TRUMPS CASTLE ASSOC v. TRAVELERS EXPRESS, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 1:90-cv-02855-JFG

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Trump's Castle Associates, LP Trump's Castle Associates, LP, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "TRUMP'S CASTLE ASSOCIATES LIMITED PARTNERSHIP"

Toggle Switch Represented by Levine Staller Sklar Chan Brown & Donnelly, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ARTHUR EDMUND SKLAR +1 609 348 1300
v.
No Logo JOHN KAS-MIKHA, Defendant
No Logo Travelers Express Company, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sedgwick LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JOSEPH F FALGIANI +1 973 242 0002 joseph.falgiani@sdma.com
No Logo JOHN KAS-MIKHA, Cross-Defendant
No Logo Travelers Express Company, Inc., Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sedgwick LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JOSEPH F FALGIANI +1 973 242 0002 joseph.falgiani@sdma.com
Office Camden
Filed 7/24/1990
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 140 - Contract - Injunction (Post Award)
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Account Receivable
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Atlantic
Terminated 2/19/1993
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 92-5440[]
Def Custody Status
Flags 12BG, CLOSED
  Entries (77) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 2/19/1993, Entered: 2/19/1993 Terminated Case
Case closed (femp)
    LREF
    Blank 54 Filed: 12/30/1992, Entered: 12/30/1992 Writ Returned
    WRIT of Execution returned unexecuted filed (femp)
      LREF
      Blank 53 Filed: 10/1/1992, Entered: 10/23/1992 USCA Order (Terms Appeal)
      Certified Copy Of Clerk's Order from the USCA. Re: dismissing appeal pursuant to Rule 42(b) without prejudice and without costs to either party (sa)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 8/27/1992, Entered: 8/27/1992, Terminated: 2/19/1993 Appeal Record Sent to USCA
        Record on appeal sent to U.S. Court of Appeals: [50-1] appeal (sa)
          LREF
          Blank 52 Filed: 8/17/1992, Entered: 8/27/1992 Transcript Request
          Transcript Purchase Order RE: [50-1] appeal-Unnecessary for purposes of appeal (sa)
            LREF
            Blank 51 Filed: 8/17/1992, Entered: 8/27/1992 USCA Notice of Docketing ROA
            NOTICE of Docketing ROA from USCA Re: [50-1] appeal USCA NUMBER: 92-5440 (sa)
              LREF
              Blank 50 Filed: 8/5/1992, Entered: 8/7/1992 Notice of Appeal (USCA)
              NOTICE OF APPEAL filed at 9:59AM by TRUMPS CASTLE ASSOC Fee Status: paid. Copies of notice of appeal sent to USCA and Attorney(s): (TPO Issued) (sa)
                LREF
                Blank 49 Filed: 7/8/1992, Entered: 7/9/1992 OrderCourt Filing
                OPINION AND ORDER granting defendant Travelers Express Company, Inc.'s [40-1] motion for Summary judgment on Counts Two and Three of the Complaint. (signed by Chief Judge John F. Gerry) (lc)
                  LREF
                  Blank 48 Filed: 6/5/1992, Entered: 6/8/1992 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                  Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: Ted Formaroli; Minutes of: ; The following actions were taken, granting [40-1] motion for summary judgment, Opinion and Order to be submitted. Terminating [40-2] hearing Motion hearing set for 9:30 5/1/92 on [40-1] motion (By Chief Judge John F. Gerry) (lc)
                    LREF
                    Blank 47 Filed: 5/8/1992, Entered: 5/11/1992 Certificate Of Service.
                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re: Reply Brief of Travelers Express in support of motion for summary judgment. (lc)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 5/6/1992, Entered: 5/6/1992 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                      Deadline updated; Motion hearing set for 9:30 6/5/92 for [40-1] motion for summary judgment (femp)
                        LREF
                        Blank 46 Filed: 5/1/1992, Entered: 5/4/1992 Certificate Of Service.
