District Appellate Supreme
Federal
Washington Western District Court Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit United States Supreme Court

Balan v. Tesla Motors Inc
Federal Civil Lawsuit Washington Western District Court, Case No. 2:19-cv-00067-MJP
District Judge Marsha J. Pechman, presiding

Tags

Reality Check: Tesla, Inc.

This docket is featured in the January 7, 2020 article Reality Check: Tesla, Inc..

Last Updated April 26, 2021 at 3:24 PM DT (6 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cristina Balan, Plaintiff
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Tesla Motors Inc"
Office Seattle
Filed 1/15/2019
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 320 - Personal Injury: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition
County Snohomish
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flag JURYDEMAND
  Entries (83) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Reconsideration
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: None Reconsideration
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document 75 Filed: 4/22/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Vacate
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/13/2021, Entered: None Declaration
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 2/11/2021, Entered: 2/11/2021 Order of USCA
          ORDER OF USCA (19-35637) as to [42] Notice of Appeal filed by Tesla Motors Inc. (SG)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 4/13/2021, Entered: None Vacate
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document 68 Filed: 10/13/2020, Entered: 10/13/2020 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel
              NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney William Elliot Weiner for Defendant Tesla Motors Inc. (Weiner, William)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 4/13/2021, Entered: None Mandate of USCA
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/5/2020, Entered: 10/7/2020 Order of USCA
                  ORDER OF USCA (19-35637) as to [42] Notice of Appeal filed by Tesla Motors Inc. (RE)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 4/13/2021, Entered: None Lift Stay
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 8/19/2020, Entered: 8/19/2020 Notice of appearance
                      NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Per D Jansen on behalf of Defendant Tesla Motors Inc. (Jansen, Per)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 3/22/2021, Entered: None Memorandum/Opinion from USCA
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 8/19/2020, Entered: 8/19/2020 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel
                          NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Darin M Sands for Defendant Tesla Motors Inc. (Weiner, William)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 8/19/2020, Entered: 8/19/2020 Notice of appearance
                            NOTICE of Appearance by attorney William Elliot Weiner on behalf of Defendant Tesla Motors Inc. (Weiner, William)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document 63 Filed: 4/17/2020, Entered: 4/20/2020 Order of USCA
                              ORDER OF USCA (19-35637) as to [42] Notice of Appeal filed by Tesla Motors Inc. (CDA)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 62 Filed: 3/16/2020, Entered: 3/16/2020 Order on Motion for reliefCourt Filing
                                ORDER denying Plaintiff's [47] Motion for Relief from the Court's Order Granting Partial Arbitration. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (TH)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/4/2020, Entered: 3/4/2020 Declaration (non-motion)
                                  DECLARATION of Gal Gressel re [60] Response (non motion), by Defendant Tesla Motors Inc (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Sands, Darin)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/4/2020, Entered: 3/4/2020 Response (Non-Motion)
                                    RESPONSE by Defendant Tesla Motors Inc re [59] Supplement, [47] MOTION for Relief RULE 60(B)(2)(3)(6)from the Order ECF [40], granting partial arbitration & request for indicative ruling under 62.1, based on Plaintiff's first 180 days case status update of arbitration per the Court's request (Sands, Darin)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/20/2020, Entered: 2/20/2020 supplement
                                      SUPPLEMENT re [47] MOTION for Relief RULE 60(B)(2)(3)(6)from the Order ECF [40], granting partial arbitration & request for indicative ruling under 62.1, based on Plaintiff's first 180 days case status update of arbitration per the Court's request Due to New Critical Developments that may affect the motion for indicative ruling and sanctions requested by Plaintiff Cristina Balan (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibits 1 to 4)(Balan, Cristina)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Blank 58 Filed: 2/11/2020, Entered: 2/11/2020 Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                        ORDER re [56] Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Gal Gressel for Tesla Motors Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). Local counsel maintains an office in the WDWA**(DS)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 57 Filed: 2/6/2020, Entered: 2/6/2020 Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                          ORDER re [55] Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Babak G. Yousefzadeh for Tesla Motors Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).**Local counsel maintains an office in the WDWA**(CDA)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/6/2020, Entered: 2/6/2020, Terminated: 2/11/2020 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                            APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Gal Gressel FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Tesla Motors Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6128913 (Sands, Darin)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/6/2020, Entered: 2/6/2020, Terminated: 2/6/2020 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                              APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Babak Yousefzadeh FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Tesla Motors Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6128689 (Sands, Darin)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/6/2020, Entered: 2/6/2020 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel
