SCHWARTZ, et al v. CASTLE, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 1:90-cv-02350-JFG

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 14, 2017 at 1:27 AM ST (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo JEROME SCHWARTZ, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MICHAEL A. COHAN +1 732 727 8440
v.
Trump, Donald J. Trump, Donald J., Defendant
Officially listed as "DONALD J. TRUMP"
Unknown Role, Riviera Holdings Corp
Trump Taj Mahal Associates, LP Trump Taj Mahal Associates, LP, Defendant
Officially listed as "TRUMP TAJ MAHAL ASSOCIATES LIMITED PARTNERSHIP"
Trump Taj Mahal Funding, Inc. Trump Taj Mahal Funding, Inc., Defendant
Trump's Castle Associates, LP Trump's Castle Associates, LP, Defendant
Officially listed as "TRUMP'S CASTLE ASSOCIATES LIMITED PARTNERSHIP"
No Logo TRUMP'S CASTLE FUNDING, INC., Defendant
Office Camden
Filed 6/15/1990
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated 6/25/1992
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
190-cv-02350-JFG None
Related Case
Other Court Case MDL864[US MDL PANEL]
Def Custody Status
Flags 12BC, CLOSED, MDL864, MEMBERCASE
  Entries (97) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 8/8/1994, Entered: 8/9/1994 Order
ORDER, proofs of claim submitted by members of the settlement class on or before Dec. 1, 1993 shall be deemed timely filed. ( signed by Chief Judge John F. Gerry ) (ar1)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 8/4/1994, Entered: 8/9/1994 Affidavit
    AFFIDAVIT of MOJDEH L. KHAGHAN Re: [93-1] motion for distribution and other administrative matters (ar1)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 8/2/1994, Entered: 8/9/1994 Minutes-Miscellaneous
      Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: Ted Formaroli; Minutes of: 8/2/94; The following actions were taken, ordered settlement fund be distributed and all claims in litigation be dismissed an approving administrative costs. By Chief Judge John F. Gerry (ar1)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 7/18/1994, Entered: 7/18/1994 Set/Reset Deadlines:
        Deadline updated; Motion hearing set for 9:30 8/5/94 in 1:90-mc-00919, in 1:90-cv-02349, in 1:90-cv-02350, in 1:90-cv-05004, in 1:90-cv-05051, in 1:90-cv-05052, in 1:91-cv-00018, in 1:91-cv-00019, in 1:91-cv-00020 for [93-1] motion for distribution and other administrative matters in 1:90-mc-00919 (femp)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 6/3/1994, Entered: 6/3/1994 Set/Reset Deadlines:
          Deadline updated; Motion hearing set for 9:30 7/1/94 for [93-1] motion for distribution and other administrative matters (femp)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 3/17/1994, Entered: 3/23/1994 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
            Notice of MOTION for distribution and other administrative matters by DINO DEL ZOTTO in 1:90-mc-00919, JOANNE GOLLOMP in 1:90-mc-00919, FAIRMONT FINANCIAL in 1:90-mc-00919, HELEN KLOSS in 1:90-mc-00919, ROBERT KLOSS in 1:90-mc-00919, HERMAN KRANGEL in 1:90-mc-00919, FRED GLOSSNER in 1:90-mc-00919, DOROTHY ARKELL in 1:90-mc-00919, ALEXANDER L. CHARNIS in 1:90-mc-00919, JEAN CURZIO in 1:90-mc-00919, DAVID E. DOUGHERTY in 1:90-mc-00919, ERIC CAGAN in 1:90-mc-00919, SUSAN CAGAN in 1:90-mc-00919, PETER STUYVESANT in 1:90-mc-00919, Motion hearing set for 4/15/93 on [93-1] motion .(Affidavits and Cert. of Service Attached) (mb)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 11/8/1993, Entered: 11/9/1993 Remark
              Judgment of USCA (See 90mc919) (sa) Modified on 11/09/1993
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 11/8/1993, Entered: 11/9/1993 Remark
                Memorandum Opinion USCA (sa) Modified on 11/09/1993
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 11/8/1993, Entered: 11/9/1993 Remark
                  Memorandum Opinion USCA (sa) Modified on 11/09/1993
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 8/23/1993, Entered: 8/24/1993 ~Notice (other)
                    NOTICE of CHANGE OF ADDRESS by ZWERLING, SCHACHTER & ZWERLING atty for the plaintiff. Submitted with affidavit of service. (mb)
                      LREF
                      Blank 65 Filed: 8/17/1992, Entered: 9/1/1992 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER/JUDGMENT , dismissing with prejudice and without costs to any party in accordance with the Stipulation of Settlement dated March 5, 1992 and prior Order of the court on Stuyvesant et al. v. Trump et al., Civ. No. 90-5004(JFG) and Kaufman v. Trump's Castle et al., Civ No. 90-2349(JFG) ( signed by Chief Judge John F. Gerry ) (ln)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 7/15/1992, Entered: 7/16/1992 Appeal Record Sent to USCA
