Barsky v. Arthur Andersen LLP
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Southern District Court, Case No. 4:02-cv-01922
District Judge Melinda Harmon, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 15, 2019 at 7:29 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by McKool Smith, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Charles W Cunningham +1 214 978 4000 +1 214 978 4044

Toggle Switch Represented by McKool Smith, PC - Houston

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lewis Titus LeClair +1 214 978 4000 +1 214 978 4044 lleclair@mckoolsmith.com
No Logo Rick Barsky, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 280

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Daniel David Horowitz, III +1 832 460 5181 +1 832 266 1478 daniel@ddhlawyers.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Roberts Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 12/07/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY Sean Alan Roberts +1 713 630 0900 sr@therobertsfirm.com
v.
No Logo Andrew S Fastow, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Smyser Kaplan Veslka

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Craig Smyser +1 713 221 2330 +1 713 221 2320 csmyser@skv.com
No Logo Arthur Andersen LLP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Rusty Hardin and Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 11/06/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 11/06/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY Russell Hardin, Jr. +1 713 652 9000 +1 713 652 9800

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 420

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY George W Billy Shepherd, III +1 713 955 4440 +1 713 766 6542 bshepherd@spmlegal.com
No Logo Ben F Glisan, Jr, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Entity EP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Tom P Allen +1 832 393 6411 tom.allen@houstontx.gov
No Logo Bruce Willison, Defendant
No Logo Charles A Lemaistre, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibbs & Bruns, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Robin C Gibbs +1 713 650 8805 +1 713 750 0903 rgibbs@gibbs-bruns.com
No Logo Charles E Walker, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibbs & Bruns, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Robin C Gibbs +1 713 650 8805 +1 713 750 0903 rgibbs@gibbs-bruns.com
No Logo Cindy K Olson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McGuireWoods LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Jacks C Nickens +1 713 353 6668 +1 713 571 9652 jnickens@mcguirewoods.com
Citigroup, Inc. Citigroup, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Chippac, Inc.
Unknown Role, Amis Holdings, Inc.
Citibank, NA Unknown Role, Citibank, NA
Unknown Role, Keane, Inc.
Unknown Role, Macdermid Inc.
Unknown Role, CITICORP
Unknown Role, Imc Mortgage Co
Unknown Role, Fashion Dynamics Corp
Unknown Role, Pfs Services Inc
Unknown Role, Citicorp Banking Corp
Unknown Role, Intersil Holding Co
Unknown Role, Citigroup Holdings Co
Unknown Role, Cvc Partners LLC
Unknown Role, Ness Technologies Inc
Unknown Role, Primerica, Inc.
Unknown Role, Student Loan Corp
Unknown Role, Pacholder Fund Inc
Unknown Role, Munienhanced Fund Inc
Unknown Role, Salomon Inc
Unknown Role, Jones Energy, Inc.
No Logo D Stephen Goddard, Jr, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cruse Scott et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 02/23/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY Billy Jack Shepherd +1 713 650 6600 +1 713 650 1720

Toggle Switch Represented by Rusty Hardin and Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 11/06/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 11/06/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY Russell Hardin, Jr. +1 713 652 9000 +1 713 652 9800

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 420

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY George W Billy Shepherd, III +1 713 955 4440 +1 713 766 6542 bshepherd@spmlegal.com
No Logo David Duncan, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon & Rees LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Barry G. Flynn +1 713 961 3366 +1 713 961 3938 bflynn@gordonrees.com
No Logo Frank Savage, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibbs & Bruns, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Robin C Gibbs +1 713 650 8805 +1 713 750 0903 rgibbs@gibbs-bruns.com
No Logo Herbert S Winokur, Jr, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibbs & Bruns, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Robin C Gibbs +1 713 650 8805 +1 713 750 0903 rgibbs@gibbs-bruns.com
No Logo J P Morgan Chase & Co, Defendant
No Logo James V Derrick, Jr, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by bracewelllaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY J Clifford Gunter, III +1 713 221 1213 +1 713 221 2164 clifford.gunter@BracewellLaw.com
No Logo Jeffrey K Skilling, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shannon M. Barrett +1 202 383 5308 +1 202 383 5414 sbarrett@omm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Daniel M. Petrocelli +1 310 553 6700 +1 213 430 6407 dpetrocelli@omm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Slsdrvrs,hlprs,dairy Workers 683

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Bruce Hiler +1 202 383 5300 +1 202 383 5414
No Logo Jeffrey McMahon, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McGuireWoods LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Jacks C Nickens +1 713 353 6668 +1 713 571 9652 jnickens@mcguirewoods.com
No Logo Jerome J Meyer, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibbs & Bruns, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Robin C Gibbs +1 713 650 8805 +1 713 750 0903 rgibbs@gibbs-bruns.com
No Logo Joe H Foy, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibbs & Bruns, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Robin C Gibbs +1 713 650 8805 +1 713 750 0903 rgibbs@gibbs-bruns.com
No Logo John H Duncan, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibbs & Bruns, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Robin C Gibbs +1 713 650 8805 +1 713 750 0903 rgibbs@gibbs-bruns.com
No Logo John Wakeman, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibbs & Bruns, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Robin C Gibbs +1 713 650 8805 +1 713 750 0903 rgibbs@gibbs-bruns.com
No Logo Joseph M Hirko, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McGuireWoods LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Jacks C Nickens +1 713 353 6668 +1 713 571 9652 jnickens@mcguirewoods.com
No Logo Joseph W Sutton, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jesse R. Pierce & Associates, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Edward John Jack O'Neill, Jr. +1 713 634 3638 +1 713 634 3639 joneill@pierceoneill.com
No Logo Ken L Harrison, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Tonkon Torp LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Zachary W L Wright +1 503 802 2041 +1 503 802 3741 zach.wright@tonkon.com
No Logo Kenneth D Rice, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McGuireWoods LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Jacks C Nickens +1 713 353 6668 +1 713 571 9652 jnickens@mcguirewoods.com
