneth) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              CIVIL Cover Sheet (Craycraft, Kenneth) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                NOTICE of Removal from 15th Judicial District, Lee County, Ill., case number (2011L4) filed by Teva Parenteral Medicines, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical USA, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Teva Women's Health, Inc. Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0752-5978321. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit State Court Complaint Caption, # 2 Exhibit Oregon Motion to Dismiss, # 3 Exhibit Mongan Affidavit)(Craycraft, Kenneth) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                  Space Space

                                                                  Statistics

                                                                  This case has been viewed 1 time.

                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                  Space
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                   
                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                  Need Password Help?