                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of plaintiff's brief in opposition to the motion of defendants for Summary Judgment, etc. (lc)
                          LREF
                          Blank 45 Filed: 5/1/1992, Entered: 5/1/1992 Miscellaneous Document
                          PLINTIFF'S LOCAL RULE 12 (G) STATEMENT. (lc)
                            LREF
                            Blank 44 Filed: 5/1/1992, Entered: 5/1/1992 Certification
                            CERTIFICATION of Benjamin Zeltner in opposition to defendant's motion for summary judgment on counts two and three of the complaint. (lc)
                              LREF
                              Blank 43 Filed: 4/13/1992, Entered: 4/16/1992 Certificate Of Service.
                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re: Notice of motion for Summary Judgment of defendant Travelers Express Company, Inc. (lc)
                                LREF
                                Blank 42 Filed: 4/7/1992, Entered: 4/8/1992 Certification
                                CERTIFICATION of Stephen Marinko Re: [40-1] motion for summary judgment. (lc) Modified on 04/14/1992
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 41 Filed: 4/7/1992, Entered: 4/8/1992 Miscellaneous Document
                                  STATEMENT OF JOSEPH F. FALGIANI PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 12G. (lc) Modified on 04/14/1992
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 40 Filed: 4/7/1992, Entered: 4/8/1992, Terminated: 7/8/1992 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                    Notice of MOTION for summary judgment by deft. TRAVELERS EXPRESS COMPANY, INC., Motion hearing set for 9:30 5/1/92 on [40-1] motion . (BRIEF SUBMITTED) "ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED" (lc) Modified on 04/14/1992
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 39 Filed: 4/7/1992, Entered: 4/8/1992 OrderCourt Filing
                                      OPINION & Order denying plaintiff's motion for reconsideration of Opinion and order of 11/22/91. ( signed by Chief Judge John F. Gerry ) (lc) Modified on 04/14/1992
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 38 Filed: 4/3/1992, Entered: 4/3/1992 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                        Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: Ted Formaroli; Minutes of: 4/3/92; The following actions were taken, denying [37-1] motion for reargument/reconsideration of the Court's Order dated 11/22/91 pursuant to Rule 12I, Opinion & Order to be submitted. Terminating [36-2] hearing Motion hearing set for 9:30 1/3/92 on [36-1] motion By Chief Judge John F. Gerry (lc) Modified on 04/14/1992
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 3/23/1992, Entered: 3/23/1992 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                          Deadline updated; Motion hearing set for 9:30 4/3/92 for [36-1] motion for reargument/reconsideration of the Court's Order dated 11/22/91 pursuant to Rule 12I (femp)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 3/10/1992, Entered: 3/10/1992 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                            Deadline updated; Motion hearing set for 9:30 3/20/92 for [35-1] motion for reargument/reconsideration of the Court's Order dated 11/22/91 pursuant to Rule 12I (lc)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 1/28/1992, Entered: 1/28/1992 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                              Deadline updated; Motion hearing set for 9:30 3/6/92 for [35-1] motion for reargument/reconsideration of the Court's Order dated 11/22/91 pursuant to Rule 12I (lc)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 12/11/1991, Entered: 12/11/1991 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                Deadline updated; Motion hearing set for 9:30 1/3/92 for [35-1] motion for reargument/reconsideration of the Court's Order dated 11/22/91 pursuant to Rule 12I (lc)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 37 Filed: 12/4/1991, Entered: 12/10/1991 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                  Notice of MOTION for reargument/reconsideration of the Court's Order dated 11/22/91 pursuant to Rule 12I by pltf. TRUMPS CASTLE ASSOC, Motion hearing set for 9:30 1/3/92 on [37-1] motion . (Certificate of Service attached thereto) LETTER MEMORANDUM SUBMITTED. (lc) Modified on 04/14/1992
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 36 Filed: 11/22/1991, Entered: 3/10/1992 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    Order denying plaintiff's [28-1] Cross motion for summary judgment; and Granting defendant Travelers Express motion for Summary Judgment as to Count One of the complaint but Denied as to Counts Two and Three of the complaint. (signed by Chief Judge John F. Gerry ) (lc) Modified on 04/14/1992
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 35 Filed: 11/22/1991, Entered: 11/25/1991 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      OPINION ( signed by Chief Judge John F. Gerry ) (lc) Modified on 04/14/1992
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 34 Filed: 10/18/1991, Entered: 10/21/1991 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                        Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: Ted Formaroli; Minutes of: 10/18/91; The following actions were taken, [28-1] motion for summary judgment, DECISION RESERVED. By Chief Judge John F. Gerry (lc) Modified on 04/14/1992
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 33 Filed: 10/10/1991, Entered: 10/10/1991 Letter
                                                          LETTER request by TRUMPS CASTLE ASSOC for issuance of a writ of execution. (am) Modified on 04/14/1992
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 10/10/1991, Entered: 10/10/1991 Writ Issued
                                                            WRIT of execution issued & recorded in Book "PP", Page 48 of Executions. (Sent to U.S. Marshal - Newark) (am)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 32 Filed: 8/7/1991, Entered: 8/8/1991 Certificate Of Service.