Lay, Kenneth L Lay, Kenneth L, Defendant
Officially listed as "Kenneth L Lay"

Toggle Switch Represented by Carrington, Coleman, Sloman & Blumenthal, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY James E Coleman, Jr. +1 214 855 3000 + 214 855 1333 jcoleman@ccsb.com
No Logo Kristina Mordaunt, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 04/27/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY Robert Hayden Burns +1 713 542 1183 rhburns1@comcast.net
No Logo Linda Lay, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Nathan Sommers Jacobs, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY George R Gibson +1 713 892 4843 +1 713 892 4840 ggibson@nathansommers.com
No Logo Lou L Pai, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by fbfog.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Murray J Fogler +1 713 481 1010 +1 713 574 3224 mfogler@fbfog.com
No Logo Mark A Frevert, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McGuireWoods LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Jacks C Nickens +1 713 353 6668 +1 713 571 9652 jnickens@mcguirewoods.com
No Logo Mark E Koenig, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McGuireWoods LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Jacks C Nickens +1 713 353 6668 +1 713 571 9652 jnickens@mcguirewoods.com
No Logo Michael J Kopper, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Beck Redden & Secrest - Houston

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Eric J R Nichols +1 512 708 1000 enichols@beckredden.com
No Logo Michael S McConnell, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McGuireWoods LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Jacks C Nickens +1 713 353 6668 +1 713 571 9652 jnickens@mcguirewoods.com
No Logo Norman P Blake, Jr, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibbs & Bruns, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Robin C Gibbs +1 713 650 8805 +1 713 750 0903 rgibbs@gibbs-bruns.com
No Logo Paulo V Ferraz Pereira, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibbs & Bruns, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Robin C Gibbs +1 713 650 8805 +1 713 750 0903 rgibbs@gibbs-bruns.com
No Logo Rebecca P Mark-Jusbasche, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Graves, Dougherty, Hearon & Moody, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY John J. McKetta, III +1 512 480 5600 +1 512 480 5816 mmcketta@gdhm.com
No Logo Richard A Causey, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McGuireWoods LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Jacks C Nickens +1 713 353 6668 +1 713 571 9652 jnickens@mcguirewoods.com

Toggle Switch Represented by TEKELL BOOK MATTHEWS & LIMMER LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY C. Robert Mace +1 713 222 9542 +1 713 655 7727 bmace@taylorbook.com
No Logo Richard B Buy, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McGuireWoods LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Jacks C Nickens +1 713 353 6668 +1 713 571 9652 jnickens@mcguirewoods.com
No Logo Robert A Belfer, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibbs & Bruns, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Robin C Gibbs +1 713 650 8805 +1 713 750 0903 rgibbs@gibbs-bruns.com
No Logo Robert K Jaedicke, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibbs & Bruns, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Robin C Gibbs +1 713 650 8805 +1 713 750 0903 rgibbs@gibbs-bruns.com
No Logo Ronnie C Chan, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibbs & Bruns, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Robin C Gibbs +1 713 650 8805 +1 713 750 0903 rgibbs@gibbs-bruns.com
No Logo Stanley C Horton, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McGuireWoods LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Jacks C Nickens +1 713 353 6668 +1 713 571 9652 jnickens@mcguirewoods.com
No Logo Steven J Kean, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McGuireWoods LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Jacks C Nickens +1 713 353 6668 +1 713 571 9652 jnickens@mcguirewoods.com
No Logo Wendy L Gramm, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibbs & Bruns, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Robin C Gibbs +1 713 650 8805 +1 713 750 0903 rgibbs@gibbs-bruns.com
No Logo Affiliated Debtors and Debtors in Possession, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by McKool Smith, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Charles W Cunningham +1 214 978 4000 +1 214 978 4044
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 1001
Nature of Suit 791 - Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
  Entries (159) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/22/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Archive Data: FRC Shipment id: 2011, Accession number: 021-10-0230, Location number: shelved, Box number: 62, Type of documents sent to FRC: c, Date documents shipped to FRC: 12/14/2009, Disposal authority: IIA7b(2), Disposal date: 01/01/2034, Restriction code: N, Notes: Closed Civil Case Files. Notes 2: 4:02cv0043 through 4:02cv2698, filed. (dkellyadi, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER granting 154 Motion for Reinstatement and Motion to Dismiss without Prejudice.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(bthomas, ) (Entered: 06/09/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Unopposed MOTION to Reinstate Case by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/24/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Unopposed Motion for Reinstatement and Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice)(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 06/03/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER OF DISMISSAL ON SETTLEMENT ANNOUNCEMENT. Case terminated on March 4, 2011.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(htippen, ) (Entered: 03/04/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          STATUS REPORT by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed.(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 2/15/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            STATUS REPORT by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed.(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 02/15/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              STATUS REPORT by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed.(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 1/4/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                STATUS REPORT by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed.(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 01/04/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 12/14/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  ORDER The Court ORDERS that Plaintiffs counsel shall file a status report within 3 weeks indicating whether any settlements have been reached, and if not, providing potential dates in early 2011 for trial of whatever remains of this litigation..(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(htippen, ) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 8/12/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    ORDER granting 146 Unopposed MOTION to Vacate, The 10/12/10 trial setting is VACATED; either side may move to reset this matter for trial.