                                                NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Matthew C Lewis and Leila S Narvid for Defendant Tesla Motors Inc. (Sands, Darin)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document 53 Filed: 1/23/2020, Entered: 1/23/2020 Reply to Response to motion
                                                  REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Cristina Balan, TO RESPONSE to [47] MOTION for Relief RULE 60(B)(2)(3)(6)from the Order ECF [40], granting partial arbitration & request for indicative ruling under 62.1, based on Plaintiff's first 180 days case status update of arbitration per the Court's request (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibits 1 to 17)(Balan, Cristina)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/17/2020, Entered: 1/17/2020 Declaration
                                                  DECLARATION of Matthew C. Balan filed by Defendant Tesla Motors Inc re [47] MOTION for Relief RULE 60(B)(2)(3)(6)from the Order ECF [40], granting partial arbitration & request for indicative ruling under 62.1, based on Plaintiff's first 180 days case status update of arbitration per the Court's request (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit 9, # (10) Exhibit 10, # (11) Exhibit 11, # (12) Exhibit 12, # (13) Exhibit 13, # (14) Exhibit 14, # (15) Exhibit 15, # (16) Exhibit 16, # (17) Exhibit 17)(Sands, Darin)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document 51 Filed: 1/17/2020, Entered: 1/17/2020 Response to motion
                                                    RESPONSE, by Defendant Tesla Motors Inc, to [47] MOTION for Relief RULE 60(B)(2)(3)(6)from the Order ECF [40], granting partial arbitration & request for indicative ruling under 62.1, based on Plaintiff's first 180 days case status update of arbitration per the Court's request. (Sands, Darin)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 50 Filed: 1/8/2020, Entered: 1/8/2020 Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                      ORDER re [48] Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Leila S Narvid for defendant Tesla Motors Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank  Set/Reset Motion Noting Date
                                                        Noting Date Reset re LCR 7(d)(3) and per direction of chambers: Plaintiff's [47] MOTION for Relief RULE 60(B)(2)(3)(6)from the Order ECF [40], granting partial arbitration & request for indicative ruling under 62.1, based on Plaintiff's first 180 days case status update of arbitration per the Court's request: Noting Date 1/24/2020. (PM)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank  Set/Reset Motion Noting Date
                                                          Noting Date Reset re LCR 7(d)(3) and per direction of chambers: Plaintiff's [47] MOTION for Relief RULE 60(B)(2)(3)(6)from the Order ECF [40], granting partial arbitration & request for indicative ruling under 62.1, based on Plaintiff's first 180 days case status update of arbitration per the Court's request: Noting Date 1/24/2020. (PM)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 49 Filed: 1/7/2020, Entered: 1/7/2020 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel
                                                            NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Rodney B Sorensen for Defendant Tesla Motors Inc. (Sands, Darin)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 48 Filed: 1/7/2020, Entered: 1/7/2020, Terminated: 1/8/2020 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                              APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Leila S. Narvid FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Tesla Motors Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-6076428 (Sands, Darin) Local counsel maintains an office in both Seattle, WA and Portland, OR on 1/8/2020 (DS).
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 47 Filed: 1/7/2020, Entered: 1/7/2020, Terminated: 3/16/2020 Motion for relief
                                                                MOTION for Relief RULE 60(B)(2)(3)(6) from the Order ECF [40], granting partial arbitration & request for indicative ruling under 62.1, based on Plaintiff's first 180 days case status update of arbitration per the Court's request, filed by Plaintiff Cristina Balan. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit) Noting Date 1/7/2020 1/24/2020 , (Balan, Cristina) Modified on 1/8/2020 to remove excessive capitalization and renote. (PM).
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank  Terminate Motions
                                                                ***Motion terminated: [46] MOTION for Relief RULE 60(B)(2)(3) and (6), FROM THE ORDER GRANTING IN PART ARBITRATION & REQUEST FOR INDICATIVE RULING UNDER RULE 62.1 AND FRAP 12.1, BASED ON PLAINTIFFS FIRST 180 DAYS CASE STATUS UPDATE OF ARBITRATION PER THE COURTS ORDER FROM J filed by Cristina Balan. Per filer, filed incorrectly. Re-filed as document [47]. (STP)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 46 Filed: 1/6/2020, Entered: 1/6/2020, Terminated: 1/7/2020 Motion for relief
                                                                  DISREGARD ENTRY filer re-filed corrected motion [47] MOTION for Relief RULE 60(B)(2)(3) and (6), FROM THE ORDER GRANTING IN PART ARBITRATION & REQUEST FOR INDICATIVE RULING UNDER RULE 62.1 AND FRAP 12.1, BASED ON PLAINTIFFS FIRST 180 DAYS CASE STATUS UPDATE OF ARBITRATION PER THE COURTS ORDER FROM JUNE 27, 2019, filed by Plaintiff Cristina Balan. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit) Noting Date 1/6/2020, (Balan, Cristina) Modified on 1/7/2020 (STP).
