In Re: TRUMP SECURITIES MDL, et al v. , et al
Federal Court Proceeding New Jersey District Court, Case No. 1:90-mc-00919-JBS
District Judge Jerome B. Simandle, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 4, 2017 at 11:11 PM DT (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ALEXANDER L. CHARNIS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Stamell & Schaffer, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jared Bennett Stamell +1 212 566 4047 +1 212 566 4061 stamell@ssnyc.com
No Logo Carborundum Company, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "DAVID E. DOUGHERTY"

Toggle Switch Represented by Harwood Feffer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space STUART D. WECHSLER +1 212 935 7400 + 212 735 2510

Represented by Zwerling, Schachter & Zwerling, LLP

No Logo DINO DEL ZOTTO, Plaintiff
No Logo DOROTHY ARKELL, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodkind Labaton Rudoff & Sucharow LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan M. Plasse +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 883 7063

Toggle Switch Represented by Stamell & Schaffer, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jared Bennett Stamell +1 212 566 4047 +1 212 566 4061 stamell@ssnyc.com
No Logo ERIC CAGAN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Harwood Feffer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space STUART D. WECHSLER +1 212 935 7400 + 212 735 2510

Represented by Zwerling, Schachter & Zwerling, LLP

No Logo FAIRMONT FINANCIAL CORP., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard David Greenfield +10320593 103 320 5931 +1 410 745 4149 whitehatrdg@earthlink.net
No Logo FRED GLOSSNER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space CHARLES R. VANDEWALLE +1 516 482 6100

Toggle Switch Represented by Barrack, Rodos & Bacine

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gerarld J Rodos +1 215 963 0600 +1 619 963 0838 grodos@barrack.com
No Logo HELEN KLOSS, Plaintiff

Represented by Garwin Gerstein & Fisher

No Logo HERMAN KRANGEL, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space CHARLES R. VANDEWALLE +1 516 482 6100

Toggle Switch Represented by Barrack, Rodos & Bacine

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gerarld J Rodos +1 215 963 0600 +1 619 963 0838 grodos@barrack.com
No Logo JEAN CURZIO, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Harwood Feffer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space STUART D. WECHSLER +1 212 935 7400 + 212 735 2510

Represented by Zwerling, Schachter & Zwerling, LLP

No Logo JEROME SCHWARTZ, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MICHAEL A. COHAN +1 732 727 8440
Space Edward Labaton +1 212 907 0700
Space ROBERT B. MATUSOFF

Toggle Switch Represented by Gene Mesh & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gene Irving Mesh +1 513 221 8800 +1 513 221 8800
No Logo JOANNE GOLLOMP, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard David Greenfield +10320593 103 320 5931 +1 410 745 4149 whitehatrdg@earthlink.net
No Logo PETER STUYVESANT, LTD., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward Labaton +1 212 907 0700
No Logo ROBERT KLOSS, Plaintiff

Represented by Garwin Gerstein & Fisher

No Logo SIDNEY L. KAUFMAN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MICHAEL A. COHAN +1 732 727 8440
Space HOWARD A. SPECTER
No Logo SUSAN CAGAN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Harwood Feffer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space STUART D. WECHSLER +1 212 935 7400 + 212 735 2510

Represented by Zwerling, Schachter & Zwerling, LLP

v.
No Logo C. "BUCKY&quo WILLARD, Defendant
No Logo EDWARD M. TRACY, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Willkie Farr & Gallagher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard L. Posen +1 212 728 8000 +1 212 728 8111 rposen@willkie.com
No Logo FRANCISCO TEJEDA, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Willkie Farr & Gallagher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard L. Posen +1 212 728 8000 +1 212 728 8111 rposen@willkie.com
No Logo Jeffrey A. Ross, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Willkie Farr & Gallagher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard L. Posen +1 212 728 8000 +1 212 728 8111 rposen@willkie.com
No Logo JOHN O'DONNELL, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Willkie Farr & Gallagher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard L. Posen +1 212 728 8000 +1 212 728 8111 rposen@willkie.com
No Logo JOHN P. BELISLE, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Willkie Farr & Gallagher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard L. Posen +1 212 728 8000 +1 212 728 8111 rposen@willkie.com
No Logo JULIAN MENARGUEZ, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Willkie Farr & Gallagher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard L. Posen +1 212 728 8000 +1 212 728 8111 rposen@willkie.com
No Logo LORI TAYLOR, Defendant
No Logo MICHAEL S. VAUTRIN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Willkie Farr & Gallagher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard L. Posen +1 212 728 8000 +1 212 728 8111 rposen@willkie.com
No Logo NATHAN KATZ, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Willkie Farr & Gallagher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard L. Posen +1 212 728 8000 +1 212 728 8111 rposen@willkie.com
No Logo PATRICK C. MCKOY, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Willkie Farr & Gallagher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard L. Posen +1 212 728 8000 +1 212 728 8111 rposen@willkie.com
No Logo PAUL HENDERSON, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Willkie Farr & Gallagher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard L. Posen +1 212 728 8000 +1 212 728 8111 rposen@willkie.com
No Logo TIM MALAND, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Willkie Farr & Gallagher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard L. Posen +1 212 728 8000 +1 212 728 8111 rposen@willkie.com
No Logo TIMOTHY G. ROSE, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Willkie Farr & Gallagher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard L. Posen +1 212 728 8000 +1 212 728 8111 rposen@willkie.com
Trump's Castle Associates, LP Trump's Castle Associates, LP, Defendant
Officially listed as "TRUMP'S CASTLE ASSOCIATES LIMITED PARTNERSHIP"

