Sarabia v. Mannisto
Federal Civil Lawsuit Arkansas Eastern District Court, Case No. 4:18-cv-00441

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 14, 2019 at 12:24 AM DT (2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Frank Sarabia, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gill Elrod Ragon Owen Sherman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Dylan Hugh Potts +1 501 376 3800 +1 501 372 3359 potts@gill-law.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Danielle M. Whitehouse +1 501 376 3800 whitehouse@gill-law.com
v.
No Logo Matthew Mannisto, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wright, Lindsey & Jennings, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Edwin Lee Lowther, III +1 501 371 0808 +1 501 376 9442 llowther@wlj.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/15/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
JUDGMENT: Pursuant to 23 order entered this day, the complaint of the plaintiff is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 1/15/2019. (ljb)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 12/5/2018. Rule 26(f) Report due by 12/19/2018. Proposed jury trial date set for the week of 11/25/2019 at 9:15 AM in Little Rock Courtroom #4A before Judge James M. Moody Jr. Signed at the Direction of the Court. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Final Scheduling Order) (cdw) (Entered: 10/22/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      REPLY to Response to Motion re 12 MOTION to Dismiss /Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint /Defendant Matthew Mannisto's Reply to Response to Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Matthew Mannisto. (Lowther, Edwin) (Entered: 10/01/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting 18 Motion for Leave to File. Defendant is granted leave to file a reply brief, without opposition. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 10/1/18. (dpb) (Entered: 10/01/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          MOTION for Leave to File /Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief by Matthew Mannisto (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Lowther, Edwin) (Entered: 09/28/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER finding as moot 5 Motion to Dismiss in light of filing of first amended complaint. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 9/24/18. (dpb) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              RESPONSE in Opposition re 12 MOTION to Dismiss /Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Frank Sarabia. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Whitehouse, Danielle) (Entered: 09/20/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                REPLY to Response to Motion re 5 MOTION to Dismiss /Motion to Dismiss /Defendant Matthew Mannisto's Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Motion to Dismiss Complaint filed by Matthew Mannisto. (Lowther, Edwin) (Entered: 09/12/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  ANSWER to 11 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand /Answer to First Amended Complaint by Matthew Mannisto.(Lowther, Edwin) (Entered: 09/10/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 12 Motion to Dismiss /Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Matthew Mannisto. (Lowther, Edwin) (Entered: 09/10/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      MOTION to Dismiss /Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by Matthew Mannisto (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Lowther, Edwin) (Entered: 09/10/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        AMENDED COMPLAINT (First) with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Frank Sarabia(Whitehouse, Danielle) (Entered: 08/30/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 5 MOTION to Dismiss /Motion to Dismiss and supporting authorities filed by All Plaintiffs. (Whitehouse, Danielle) (Entered: 08/30/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting 8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 5 MOTION to Dismiss /Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff has to and including August 30, 2018 to file a response. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 8/22/18. (dpb) (Entered: 08/22/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 6 Brief in Support, 5 MOTION to Dismiss /Motion to Dismiss by Frank Sarabia (Whitehouse, Danielle) (Entered: 08/21/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Jury Demand /Answer by Matthew Mannisto.(Lowther, Edwin) (Entered: 08/09/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 5 Motion to Dismiss filed by Matthew Mannisto. (Lowther, Edwin)(Docket text modified on 8/9/2018 to remove duplicate text) (jak) (Entered: 08/09/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    MOTION to Dismiss by Matthew Mannisto (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Lowther, Edwin)(Docket text modified on 8/9/2018 to remove duplicate text)(jak) (Entered: 08/09/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting 3 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendant has until August 10, 2018 to file an answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 7/16/18. (dpb) (Entered: 07/16/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File for Defendant to File Answer by Frank Sarabia (Whitehouse, Danielle) (Entered: 07/16/2018)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Frank Sarabia. Matthew Mannisto served on 7/6/2018. (Whitehouse, Danielle) (Entered: 07/12/2018)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Matthew Mannisto ( Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT067793.), filed by Frank Sarabia. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mcz) (Entered: 07/05/2018)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re 5 MOTION to Dismiss and 6 Brief in Support. CORRECTION: The docket texts were modified to remove duplicate text. (jak)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 7 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?