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/27/2019, Entered: 8/27/2019 Transcript Designation/Order Form - Appeal
                                                                  TRANSCRIPT REQUEST (19-35637) by Defendant Tesla Motors Inc for proceedings held on 06/19/2019, re [41] Notice of Filing of Official Transcript,,,. Requesting Attorney: Darin M Sands. (Sands, Darin)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/30/2019, Entered: 7/30/2019 USCA Scheduling Order
                                                                    TIME SCHEDULE ORDER ( #19-35637) as to [42] Notice of Appeal filed by Tesla Motors Inc (CDA)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/29/2019, Entered: 7/29/2019 Representation Statement
                                                                      REPRESENTATION STATEMENT, by Defendant Tesla Motors Inc, (re: [42] Notice of Appeal.) (Sands, Darin)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/29/2019, Entered: 7/29/2019 Notice of appeal
                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEAL to Ninth Circuit (19-35637) re [40] Order on Motion to Compel,, Case Stayed, by Defendant Tesla Motors Inc. $505, receipt number 0981-5864259. (cc: USCA) (Sands, Darin) Modified on 7/30/2019 add CCA # (CDA).
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/28/2019, Entered: 6/28/2019 Notice of Filing of Official TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion to Compel Arbitration held on 6/19/2019 before Judge Marsha J. Pechman.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Debbie Zurn, debbie_zurn@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8504. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/26/2019, (DZ)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 40 Filed: 6/27/2019, Entered: 6/27/2019 Order on motion to compelCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant's [17] Motion to Compel Arbitration. This matter is stayed until the conclusion of the arbitration by written decision of the arbitrator. The Parties are to notify the Court within 10 days of the decision. The Parties will also advise the Court every 180 days of the state of the arbitration. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 39 Filed: 6/19/2019, Entered: 6/20/2019 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                              MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Marsha J. Pechman- Dep Clerk: Rhonda Miller; Pla Counsel: Pro Se; Def Counsel: Rodney Sorensen CR: Debbie Zurn; Motion Hearing held on 6/19/2019 [17] MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Tesla Motors Inc. Oral argument presented. Court will issue written opinion. (RM)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 38 Filed: 6/17/2019, Entered: 6/17/2019 Notice of hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED HEARING TIME - The hearing time has been changed: ORAL ARGUMENT/Motion Hearing set for 6/19/2019 at 2:45 PM in Courtroom 14206 before Judge Marsha J. Pechman. Each side is allowed 20 minutes for argument, including rebuttal. (RM)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 37 Filed: 5/29/2019, Entered: 5/29/2019 Notice of hearing on motionCourt Filing
                                                                                  NOTICE of Hearing [17] MOTION to Compel Arbitration : ORAL ARGUMENT/Motion Hearing set for 6/19/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 14206 before Judge Marsha J. Pechman. Each side is allowed 20 minutes for argument, including rebuttal. (RM)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 36 Filed: 5/23/2019, Entered: 5/23/2019 Order on Motion for sanctionsCourt Filing
                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER striking as moot Plaintiff's [12][14] Motions for Sanctions. Authorized by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 35 Filed: 5/16/2019, Entered: 5/16/2019 Notice of Filing of Official TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of status conference held on 5/1/2019 before Judge Marsha J. Pechman.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Nancy Bauer, nancy_bauer@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8506. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/14/2019, (NB)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 34 Filed: 5/14/2019, Entered: 5/14/2019 Minute OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER re: Plaintiff's [12] [14] Motions for Sanctions. Having received the Defendant's Initial Disclosures and the Parties' updated Joint Status Report, unless the Court hears from Plaintiff within eight (8) days of this Order, Plaintiff's Motions for Sanctions (Dkt. Nos. [12], [14]) will be stricken as moot. Authorized by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/14/2019, Entered: 5/14/2019 Order Setting Trial Date and Related DatesCourt Filing
                                                                                          ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES; Length of Trial: *2-4 DAY* - Jury Trial is set for 4/27/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 14206 before Judge Marsha J. Pechman. Joinder of Parties due by 6/11/2019, Amended Pleadings due by 6/21/2019, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 9/30/2019, Motions due by 10/30/2019, Discovery completed by 11/29/2019, Dispositive motions due by 12/30/2019, Motions in Limine due by 3/23/2020, Pretrial Order due by 4/15/2020, Trial briefs to be submitted by 4/15/2020, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 4/15/2020, Pretrial Conference set for 4/17/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 14206 before Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RM)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Blank 32 Filed: 5/13/2019, Entered: 5/13/2019 Notice of Stricken Hearing