Toggle Switch Represented by Dilworth Paxson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JOHN LEWIS LASKEY +1 856 663 8877 jlaskey@dilworthlaw.com
No Logo TRUMP'S CASTLE FUNDING, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dilworth Paxson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JOHN LEWIS LASKEY +1 856 663 8877 jlaskey@dilworthlaw.com
Office Camden
Filed 12/6/1990
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated
Origin 5
Reopened
Lead Case
190-cv-02350-JFG None
Related Case
Other Court Cases 92-5350[], MDL864[US MDL PANEL]
Def Custody Status
Flags 12BC, CLOSED, SCHEDO
  Entries (114) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 99 Filed: 1/26/2007, Entered: 1/29/2007 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
ORDER granting [97] Motion authorizing distribution of residual balance of settlement funds and permitting settlement administratior to dispose of all calm forms and supporting documents . Signed by Judge Jerome B. Simandle on 01/26/07. (db, )
    LREF
    Legal Document 98 Filed: 1/22/2007, Entered: 1/23/2007 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
    ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jerome B. Simandle for all further proceedings. Judge John F. Gerry no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Garrett E. Brown, Jr. on 01/22/07. (db, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 97 Filed: 12/26/2006, Entered: 1/10/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
      MOTION for an order authorizing distribution of residual balance of settlement fund and permitting settlement administrator to dispose of all claim forms and supporting documents by DOROTHY ARKELL et al. (Attachments: # (1) Brief # (2) Declaration of Jonathan M. Plasse# (3) Exhibit A# (4) Exhibit B# (5) Exhibit C# (6) Exhibit D# (7) Affidavit of Shandarese Garr# (8) Text of Proposed Order)(db, )
      LREF
      Blank 96 Filed: 8/8/1994, Entered: 8/9/1994 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER, proofs of claim submitted by members of the settlement class on or before Dec. 1, 1993 shall be deemed timely filed. ( signed by Chief Judge John F. Gerry ) (ar1)
        LREF
        Blank 95 Filed: 8/4/1994, Entered: 8/9/1994 Affidavit
        AFFIDAVIT of MOJDEH L. KHAGHAN Re: [93-1] motion for distribution and other administrative matters (ar1) (dd).
          LREF
          Blank 94 Filed: 8/2/1994, Entered: 8/9/1994 Minutes - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
          Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: Ted Formaroli; Minutes of: 8/2/94; The following actions were taken, ordered settlement fund be distributed and all claims in litigation be dismissed an approving administrative costs. By Chief Judge John F. Gerry (ar1)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 7/18/1994, Entered: 7/18/1994 Set/Reset Deadlines:
            Deadline updated; Motion hearing set for 9:30 8/5/94 in 1:90-mc-00919, in 1:90-cv-02349, in 1:90-cv-02350, in 1:90-cv-05004, in 1:90-cv-05051, in 1:90-cv-05052, in 1:91-cv-00018, in 1:91-cv-00019, in 1:91-cv-00020 for [93-1] motion for distribution and other administrative matters in 1:90-mc-00919 (femp)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 7/5/1994, Entered: 7/5/1994 Set/Reset Deadlines:
              Deadline updated; Motion hearing set for 9:30 7/15/94 in 1:90-mc-00919, in 1:90-cv-02349 for [93-1] motion for distribution and other administrative matters in 1:90-mc-00919 (femp)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 6/3/1994, Entered: 6/3/1994 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                Deadline updated; Motion hearing set for 9:30 7/1/94 for [93-1] motion for distribution and other administrative matters (femp)
                  LREF
                  Blank 93 Filed: 3/17/1994, Entered: 3/23/1994 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                  Notice of MOTION for distribution and other administrative matters by DINO DEL ZOTTO in 1:90-mc-00919, JOANNE GOLLOMP in 1:90-mc-00919, FAIRMONT FINANCIAL in 1:90-mc-00919, HELEN KLOSS in 1:90-mc-00919, ROBERT KLOSS in 1:90-mc-00919, HERMAN KRANGEL in 1:90-mc-00919, FRED GLOSSNER in 1:90-mc-00919, DOROTHY ARKELL in 1:90-mc-00919, ALEXANDER L. CHARNIS in 1:90-mc-00919, JEAN CURZIO in 1:90-mc-00919, DAVID E. DOUGHERTY in 1:90-mc-00919, ERIC CAGAN in 1:90-mc-00919, SUSAN CAGAN in 1:90-mc-00919, PETER STUYVESANT in 1:90-mc-00919, Motion hearing set for 4/15/93 on [93-1] motion .(Affidavits and Cert. of Service Attached) (mb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/19/2016: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C) (dd).
                    LREF
                    Blank 92 Filed: 11/8/1993, Entered: 11/9/1993 USCA Judgment
                    JUDGMENT OF USCA (certified copy) Re: [84-1] appeal, [82-1] appeal issued in lieu of a formal mandate on November 5, 1993 affirming jdugment of USDC entered 6/17/92 with costs taxed against appellants (sa) (dd).
                      LREF
                      Blank 91 Filed: 11/8/1993, Entered: 11/9/1993 Order
                      MEMORANDUM OPINION (USCA) (sa) (dd).
                        LREF
                        Blank 90 Filed: 8/23/1993, Entered: 8/24/1993 Notice (Other)
                        NOTICE of CHANGE OF ADDRESS by ZWERLING, SCHACHTER & ZWERLING atty for the plaintiff. Submitted with affidavit of service. (mb)
                          LREF
                          Blank 89 Filed: 8/17/1992, Entered: 9/1/1992 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER/JUDGMENT , dismissing with prejudice and without cost to any party in accordance with the stipulation of settlement dated March 5, 1992 as to the following cases; Stuyvesant et al. v. Trump et al. Civ. No. 90-5004 (JFG); Kaufman v. Trump's Castle et al., 90-2349 (JFG); Schwartz v. Trump's Castle et al., Civ No. 90-2350 (JFG) signed by Chief Judge John F. Gerry ) (ln) Modified on 09/01/1992 (dd).
                            LREF
                            Blank 88 Filed: 7/15/1992, Entered: 7/16/1992 Transcript
                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings taken on 5/1/92 (sa) (dd).
                              LREF
                              Blank 87 Filed: 7/15/1992, Entered: 7/16/1992 TranscriptCourt Filing
                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings taken on January 11, 1992 , before John F. Gerry, Chief Judge and Jerome B. Simandle, U.S. Magistrate Judge (ln) (dd).