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(htippen, ) (Entered: 08/12/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 8/11/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Unopposed MOTION to Vacate by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/1/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order To Vacate Trial Setting)(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 08/11/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 4/8/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        ORDER granting 143 Motion for Continuance Jury Trial set for 10/12/2010 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9C before Judge Melinda Harmon.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(jewilliams, ) (Entered: 04/09/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 4/8/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Melinda Harmon. STATUS CONFERENCE held on 4/8/2010. Unopposed Motion for continuance of the May 3 trial is granted, as stated on the record. Jury Trial is RESET to 10/12/2010 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9C before Judge Melinda Harmon. (Order to issue) Appearances:See attached for courtroom appearances; Lew LeClair by telephone.(Court Reporter: Gayle Dye), filed.(htippen, ) (Entered: 04/08/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Unopposed MOTION for Continuance of Trial Setting by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/28/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 04/07/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 3/31/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              ORDER granting 141 Motion for Conference Status Conference set for 4/8/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9C before Judge Melinda Harmon.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(jewilliams, ) (Entered: 03/31/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 3/25/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                MOTION for Status Conference by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/15/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 03/25/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  AGREED ORDER re: 139 Proposed Order Jury Trial set for 5/3/2010 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9C before Judge Melinda Harmon.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(sjones, ) (Entered: 10/13/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 10/5/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Agreed PROPOSED ORDER re Lay Estate, filed.(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 10/05/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 10/1/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      ORDER granting 134 Motion to Dismiss; mooting 135 Motion for Extension of Time.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(dgould) (Entered: 10/01/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 9/28/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        ORDER Granting Unopposed 136 Motion of Voluntary Dismissal of Claims Against Michael J. Kopper. The dismissal is with prejudice.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(jegonzalez, ) (Entered: 09/30/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 9/22/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Claims Against Michael J. Kopper by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/13/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 09/22/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaints by Richard A Causey, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/7/2009. (Mace, C. Robert) (Entered: 09/14/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 9/10/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Voluntarily Claims Against Richard A. Causey by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/5/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 09/10/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 8/21/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                ORDER granting 131 Motion for Extension of Time; Answer due for Richard A Causey 9/14/2009.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(sjones, ) (Entered: 08/25/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 8/21/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER granting 130 Motion to Dismiss. Case terminated on August 21, 2009.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(sjones, ) (Entered: 08/25/2009)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 8/13/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaints by Richard A Causey, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/8/2009. (Mace, C. Robert) (Entered: 08/13/2009)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Claims Against Jeffrey K. Skilling by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/18/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion of Voluntary Dismissal of Claims Against Jeffrey K. Skilling)(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 07/29/2009)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 6/30/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER granting 127 Motion for Extension of Time Responses due by 7/31/2009.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(esmith, ) (Entered: 07/02/2009)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 6/30/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER granting 126 Motion for Extension of Time Responses due by 8/14/2009.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(esmith, ) (Entered: 07/02/2009)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 6/29/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to Complaints by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, Jeffrey K Skilling, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/20/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaints)(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 06/29/2009)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 6/25/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaints by Richard A Causey, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/15/2009. (Mace, C. Robert) (Entered: 06/25/2009)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 5/26/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER granting 124 Motion for Judgment.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(esmith, ) (Entered: 05/28/2009)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 5/21/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  Joint MOTION for Entry of Order of Final Judgment by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/10/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order of Final Judgment)(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 05/21/2009)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER.Counsel shall file within two weeks of receipt of this order a status report regarding the parties' request for the Court to defer ruling on the pending motions to dismiss by Arthur Andersen, LLP(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(jdav, ) (Entered: 05/21/2009)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 5/8/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER granting 118 Motion for Extension of Time. Answer due by 6/30/2009.