                                                                                            NOTICE striking telephone conference set for 5/14/2019. (RM)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 31 Filed: 5/10/2019, Entered: 5/10/2019 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                              REPLY, filed by Defendant Tesla Motors Inc, TO RESPONSE to [17] MOTION to Compel Arbitration (Sands, Darin)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                Blank 30 Filed: 5/10/2019, Entered: 5/10/2019 Notice of hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 5/14/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(RM)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/6/2019, Entered: 5/6/2019 Declaration
                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Cristina Balan filed by Plaintiff Cristina Balan re [17] MOTION to Compel Arbitration (Balan, Cristina)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/6/2019, Entered: 5/6/2019 Response to motion
                                                                                                    RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Cristina Balan, to [17] MOTION to Compel Arbitration. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Balan, Cristina)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/3/2019, Entered: 5/3/2019 Joint Status Report
                                                                                                      JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 2 - 4 days. (Sands, Darin)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 26 Filed: 5/1/2019, Entered: 5/1/2019 Minute OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER: An updated Joint Status Report is due no later than 5/3/2019. Defendant will provide the Court with an amended initial disclosure report no later than 5/8/2019. The Court will not rule on any motions until it reviews the outcome of the Joint Status Report and Defendant's initial disclosures. Authorized by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RM)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 25 Filed: 5/1/2019, Entered: 5/1/2019 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                          MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Marsha J. Pechman- Dep Clerk: Rhonda Miller; Pla Counsel: Pro Se; Def Counsel: Darin Sands; CR: Nancy Bauer; Status Conference held on 5/1/2019. An updated Joint Status Report is due no later than 5/3/2019. Defendant will provide the Court with an amended initial disclosure report no later than 5/8/2019. (RM)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank  Set/Reset Motion Noting Date
                                                                                                            Noting Date Reset re Plaintiff's [14] Second MOTION for Sanctions: Noting Date 5/3/2019, per LCR 7(d)(3). (PM)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 24 Filed: 4/24/2019, Entered: 4/24/2019 Declaration
                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Darin M. Sands filed by Defendant Tesla Motors Inc re [14] Second MOTION for Sanctions for Forging Plaintiff Sgnature on the Joint Status Report, missing the second deadline, misleading the court and lack of good faith and cooperation (Sands, Darin)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 23 Filed: 4/24/2019, Entered: 4/24/2019 Declaration
                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Matthew C. Lewis filed by Defendant Tesla Motors Inc re [14] Second MOTION for Sanctions for Forging Plaintiff Sgnature on the Joint Status Report, missing the second deadline, misleading the court and lack of good faith and cooperation (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Sands, Darin)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 22 Filed: 4/24/2019, Entered: 4/24/2019 Response to motion
                                                                                                                RESPONSE, by Defendant Tesla Motors Inc, to [14] Second MOTION for Sanctions for Forging Plaintiff Sgnature on the Joint Status Report, missing the second deadline, misleading the court and lack of good faith and cooperation. (Sands, Darin)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                                                  Set Hearings: Status Conference set for 5/1/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (LW)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: 4/18/2019 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                    REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Cristina Balan, TO RESPONSE to [12] Proposed MOTION for Sanctions for Failure to Make Disclosures and Cooperate in Good Faith in Discovery (Balan, Cristina)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: 4/18/2019 Request
                                                                                                                      REQUEST for Judicial Notice by Defendant Tesla Motors Inc for Judicial Notice re [17] MOTION to Compel Arbitration (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-C)(Sands, Darin)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: 4/18/2019 Declaration
                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Matthew C. Lewis filed by Defendant Tesla Motors Inc re [17] MOTION to Compel Arbitration (Sands, Darin)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: 4/18/2019 Declaration
                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Nicole White filed by Defendant Tesla Motors Inc re [17] MOTION to Compel Arbitration (Sands, Darin)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 17 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: 4/18/2019, Terminated: 6/27/2019 Motion to compel
                                                                                                                            MOTION to Compel Arbitration, filed by Defendant Tesla Motors Inc. Oral Argument Requested. Noting Date 5/10/2019, (Sands, Darin)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/15/2019, Entered: 4/15/2019 Declaration