                                LREF
                                Blank 86 Filed: 7/15/1992, Entered: 7/15/1992 Transcript Request
                                Transcript Purchase Order RE: [82-1] appeal-5/1/92 (sa) (dd).
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 7/15/1992, Entered: 7/16/1992 Appeal Record Sent to USCA
                                  Record on appeal sent to U.S. Court of Appeals: [84-1] appeal in 1:90-mc-00919, [82-1] appeal in 1:90-mc-00919 (sa)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 85 Filed: 7/7/1992, Entered: 7/13/1992 OrderCourt Filing
                                    OPINION AND ORDER directing the motion to disqualify present counsel as co-lead plaintiffs' counsel and to disqualify Fairmount Financial Corp. as a class representaive is DISMISSED as moot. It is further ORDERED that the matters addressed in this opinion be referred to disciplinary investigation in compliance with Local Rule 7E. ( signed by Chief Judge John F. Gerry ) SEALED (ln) Modified on 07/22/1992
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 84 Filed: 7/1/1992, Entered: 7/2/1992 Notice of Appeal (USCA)
                                      AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL to add plaintiffs DelZotto (Civ. 92-621) and Charnis and Arkell (Civ. 90-5052) filed at 3:27 pm Re: . Fee Status: none. Copies of notice of appeal sent to USCA and Attorney(s): (mb) (dd).
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 83 Filed: 7/1/1992, Entered: 7/1/1992 USCA Notice of Docketing ROA
                                        NOTICE of Docketing ROA from USCA Re: [82-1] appeal USCA NUMBER: 92-5350 (sa) (dd).
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 82 Filed: 6/24/1992, Entered: 6/24/1992, Terminated: 11/8/1993 Notice of Appeal (USCA)
                                          NOTICE OF APPEAL filed at 10:47 am by JOANNE GOLLOMP in 1:90-mc-00919, HELEN KLOSS in 1:90-mc-00919, ROBERT KLOSS in 1:90-mc-00919, HERMAN KRANGEL in 1:90-mc-00919, FRED GLOSSNER in 1:90-mc-00919, JEAN CURZIO in 1:90-mc-00919, DAVID E. DOUGHERTY in 1:90-mc-00919, ERIC CAGAN in 1:90-mc-00919, SUSAN CAGAN in 1:90-mc-00919, JEROME SCHWARTZ in 1:90-mc-00919, SIDNEY L. KAUFMAN in 1:90-mc-00919 Re: [79-1] order . Fee Status: pd. Copies of notice of appeal sent to USCA and Attorney(s): (TPO ISSUED) (sa) (dd).
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 81 Filed: 6/19/1992, Entered: 6/23/1992 Minutes - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                            Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: Theodore Formaroli; Minutes of: June 19, 1992; The following actions were taken, mooting - court reported action settled as to certain actions [65-1] motion for Approval of the Proposed settlement, mooting - court reported action settled as to certain actions [65-2] motion for Approval of attorney fees and Reimbursement of Expenses, By Chief Judge John F. Gerry (ln) (dd).
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 80 Filed: 6/8/1992, Entered: 6/8/1992 Minutes - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                              Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: Theodore Formaroli; Minutes of: June 5, 1992; The following actions were taken, mooting [61-1] motion By Chief Judge John F. Gerry, Order and Opinion to be submitted. (ln) (dd).
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 79 Filed: 6/2/1992, Entered: 6/3/1992 OrderCourt Filing
                                                ORDER dismissing complaint as to defts , Donald J. Trump, Robert S. Trump, Harvey S. Freeman, The Trump Organization, Inc., Taj Mahal Funding, Inc. , Trump Taj Mahal Inc. and Trump Taj Mahal Associates Limited (collectively "the Trump defendants"), and of defendant Merrill, Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, with Prejudice ( signed by Chief Judge John F. Gerry ) (ln) (dd).
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 78 Filed: 6/2/1992, Entered: 6/3/1992 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  OPINION ( signed by Chief Judge John F. Gerry ) (ln) (dd).
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 77 Filed: 6/1/1992, Entered: 6/1/1992 Affidavit
                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Jared Stamell Re: In support of the motin to require the withdrawal of the law firm, Greenfield & Chimicles. (See Misc. 90-919) (lc) Modified on 06/01/1992 (dd).
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 76 Filed: 5/29/1992, Entered: 5/29/1992 Affidavit
                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF BERTRAM BRONZAFT Re: [61-1] motion (ln) (dd).
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 75 Filed: 5/29/1992, Entered: 5/29/1992 Affidavit
                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF JOSEPH H. WEISS Re: [61-1] motion (ln) (dd).
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 74 Filed: 5/29/1992, Entered: 5/29/1992 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                          REPLY by DINO DEL ZOTTO in 1:90-mc-00919, JOANNE GOLLOMP in 1:90-mc-00919, FAIRMONT FINANCIAL in 1:90-mc-00919, HELEN KLOSS in 1:90-mc-00919, ROBERT KLOSS in 1:90-mc-00919, HERMAN KRANGEL in 1:90-mc-00919 AND ALL OTHER PLAINTIFFS in response to [61-1] motion (ln) Modified on 05/29/1992 (dd).
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 73 Filed: 5/21/1992, Entered: 5/21/1992 Minutes - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                            Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: Carl Nami; Minutes of: May 21, 1992; The following actions were taken, granting [65-1] motion for Approval of the Proposed settlement in 1:90-mc-00919, granting [65-2] motion for Approval of attorney fees and expenses in 1:90-mc-00919, Ordered Settlement Approved; Order submitted By Chief Judge John F. Gerry (ln) (dd).
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 72 Filed: 5/21/1992, Entered: 5/21/1992 Affidavit
                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Re: [71-1] affidavit (ln) Modified on 05/22/1992 (dd).
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 71 Filed: 5/21/1992, Entered: 5/21/1992 Affidavit
                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF IRENE M. KOCH Re: [65-1] motion for Approval of the Proposed settlement, [65-2] motion for Approval of attorney fees, [65-3] hearing Motion hearing set for 6/19/92 on [65-1] motion, set for 6/19/92 on [65-2] motion (ln) Modified on 05/22/1992 (dd).