                                                              CERTIFICATION OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Supplemental Letter Brief. (lc) Modified on 04/14/1992
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 31 Filed: 6/10/1991, Entered: 6/12/1991 Affidavit
                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Service Brief in opposition to plaintiff's cross-motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Certification and Proposed Order. (lc) Modified on 04/14/1992
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 30 Filed: 6/10/1991, Entered: 6/12/1991 Certification
                                                                  CERTIFICATION of Joseph F. Falgiani, Esq. in support of Travelers Express's Opposition to plaintiff's motion for Summary Judgment. (lc) Modified on 04/14/1992
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 29 Filed: 5/10/1991, Entered: 5/14/1991 Remark
                                                                    PLAINTIFF'S LOCAL RULE 12G STATEMENT OF UNCONTESTED FACTS. (lc) Modified on 04/14/1992
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 28 Filed: 5/10/1991, Entered: 5/14/1991, Terminated: 11/22/1991 Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                      Notice of MOTION by pltf. TRUMPS CASTLE ASSOC for summary judgment [28-1] motion referred to Chief Judge John F. Gerry, Motion hearing set for 9:30 6/7/91 on [28-1] motion .(Certificate of Service thereto) (BRIEF) ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED (lc) Modified on 04/14/1992
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 27 Filed: 4/4/1991, Entered: 4/5/1991 Order
                                                                        LETTER OPINION AND ORDER denying plaintiff's motion to strike defendant's answer or in the alternative to compel discovery and award counsel fees, and denying cross motion by Travelers Express for attorney fees and for a protective order. ( signed by Magistrate Jerome B. Simandle ) (lc) Modified on 04/14/1992
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 26 Filed: 4/4/1991, Entered: 4/5/1991 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                          Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: none; Minutes of: 4/4/91; The following actions were taken, denying without prejudice [20-1] motion to strike defendant's answer or in the alternative to compel discovery and award counsel fees. [20-1] motion, Letter Opinion & Order to be entered. (Simandle) (lc) Modified on 04/14/1992
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 25 Filed: 4/4/1991, Entered: 4/5/1991 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                            Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: none; Minutes of: 4/4/91; The following actions were taken, denying [23-1] cross motion for attorney fees and for a protective order, Letter Opinion & Order to be entered. (Simandle) (lc) Modified on 04/14/1992
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 24 Filed: 2/20/1991, Entered: 2/22/1991 Certification
                                                                              CERTIFICATION of Joseph F. Falgiani in support of defendant's opposition to plaintiff's Discovery motion and in support of defendant's motion for attorneys' fees and a protective order. (lc) Modified on 04/14/1992
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 23 Filed: 2/20/1991, Entered: 2/22/1991 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                Notice of CROSS MOTION by TRAVELERS EXPRESS for attorney fees and for a protective order , Motion hearing set for 9:30 3/1/91 on [23 -1] cross motion (Affidavit of Service attached thereto) MEMO (lc) Modified on 04/14/1992
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 22 Filed: 2/11/1991, Entered: 2/11/1991 Remark
                                                                                  CORRECTED NOTICE OF MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT'S ANSWER OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO COMPEL DISCOVERY AND AWARD COUNSEL FEES. (lc) Modified on 04/14/1992
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 21 Filed: 2/7/1991, Entered: 2/7/1991 Certification
                                                                                    CERTIFICATION of Pamela J. Saunders. (lc) Modified on 04/14/1992
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 20 Filed: 2/7/1991, Entered: 2/7/1991, Terminated: 4/4/1991 Motion to Strike
                                                                                      Notice of MOTION by pltf. TRUMPS CASTLE ASSOC to strike defendant's answer or in the alternative to compel discovery and award counsel fees. [20-1] motion , Motion hearing set for 9:30 on 3/1/91 on [20-1] motion . (Certificate of Service attached thereto) (MEMO) (lc) Modified on 04/14/1992
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 2/7/1991, Entered: 2/7/1991 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                        Deadline updated; Motion hearing set for 9:30 3/1/91 for [19-1] motion to strike defendant's answer or in the alternative to compel discovery and award counsel fees. [19-1] motion (lc)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 19 Filed: 11/16/1990, Entered: 11/19/1990 Order