                        Record on appeal sent to U.S. Court of Appeals: [84-1] appeal in 1:90-mc-00919, [82-1] appeal in 1:90-mc-00919 (sa)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 6/25/1992, Entered: 6/25/1992 Terminated Case
                          Case closed (ln)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 6/24/1992, Entered: 6/24/1992 Remark
                            Notice of Appeal - See 90mc919 (sa)
                              LREF
                              Blank 64 Filed: 5/21/1992, Entered: 5/21/1992 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER granting Motion for approval of the Proposed Settlement and for approval of attorneys fees and expenses, ( signed by Chief Judge John F. Gerry ) (ln)
                                LREF
                                Blank 63 Filed: 5/21/1992, Entered: 5/21/1992 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: Carl Nami; Minutes of: May 21, 1992; The following actions were taken, granting [65-1] motion for Approval of the Proposed settlement in 1:90-mc-00919, granting [65-2] motion for Approval of attorney fees and expenses in 1:90-mc-00919, Ordered Settlement Approved; Order submitted By Chief Judge John F. Gerry (ln)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 62 Filed: 8/22/1991, Entered: 8/28/1991 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                  Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: none; Minutes of: 8/22/91; The following actions were taken,, set scheduling conference for 1:30 9/5/91 in 1:90-mc-00919, in 1:90-cv-02349, in 1:90-cv-02350, in 1:90-cv-05004, in 1:90-cv-05051, in 1:90-cv-05052, in 1:91-cv-00018, in 1:91-cv-00019, in 1:91-cv-00020 By Magistrate Jerome B. Simandle (ln) Modified on 06/18/1992
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/23/1991, Entered: 5/31/1991 Order
                                    CONSENT ORDER, extending time for all defendants to answer to June 24, 1991 ( signed by Chief Judge John F. Gerry ) (ln) Modified on 05/21/1992
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 4/8/1991, Entered: 4/11/1991 Settlement Conference
                                      Settlement conference held before Magistrate Jerome B. Simandle (ln)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 3/27/1991, Entered: 4/16/1991 Discovery Hearing
                                        Discovery hearing held before Magistrate Jerome B. Simandle (ln)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 60 Filed: 3/22/1991, Entered: 3/22/1991 Remark
                                          SERVICE LIST COMPILED BY COURT [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT IS CONTAINED IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919(JFG)] (femp)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 59 Filed: 3/21/1991, Entered: 3/22/1991 Order
                                            ORDER, AMENDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 2 WHICH WAS FILED 2/14/91. Defendants shall answer move or otherwise plead to complaints not later than 4/23/91; any motion to dismiss shall be made returnable 6/7/91 - responses by 5/15/91 - replies by 5/25/91 [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT IS CONTAINED IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919] Mailed to all parties 3/22/91 pt ( signed by Magistrate Jerome B. Simandle ) (femp)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/11/1991, Entered: 3/12/1991 Remark
                                              Copies of portion of 90-5051(JFG) "Cagan V. Taj" received from Clerk in EDNY Uniondale. (femp)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 58 Filed: 3/4/1991, Entered: 3/5/1991 Amended Complaint
                                                CONSOLIDATED, AMENDED COMPLAINT (CASTLE & PLAZA) by SIDNEY L. KAUFMAN in 1:90-mc-00919, JEROME SCHWARTZ in 1:90-mc-00919, PETER STUYVESANT in 1:90-mc-00919, Signed by Edward Labaton of GOODKIND, ETC. in Manhattan. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT IS CONTAINED IN MASTER FILE 1:90cv919] (femp) Modified on 03/20/1991
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 57 Filed: 3/4/1991, Entered: 3/5/1991 Amended Complaint
