KAUFMAN, et al v. CASTLE, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 1:90-cv-02349-JFG

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 4, 2017 at 11:22 PM DT (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo SIDNEY L. KAUFMAN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MICHAEL A. COHAN +1 732 727 8440
v.
Trump, Donald J. Trump, Donald J., Defendant
Officially listed as "DONALD J. TRUMP"
Unknown Role, Riviera Holdings Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Dilworth Paxson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JOHN LEWIS LASKEY +1 856 663 8877 jlaskey@dilworthlaw.com
Trump Taj Mahal Associates, LP Trump Taj Mahal Associates, LP, Defendant
Officially listed as "TRUMP TAJ MAHAL ASSOCIATES LIMITED PARTNERSHIP"

Toggle Switch Represented by Dilworth Paxson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JOHN LEWIS LASKEY +1 856 663 8877 jlaskey@dilworthlaw.com
Trump Taj Mahal Funding, Inc. Trump Taj Mahal Funding, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dilworth Paxson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JOHN LEWIS LASKEY +1 856 663 8877 jlaskey@dilworthlaw.com
Trump's Castle Associates, LP Trump's Castle Associates, LP, Defendant
Officially listed as "TRUMP'S CASTLE ASSOCIATES LIMITED PARTNERSHIP"

Toggle Switch Represented by Dilworth Paxson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JOHN LEWIS LASKEY +1 856 663 8877 jlaskey@dilworthlaw.com
No Logo TRUMP'S CASTLE FUNDING, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dilworth Paxson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JOHN LEWIS LASKEY +1 856 663 8877 jlaskey@dilworthlaw.com
Office Camden
Filed 6/15/1990
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated 7/23/1993
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
190-cv-02349-JFG None
Related Case
Other Court Case MDL864[US MDL PANEL]
Def Custody Status
Flags 12BG, CLOSED, MEMBERCASE
  Entries (93) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 8/8/1994, Entered: 8/9/1994 Order
ORDER, proofs of claim submitted by members of the settlement class on or before Dec. 1, 1993 shall be deemed timely filed. ( signed by Chief Judge John F. Gerry ) (ar1)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 8/4/1994, Entered: 8/9/1994 Affidavit
    AFFIDAVIT of MOJDEH L. KHAGHAN Re: [93-1] motion for distribution and other administrative matters (ar1)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 8/2/1994, Entered: 8/9/1994 Minutes-Miscellaneous
      Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: Ted Formaroli; Minutes of: 8/2/94; The following actions were taken, ordered settlement fund be distributed and all claims in litigation be dismissed an approving administrative costs. By Chief Judge John F. Gerry (ar1)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 7/18/1994, Entered: 7/18/1994 Set/Reset Deadlines:
        Deadline updated; Motion hearing set for 9:30 8/5/94 in 1:90-mc-00919, in 1:90-cv-02349, in 1:90-cv-02350, in 1:90-cv-05004, in 1:90-cv-05051, in 1:90-cv-05052, in 1:91-cv-00018, in 1:91-cv-00019, in 1:91-cv-00020 for [93-1] motion for distribution and other administrative matters in 1:90-mc-00919 (femp)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 7/5/1994, Entered: 7/5/1994 Set/Reset Deadlines:
          Deadline updated; Motion hearing set for 9:30 7/15/94 in 1:90-mc-00919, in 1:90-cv-02349 for [93-1] motion for distribution and other administrative matters in 1:90-mc-00919 (femp)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 6/3/1994, Entered: 6/3/1994 Set/Reset Deadlines:
            Deadline updated; Motion hearing set for 9:30 7/1/94 for [93-1] motion for distribution and other administrative matters (femp)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 3/17/1994, Entered: 3/23/1994 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
              Notice of MOTION for distribution and other administrative matters by DINO DEL ZOTTO in 1:90-mc-00919, JOANNE GOLLOMP in 1:90-mc-00919, FAIRMONT FINANCIAL in 1:90-mc-00919, HELEN KLOSS in 1:90-mc-00919, ROBERT KLOSS in 1:90-mc-00919, HERMAN KRANGEL in 1:90-mc-00919, FRED GLOSSNER in 1:90-mc-00919, DOROTHY ARKELL in 1:90-mc-00919, ALEXANDER L. CHARNIS in 1:90-mc-00919, JEAN CURZIO in 1:90-mc-00919, DAVID E. DOUGHERTY in 1:90-mc-00919, ERIC CAGAN in 1:90-mc-00919, SUSAN CAGAN in 1:90-mc-00919, PETER STUYVESANT in 1:90-mc-00919, Motion hearing set for 4/15/93 on [93-1] motion .(Affidavits and Cert. of Service Attached) (mb)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 11/8/1993, Entered: 11/9/1993 Remark
                Judgment of USCA (See 90mc919) (sa)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 11/8/1993, Entered: 11/9/1993 Remark