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(jdav, ) (Entered: 05/13/2009)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 5/8/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER granting 119 Motion for Extension of Time; Answer due for Richard A Causey 6/30/2009.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(sjones, ) (Entered: 05/13/2009)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 4/29/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Complaints by Richard A Causey, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/19/2009. (Mace, C. Robert) (Entered: 04/29/2009)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 4/28/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            Letter from attorney Donald Wall requesting removal of himself and Squire Sanders & Dempsey LLP from future communications, filed. (ltien, ) (Entered: 04/30/2009)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond To Complaint by Jeffrey K Skilling, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/18/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (Entered: 04/27/2009)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 4/6/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER granting 115 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time Answer due by 4/30/2009.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(kcarr, ) (Entered: 04/08/2009)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 3/30/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaints by Richard A Causey, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/20/2009. (Mace, C. Robert) (Entered: 03/30/2009)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER granting 114 Motion for Extension of Time Answer due by 4/30/2009.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(sjones, ) (Entered: 03/30/2009)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 3/26/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond To complaints by Jeffrey K Skilling, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/15/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (Entered: 03/26/2009)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 3/18/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                        ORDER granting 112 Motion to Defer Ruling on Arthur Andersen LLP's Motions to Dismiss until April 15, 2009.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 03/19/2009)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          Agreed MOTION Motion of The Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp. And Defendant Arthur Andersen Requesting That the Court Defer Ruling on Arthur Andersen LLPS Pending Motions to Dismiss by Arthur Andersen LLP, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/2/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Defer Ruling on Defendant Arthur Andersen LLPs Motions to Dismiss)(Shepherd, George) (Entered: 03/13/2009)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 3/3/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER granting 108 Motion for Extension of Time Answer due by 3/31/2009.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(sbyrum, ) (Entered: 03/04/2009)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 3/3/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER granting 109 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time Response due by 3/31/2009.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(kcarr, ) (Entered: 03/04/2009)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 2/26/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Complaints by Richard A Causey, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/18/2009. (Mace, C. Robert) (Entered: 02/26/2009)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 2/25/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond To Complaint by Jeffrey K Skilling, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/17/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (Entered: 02/25/2009)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 1/20/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER OF DISMISSAL granting 102 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with prejudice of Claims against Ben Glisan, Jr.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(jdav, ) (Entered: 01/21/2009)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 1/20/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER granting 103 Motion to Defer Ruling on 85 Defendant Arthur Andersen's Motion to Dismiss. It is ORDERED that the ruling be deferred until 03/15/09 or later.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(htippen, ) (Entered: 01/20/2009)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 1/16/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        Agreed MOTION Of The Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp. And Defendant Arthur Andersen Requesting That the Court Defer Ruling On Arthur Andersen LLPs Pending Motions to Dismiss by Arthur Andersen LLP, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/5/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion To Defer Ruling on Defendant Arthur Andersen LLPs Motions To Dismiss)(Shepherd, George) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 1/15/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Dismissal as to Ben F Glisan, Jr by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Voluntary Dismissal of Claims Against Ben Glisan, Jr. with prejudice)(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 01/15/2009)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER granting 100 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Richard A. Causey is given until February 27, 2009 to file responsive pleadings to the complaints. (Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(jdav, ) (Entered: 01/20/2009)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER granting 101 Motion for Extension of Time. Mr. Skilling shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaints on or before 2/27/2009. (Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(jdav, ) (Entered: 01/20/2009)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 1/13/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaints by Jeffrey K Skilling, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/2/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Barrett, Shannon) (Entered: 01/13/2009)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 1/12/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Complaints by Richard A Causey, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/2/2009. (Mace, C. Robert) (Entered: 01/12/2009)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 11/24/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    REPLY in Support of 94 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendant Arthur Andersens Motions to Dismiss the Amended Complaint, filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp. (LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 11/24/2008)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 11/19/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to 94 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendant Arthur Andersens Motions to Dismiss the Amended Complaint, filed by Arthur Andersen LLP. (Shepherd, George) (Entered: 11/19/2008)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 11/4/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Intent To Oppose The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp.s Motion for Leave to File A Sur-Reply In Opposition to Defendant Arthur Andersens Motions To Dismiss The Amended Complaint re: 94 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendant Arthur Andersens Motions to Dismiss the Amended Complaint by Arthur Andersen LLP, filed. (Shepherd, George) (Entered: 11/04/2008)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 10/30/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 93 Motion for Extension of Time.