                                                  CONSOLIDATED, AMENDED COMPLAINT by SIDNEY L. KAUFMAN in 1:90-mc-00919, JEROME SCHWARTZ in 1:90-mc-00919, PETER STUYVESANT in 1:90-mc-00919, SUSAN CAGAN in 1:90-mc-00919, ERIC CAGAN in 1:90-mc-00919, DAVID E. DOUGHERTY in 1:90-mc-00919, JEAN CURZIO in 1:90-mc-00919, ALEXANDER L. CHARNIS in 1:90-mc-00919, DOROTHY ARKELL in 1:90-mc-00919, FRED GLOSSNER in 1:90-mc-00919, HERMAN KRANGEL in 1:90-mc-00919, ROBERT KLOSS in 1:90-mc-00919, HELEN KLOSS in 1:90-mc-00919, FAIRMONT FINANCIAL in 1:90-mc-00919, JOANNE GOLLOMP in 1:90-mc-00919, SIDNEY L. KAUFMAN in 1:90-cv-02349, JEROME SCHWARTZ in 1:90-cv-02350, PETER STUYVESANT in 1:90-cv-05004, SUSAN CAGAN in 1:90-cv-05051, ERIC CAGAN in 1:90-cv-05051, DAVID E. DOUGHERTY in 1:90-cv-05051, JEAN CURZIO in 1:90-cv-05051, ALEXANDER L. CHARNIS in 1:90-cv-05052, DOROTHY ARKELL in 1:90-cv-05052, FAIRMONT FINANCIAL in 1:91-cv-00018, JOANNE GOLLOMP in 1:91-cv-00018, ROBERT KLOSS in 1:91-cv-00019, HELEN KLOSS in 1:91-cv-00019, FRED GLOSSNER in 1:91-cv-00020, HERMAN KRANGEL in 1:91-cv-00020 , amending [53-1] amended complaint in 1:90-cv-02349, 1:90-mc-00919, 1:90-cv-02350, 1:90-cv-05004, 1:90-cv-05051, 1:90-cv-05052, 1:91-cv-00018, 1:91-cv-00019, 1:91-cv-00020, [50-1] amended complaint in 1:90-cv-02349, 1:90-mc-00919, 1:90-cv-02350, 1:90-cv-05004, 1:90-cv-05051, 1:90-cv-05052, 1:91-cv-00018, 1:91-cv-00019, 1:91-cv-00020, [1-1] complaint in 1:90-cv-02349, [1-1] complaint in 1:90-cv-02350, [1-1] amended complaint in 1:90-cv-05004, [1-1] complaint in 1:90-cv-05004, [4-1] complaint in 1:90-cv-05052, [4-1] complaint in 1:91-cv-00018, [2-1] complaint in 1:91-cv-00019, [2-1] complaint in 1:91-cv-00020 [ORIGINAL PLEADING IN MASTER DOCKET 1:90mc919] Signed by Edward Labaton, Esq. of GOODKIND, LABATON & RUDOFF NYC, NY. (femp) Modified on 03/05/1991
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 2/20/1991, Entered: 2/20/1991 Set/Clear Flags
                                                    Consolidated Member Case . Lead Case Number: 1mc90 919 (femp)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 2/20/1991, Entered: 2/20/1991 Set/Clear Flags
                                                      Consolidated Member Case . Lead Case Number: 1mc90 919 (femp)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 2/20/1991, Entered: 2/20/1991 Set/Clear Flags
                                                        Consolidated Member Case . Lead Case Number: 1mc90 919 (femp)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 2/20/1991, Entered: 2/20/1991 Set/Clear Flags
                                                          Consolidated Member Case . Lead Case Number: 1mc90 919 (femp)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 2/20/1991, Entered: 2/20/1991 Set/Clear Flags
                                                            Consolidated Member Case . Lead Case Number: 1mc90 919 (femp)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 2/20/1991, Entered: 2/20/1991 Set/Clear Flags
                                                              Consolidated Member Case . Lead Case Number: 1:90mc919 (femp)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 2/20/1991, Entered: 2/20/1991 Set/Clear Flags
                                                                Consolidated Member Case . Lead Case Number: 1mc90 919 (femp)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 56 Filed: 2/19/1991, Entered: 2/19/1991 Remark
                                                                  SERVICE LIST COMPILED BY COURT. (jo) Modified on 02/20/1991
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 55 Filed: 2/14/1991, Entered: 2/15/1991 Order
                                                                    CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO.2 setting rules for filing, subsequent filings & transferred actions, case captionation, filing and docketing, guidelines for consolidated amended complaints, organization of pltfs' counsel, coordination of pleadings and other documents, exchange of information, preservation of documents, modifications, AND SETTING DATE FOR NEXT CONFERENCE ON WEDNESDAY, MARCH 20th, 1991 AT 1:00PM ( signed by Magistrate Jerome B. Simandle ) [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919(JFG) AND COPIES IN ALL ASSOCIATED ACTIONS] (femp)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 53 Filed: 2/14/1991, Entered: 2/15/1991 Order
                                                                      ORDER, for EDWARD LABATON, ESQ. OF GOODKIND, LABATON & RUDOFF to appear pro hac vice ( signed by Magistrate Jerome B. Simandle ) [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT CONTAINED IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919(JFG)] (femp)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 52 Filed: 2/14/1991, Entered: 2/15/1991 Order