                  Memorandum Opinion USCA (sa) Modified on 11/09/1993
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 8/23/1993, Entered: 8/24/1993 ~Notice (other)
                    NOTICE of CHANGE OF ADDRESS by ZWERLING, SCHACHTER & ZWERLING atty for the plaintiff. Submitted with affidavit of service. (mb)
                      LREF
                      Blank 61 Filed: 8/17/1992, Entered: 9/1/1992 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER/JUDGMENT, dismissing with prejudice and without costs to any party in accordance with the Stipulation of Settlement dated March 5, 1992 and prior orders of court on Stuyvesant et al. v. Trump et al., Civ No. 90-5004(JFG) and Schwartz v. Trump's Castle et al., Civ. No. 90-2350(JFG) ( signed by Chief Judge John F. Gerry ) (ln)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 7/15/1992, Entered: 7/16/1992 Appeal Record Sent to USCA
                        Record on appeal sent to U.S. Court of Appeals: [84-1] appeal in 1:90-mc-00919, [82-1] appeal in 1:90-mc-00919 (sa)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 6/25/1992, Entered: 6/25/1992 Terminated Case
                          Case closed (ln)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 6/24/1992, Entered: 6/24/1992 Remark
                            Notice of Appeal - See 90mc919 (sa)
                              LREF
                              Blank 60 Filed: 6/1/1992, Entered: 6/1/1992 Affidavit
                              AFFIDAVIT of Jared Stamell Re: In support of the motin to require the withdrawal of the law firm, Greenfield & Chimicles. (See Misc. 90-919) (lc) Modified on 06/01/1992
                                LREF
                                Blank 59 Filed: 5/21/1992, Entered: 5/21/1992, Terminated: 5/21/1992 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER granting motion for Approval of the Proposed settlement (signed Chief Judge John F. Gerry)SEE MISC 90-919(ln) Modified on 06/25/1992
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 58 Filed: 5/21/1992, Entered: 5/21/1992 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                  Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: Carl Nami; Minutes of: May 21, 1992; The following actions were taken, granting [65-1] motion for Approval of the Proposed settlement in 1:90-mc-00919, granting [65-2] motion for Approval of attorney fees and expenses in 1:90-mc-00919, Ordered Settlement Approved; Order submitted By Chief Judge John F. Gerry (ln)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 10/23/1991, Entered: 10/23/1991 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                    Deadline updated; Motion hearing set for 11/8/91 for [14-1] motion by the law firm of Greenfield and Chimicles on behalf of plantiff Fairmont Financial Corporation for appointment as plainitiffs' Interim Lead Counsel, set for 11/8/91 for [8-1] motion to certify class action (ms)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 56 Filed: 8/22/1991, Entered: 8/28/1991 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                      Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: none; Minutes of: 8/22/91; The following actions were taken,, set scheduling conference for 1:30 9/5/91 in 1:90-mc-00919, in 1:90-cv-02349, in 1:90-cv-02350, in 1:90-cv-05004, in 1:90-cv-05051, in 1:90-cv-05052, in 1:91-cv-00018, in 1:91-cv-00019, in 1:91-cv-00020 By Magistrate Jerome B. Simandle (ln) Modified on 06/18/1992
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 5/23/1991, Entered: 5/31/1991 Order
                                        CONSENT ORDER, extending time for all defendants to answer to June 24, 1991 ( signed by Chief Judge John F. Gerry ) (ln) Modified on 05/21/1992
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 4/8/1991, Entered: 4/11/1991 Settlement Conference
                                          Settlement conference held before Magistrate Jerome B. Simandle (ln)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 3/27/1991, Entered: 4/16/1991 Discovery Hearing
                                            Discovery hearing held before Magistrate Jerome B. Simandle (ln)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 56 Filed: 3/22/1991, Entered: 3/22/1991 Remark
                                              SERVICE LIST COMPILED BY COURT [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT IS CONTAINED IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919(JFG)] (femp)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 55 Filed: 3/21/1991, Entered: 3/22/1991 Order