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 70 Filed: 5/21/1992, Entered: 5/21/1992 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER granting [65-1] motion for Approval of the Proposed settlement ( signed by Chief Judge John F. Gerry ) (ln) Modified on 05/22/1992 (dd).
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 69 Filed: 5/15/1992, Entered: 5/19/1992 Minutes - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                    Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: Theodore Formaroli; Minutes of: May 15, 1992; The following actions were taken, granting [52-1] motion to dismiss consolidated amended complaint granting [51-1] motion to dismiss consolidated amended complaint; Order to be Submitted, By Chief Judge John F. Gerry (ln) Modified on 05/19/1992 (dd).
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 68 Filed: 5/14/1992, Entered: 5/15/1992 Affidavit
                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF GABRIEL F. NAGY Re: [65-1] motion for Approval of the Proposed settlement, [65-2] motion for Approval of attorney fees (ln) (dd).
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 67 Filed: 5/14/1992, Entered: 5/15/1992 Affidavit
                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF ROBERT B. MATUSOFF Re: [65-2] motion for Approval of attorney fees (ln)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 66 Filed: 5/14/1992, Entered: 5/15/1992 Affidavit
                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF EDWARD LABATON Re: [65-1] motion for Approval of the Proposed settlement, [65-2] motion for Approval of attorney fees (ln) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/20/2016: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D) (dd).
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 65 Filed: 5/14/1992, Entered: 5/15/1992 Motion for SettlementCourt Filing
                                                                            Notice of MOTION for Approval of the Proposed settlement , for Approval of attorney fees and Reimbursement of Expenses by DINO DEL ZOTTO in 1:90-mc-00919, JOANNE GOLLOMP in 1:90-mc-00919, FAIRMONT FINANCIAL in 1:90-mc-00919, HELEN KLOSS in 1:90-mc-00919, ROBERT KLOSS in 1:90-mc-00919,AND ALL OTHER PLAINTIFFS , Motion hearing set for 6/19/92 on [65-1] motion, set for 6/19/92 on [65-2] motion Before Judge John F. Gerry . (ln) (dd).
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 64 Filed: 5/1/1992, Entered: 5/6/1992 Minutes - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                              Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: Ted Formaroli; Minutes of: May 1, 1992; The following actions were taken, [52-1] motion to dismiss consolidated amended complaint taken under advisement, [51-1] motion to dismiss consolidated amended complaint taken under advisement By Chief Judge John F. Gerry (ln) (dd).
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 63 Filed: 4/30/1992, Entered: 5/6/1992 Affidavit
                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF STUART D. WECHSLER Re: [61-1] motion (ln) (dd).
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 62 Filed: 4/30/1992, Entered: 5/6/1992 Certificate of Service
                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (ln) (dd).
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 61 Filed: 4/30/1992, Entered: 5/4/1992 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                    Notice of MOTION TO DISQUALFY FAIRMONT FIANCIAL CORP AND ITS COUNSEL by DINO DEL ZOTTO in 1:90-mc-00919, JOANNE GOLLOMP in 1:90-mc-00919, FAIRMONT FINANCIAL in 1:90-mc-00919, HELEN KLOSS in 1:90-mc-00919, ROBERT KLOSS in 1:90-mc-00919, HERMAN KRANGEL in 1:90-mc-00919, FRED GLOSSNER in 1:90-mc-00919, DOROTHY ARKELL in 1:90-mc-00919, ALEXANDER L. CHARNIS in 1:90-mc-00919, JEAN CURZIO in 1:90-mc-00919, DAVID E. DOUGHERTY in 1:90-mc-00919, ERIC CAGAN in 1:90-mc-00919, SUSAN CAGAN in 1:90-mc-00919, PETER STUYVESANT in 1:90-mc-00919, JEROME SCHWARTZ in 1:90-mc-00919, SIDNEY L. KAUFMAN in 1:90-mc-00919,,, Motion hearing set for 6/5/92 at 10:00 a.m. on [61-1] motion . BRIEF SUBMITTED (ln) Modified on 05/06/1992 (dd).
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 60 Filed: 3/25/1992, Entered: 3/30/1992 Order
                                                                                      ORDER FOR COORDINATION with cv 92-621 Del Zotto Case ( signed by Magistrate Jerome B. Simandle ) (ln) Modified on 04/23/1992 (dd).
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 59 Filed: 3/24/1992, Entered: 3/30/1992 Order
                                                                                        CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER # 4 ( signed by Magistrate Jerome B. Simandle ) (ln) Modified on 04/23/1992 (dd).
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 3/24/1992, Entered: 3/24/1992 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                          Deadline updated; Motion hearing set for 5/1/92 for [52-1] motion to dismiss consolidated amended complaint, set for 5/1/92 for [51-1] motion to dismiss consolidated amended complaint (ln)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 3/20/1992, Entered: 3/20/1992 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                            Deadline updated; set settlement hearing for 10:00 5/21/92 before Judge John F. Gerry (ln) Modified on 03/23/1992
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 58 Filed: 3/10/1992, Entered: 4/22/1992 Stipulation
                                                                                              STIPULATION AND AGREEMENT OF COMPROMISE AND SETTLEMENT (ln) Modified on 04/23/1992 (dd).
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 57 Filed: 3/10/1992, Entered: 3/19/1992 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                PRELIMINARY ORDER ( signed by Chief Judge John F. Gerry ) scheduling a "Settlement Hearing" to be held May 21, 1992 at 10:00 a.m. or at any adjourned time court establishes in Ctrm No. 2. NM (ln) Modified on 03/23/1992 (dd).
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 56 Filed: 3/6/1992, Entered: 3/23/1992 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                  SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by SIDNEY L. KAUFMAN and PETER STUYVESANT (jo) (dd).