                                                                        ORDER, for JONATHAN PLASSE, ESQ. OF GOODKIND, LABATON & RUDOFF to appear pro hac vice ( signed by Magistrate Jerome B. Simandle ) [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT CONTAINED IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919(JFG)] (femp)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 51 Filed: 2/14/1991, Entered: 2/15/1991 Affidavit
                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF GOOD STANDING Re: admission of EDWARD LABATON to appear pro hac vice. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT IS CONTAINED IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919(JFG)] (femp)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 54 Filed: 2/11/1991, Entered: 2/15/1991 Amended Complaint
                                                                            CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT RELATED TO TAJ MAHAL LITIGATION FILED BY MARK C. RIFKIN, ESQ. OF GREENFIELD & CHIMICLES [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT CONTAINED IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919(JFG)] (This document was rec'd in DNJ's Trenton Office on 2/11/91, and in this office via pouch on 2/14/91.) (femp)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 50 Filed: 2/7/1991, Entered: 2/15/1991 Affidavit
                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF GOOD STANDING Re: admission of JONATHAN PLASSE to appear pro hac vice. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT IS CONTAINED IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919(JFG)] (femp)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 49 Filed: 2/7/1991, Entered: 2/15/1991 Order
                                                                                ORDER, for ROBERT J. RYAN, ESQ. OF WECHSLER, SKIRNICK, HARWOOD, HALEBIAN & FEFFER to appear pro hac vice ( signed by Magistrate Jerome B. Simandle ) [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT CONTAINED IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919(JFG)] (femp)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 48 Filed: 2/7/1991, Entered: 2/15/1991 Order
                                                                                  ORDER, for BRUCE E. GERSTEIN, ESQ. OF GARWIN, BRONZAFT, GERSTEIN & FISHER to appear pro hac vice ( signed by Magistrate Jerome B. Simandle ) [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT CONTAINED IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919(JFG)] (femp)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 47 Filed: 2/7/1991, Entered: 2/15/1991 Order
                                                                                    ORDER, for BERTRAM BRONZAFT, ESQ. OF GARWIN, BRONZAFT, GERSTEIN & FISHER to appear pro hac vice ( signed by Magistrate Jerome B. Simandle ) [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919(JFG)] (femp)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 46 Filed: 2/7/1991, Entered: 2/15/1991 Order
                                                                                      ORDER, for SCOTT W. FISHER, ESQ. OF GARWIN, BRONZAFT, GERSTEIN & FISHER to appear pro hac vice ( signed by Magistrate Jerome B. Simandle ) [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT CONTAINED IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919(JFG)] (femp)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 45 Filed: 2/7/1991, Entered: 2/15/1991 Order
                                                                                        ORDER, for ROBERT S. SCHACHTER, ESQ. OF ZWERLING, SCHACHTER & ZWERLING ID#RS7243 to appear pro hac vice ( signed by Magistrate Jerome B. Simandle ) [ORIGINAL CONTAINED IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919(JFG)] (femp)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 44 Filed: 2/6/1991, Entered: 2/13/1991 Affidavit
                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF GOOD STANDING Re: admission of Robert J. Ryan to appear PRO HAC VICE [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919(JFG)] (femp)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 43 Filed: 2/6/1991, Entered: 2/13/1991 Affidavit
                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF GOOD STANDING Re: Admission of Bruce E. Gerstein to appear PRO HAC VICE [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT IN 1:90mc919(JFG)] (femp)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 42 Filed: 2/6/1991, Entered: 2/13/1991 Affidavit
                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF GOOD STANDING Re: admission of Bertram Bronzaft PRO HAC VICE [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919(JFG)] (femp)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 41 Filed: 2/6/1991, Entered: 2/13/1991 Affidavit