                                                ORDER, AMENDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 2 WHICH WAS FILED 2/14/91. Defendants shall answer move or otherwise plead to complaints not later than 4/23/91; any motion to dismiss shall be made returnable 6/7/91 - responses by 5/15/91 - replies by 5/25/91 [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT IS CONTAINED IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919] Mailed to all parties 3/22/91 pt ( signed by Magistrate Jerome B. Simandle ) (femp)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/11/1991, Entered: 3/12/1991 Remark
                                                  Copies of portion of 90-5051(JFG) "Cagan V. Taj" received from Clerk in EDNY Uniondale. (femp)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 54 Filed: 3/4/1991, Entered: 3/5/1991 Amended Complaint
                                                    CONSOLIDATED, AMENDED COMPLAINT (CASTLE & PLAZA) by SIDNEY L. KAUFMAN in 1:90-mc-00919, JEROME SCHWARTZ in 1:90-mc-00919, PETER STUYVESANT in 1:90-mc-00919, Signed by Edward Labaton of GOODKIND, ETC. in Manhattan. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT IS CONTAINED IN MASTER FILE 1:90cv919] (femp) Modified on 03/20/1991
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 53 Filed: 3/4/1991, Entered: 3/5/1991 Amended Complaint
                                                      CONSOLIDATED, AMENDED COMPLAINT by SIDNEY L. KAUFMAN in 1:90-mc-00919, JEROME SCHWARTZ in 1:90-mc-00919, PETER STUYVESANT in 1:90-mc-00919, SUSAN CAGAN in 1:90-mc-00919, ERIC CAGAN in 1:90-mc-00919, DAVID E. DOUGHERTY in 1:90-mc-00919, JEAN CURZIO in 1:90-mc-00919, ALEXANDER L. CHARNIS in 1:90-mc-00919, DOROTHY ARKELL in 1:90-mc-00919, FRED GLOSSNER in 1:90-mc-00919, HERMAN KRANGEL in 1:90-mc-00919, ROBERT KLOSS in 1:90-mc-00919, HELEN KLOSS in 1:90-mc-00919, FAIRMONT FINANCIAL in 1:90-mc-00919, JOANNE GOLLOMP in 1:90-mc-00919, SIDNEY L. KAUFMAN in 1:90-cv-02349, JEROME SCHWARTZ in 1:90-cv-02350, PETER STUYVESANT in 1:90-cv-05004, SUSAN CAGAN in 1:90-cv-05051, ERIC CAGAN in 1:90-cv-05051, DAVID E. DOUGHERTY in 1:90-cv-05051, JEAN CURZIO in 1:90-cv-05051, ALEXANDER L. CHARNIS in 1:90-cv-05052, DOROTHY ARKELL in 1:90-cv-05052, FAIRMONT FINANCIAL in 1:91-cv-00018, JOANNE GOLLOMP in 1:91-cv-00018, ROBERT KLOSS in 1:91-cv-00019, HELEN KLOSS in 1:91-cv-00019, FRED GLOSSNER in 1:91-cv-00020, HERMAN KRANGEL in 1:91-cv-00020 , amending [53-1] amended complaint in 1:90-cv-02349, 1:90-mc-00919, 1:90-cv-02350, 1:90-cv-05004, 1:90-cv-05051, 1:90-cv-05052, 1:91-cv-00018, 1:91-cv-00019, 1:91-cv-00020, [50-1] amended complaint in 1:90-cv-02349, 1:90-mc-00919, 1:90-cv-02350, 1:90-cv-05004, 1:90-cv-05051, 1:90-cv-05052, 1:91-cv-00018, 1:91-cv-00019, 1:91-cv-00020, [1-1] complaint in 1:90-cv-02349, [1-1] complaint in 1:90-cv-02350, [1-1] amended complaint in 1:90-cv-05004, [1-1] complaint in 1:90-cv-05004, [4-1] complaint in 1:90-cv-05052, [4-1] complaint in 1:91-cv-00018, [2-1] complaint in 1:91-cv-00019, [2-1] complaint in 1:91-cv-00020 [ORIGINAL PLEADING IN MASTER DOCKET 1:90mc919] Signed by Edward Labaton, Esq. of GOODKIND, LABATON & RUDOFF NYC, NY. (femp) Modified on 03/05/1991
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 2/20/1991, Entered: 2/20/1991 Set/Clear Flags
                                                        Consolidated Member Case . Lead Case Number: 1mc90 919 (femp)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 2/20/1991, Entered: 2/20/1991 Set/Clear Flags
                                                          Consolidated Member Case . Lead Case Number: 1mc90 919 (femp)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 2/20/1991, Entered: 2/20/1991 Set/Clear Flags
                                                            Consolidated Member Case . Lead Case Number: 1mc90 919 (femp)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 2/20/1991, Entered: 2/20/1991 Set/Clear Flags
                                                              Consolidated Member Case . Lead Case Number: 1mc90 919 (femp)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 2/20/1991, Entered: 2/20/1991 Set/Clear Flags
                                                                Consolidated Member Case . Lead Case Number: 1mc90 919 (femp)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/20/1991, Entered: 2/20/1991 Set/Clear Flags
                                                                  Consolidated Member Case . Lead Case Number: 1:90mc919 (femp)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 2/20/1991, Entered: 2/20/1991 Set/Clear Flags
                                                                    Consolidated Member Case . Lead Case Number: 1mc90 919 (femp)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 52 Filed: 2/19/1991, Entered: 2/19/1991 Remark