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(ypippin, ) (Entered: 11/03/2008)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 10/30/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            Opposed MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendant Arthur Andersens Motions to Dismiss the Amended Complaint by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/19/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Sur-Reply, # 2 Exhibit A to Sur-Reply, # 3 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply)(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 10/30/2008)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 10/29/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 92 Motion for Extension of Time.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(ypippin, ) (Entered: 10/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 10/29/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaints by Jeffrey K Skilling, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/18/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Barrett, Shannon) (Entered: 10/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 10/29/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Complaints by Richard A Causey, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/18/2008. (Mace, C. Robert) (Entered: 10/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 10/23/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Intent to File a Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendant Arthur Andersen re: 87 MOTION to Dismiss 37 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., MOTION to Dismiss 37 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. (LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 10/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      Corrected APPENDIX re: 89 Reply, by Arthur Andersen LLP, filed.(Shepherd, George) (Entered: 10/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        REPLY Memorandum in Support of 87 MOTION to Dismiss 37 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., Defendant Arthur Andersen LLPs Reply Memorandum In Support of Motion to Dismiss The Amended Complaint [OCUC Instrument Nos. 129, 177, 178 and 183], filed by Arthur Andersen LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A to Defendant Arthur Andersen LLPs Reply Memorandum In Support of Motion to Dismiss The Amended Complaint [OCUC Instrument Nos. 129, 177, 178 and 183])(Shepherd, George)Call from Attorney office on attachment Appendix A has been filed in error Attorney to refile as Corrected Appendix Modified on 10/20/2008 (ncavazos, ). Linked to #87 on 10/27/2008 (ltien, ). (Entered: 10/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 9/22/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to 87 MOTION to Dismiss 37 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., MOTION to Dismiss 37 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,, filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Denying Arthur Andersen LLPs Motions To Dismiss The Amended Complaint)(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 09/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss 37 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., by Arthur Andersen LLP, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/29/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Arthur Andersen LLP's Notice of Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint [BARKSY Instrument No. 37])(Shepherd, George) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM Defendant Arthur Andersen LLP's Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss The Amended Complaint [BARSKY Instrument No. 37] re: 37 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., by Arthur Andersen LLP, filed.(Shepherd, George) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                MOTION Defendant Arthur Andersen LLP's Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint [BARSKY Instrument No. 37] by Arthur Andersen LLP, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/29/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1; Form 8-K, # 2 Exhibit 2; (Part 1 of 2) Form 10-Q, # 3 Exhibit 2; (Part 2 of 2) Form 10-Q)(Shepherd, George) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 83 Motion for Extension of Time.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(ypippin, ) (Entered: 08/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Jeffrey K Skilling, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/20/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Barrett, Shannon) (Entered: 07/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 81 Motion for Extension of Time. Response due 11/2/08.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(ypippin, ) (Entered: 07/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Complaints by Richard A Causey, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/18/2008. (Mace, C. Robert) (Entered: 07/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 79 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaints. Responses due by 8/4/2008.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(chorace) (Entered: 04/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Complaints by Richard A Causey, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/23/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Agreed Motion for Extension)(Mace, C. Robert) (Entered: 04/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 4/2/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 77 Motion for Extension of Time. Jeffrey K. Skilling to answer by 8/4/2008.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(ypippin, ) (Entered: 04/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 3/27/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Jeffrey K Skilling, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/16/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Barrett, Shannon) (Entered: 03/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 12/12/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 74 Motion for Extension of Time. Jeffrey K. Skilling to answer by 4/6/2008.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(ypippin, ) (Entered: 12/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 12/6/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 73 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Complaints Responses due by 4/5/2008.