Unknown Case Title
Bankruptcy Case Washington Western Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 14-00101
District Judge Brian D Lynch, presiding

Tags
Last Updated January 15, 2019 at 3:32 AM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo PACER Exemptions, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by PACER Exemptions

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space PACER Exemptions
  Entries (34) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORDER Exempting Duly Appointed and Qualified Trustees Acting in Chapter 7, 11, 12 and 13 Cases Filed Under Title 11 From Payment of the Prescribed Fee for Electronic Access. Order signed Sept. 17, 2002. Docketed on this date for historic preservation.(GZW) Modified on 8/22/2017 (GZW). (Entered: 08/22/2017 at 13:25:07)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Data Transfer and Use Agreement with FHCRC. (GZW) (Entered: 04/05/2017 at 11:07:40)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      ORDER Granting Application for Exemption from the Electronic Public Access Fees for Professor Karen A. Overstreet. (Related Doc # 31 Application) . (LJT) (Entered: 02/09/2017 at 11:13:51)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Application for Exemption from the Electronic Public Access Fees by Professor Karen A. Overstreet. Filed by Karen A. Overstreet. (LJT) (Entered: 02/08/2017 at 15:28:35)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          ORDER - Revocation Of Previous Orders Regarding PACER Exemption For Washington State Courts. (LJT) (Entered: 09/20/2016 at 08:21:25)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            ORDER Granting Exemption from Public Access Fees for Superior Courts, District Courts, Municipal Courts for the state of Washington. Order Originally Signed on 10/2/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Amended Order Granting Exemptions Dated 9/29/2010 # 2 Letter) (LJT) (Entered: 09/16/2016 at 14:58:54)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              ORDER Granting Application for Exemption from Public Access Fees (Related Doc 27 Application). Paper copy of Order Mailed to Wei Wang. (TAM) (Entered: 07/19/2016 at 14:22:25)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Application for Exemption from the PACER fees for Wei Wang (Queen's University of Canada). (LJT) (Entered: 07/19/2016 at 10:37:52)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  BNC Certificate of Notice (Related document(s)25 Order Re Motion to). Notice Date 07/14/2016. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/14/2016 at 21:32:38)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    ORDER Granting Application for Exemption from Public Access Fees for Fred Hutchinson Cancer Research Center (Scott Ramsey, Veena Shankaran, Judge Karen A. Overstreet (Ret.) Aasthaa Bansal, Catherine Fedorenko (collectively Applicants). (Related Doc # 24 Application) . (LJT) (Entered: 07/12/2016 at 16:03:04)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      Motion for Exemption from Public Access Fees by the Fred Hutchinson Cancer Research Center (Scott Ramsey, Veena Shankaran, Judge Karen A. Overstreet (Ret.) Aasthaa Bansal, Catherine Fedorenko (collectively Applicants). Filed by Veena Shankaran. (Exhibit Data Use Agreement # 1, Exhibit Order RE: Hollingworth # 2) (Taylor, Leslie). (Entered: 07/12/2016 at 12:42:27)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Paper copy of order sent to David Price, PhD. Candidate, Stanford University (Related document(s)22 Order Re Motion to). (CCT) (Entered: 06/24/2015 at 15:09:38)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          ORDER Granting Application for Exemption from Public Access Fees to David J. Price. (Related Doc # 21) . (RMS) (Entered: 06/23/2015 at 06:12:10)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Motion for Exemption from PACER fee (David Price with Stanford University) Filed by David Price. (RMS) (Entered: 06/22/2015 at 13:54:31)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Paper copy of Order sent to Carlos Parra, Ph.D. Candidate, University of Texas at Austin McCombs School of Business (Related document(s)19 Order Re Motion to). (CCT) (Entered: 05/13/2015 at 17:07:48)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                ORDER Granting Application for Exemption from Public Access Fees (to Carlos Parra) (Related Doc # 16) . (CCT) (Entered: 05/13/2015 at 17:03:31)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Paper copy of Order