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 55 Filed: 3/4/1992, Entered: 3/4/1992 Certificate of Service
                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE RE: BRIEF IN OPPOSITION AND AFFIDAVIT. (ln) (dd).
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 54 Filed: 2/28/1992, Entered: 3/4/1992 Affidavit
                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of JEFFREY M. KRULIK in opposition to Deft's Re: [52-1] motion to dismiss consolidated amended complaint, [51-1] motion to dismiss consolidated amended complaint (BRIEF SUBMITTED) (ln) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/19/2016: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I, # (10) Exhibit J) (dd).
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 53 Filed: 2/14/1992, Entered: 2/14/1992 Remark
                                                                                                        CASE #92cv621 (JFG) transfered from Eastern District of New York to New Jersey with Dino Del Zotto as Plaintiff. (femp) (dd).
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 53 Filed: 2/14/1992, Entered: 2/14/1992 Remark
                                                                                                          CASE #92cv621 (JFG) transfered from Eastern District of New York to New Jersey with Dino Del Zotto as Plaintiff. (femp)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 52 Filed: 1/28/1992, Entered: 2/6/1992 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                            Notice of MOTION to dismiss consolidated amended complaint by HARVEY I. FREEMAN in 1:90-mc-00919, TRUMP TAJ MAHAL, INC in 1:90-mc-00919, TRUMP ORGANIZATION in 1:90-mc-00919, ROBERT S. TRUMP in 1:90-mc-00919, DONALD J. TRUMP in 1:90-mc-00919, TRUMP TAJ MAHAL ASSO in 1:90-mc-00919, TRUMP TAJ MAHAL FUND in 1:90-mc-00919, Motion hearing set for 3/20/92 on [52-1] motion with Affidavit of Richard Posen . (MEMO) (ln) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/24/2016: # (1) Text of Proposed Order, # (2) Affidavit, # (3) Exhibit A, # (4) Exhibit B) (dd).
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 51 Filed: 1/28/1992, Entered: 2/6/1992 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                              Notice of MOTION to dismiss consolidated amended complaint by MERRILL LYNCH in 1:90-mc-00919, Motion hearing set for 3/20/92 on [51-1] motion with Affidavit of Service . (MEMO) (ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED) (ln) Modified on 02/06/1992
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 50 Filed: 1/16/1992, Entered: 1/16/1992 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER setting Temprorary Stay of Discovery cutoff 3/10/92 ; Pretrial conference 1:30 3/20/92 ; Dismissal Motions due on or before 1/28/92 ( signed by Magistrate Jerome B. Simandle ) (ln) (dd).
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 48 Filed: 11/25/1991, Entered: 11/25/1991 Minutes - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: Theodore Formaroli; Minutes of: 11/8/91; The following actions were taken, denying [45-1] motion to solicit approval by the class of the proposed settlement, etc. w/affidavits of Robert M. Miller and Richard L. Posen attached By Chief Judge John F. Gerry (ln) (dd).
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 49 Filed: 11/15/1991, Entered: 11/26/1991 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying [45-1] motion to solicit approval by the class of the proposed settlement, etc. w/affidavits of Robert M. Miller and Richard L. Posen attached ( signed by Chief Judge John F. Gerry ) (ln) (dd).
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 47 Filed: 11/1/1991, Entered: 11/7/1991 Affidavit
                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of JOEL C. FEFFER Re: [45-2] hearing Motion hearing set for 11/8/91 on [45-1] motion (ln)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 46 Filed: 11/1/1991, Entered: 11/7/1991 Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff in Opposition of Motion by deft's to solicate approval by the class. (ln) (dd).
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 45 Filed: 10/21/1991, Entered: 10/22/1991 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                          Notice of MOTION to solicit approval by the class of the proposed settlement, etc. w/affidavits of Robert M. Miller and Richard L. Posen attached by MERRILL LYNCH in 1:90-mc-00919, Motion hearing set for 11/8/91 on [45-1] motion . (ln) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/25/2016: # (1) Affidavit, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit C PART 1, # (5) Exhibit C PART2, # (6) Exhibit C PART3, # (7) Exhibit D, # (8) Exhibit E, # (9) Exhibit F, # (10) Exhibit G, # (11) Exhibit H, # (12) Exhibit I, # (13) Exhibit J, # (14) Exhibit K, # (15) Exhibit L, # (16) Exhibit M, # (17) Exhibit N, # (18) Exhibit O, # (19) Exhibit P, # (20) Exhibit Q) (dd).
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 44 Filed: 8/22/1991, Entered: 8/28/1991 Minutes - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                            Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: none; Minutes of: 8/22/91; The following actions were taken,, set scheduling conference for 1:30 9/5/91 in 1:90-mc-00919, in 1:90-cv-02349, in 1:90-cv-02350, in 1:90-cv-05004, in 1:90-cv-05051, in 1:90-cv-05052, in 1:91-cv-00018, in 1:91-cv-00019, in 1:91-cv-00020 By Magistrate Jerome B. Simandle (ln) Modified on 06/18/1992 (dd).
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 43 Filed: 5/23/1991, Entered: 5/31/1991 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              CONSENT ORDER, extending time for all defendants to answer to June 24, 1991 ( signed by Chief Judge John F. Gerry ) (ln) Modified on 05/21/1992 (dd).
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 4/8/1991, Entered: 4/11/1991 Settlement Conference
                                                                                                                                Settlement conference held before Magistrate Jerome B. Simandle (ln)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/27/1991, Entered: 4/16/1991 Discovery Hearing
                                                                                                                                  Discovery hearing held before Magistrate Jerome B. Simandle (ln)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 42 Filed: 3/22/1991, Entered: 3/22/1991 Remark