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(ltrevino, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/12/2007 (ltien, ). (Entered: 12/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 12/6/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Jeffrey K Skilling, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/26/2007. (Barrett, Shannon) (Entered: 12/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Complaints by Richard A Causey, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/19/2007. (Mace, C. Robert) (Entered: 11/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/16/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 71 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Jeffrey K. Skilling to answer by 1/7/2008. ( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(ypippin, ) (Entered: 10/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 10/8/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Jeffrey K Skilling, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/29/2007. (Barrett, Shannon) (Entered: 10/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/21/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE Amended Nts of Partial Withdrawal of (206) Mtn to Dismiss by Linda Lay, filed. (Attachments: # 1)(Gibson, George) (Entered: 08/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/17/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of No Response Required To The Motion To Dismiss Filed By Defendant Linda P. Lay, Executrix Of Estate Of Kenneth Lee Lay, Deceased re: 68 Notice (Other) by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. (LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 08/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/15/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE Withdrawal of 53 Motion to Dismiss by Linda Lay, filed. (Gibson, George) Linked to #53 on 8/21/2007 (ltien, ). (Entered: 08/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/8/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying 66 Motion for Extension of Time. Answer due 8/17/2007.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(ypippin, ) (Entered: 08/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time For Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp to Extend its Response date to the Motion to Dismiss Filed by Defendant Linda P Lay, Executrix of Estate of Kenneth Lee Lay, Deceased by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/23/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 08/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 64 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaints on or before 10/9/07.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 07/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/12/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Jeffrey K Skilling, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/1/2007. (Barrett, Shannon) (Entered: 07/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/30/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 62 Motion for Extension of Time to respond to Defendant Linda Lay's Motion to Dismiss.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 06/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 5/24/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond to Motion to Dismiss filed by Linda P. Lay, Executrix of Estate of Kenneth Lee Lay, Deceased, by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/13/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 05/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting Richard Causey's 58 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaints until 08/09/07.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 04/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting Deft Skilling's 59 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint on or before 07/11/07.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 04/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/12/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaints by Jeffrey K Skilling, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/2/2007. (Barrett, Shannon) (Entered: 04/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/5/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Complaints by Richard A Causey, filed.Motion Docket Date 4/25/2007. (Mace, C. Robert) (Entered: 04/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/27/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 56 Motion for Extension of Time for Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp to Respond to Defendant Linda K Lay's Motion to Dismiss on or before 05/29/07.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 03/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/22/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time For Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp. to Extend its Response Date to the Motion to Dismiss Filed by Defendant Linda K. Lay, Executrix of Estate of Kenneth Lee Lay, Deceased by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/11/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 03/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/5/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 52 Motion for Extension of Time. Response to Defendants's Motion to Dismiss due March 29, 2007.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(espencer, ) (Entered: 03/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp. to Extend its Response Date to the Motion to Dismiss Filed by Defendant Linda K. Lay, Executrix of Estate of Kenneth Lee Lay, Deceased by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/22/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 03/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/26/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Partial Withdrawal of 53 MOTION to Dismiss by Linda Lay, filed. This document was originally filed electronically at CA H-01-3645 inst #214.(ltien, ) (Entered: 03/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/7/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 50 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(dpower, ) (Entered: 02/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/5/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp. Response Date to the Motion to Dismiss Filed by Defendant Linda K. Lay, Executrix of Estate of Kenneth Lee Lay, Deceased by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/26/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 02/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/1/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 47 Motion for Extension of Time.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(mmar, ) (Entered: 02/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/18/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 46 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time For Linda Lay to respond to Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp Amended Complaint. Responses due by 1/12/2007.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(chorace, ) (Entered: 01/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/17/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER and MOTION to Dismiss 37 Amended Complaint under Fed.R.Civ.P.12(B)(6) by Linda Lay, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/6/2007. This document was originally filed electronically at CA H-01-3645 inst #206.