                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF GOOD STANDING Re: admission of Robert S. Schachter to appear Pro hac vice for plaintiffs Cagan, et al. DNJ#1:90cv5051(JFG), and EDNY90-2842(CJP) [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT IS CONTAINED IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919(JFG)] (femp)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 40 Filed: 2/6/1991, Entered: 2/13/1991 Affidavit
                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF GOOD STANDING Re:admission of Scott W. Fisher Pro Hac Vice for Robert and Helen Kloss, et al. (plaintiffs in DNJ#1:91cv19(JFG), EDNY#90-3516 [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT CONTAINED IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919] (femp) Modified on 02/13/1991
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/30/1991, Entered: 2/4/1991 Remark
                                                                                                    CASE RECORD OF SDNY 90cv6202(LBS) "Fairmont Financial v. Trump" RECEIVED IN CAMDEN OFFICE: DNJ#1:91cv18 (note on transmittal letter by SDNY Deputy Glenda Horton indicates that Doc#3 is lost) (femp) Modified on 02/04/1991
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 38 Filed: 1/29/1991, Entered: 1/29/1991 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER, for STUART D. WECHSLER to appear pro hac vice ( signed by Chief Judge John F. Gerry ) [ORIGINAL IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919] (femp)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 37 Filed: 1/29/1991, Entered: 1/29/1991 Affidavit
                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of STUART D. WECHSLER Re: good standing to appear phv. [ORIGINAL IN MASTER FILE 1:90cv919] (proof of service attached). (femp)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 39 Filed: 1/28/1991, Entered: 2/1/1991 Order
                                                                                                          ORDER, for STUART J. BASKIN, ESQ. to appear pro hac vice ( signed by Magistrate Jerome B. Simandle ) [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919] (femp)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 1/28/1991, Entered: 1/28/1991 Remark
                                                                                                            SDNY DOCKET OF "Fairmont Financial V. Trump" SDNY#90-6202(SAND) received in Camden by Fax in order to complete JS5 report to Washington. Case opened in DNJ as 1:91cv18(JFG), and made part of MDL864, MASTER DOCKET NUMBER 1:90mc919. (femp)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 36 Filed: 1/24/1991, Entered: 1/28/1991 Order
                                                                                                              ORDER, for RICHARD L. POSEN, ESQ. to appear pro hac vice ( signed by Magistrate Jerome B. Simandle ) [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT IS CONTAINED IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919] (femp)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 35 Filed: 1/24/1991, Entered: 1/28/1991 Affidavit
                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF RICHARD L. POSEN Re: good standing to plead [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT IS CONTAINED IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919] (femp)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/22/1991, Entered: 1/22/1991 Remark
                                                                                                                  CASE RECORD OF EDNY 90cv3516(TJP) "Kloss V. Trump" RECEIVED IN CAMDEN OFFICE, DNJ# is 1:91cv19 (femp)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/17/1991, Entered: 1/17/1991 Remark
                                                                                                                    CASE RECORD OF SDNY 90cv6534(LBS) "Glossner V. Trump" RECEIVED IN CAMDEN OFFICE DNJ# is 1:91cv20. (femp)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 34 Filed: 1/16/1991, Entered: 1/28/1991 Affidavit
                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Alan E. Lasak Re: service of Affidavit of Good Standing for STUART J. BASKIN, ESQ. of SHEARMAN & STERLING, NYC, NY [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT IN LEAD CASE FILE 1:90mc919] (femp)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 33 Filed: 1/11/1991, Entered: 1/22/1991 Order