                                                                                                                                    SERVICE LIST COMPILED BY COURT [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT IS CONTAINED IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919(JFG)] (femp) (dd).
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/22/1991, Entered: 3/22/1991 Remark
                                                                                                                                      DOCUMENTS NUMBERED 1 THROUGH 40 ARE IN FOLDER NUMBER ONE, FOLDER NUMBER TWO BEGINS WITH DOCUMENT NUMBER 41. (femp)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 41 Filed: 3/21/1991, Entered: 3/22/1991 Order
                                                                                                                                        ORDER, AMENDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 2 WHICH WAS FILED 2/14/91. Defendants shall answer move or otherwise plead to complaints not later than 4/23/91; any motion to dismiss shall be made returnable 6/7/91 - responses by 5/15/91 - replies by 5/25/91 [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT IS CONTAINED IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919] Mailed to all parties 3/22/91 pt ( signed by Magistrate Jerome B. Simandle ) (femp) (dd).
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 3/11/1991, Entered: 3/12/1991 Remark
                                                                                                                                          Copies of portion of 90-5051(JFG) "Cagan V. Taj" received from Clerk in EDNY Uniondale. (femp)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 40 Filed: 3/4/1991, Entered: 3/5/1991 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                            CONSOLIDATED, AMENDED COMPLAINT (CASTLE & PLAZA) by SIDNEY L. KAUFMAN in 1:90-mc-00919, JEROME SCHWARTZ in 1:90-mc-00919, PETER STUYVESANT in 1:90-mc-00919, Signed by Edward Labaton of GOODKIND, ETC. in Manhattan. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT IS CONTAINED IN MASTER FILE 1:90cv919] (femp) Modified on 03/20/1991 (dd).
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 39 Filed: 2/19/1991, Entered: 2/19/1991 Remark
                                                                                                                                              SERVICE LIST COMPILED BY COURT. (jo) Modified on 02/20/1991 (dd).
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 38 Filed: 2/14/1991, Entered: 2/15/1991 Order
                                                                                                                                                CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO.2 setting rules for filing, subsequent filings & transferred actions, case captionation, filing and docketing, guidelines for consolidated amended complaints, organization of pltfs' counsel, coordination of pleadings and other documents, exchange of information, preservation of documents, modifications, AND SETTING DATE FOR NEXT CONFERENCE ON WEDNESDAY, MARCH 20th, 1991 AT 1:00PM ( signed by Magistrate Jerome B. Simandle ) [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919(JFG) AND COPIES IN ALL ASSOCIATED ACTIONS] (femp) (dd).
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 36 Filed: 2/14/1991, Entered: 2/15/1991 Order
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, for EDWARD LABATON, ESQ. OF GOODKIND, LABATON & RUDOFF to appear pro hac vice ( signed by Magistrate Jerome B. Simandle ) [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT CONTAINED IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919(JFG)] (femp) (dd).
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 35 Filed: 2/14/1991, Entered: 2/15/1991 Order
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, for JONATHAN PLASSE, ESQ. OF GOODKIND, LABATON & RUDOFF to appear pro hac vice ( signed by Magistrate Jerome B. Simandle ) [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT CONTAINED IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919(JFG)] (femp) (dd).
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 34 Filed: 2/14/1991, Entered: 2/15/1991 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF GOOD STANDING Re: admission of EDWARD LABATON to appear pro hac vice. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT IS CONTAINED IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919(JFG)] (femp) (dd).
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 37 Filed: 2/11/1991, Entered: 2/15/1991 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                        CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT RELATED TO TAJ MAHAL LITIGATION FILED BY MARK C. RIFKIN, ESQ. OF GREENFIELD & CHIMICLES [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT CONTAINED IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919(JFG)] (This document was rec'd in DNJ's Trenton Office on 2/11/91, and in this office via pouch on 2/14/91.) (femp) (dd).
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 33 Filed: 2/7/1991, Entered: 2/15/1991 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF GOOD STANDING Re: admission of JONATHAN PLASSE to appear pro hac vice. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT IS CONTAINED IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919(JFG)] (femp) (dd).
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 32 Filed: 2/7/1991, Entered: 2/15/1991 Order
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, for ROBERT J. RYAN, ESQ. OF WECHSLER, SKIRNICK, HARWOOD, HALEBIAN & FEFFER to appear pro hac vice ( signed by Magistrate Jerome B. Simandle ) [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT CONTAINED IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919(JFG)] (femp) (dd).
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 31 Filed: 2/7/1991, Entered: 2/15/1991 Order
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, for BRUCE E. GERSTEIN, ESQ. OF GARWIN, BRONZAFT, GERSTEIN & FISHER to appear pro hac vice ( signed by Magistrate Jerome B. Simandle ) [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT CONTAINED IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919(JFG)] (femp) (dd).
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 30 Filed: 2/7/1991, Entered: 2/15/1991 Order