                                                                      SERVICE LIST COMPILED BY COURT. (jo) Modified on 02/20/1991
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 51 Filed: 2/14/1991, Entered: 2/15/1991 Order
                                                                        CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO.2 setting rules for filing, subsequent filings & transferred actions, case captionation, filing and docketing, guidelines for consolidated amended complaints, organization of pltfs' counsel, coordination of pleadings and other documents, exchange of information, preservation of documents, modifications, AND SETTING DATE FOR NEXT CONFERENCE ON WEDNESDAY, MARCH 20th, 1991 AT 1:00PM ( signed by Magistrate Jerome B. Simandle ) [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919(JFG) AND COPIES IN ALL ASSOCIATED ACTIONS] (femp)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 49 Filed: 2/14/1991, Entered: 2/15/1991 Order
                                                                          ORDER, for EDWARD LABATON, ESQ. OF GOODKIND, LABATON & RUDOFF to appear pro hac vice ( signed by Magistrate Jerome B. Simandle ) [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT CONTAINED IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919(JFG)] (femp)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 48 Filed: 2/14/1991, Entered: 2/15/1991 Order
                                                                            ORDER, for JONATHAN PLASSE, ESQ. OF GOODKIND, LABATON & RUDOFF to appear pro hac vice ( signed by Magistrate Jerome B. Simandle ) [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT CONTAINED IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919(JFG)] (femp)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 47 Filed: 2/14/1991, Entered: 2/15/1991 Affidavit
                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF GOOD STANDING Re: admission of EDWARD LABATON to appear pro hac vice. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT IS CONTAINED IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919(JFG)] (femp)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 50 Filed: 2/11/1991, Entered: 2/15/1991 Amended Complaint
                                                                                CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT RELATED TO TAJ MAHAL LITIGATION FILED BY MARK C. RIFKIN, ESQ. OF GREENFIELD & CHIMICLES [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT CONTAINED IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919(JFG)] (This document was rec'd in DNJ's Trenton Office on 2/11/91, and in this office via pouch on 2/14/91.) (femp)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 46 Filed: 2/7/1991, Entered: 2/15/1991 Affidavit
                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF GOOD STANDING Re: admission of JONATHAN PLASSE to appear pro hac vice. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT IS CONTAINED IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919(JFG)] (femp)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 45 Filed: 2/7/1991, Entered: 2/15/1991 Order
                                                                                    ORDER, for ROBERT J. RYAN, ESQ. OF WECHSLER, SKIRNICK, HARWOOD, HALEBIAN & FEFFER to appear pro hac vice ( signed by Magistrate Jerome B. Simandle ) [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT CONTAINED IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919(JFG)] (femp)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 44 Filed: 2/7/1991, Entered: 2/15/1991 Order
                                                                                      ORDER, for BRUCE E. GERSTEIN, ESQ. OF GARWIN, BRONZAFT, GERSTEIN & FISHER to appear pro hac vice ( signed by Magistrate Jerome B. Simandle ) [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT CONTAINED IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919(JFG)] (femp)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 43 Filed: 2/7/1991, Entered: 2/15/1991 Order
                                                                                        ORDER, for BERTRAM BRONZAFT, ESQ. OF GARWIN, BRONZAFT, GERSTEIN & FISHER to appear pro hac vice ( signed by Magistrate Jerome B. Simandle ) [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919(JFG)] (femp)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 42 Filed: 2/7/1991, Entered: 2/15/1991 Order