                                                                                          DISCOVERY ORDER ( signed by Magistrate Jerome B. Simandle ) (lc) Modified on 04/14/1992
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 11/1/1990, Entered: 11/2/1990 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Brief in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, supporting certifications and Local rule 12G Statement. (See Civil 90-1852) (lc) Modified on 11/02/1990
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 11/1/1990, Entered: 11/2/1990 Remark
                                                                                              Plaintiff's LocaL Rule 12G Statement. (See Civil 90-1852) (lc) Modified on 03/10/1992
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 11/1/1990, Entered: 11/2/1990 Certification
                                                                                                CERTIFICATION of Pamela J. Saunders Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 56(f) (See Civil 90-1852) (lc) Modified on 11/02/1990
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 11/1/1990, Entered: 11/2/1990 Certification
                                                                                                  CERTIFICATION of Antonette Cafone in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment. (See civil 90-1852) (lc)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 10/24/1990, Entered: 10/24/1990 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE/PROOF OF SERVICE OF AFFIDAVIT, LOCAL RULE 12G STATEMENT AND BRIEF. (SEE CIVIL 90-1852) (lc)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 18 Filed: 10/18/1990, Entered: 10/19/1990 Order
                                                                                                      ORDER vacating [15-1] order reset answers to interrogatories due for deft. TRAVELERS EXPRESS on 11/29/90 ( signed by Magistrate Jerome B. Simandle ) (lc) Modified on 04/14/1992
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 10/18/1990, Entered: 10/24/1990 Remark
                                                                                                        LOCAL RULE 12G STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF THE OPPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF ATLANTIC CITY SHOWBOAT'S INC. TO THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (SEE CIVIL 90-1852) (lc)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 10/18/1990, Entered: 10/24/1990 Affidavit
                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Robert Kahler in Support of Opposition to Summary Judgment Motion. (See Civil 90-1852) (lc) Modified on 10/24/1990
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 10/5/1990, Entered: 10/15/1990 Affidavit
                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of Joseph Federowicz in support of motion for Summary Judgment. (See Civ. 90-1852) (lc)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 10/5/1990, Entered: 10/15/1990 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                              Notice of MOTION by TRAVELERS EXPRESS for summary judgment , Motion hearing set for 9:30 11/2/90 on [0-1] motion with Local Rule 12G Statement and Certificate of Service attached thereto. (BRIEF) ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED. See Civil 90-1852). (lc)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 17 Filed: 10/3/1990, Entered: 10/4/1990 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                Minutes of: 10-1-90; The following actions were taken, granting [10-1] motion to extend time to respond to plaintiff's interrogatories and documents. (lc) Modified on 04/14/1992
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 16 Filed: 10/1/1990, Entered: 10/1/1990, Terminated: 10/18/1990 Order
                                                                                                                  ORDER granting defendant Travelers Express Company, Inc. 60 days to respond to plaintiff's discovery request, from the date of the entry of this order., reset answers to interrogatories due for deft. TRAVELERS EXPRESS on 11/29/90 ( signed by Magistrate Jerome B. Simandle ) (lc) Modified on 04/14/1992
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 9/26/1990, Entered: 9/26/1990 Set/Clear Flags
                                                                                                                    Consolidated Member Case . Lead Case Number: Civ-90-1852 (lc)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 15 Filed: 9/24/1990, Entered: 9/26/1990 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER/CONSENT extending time to answer interrogatories and document demand , reset answers to interrogatories by TRUMPS CASTLE ASSOC due for TRAVELERS EXPRESS until 10/10/90 ( signed by Chief Judge John F. Gerry ) (lc)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 9/24/1990, Entered: 9/26/1990 Order
                                                                                                                        ORDER/CONSENT, consolidating this case with civil 90-1852 for pre-trial and discovery purposes only ( signed by Chief Judge John F. Gerry ) (See Civil 90-1852) (lc) Modified on 09/26/1990
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 9/17/1990, Entered: 9/17/1990, Terminated: 3/1/2004 Motion to Withdraw