sent to Margaret Howard, Law Alumni Association Professor of Law, Washington and Lee University School of Law (Related document(s)17 Order Re Motion to). (CCT) (Entered: 05/13/2015 at 17:01:10)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    ORDER Granting Application for Exemption from Public Access Fees (to Margaret Howard) (Related Doc # 15) . (CCT) (Entered: 05/13/2015 at 16:50:36)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Motion for Exemption from PACER fee (Carlos Parra with University of Texas at Austin McCombs School of Business). Filed by Carlos Parra . (LJT) (Entered: 05/12/2015 at 16:09:41)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Motion for Exemption from PACER fee (Margaret Howard, Washington and Lee School of Law).. Filed by Margaret Howard. (LJT) (Entered: 05/12/2015 at 16:05:55)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Sent to BNC for Mailing to Douglas J Ende, Chief Disciplinary Counsel, Washington State Bar Association Office of Disciplinary Counsel (Related document(s)13 Order Re Motion to). Paper copy sent. BNC notice deleted. (CCT) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/28/2014 (Tamayao, Cyndi). (Entered: 05/28/2014 at 12:58:21)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            ORDER Granting Application for Exemption from Public Access Fees (to Washington State Bar Association Office of Disciplinary Counsel) (Related Doc # 12) . (CCT) (Entered: 05/28/2014 at 12:24:37)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Motion for Exemption from PACER fees (Washington State Bar Association Office of Disciplinary Counsel, Douglas J Ende, Chief Disciplinary Counsel) Filed by . (CCT) (Entered: 05/28/2014 at 12:17:20)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Sent to BNC for Mailing to Katherine Waldock, Professor Rustom M Irani and Professor Hanh T Le, NYU (Related document(s)10 Order Re Motion to). Paper copies sent. BNC notice deleted. (CCT) (Entered: 05/09/2014 at 10:34:15)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  ORDER Granting Application for Exemption from Public Access Fees (Related Doc # 9) . (CCT) (Entered: 05/09/2014 at 09:32:52)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Motion for Exemption from PACER fees (Katherine Waldock, NYU Stern School of Business) filed by Katherine Waldock . (CCT) (Entered: 05/09/2014 at 09:25:50)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      Sent to BNC for Mailing Sent to Tony Leahy Director of Cents Program (Related document(s)7 Order Re Motion to). Paper copy sent. BNC notice deleted (DR) (Entered: 05/05/2014 at 15:13:51)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        ORDER Granting Application For Exemption From Public Access Fees (Related Doc # 6) . (DR) (Entered: 05/05/2014 at 15:10:04)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          Motion for Exemption from PACER fee (CENTS) . (SRG) (Entered: 05/05/2014 at 12:37:00)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            Sent to Margaret Howard (Related document(s)4 Order GENERIC). (CCT) Modified on 4/15/2014 (Tamayao, Cyndi). Paper copy sent. BNC notice deleted. (Entered: 04/15/2014 at 13:12:01)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              DUPLICATE: ORDER Granting Application for Exemption from Public Access Fees. (Related Doc #2) Redocketed to capture Entered on Docket date.(CCT) (Entered: 04/15/2014 at 12:57:15)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                ORDER Granting Application for Exemption from Public Access Fees (Related Doc # 2) . (CCT) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/15/2014 (Tamayao, Cyndi). (Entered: 04/15/2014 at 12:15:35)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  Motion for Exemption from PACER fee (Margaret Howard, Washington and Lee School of Law). Filed by PACER Exemptions (SRG) (Entered: 04/15/2014 at 10:33:38)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    Miscellaneous Proceeding: Open Case for PACER Exemptions (JDF) (Entered: 03/06/2014 at 08:09:47)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                      Statistics

                                                                      This case has been viewed 22 times.

                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                      Space
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                       
                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                      Need Password Help?