(ltien, ) (Entered: 03/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/11/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Complaint by Richard A Causey, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/31/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Mace, Carl) (Entered: 01/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/14/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time For Linda Lay to respond to Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp Amended Complaint by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/3/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 12/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/12/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Production of Ninth Supplemental Documents to Expert Reports by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. (LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 12/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/7/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of attorney substitution by Rick Barsky. Attorney Daniel D. Horowitz added. Attorney Sean Alan Roberts terminated, filed. (Horowitz, Daniel) (Entered: 12/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/6/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Production of Eighth Supplemental Documents to Expert Report by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. (LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 12/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/29/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of the Seventh Supplemental Documents to Expert Reports by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. (LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 11/29/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/18/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Production of Sixth Supplemental Documents to Expert Reports by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. (LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 11/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/9/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Certificate of Service for Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp Amended Complaint by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. (LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 11/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/6/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, Attorney George W Billy Shepherd, III for Arthur Andersen LLP and D Stephen Goddard, Jr added .( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(sbyrum, ) (Entered: 11/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/6/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, Attorney George W Billy Shepherd, III for Arthur Andersen LLP and D Stephen Goddard, Jr added Attorney Russell Hardin, Jr terminated.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(sbyrum, ) (Entered: 11/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/31/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED Complaint with Jury Demand against Michael J Kopper, Ben F Glisan, Jr, Linda Lay, Jeffrey K Skilling, Richard A Causey filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp. Related document: 15 Amended Complaint, 1 Notice of Removal.(ltien, ) (Entered: 11/02/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/31/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 27 Second Amended Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(ltien, ) (Entered: 11/02/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Production of Fifth Supplemental Invoices to Expert Reports by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. (LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 10/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/25/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Supplemental Certificate of Service re: 32 Notice (Other) by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. (LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 10/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/24/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Non-Opposition re: 27 Second MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed Order)(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 10/24/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/24/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Production of Fourth Supplemental Invoices to Expert Reports by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. (LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 10/24/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/17/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting Pltfs 29 Motion to Substitute Mrs Linda Lay for Deft Kenneth L Lay .( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(psmith, ) (Entered: 10/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/11/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Production of Third Supplemental Invoices to Expert Reports by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. (LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 10/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/11/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Party Mrs. Linda Lay, Executrix of Estate of Kenneth L. Lay in place of Kenneth L Lay by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/31/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp Unopposed Motion to Substitute Mrs. Linda Lay, Executrix of Estate of Kenneth L. Lay, for Defendant Kenneth L Lay)(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 10/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/27/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Amended Certificate of Service re: 27 Second MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. (LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 09/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/25/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Second MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/16/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A and B# 2 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp. Second Amended Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint)(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 09/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/23/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER OF DISMISSAL of Derivative Claims against Lou L Pai per #173 CA H 01-3645 Notice of Dismissal.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 08/23/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF DERIVATIVE CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANT JEFFREY MCMAHON WITHOUT PREJUDICE .( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(espencer, ) (Entered: 06/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/5/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Dismissal as to Jeffrey McMahon by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order on Notice of Dismissal of Derivative Claims Against Defendant Jeffrey McMahon Without Prejudice)(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 06/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp's 22 Motion to Dismiss Derivative Claims against Kritina Mordaunt without prejudice.