                                                                                          ORDER, for SCOTT W. FISHER, ESQ. OF GARWIN, BRONZAFT, GERSTEIN & FISHER to appear pro hac vice ( signed by Magistrate Jerome B. Simandle ) [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT CONTAINED IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919(JFG)] (femp)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 41 Filed: 2/7/1991, Entered: 2/15/1991 Order
                                                                                            ORDER, for ROBERT S. SCHACHTER, ESQ. OF ZWERLING, SCHACHTER & ZWERLING ID#RS7243 to appear pro hac vice ( signed by Magistrate Jerome B. Simandle ) [ORIGINAL CONTAINED IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919(JFG)] (femp)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 40 Filed: 2/6/1991, Entered: 2/13/1991 Affidavit
                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF GOOD STANDING Re: admission of Robert J. Ryan to appear PRO HAC VICE [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919(JFG)] (femp)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 39 Filed: 2/6/1991, Entered: 2/13/1991 Affidavit
                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF GOOD STANDING Re: Admission of Bruce E. Gerstein to appear PRO HAC VICE [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT IN 1:90mc919(JFG)] (femp)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 38 Filed: 2/6/1991, Entered: 2/13/1991 Affidavit
                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF GOOD STANDING Re: admission of Bertram Bronzaft PRO HAC VICE [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919(JFG)] (femp)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 37 Filed: 2/6/1991, Entered: 2/13/1991 Affidavit
                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF GOOD STANDING Re: admission of Robert S. Schachter to appear Pro hac vice for plaintiffs Cagan, et al. DNJ#1:90cv5051(JFG), and EDNY90-2842(CJP) [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT IS CONTAINED IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919(JFG)] (femp)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 36 Filed: 2/6/1991, Entered: 2/13/1991 Affidavit
                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF GOOD STANDING Re:admission of Scott W. Fisher Pro Hac Vice for Robert and Helen Kloss, et al. (plaintiffs in DNJ#1:91cv19(JFG), EDNY#90-3516 [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT CONTAINED IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919] (femp) Modified on 02/13/1991
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/30/1991, Entered: 2/4/1991 Remark
                                                                                                        CASE RECORD OF SDNY 90cv6202(LBS) "Fairmont Financial v. Trump" RECEIVED IN CAMDEN OFFICE: DNJ#1:91cv18 (note on transmittal letter by SDNY Deputy Glenda Horton indicates that Doc#3 is lost) (femp) Modified on 02/04/1991
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 34 Filed: 1/29/1991, Entered: 1/29/1991 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER, for STUART D. WECHSLER to appear pro hac vice ( signed by Chief Judge John F. Gerry ) [ORIGINAL IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919] (femp)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 33 Filed: 1/29/1991, Entered: 1/29/1991 Affidavit
                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of STUART D. WECHSLER Re: good standing to appear phv. [ORIGINAL IN MASTER FILE 1:90cv919] (proof of service attached). (femp)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 35 Filed: 1/28/1991, Entered: 2/1/1991 Order
                                                                                                              ORDER, for STUART J. BASKIN, ESQ. to appear pro hac vice ( signed by Magistrate Jerome B. Simandle ) [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919] (femp)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 1/28/1991, Entered: 1/28/1991 Remark
                                                                                                                SDNY DOCKET OF "Fairmont Financial V. Trump" SDNY#90-6202(SAND) received in Camden by Fax in order to complete JS5 report to Washington. Case opened in DNJ as 1:91cv18(JFG), and made part of MDL864, MASTER DOCKET NUMBER 1:90mc919. (femp)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 32 Filed: 1/24/1991, Entered: 1/28/1991 Order
                                                                                                                  ORDER, for RICHARD L. POSEN, ESQ. to appear pro hac vice ( signed by Magistrate Jerome B. Simandle ) [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT IS CONTAINED IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919] (femp)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 31 Filed: 1/24/1991, Entered: 1/28/1991 Affidavit