                                                                                                                        ORDER admitting Robert B. Matusoff to serve as Plaintiff Schwartz's counsel in this action ( signed by Magistrate Jerome B. Simandle ) [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT CONTAINED IN 1:90mc919, MASTER FILE] (femp) Modified on 01/22/1991
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 32 Filed: 1/11/1991, Entered: 1/22/1991 Affidavit
                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF ROBERT B. MATUSOFF of GENE MESH & ASSOC. Re: Admission to plead before the court. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT IS CONTAINED IN 1:90mc919, MASTER FILE FOR MDL 864] (femp) Modified on 01/22/1991
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 31 Filed: 1/11/1991, Entered: 1/22/1991 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                            Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: Mr. Ted Formaroli; Minutes of: 1.11.91; The following actions were taken: Attorney Attendence sheet was distributed, counsel present, but not "of record" as of this date are Richard D. Greenfield for Fairmont Financial, Robert Matusoff for Schwartz, Stuart Baskin & David Bradford for Merrill Lynch, M. Richard Komins & Robert A. Hoffman for Glossner & Krange, Carl Poplar for Cagan, and Mark Rifkin for Fairmont Financial (list is attached to this minute entry). Hearing was focussed on the appointment of lead counsel, ORDER TO BE SUBMITTED. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT IS CONTAINED IN LEAD CASE FILE 1:90mc919] (femp) Modified on 01/22/1991
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 30 Filed: 1/11/1991, Entered: 1/11/1991 Affidavit
                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF GOOD STANDING for Stuart J. Baskin of SHEARMAN & STERLING of NYC [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919] (femp) Modified on 01/22/1991
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 1/11/1991, Entered: 1/16/1991 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of ROBERT B. MATUSOFF (ln)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 29 Filed: 1/8/1991, Entered: 1/10/1991 Remark
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF ADDITION OF TAG-A-LONG ACTIONS: "Fairmont Finanancial Vs. Trump" DNJ#1:91cv18; "Kloss Vs. Trump" DNJ#1:91cv19; "Glossner Vs. Trump" DNJ#1:91cv20; {ORIGINAL DOCUMENT IS CONTAINED IN MASTER FILE 1:90cv919] Service list as of 1/8/91 is attached; copies sent to all counsel. (femp) Modified on 01/11/1991
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 28 Filed: 1/8/1991, Entered: 1/8/1991 Order
                                                                                                                                    ORDER (CERTIFIED COPY) OF THE PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION, transferring case SDNY 90-6534 "Glosser v. Trump" FROM SDNY TO THE DISTRICT OF NEW JERSEY [DOCUMENT CONTAINED IN MASTER FILE 1:91mc919] (femp)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 27 Filed: 1/8/1991, Entered: 1/8/1991 Order
                                                                                                                                      ORDER (CERTIFIED COPY) OF THE PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION, transferring case EDNY 90-3516 "Kloss v. Trump" from the EDNY to THE DISTRICT OF NEW JERSEY [DOCUMENT CONTAINED IN MASTER FILE 1:90cv919] (femp)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 26 Filed: 1/8/1991, Entered: 1/8/1991 Order
                                                                                                                                        ORDER (CERTIFIED COPY) OF THE PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION, transferring case SDNY 90-6202 "Fairmont v. Trump FROM EDNY TO THE DISTRICT OF NEW JERSEY. [DOCUMENT IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919] (femp) Modified on 01/28/1991
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 25 Filed: 1/4/1991, Entered: 1/4/1991, Terminated: 6/25/1992 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by SIDNEY L. KAUFMAN in 1:90-mc-00919, JEROME SCHWARTZ in 1:90-mc-00919 to GREENFIELD & CHIMICLES' motion for appointment as plaintiffs' interim lead counsel and APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CO-LEAD COUNSEL [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT CONTAINTED IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919] (femp)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 24 Filed: 1/2/1991, Entered: 1/2/1991 Remark