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, for BERTRAM BRONZAFT, ESQ. OF GARWIN, BRONZAFT, GERSTEIN & FISHER to appear pro hac vice ( signed by Magistrate Jerome B. Simandle ) [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919(JFG)] (femp) (dd).
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 29 Filed: 2/7/1991, Entered: 2/15/1991 Order
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, for SCOTT W. FISHER, ESQ. OF GARWIN, BRONZAFT, GERSTEIN & FISHER to appear pro hac vice ( signed by Magistrate Jerome B. Simandle ) [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT CONTAINED IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919(JFG)] (femp) (dd).
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 28 Filed: 2/7/1991, Entered: 2/15/1991 Order
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, for ROBERT S. SCHACHTER, ESQ. OF ZWERLING, SCHACHTER & ZWERLING ID#RS7243 to appear pro hac vice ( signed by Magistrate Jerome B. Simandle ) [ORIGINAL CONTAINED IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919(JFG)] (femp) (dd).
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 27 Filed: 2/6/1991, Entered: 2/13/1991 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF GOOD STANDING Re: admission of Robert J. Ryan to appear PRO HAC VICE [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919(JFG)] (femp) (dd).
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 26 Filed: 2/6/1991, Entered: 2/13/1991 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF GOOD STANDING Re: Admission of Bruce E. Gerstein to appear PRO HAC VICE [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT IN 1:90mc919(JFG)] (femp) (dd).
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 25 Filed: 2/6/1991, Entered: 2/13/1991 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF GOOD STANDING Re: admission of Bertram Bronzaft PRO HAC VICE [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919(JFG)] (femp) (dd).
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 24 Filed: 2/6/1991, Entered: 2/13/1991 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF GOOD STANDING Re: admission of Robert S. Schachter to appear Pro hac vice for plaintiffs Cagan, et al. DNJ#1:90cv5051(JFG), and EDNY90-2842(CJP) [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT IS CONTAINED IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919(JFG)] (femp) (dd).
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 23 Filed: 2/6/1991, Entered: 2/13/1991 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF GOOD STANDING Re:admission of Scott W. Fisher Pro Hac Vice for Robert and Helen Kloss, et al. (plaintiffs in DNJ#1:91cv19(JFG), EDNY#90-3516 [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT CONTAINED IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919] (femp) Modified on 02/13/1991 (dd).
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 1/30/1991, Entered: 2/4/1991 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                CASE RECORD OF SDNY 90cv6202(LBS) "Fairmont Financial v. Trump" RECEIVED IN CAMDEN OFFICE: DNJ#1:91cv18 (note on transmittal letter by SDNY Deputy Glenda Horton indicates that Doc#3 is lost) (femp) Modified on 02/04/1991
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 21 Filed: 1/29/1991, Entered: 1/29/1991 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, for STUART D. WECHSLER to appear pro hac vice ( signed by Chief Judge John F. Gerry ) [ORIGINAL IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919] (femp) (dd).
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 20 Filed: 1/29/1991, Entered: 1/29/1991 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of STUART D. WECHSLER Re: good standing to appear phv. [ORIGINAL IN MASTER FILE 1:90cv919] (proof of service attached). (femp) (dd).
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 22 Filed: 1/28/1991, Entered: 2/1/1991 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, for STUART J. BASKIN, ESQ. to appear pro hac vice ( signed by Magistrate Jerome B. Simandle ) [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919] (femp) (dd).
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/28/1991, Entered: 1/28/1991 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                        SDNY DOCKET OF "Fairmont Financial V. Trump" SDNY#90-6202(SAND) received in Camden by Fax in order to complete JS5 report to Washington. Case opened in DNJ as 1:91cv18(JFG), and made part of MDL864, MASTER DOCKET NUMBER 1:90mc919. (femp)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 19 Filed: 1/24/1991, Entered: 1/28/1991 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, for RICHARD L. POSEN, ESQ. to appear pro hac vice ( signed by Magistrate Jerome B. Simandle ) [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT IS CONTAINED IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919] (femp) (dd).
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 18 Filed: 1/24/1991, Entered: 1/28/1991 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF RICHARD L. POSEN Re: good standing to plead [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT IS CONTAINED IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919] (femp) (dd).
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 1/22/1991, Entered: 1/22/1991 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                              CASE RECORD OF EDNY 90cv3516(TJP) "Kloss V. Trump" RECEIVED IN CAMDEN OFFICE, DNJ# is 1:91cv19 (femp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 1/17/1991, Entered: 1/17/1991 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                CASE RECORD OF SDNY 90cv6534(LBS) "Glossner V. Trump" RECEIVED IN CAMDEN OFFICE DNJ# is 1:91cv20. (femp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 17 Filed: 1/16/1991, Entered: 1/28/1991 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Alan E. Lasak Re: service of Affidavit of Good Standing for STUART J. BASKIN, ESQ. of SHEARMAN & STERLING, NYC, NY [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT IN LEAD CASE FILE 1:90mc919] (femp) (dd).
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 16 Filed: 1/11/1991, Entered: 1/22/1991 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER admitting Robert B. Matusoff to serve as Plaintiff Schwartz's counsel in this action ( signed by Magistrate Jerome B. Simandle ) [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT CONTAINED IN 1:90mc919, MASTER FILE] (femp) Modified on 01/22/1991 (dd).