                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF RICHARD L. POSEN Re: good standing to plead [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT IS CONTAINED IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919] (femp)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/22/1991, Entered: 1/22/1991 Remark
                                                                                                                      CASE RECORD OF EDNY 90cv3516(TJP) "Kloss V. Trump" RECEIVED IN CAMDEN OFFICE, DNJ# is 1:91cv19 (femp)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/17/1991, Entered: 1/17/1991 Remark
                                                                                                                        CASE RECORD OF SDNY 90cv6534(LBS) "Glossner V. Trump" RECEIVED IN CAMDEN OFFICE DNJ# is 1:91cv20. (femp)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 30 Filed: 1/16/1991, Entered: 1/28/1991 Affidavit
                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Alan E. Lasak Re: service of Affidavit of Good Standing for STUART J. BASKIN, ESQ. of SHEARMAN & STERLING, NYC, NY [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT IN LEAD CASE FILE 1:90mc919] (femp)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 29 Filed: 1/11/1991, Entered: 1/22/1991 Order
                                                                                                                            ORDER admitting Robert B. Matusoff to serve as Plaintiff Schwartz's counsel in this action ( signed by Magistrate Jerome B. Simandle ) [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT CONTAINED IN 1:90mc919, MASTER FILE] (femp) Modified on 01/22/1991
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 28 Filed: 1/11/1991, Entered: 1/22/1991 Affidavit
                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF ROBERT B. MATUSOFF of GENE MESH & ASSOC. Re: Admission to plead before the court. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT IS CONTAINED IN 1:90mc919, MASTER FILE FOR MDL 864] (femp) Modified on 01/22/1991
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 27 Filed: 1/11/1991, Entered: 1/22/1991 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: Mr. Ted Formaroli; Minutes of: 1.11.91; The following actions were taken: Attorney Attendence sheet was distributed, counsel present, but not "of record" as of this date are Richard D. Greenfield for Fairmont Financial, Robert Matusoff for Schwartz, Stuart Baskin & David Bradford for Merrill Lynch, M. Richard Komins & Robert A. Hoffman for Glossner & Krange, Carl Poplar for Cagan, and Mark Rifkin for Fairmont Financial (list is attached to this minute entry). Hearing was focussed on the appointment of lead counsel, ORDER TO BE SUBMITTED. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT IS CONTAINED IN LEAD CASE FILE 1:90mc919] (femp) Modified on 01/22/1991
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 26 Filed: 1/11/1991, Entered: 1/11/1991 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF GOOD STANDING for Stuart J. Baskin of SHEARMAN & STERLING of NYC [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919] (femp) Modified on 01/22/1991
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/11/1991, Entered: 1/16/1991 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of ROBERT B. MATUSOFF (ln)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 25 Filed: 1/8/1991, Entered: 1/10/1991 Remark
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF ADDITION OF TAG-A-LONG ACTIONS: "Fairmont Finanancial Vs. Trump" DNJ#1:91cv18; "Kloss Vs. Trump" DNJ#1:91cv19; "Glossner Vs. Trump" DNJ#1:91cv20; {ORIGINAL DOCUMENT IS CONTAINED IN MASTER FILE 1:90cv919] Service list as of 1/8/91 is attached; copies sent to all counsel. (femp) Modified on 01/11/1991
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 24 Filed: 1/8/1991, Entered: 1/8/1991 Order
                                                                                                                                        ORDER (CERTIFIED COPY) OF THE PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION, transferring case SDNY 90-6534 "Glosser v. Trump" FROM SDNY TO THE DISTRICT OF NEW JERSEY [DOCUMENT CONTAINED IN MASTER FILE 1:91mc919] (femp)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 23 Filed: 1/8/1991, Entered: 1/8/1991 Order