                                                                                                                          WITHDRAWAL of [12-1] motion to extend time to respond to plaintiff's interrogatories and documents. (lc)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 14 Filed: 9/13/1990, Entered: 9/17/1990 Remark
                                                                                                                            Letter requesting a withdrawal of motion for an order extending time to respond to plaintiff's interrogatories. (lc)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 9/10/1990, Entered: 9/10/1990 Default -Judgment
                                                                                                                              DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of plaintiff, TRUMPS CASTLE ASSOC and against deft. JOHN KAS-MIKHA in the amount of $216,800 with Costs in the amount of $120.00. (lc) Modified on 09/17/1990
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 12 Filed: 9/10/1990, Entered: 9/10/1990 Order
                                                                                                                                ORDER, set scheduling conference for 12:00 11/1/90 ( signed by Magistrate Joel B. Rosen ) (lc) Modified on 09/17/1990
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 9/10/1990, Entered: 9/10/1990 Clerks Entry of Default*
                                                                                                                                  DEFAULT ENTERED as to deft. JOHN KAS-MIKHA FOR FAILURE TO PLEAD OR OTHERWISE DEFEND. (lc) Modified on 09/10/1990
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 11 Filed: 9/7/1990, Entered: 9/12/1990 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Joseph F. Falgiani in support of motion to extend time to answer interrogatories and documents. (lc) Modified on 09/17/1990
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 10 Filed: 9/7/1990, Entered: 9/12/1990 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                      Notice of MOTION by deft. TRAVELERS EXPRESS to extend time to respond to plaintiff's interrogatories and documents , Motion hearing set for 9:30 on 10/5/90 on [10-1] motion (CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ATTACHED THERETO) LETTER BRIEF (lc) Modified on 09/17/1990
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 9 Filed: 9/4/1990, Entered: 9/10/1990 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Service of Answer of deft. Travelers Express Company, Inc. (lc) Modified on 09/10/1990
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 8 Filed: 9/4/1990, Entered: 9/10/1990 Answer
                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to complaint and CROSSCLAIM by deft. TRAVELERS EXPRESS against deft. JOHN KAS-MIKHA. (lc) Modified on 09/10/1990
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 7 Filed: 8/31/1990, Entered: 9/10/1990 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of amount due and Non Military Service. (lc) Modified on 09/10/1990
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 6 Filed: 8/31/1990, Entered: 9/10/1990 request for default
                                                                                                                                              REQUEST BY TRUMPS CASTLE ASSOC FOR DEFAULT AGAINST JOHN KAS-MIKHA FOR FAILURE TO PLEAD OR OTHERWISE DEFEND W/ CERTIFICATION OF PAMELA J. SAUNDERS ATTACHED THERETO. (lc) Modified on 09/10/1990
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 5 Filed: 8/24/1990, Entered: 8/24/1990 Acknowledgment of Service
                                                                                                                                                ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint as to deft. TRAVELERS EXPRESS on 8/14/90. Answer due on 9/3/90 for TRAVELERS EXPRESS. (lc)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 8/24/1990, Entered: 8/24/1990 Acknowledgment of Service
                                                                                                                                                  ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint as to deft. JOHN KAS-MIKHA on 8/17/90. Answer due on 9/6/90 for JOHN KAS-MIKHA. (lc)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 8/24/1990, Entered: 8/24/1990 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATION RE: SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT, Kas-mikha on 8-l7-90, Travelers Express Company, Inc. on 8-14-90. (lc)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 7/24/1990, Entered: 7/24/1990 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Allocation and Assignment filed. Magistrate Joel B. Rosen (CAMDEN-GERRY) (dv)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 7/24/1990, Entered: 7/24/1990 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT filed; FILING FEE $ 120.00 RECEIPT # 125427 (dv)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 7/24/1990, Entered: 7/24/1990 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS(ES) issued for TRAVELERS EXPRESS, JOHN KAS-MIKHA, thirty-five days, and returned to counsel for service. (dv)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 79 times.

                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?