                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Matthew C. Lewis filed by Defendant Tesla Motors Inc re [12] Proposed MOTION for Sanctions for Failure to Make Disclosures and Cooperate in Good Faith in Discovery (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(Sands, Darin)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/15/2019, Entered: 4/15/2019 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                RESPONSE, by Defendant Tesla Motors Inc, to [12] Proposed MOTION for Sanctions for Failure to Make Disclosures and Cooperate in Good Faith in Discovery. (Sands, Darin)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 14 Filed: 4/12/2019, Entered: 4/12/2019, Terminated: 5/23/2019 Motion for sanctions
                                                                                                                                  Second MOTION for Sanctions for Forging Plaintiff Sgnature on the Joint Status Report, missing the second deadline, misleading the court and lack of good faith and cooperation, filed by Plaintiff Cristina Balan. Noting Date 4/26/2019, (Balan, Cristina)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 13 Filed: 4/11/2019, Entered: 4/11/2019 Joint Status Report
                                                                                                                                    JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties (Sands, Darin)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 12 Filed: 4/1/2019, Entered: 4/1/2019, Terminated: 5/23/2019 Motion for sanctions
                                                                                                                                      Proposed MOTION for Sanctions for Failure to Make Disclosures and Cooperate in Good Faith in Discovery, filed by Plaintiff Cristina Balan. Oral Argument Requested. Noting Date 4/1/2019 4/19/2019, (Balan, Cristina) Modified on 4/1/2019 to strike through the word "Proposed" and noting date of 4/1/2019(PM).
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 11 Filed: 4/1/2019, Entered: 4/1/2019 Minute OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER: The parties have not complied with the order directing that a joint status report be filed by 3/27/2019. The time for filing the report is hereby extended to 4/11/2019. If the report is not filed by that time, sanctions may be ordered. Sanctions may include dismissal of the action without prejudice. Authorized by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RM)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank  Set/Reset Motion Noting Date
                                                                                                                                          Noting Date Reset re Plaintiff's [12] Proposed MOTION for Sanctions for Failure to Make Disclosures and Cooperate in Good Faith in Discovery: Noting Date 4/19/2019, per direction of chambers. (PM)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 10 Filed: 2/15/2019, Entered: 2/15/2019 Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                            ORDER re [8] Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Rodney B Sorensen for defendant Tesla Motors Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 9 Filed: 2/15/2019, Entered: 2/15/2019 Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                              ORDER re [7] Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Matthew C Lewis for Defendant Tesla Motors Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/14/2019, Entered: 2/14/2019, Terminated: 2/15/2019 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Rodney B. Sorensen FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Tesla Motors Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5651812 (Sands, Darin)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/14/2019, Entered: 2/14/2019, Terminated: 2/15/2019 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Matthew C. Lewis FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Tesla Motors Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5651808 (Sands, Darin)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/14/2019, Entered: 2/14/2019 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Tesla Motors Inc (Sands, Darin)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/14/2019, Entered: 2/14/2019 Answer
                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to [1] Complaint with JURY DEMAND Attorney Darin M Sands added to party Tesla Motors Inc(pty:dft) by Tesla Motors Inc.(Sands, Darin)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/13/2019, Entered: 2/13/2019 Joint Status Report Order Form for District JudgesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 3/27/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 3/13/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/20/2019, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RM)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/1/2019, Entered: 2/1/2019 Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint
                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on TESLA MOTORS INC on 1/24/2019, filed by Plaintiff Cristina Balan. (Balan, Cristina)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/16/2019, Entered: 1/16/2019 Notice re Pro Se Registration
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE: Plaintiff Cristina Balan has registered to electronically file and receive electronic service in this case. (PS)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/15/2019, Entered: 1/16/2019 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT, filed by Cristina Balan against defendant(s) Tesla Motors Inc with JURY DEMAND (Summons(es) issued) (Receipt # SEA094286) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Civil Cover Sheet)(ST)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                                                                              Space Space

                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 1,742 times.

                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?