                                                                                                                                            DISCOVERY MEMORANDUM OF PLAINTIFFS submitted by Michael A. Cohan, Esq. of COHAN & ECKHAUS, Parlin, NJ. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT IS CONTAINED IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919] (femp) Modified on 01/02/1991
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 23 Filed: 12/26/1990, Entered: 12/26/1990 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Glenn C. Mariano of WECHSLER, SKIRNICK, ETC. re: correction of pleading #4. [DOCUMENT CONTAINED IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919] (femp) Modified on 12/26/1990
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 22 Filed: 12/21/1990, Entered: 12/26/1990 Response in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE of PETER STUYVESANT, LTD. in support of GREENFIELD & CHIMICLES' motion for appointment as plaintiff's lead counsel. [DOCUMENT CONTAINED IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919] (femp) Modified on 12/26/1990
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 21 Filed: 12/21/1990, Entered: 12/26/1990 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of STUART D. WECHSLER in opposition to Greenfield & Chimicles' motion to appoint an interim lead counsel for plaintiffs. [DOCUMENT CONTAINED IN MASTER FILE 1:90MC919] (femp) Modified on 12/26/1990
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 19 Filed: 12/20/1990, Entered: 12/20/1990 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Allocation and Assignment filed. Magistrate JEROME B. SIMANDLE to handle discovery. "Tag-along" action 1:90cv5052 added. [DOCUMENT IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919] (femp) Modified on 12/26/1990
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 20 Filed: 12/17/1990, Entered: 12/21/1990 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER & CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1 -- establishing MDL filing procedures; setting discovery memo due date for 1/1/91; staying pending discovery; extending answer due dates; commanding counsel and parties to preserve documents; designating JEROME B. SIMANDLE, U.S. MAGISTRATE to perform all pretrial jusicial duties relating to case management, etc.; and setting Status conference 2:00 1/11/91 in 1:90-mc-00919, in 1:90-cv-02349, in 1:90-cv-02350, in 1:90-cv-05004 ; ( signed by Chief Judge John F. Gerry ) [DOCUMENT IN MASTER FILE 1:90MC919] ATTACHMENTS: Meeting agenda, service list. (femp) Modified on 12/21/1990
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 10/29/1990, Entered: 10/29/1990 Set/Clear Flags
                                                                                                                                                        Consolidated Member Case . Lead Case Number: 90-cv-2349 (lc)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 10/23/1990, Entered: 10/29/1990 Order
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER consolidating this action with civ.90-2349 for discovery purposes. ( signed by Magistrate Joel B. Rosen ) (See Civil 90-2349) (lc)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 9/28/1990, Entered: 9/28/1990 Remark
                                                                                                                                                            Odd-numbered case transferred to magistrate Rosen from Magristrate Simandle. (lc)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 18 Filed: 9/24/1990, Entered: 9/24/1990 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                              Minutes of: 9/24/90; The following actions were taken, granting [7-1] motion for the admission of Howard A. Specter, Esq., and David J. Manogue to appear pro hac vice (lc)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 17 Filed: 9/24/1990, Entered: 9/24/1990 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                Minutes of: 9/24/90; The following actions were taken, granting [9-1] motion for an order admitting Gene I. Mesh, Esq., Michael G. Kohn, Esq., Edward A. Zumbiel, Esq. and Michael M. Odioso, Esq. to appear pro hac vice (lc)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 16 Filed: 9/24/1990, Entered: 9/24/1990 Order
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [9-1] motion for an order admitting Howard A. Specter, Esq., David J. Manogue, Esq., Gene I. Mesh, Esq., Edward A. Zumbiel, Esq. and Michael M. Odioso, Esq. to appear pro hac vice on behalf of plaintiff. ( signed by Magistrate Jerome B. Simandle ) (lc)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 15 Filed: 9/19/1990, Entered: 9/19/1990 Order