                                                                                                                                          ORDER (CERTIFIED COPY) OF THE PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION, transferring case EDNY 90-3516 "Kloss v. Trump" from the EDNY to THE DISTRICT OF NEW JERSEY [DOCUMENT CONTAINED IN MASTER FILE 1:90cv919] (femp)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 22 Filed: 1/8/1991, Entered: 1/8/1991 Order
                                                                                                                                            ORDER (CERTIFIED COPY) OF THE PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION, transferring case SDNY 90-6202 "Fairmont v. Trump FROM EDNY TO THE DISTRICT OF NEW JERSEY. [DOCUMENT IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919] (femp) Modified on 01/28/1991
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 21 Filed: 1/4/1991, Entered: 1/4/1991, Terminated: 3/11/1992 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by SIDNEY L. KAUFMAN in 1:90-mc-00919, JEROME SCHWARTZ in 1:90-mc-00919 to GREENFIELD & CHIMICLES' motion for appointment as plaintiffs' interim lead counsel and APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CO-LEAD COUNSEL [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT CONTAINTED IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919] (femp)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 20 Filed: 1/2/1991, Entered: 1/2/1991 Remark
                                                                                                                                                DISCOVERY MEMORANDUM OF PLAINTIFFS submitted by Michael A. Cohan, Esq. of COHAN & ECKHAUS, Parlin, NJ. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT IS CONTAINED IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919] (femp) Modified on 01/02/1991
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 19 Filed: 12/26/1990, Entered: 12/26/1990 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Glenn C. Mariano of WECHSLER, SKIRNICK, ETC. re: correction of pleading #4. [DOCUMENT CONTAINED IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919] (femp) Modified on 12/26/1990
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 18 Filed: 12/21/1990, Entered: 12/26/1990 Response in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE of PETER STUYVESANT, LTD. in support of GREENFIELD & CHIMICLES' motion for appointment as plaintiff's lead counsel. [DOCUMENT CONTAINED IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919] (femp) Modified on 12/26/1990
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 17 Filed: 12/21/1990, Entered: 12/26/1990 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of STUART D. WECHSLER in opposition to Greenfield & Chimicles' motion to appoint an interim lead counsel for plaintiffs. [DOCUMENT CONTAINED IN MASTER FILE 1:90MC919] (femp) Modified on 12/26/1990
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 15 Filed: 12/20/1990, Entered: 12/20/1990 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Allocation and Assignment filed. Magistrate JEROME B. SIMANDLE to handle discovery. "Tag-along" action 1:90cv5052 added. [DOCUMENT IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919] (femp) Modified on 12/26/1990
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 16 Filed: 12/17/1990, Entered: 12/21/1990 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER & CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1 -- establishing MDL filing procedures; setting discovery memo due date for 1/1/91; staying pending discovery; extending answer due dates; commanding counsel and parties to preserve documents; designating JEROME B. SIMANDLE, U.S. MAGISTRATE to perform all pretrial jusicial duties relating to case management, etc.; and setting Status conference 2:00 1/11/91 in 1:90-mc-00919, in 1:90-cv-02349, in 1:90-cv-02350, in 1:90-cv-05004 ; ( signed by Chief Judge John F. Gerry ) [DOCUMENT IN MASTER FILE 1:90MC919] ATTACHMENTS: Meeting agenda, service list. (femp) Modified on 12/21/1990
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 14 Filed: 12/7/1990, Entered: 12/18/1990 Motion to Appoint CounselCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            Notice of MOTION by the law firm of Greenfield and Chimicles on behalf of plantiff Fairmont Financial Corporation for appointment as plainitiffs' Interim Lead Counsel [14-1] (ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED) referred to Chief Judge John F. Gerry, Motion hearing set for 1/4/91 on [14-1] motion . (jo)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 10/29/1990, Entered: 10/29/1990 Set/Clear Flags