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 04/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/21/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/11/2005. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Derivative Claims Against Kristina Mordaunt Without Prejudice)(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 04/21/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/12/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Hearing by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/1/2005. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order on Notice and Motion Relating to Dismissal of Claims Asserted in Derivative Cases Against Certain Defendants)(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 01/12/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/19/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 18 Motion of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp to Reopen Pirelli Derivative Cases and to Substitute as Real Party Plaintiff in Interest on behalf of Bankruptcy Estate, (H 01-3645, H 01-3690, H 01-3892, H 01-3998, H 02-1832, H 02-1838, H 02-1922, and H 02-3427) ( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 10/20/2004) (Entered: 10/20/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/5/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUPPLEMENTAL CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE by Unsecured Creditors Committee to [114-1] motion to Reopen Pirelli Derivative Cases, [114-2] motion Substitute as Real Part Plaintiff in Interest on Behalf of Bankruptcy Estate, filed. (kmurphy) (Entered: 08/06/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/2/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Reopen Pirelli Derivative Cases and to Substitute as Real Party Plaintiff in Interest on Behalf of Bankruptcy Estate by by Official Unsecured Creditors' Committee of Enron Corp and its Affilated Debtors and Debtors in Possession, Motion Docket Date 8/22/04 [18-1] motion, 8/22/04 [18-2] motion, filed. (kmurphy) (Entered: 08/03/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/17/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER that Rick Barsky's [14-1] motion to amend original complaint to join J P Morgan Chase & Co and Citigroup, Inc is DENIED, entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) (fmremp) (Entered: 04/17/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/18/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DEFT'S RESPONSE by Arthur Andersen LLP in opposition to Barsky pltf's [14-1] motion to amend original complaint to join J P Morgan Chase & Co and Citigroup Inc, filed. (ddarneille) (Entered: 03/19/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/25/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT by Rick Barsky amending original complaint adding J P Morgan Chase Co and Citigroup Inc, filed. (fmremp) (Entered: 02/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/25/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to amend original complaint to join J P Morgan Chase & Co and Citigroup, Inc by Pltf Rick Barsky, Motion Docket Date 3/17/03 [14-1] motion, filed. (fmremp) (Entered: 02/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/20/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Consolidated Member Case Lead Case Number: 01-3645 (ltien)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/20/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER NUNC PRO TUNC, entered. In order of 08/16/02 12 denying remand and consolidating and administratively closing the above referenced case the court erroneously indicated the case number of Pirelli Armstrong Tire Corp Retiree Medical Benefits Trust v Kenneth Lay, et al. as H-01-4108. The court orders that the case number is corrected to be 01-3645. Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) (ljackson) (Entered: 08/20/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/15/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Case closed (ljackson)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/15/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying [9-1] motion to remand to to State Court, entered. Pursuant to the order of consolidation entered on 12/12/01 this case is consolidated in the lead case 01-4108 (Pirelli Armstrong Tire Corp Retiree Medical Benefits Trust v Kenneth Lay et al), part of MDL 1446, and is administratively closed. Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) (ljackson) (Entered: 08/16/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/22/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY by Pltf Rick Barsky to Deft's response to Pltf's [9-1] motion to remand to State Court, filed (sjones) (Entered: 07/23/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/11/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by office defts' Richard B Buy et al to pltf's [9-1] motion to remand to State Court, filed. (ljackson) (Entered: 07/12/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/21/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to remand to to State Court by Rick Barsky, Motion Docket Date 7/11/02 [9-1] motion, filed. (fmremp) (Entered: 06/24/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/12/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, entered. The defts shall file as quickly as possible an appropriate motion and brief which are the alleged bases for their removal of this suit. Pltf shall file a timely response. Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) (ljackson) (Entered: 06/12/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/12/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Ben F Glisan Jr, filed. (ljackson) (Entered: 06/12/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/11/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CASE reassigned to Judge Melinda Harmon per agreement between the judges (ltien)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/7/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Kristina Mordaunt, filed. (ljackson) (Entered: 06/10/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/6/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Rick Barsky, filed. (ljackson) (Entered: 06/07/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/21/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate of Service in Removed Action by Arthur Andersen LLP, filed. (psmith) (Entered: 05/24/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/20/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUPPLEMENT to [1-1] notice of removal by Arthur Andersen LLP, filed. (psmith) (Entered: 05/24/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/20/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order setting Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference on 1:30 7/12/02 before Judge Nancy F. Atlas and Order to Disclose Interested Persons, filed. Parties notified. (bchurchill) (Entered: 05/23/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/20/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Richard A Causey, Mark A Frevert, Stanley C Horton, Kenneth D Rice, Richard B Buy, Joseph M Hirko, Mark E Koenig, Steven J Kean, Michael S McConnell filed FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 520845 (bchurchill) (Entered: 05/23/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 9 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?