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, set scheduling conference for 9:30 10/23/90 ( signed by Magistrate Jerome B. Simandle ) (lc)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 14 Filed: 9/18/1990, Entered: 9/19/1990 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER/CONSENT extending time to answer for a period of 20 days, reset answer due for 10/3/90 for CASTLE FUNDING, for CASTLE ASSOCIATES, for TAJ MAHAL FUNDING, for TAJ MAHAL ASSOCIATES, for DONALD J. TRUMP ( signed by Chief Judge John F. Gerry ) (lc)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 13 Filed: 8/29/1990, Entered: 8/29/1990 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Michael M. Odioso in support of motion to admit counsel pro hac vice. (lc)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 12 Filed: 8/29/1990, Entered: 8/29/1990 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Edward A. Zumbiel in support of motion to appear counsel pro hac vice. (lc)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 11 Filed: 8/29/1990, Entered: 8/29/1990 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of Michael G. Kohn in support of motion to admit counsel pro hac vice. (lc)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 10 Filed: 8/29/1990, Entered: 8/29/1990 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Gene I. Mesh in support of motion to admit counsel pro hac vice. (lc)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 9 Filed: 8/29/1990, Entered: 8/29/1990, Terminated: 9/24/1990 Motion for Limited Admission
                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of MOTION by pltf. JEROME SCHWARTZ for an order admitting Gene I. Mesh, Esq., Michael G. Kohn, Esq., Edward A. Zumbiel, Esq. and Michael M. Odioso, Esq. to appear pro hac vice , Motion hearing set for 9:30 9/21/90 on [9-1] motion (Certificate of Service attached thereto) (lc)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 8/23/1990, Entered: 8/24/1990 Motion to Certify Class
                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of MOTION by pltf. JEROME SCHWARTZ to certify class action , Motion hearing set for 9:30 on 9/21/90 on [8-1] motion .(Certificate of Service attached thereto) BRIEF (lc) Modified on 08/24/1990
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 8/23/1990, Entered: 8/24/1990 Motion for Limited Admission
                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of MOTION by pltf. JEROME SCHWARTZ for the admission of Howard A. Specter, Esq., and David J. Manogue to appear pro hac vice , Motion hearing set for 9:30 on 9/21/90 on [7-1] motion with affidavits of Howard A. Specter and David J. Manogue and Certificate of Service attached thereto. (lc)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 8/3/1990, Entered: 8/7/1990 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons and complaint executed as to deft. TAJ MAHAL ASSOCIATES on 6/22/90 Answer due on 7/12/90 for TAJ MAHAL ASSOCIATES . (lc)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 8/3/1990, Entered: 8/7/1990 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE of Summmons and Complaint executed as to deft. TAJ MAHAL ASSOCIATES on 6/22/90 Answer due on 7/12/90 for TAJ MAHAL FUNDING. (lc)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 8/3/1990, Entered: 8/7/1990 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE od Summons and Complaint executed as to deft. CASTLE ASSOCIATES on 6/22/90 Answer due on 7/12/90 for CASTLE ASSOCIATES. (lc)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 8/3/1990, Entered: 8/7/1990 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                            RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint executed as to deft. CASTLE FUNDING on 6/22/90 Answer due on 7/12/90 for CASTLE FUNDING. (lc)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 6/20/1990, Entered: 6/20/1990 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Allocation and Assignment filed. Magistrate JEROME B. SIMANDLE (femp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 6/18/1990, Entered: 6/20/1990 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS(ES) issued for CASTLE FUNDING, CASTLE ASSOCIATES, TAJ MAHAL FUNDING, TAJ MAHAL ASSOCIATES, DONALD J. TRUMP (20) and returned to counsel for service. (femp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 6/15/1990, Entered: 6/20/1990 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT filed;; jury demand FILING FEE $ 120 RECEIPT # 125265 (femp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 113 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?