                                                                                                                                                              Consolidated Lead Case (consolidated with civil Civ. 90-2350) (lc)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 13 Filed: 10/23/1990, Entered: 10/29/1990 Order
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER consolidating this action with civ.90-2350 for discovery purposes. ( signed by Magistrate Joel B. Rosen ) (lc)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 12 Filed: 9/26/1990, Entered: 9/26/1990 Order
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, set scheduling conference for 10:30 11/15/90 ( signed by Magistrate Joel B. Rosen ) (lc) Modified on 09/28/1990
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 11 Filed: 9/25/1990, Entered: 9/28/1990 Order
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [9-1] motion for admision of Howard A. Specter, Esq. and David J. Marogue,Esq. to appear pro hac vice on behalf of plaintiff. ( signed by Magistrate Joel B. Rosen ) (lc) Modified on 09/28/1990
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 10 Filed: 9/24/1990, Entered: 9/26/1990 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER/CONSENT Nunc Pro Tunc extending time to answer , reset answer due for 8/17/90 for DONALD J. TRUMP, for TRUMP'S CASTLE ASSOC, for TRUMP'S CASTLE FUND, for TRUMP TAJ MAHAL ASSO, for TRUMP TAJ MAHAL FUND ( signed by Chief Judge John F. Gerry ) (lc)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 9 Filed: 8/23/1990, Entered: 8/24/1990, Terminated: 9/25/1990 Motion for Limited Admission
                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of MOTION by SIDNEY L. KAUFMAN for admision of Howard A. Specter, Esq. and David J. Manogue,Esq. to appear pro hac vice , Motion hearing set for 9:30 9/21/90 on [9-1] motion with affidavits of Howard A. Specter, Esq. and David J. Manogue, Esq. and Certificate of Service attached thereto. (lc) Modified on 08/24/1990
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 8 Filed: 8/23/1990, Entered: 8/24/1990 Motion to Certify Class
                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of MOTION by pltf. SIDNEY L. KAUFMAN to certify class action , Motion hearing set for 9:30 on 9/21/90 on [8-1] motion . (Certification of Service attached thereto) BRIEF (lc)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 7 Filed: 8/7/1990, Entered: 8/8/1990 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                            RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint showing service by Certified Mail upon deft. Donald J. Trump on 6/25/90. Answer due on 7/15/90 for DONALD J. TRUMP. (lc)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 6 Filed: 8/3/1990, Entered: 8/7/1990 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                              RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint executed as to deft. TRUMP'S CASTLE ASSOC. on 6/22/90 Answer due on 7/12/90 for TRUMP'S CASTLE ASSOC. (lc)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 5 Filed: 8/3/1990, Entered: 8/7/1990 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint executed as to deft. TRUMP'S CASTLE FUND on 6/22/90 Answer due on 7/12/90 for TRUMP'S CASTLE FUND. (lc)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 8/3/1990, Entered: 8/7/1990 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                  RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint executed as to deft. TRUMP TAJ MAHAL ASSO on 6/22/90 Answer due on 7/12/90 for TRUMP TAJ MAHAL ASSO. (lc)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 8/3/1990, Entered: 8/7/1990 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                    RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint executed as to deft. TRUMP'S CASTLE FUND on 6/22/90 Answer due on 7/12/90 for TRUMP TAJ MAHAL FUND . (lc)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 6/20/1990, Entered: 6/20/1990 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Allocation and Assignment filed. Magistrate Joel B. Rosen(CAMDEN-GERRY) (dv)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 6/18/1990, Entered: 6/20/1990 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS(ES) issued for TRUMP'S CASTLE FUND, TRUMP'S CASTLE ASSOC, TRUMP TAJ MAHAL FUND, TRUMP TAJ MAHAL ASSO, DONALD J. TRUMP, twenty days, and returned to counsel for service. (dv)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 6/15/1990, Entered: 6/20/1990 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT filed; jury demand FILING FEE $ 120.00 RECEIPT # 125262 (dv)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 164 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?