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 15 Filed: 1/11/1991, Entered: 1/22/1991 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF ROBERT B. MATUSOFF of GENE MESH & ASSOC. Re: Admission to plead before the court. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT IS CONTAINED IN 1:90mc919, MASTER FILE FOR MDL 864] (femp) Modified on 01/22/1991 (dd).
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 14 Filed: 1/11/1991, Entered: 1/22/1991 Minutes - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: Mr. Ted Formaroli; Minutes of: 1.11.91; The following actions were taken: Attorney Attendence sheet was distributed, counsel present, but not "of record" as of this date are Richard D. Greenfield for Fairmont Financial, Robert Matusoff for Schwartz, Stuart Baskin & David Bradford for Merrill Lynch, M. Richard Komins & Robert A. Hoffman for Glossner & Krange, Carl Poplar for Cagan, and Mark Rifkin for Fairmont Financial (list is attached to this minute entry). Hearing was focussed on the appointment of lead counsel, ORDER TO BE SUBMITTED. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT IS CONTAINED IN LEAD CASE FILE 1:90mc919] (femp) Modified on 01/22/1991 (dd).
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 13 Filed: 1/11/1991, Entered: 1/11/1991 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF GOOD STANDING for Stuart J. Baskin of SHEARMAN & STERLING of NYC [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919] (femp) Modified on 01/22/1991 (dd).
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 12 Filed: 1/8/1991, Entered: 1/10/1991 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF ADDITION OF TAG-A-LONG ACTIONS: "Fairmont Finanancial Vs. Trump" DNJ#1:91cv18; "Kloss Vs. Trump" DNJ#1:91cv19; "Glossner Vs. Trump" DNJ#1:91cv20; {ORIGINAL DOCUMENT IS CONTAINED IN MASTER FILE 1:90cv919] Service list as of 1/8/91 is attached; copies sent to all counsel. (femp) Modified on 01/11/1991 (dd).
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 11 Filed: 1/8/1991, Entered: 1/8/1991 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER (CERTIFIED COPY) OF THE PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION, transferring case SDNY 90-6534 "Glosser v. Trump" FROM SDNY TO THE DISTRICT OF NEW JERSEY [DOCUMENT CONTAINED IN MASTER FILE 1:91mc919] (femp) (dd).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 10 Filed: 1/8/1991, Entered: 1/8/1991 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER (CERTIFIED COPY) OF THE PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION, transferring case EDNY 90-3516 "Kloss v. Trump" from the EDNY to THE DISTRICT OF NEW JERSEY [DOCUMENT CONTAINED IN MASTER FILE 1:90cv919] (femp) (dd).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 1/8/1991, Entered: 1/8/1991 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER (CERTIFIED COPY) OF THE PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION, transferring case SDNY 90-6202 "Fairmont v. Trump FROM EDNY TO THE DISTRICT OF NEW JERSEY. [DOCUMENT IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919] (femp) Modified on 01/28/1991 (dd).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 1/4/1991, Entered: 1/4/1991 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by SIDNEY L. KAUFMAN in 1:90-mc-00919, JEROME SCHWARTZ in 1:90-mc-00919 to GREENFIELD & CHIMICLES' motion for appointment as plaintiffs' interim lead counsel and APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CO-LEAD COUNSEL [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT CONTAINTED IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919] (femp) (dd).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 1/2/1991, Entered: 1/2/1991 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DISCOVERY MEMORANDUM OF PLAINTIFFS submitted by Michael A. Cohan, Esq. of COHAN & ECKHAUS, Parlin, NJ. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT IS CONTAINED IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919] (femp) Modified on 01/02/1991 (dd).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 12/26/1990, Entered: 12/26/1990 Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Glenn C. Mariano of WECHSLER, SKIRNICK, ETC. re: correction of pleading #4. [DOCUMENT CONTAINED IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919] (femp) Modified on 12/26/1990 (dd).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 12/21/1990, Entered: 12/26/1990 Response in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE of PETER STUYVESANT, LTD. in support of GREENFIELD & CHIMICLES' motion for appointment as plaintiff's lead counsel. [DOCUMENT CONTAINED IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919] (femp) Modified on 12/26/1990 (dd).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 12/21/1990, Entered: 12/26/1990 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of STUART D. WECHSLER in opposition to Greenfield & Chimicles' motion to appoint an interim lead counsel for plaintiffs. [DOCUMENT CONTAINED IN MASTER FILE 1:90MC919] (femp) Modified on 12/26/1990 (dd).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 12/20/1990, Entered: 12/20/1990 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Allocation and Assignment filed. Magistrate JEROME B. SIMANDLE to handle discovery. "Tag-along" action 1:90cv5052 added. [DOCUMENT IN MASTER FILE 1:90mc919] (femp) Modified on 12/26/1990 (dd).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 12/17/1990, Entered: 12/21/1990 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER & CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1 -- establishing MDL filing procedures; setting discovery memo due date for 1/1/91; staying pending discovery; extending answer due dates; commanding counsel and parties to preserve documents; designating JEROME B. SIMANDLE, U.S. MAGISTRATE to perform all pretrial jusicial duties relating to case management, etc.; and setting Status conference 2:00 1/11/91 in 1:90-mc-00919, in 1:90-cv-02349, in 1:90-cv-02350, in 1:90-cv-05004 ; ( signed by Chief Judge John F. Gerry ) [DOCUMENT IN MASTER FILE 1:90MC919] ATTACHMENTS: Meeting agenda, service list. (femp) Modified on 12/21/1990 (dd).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 12/6/1990, Entered: 12/20/1990 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER, transferring cases 90-3826(JBS) from SDNY, and 90-2842(CJP) from EDNY to the DISTRICT OF NEW JERSEY , and consolidating cases with 90-2349(JFG) and 90-2350(JFG) for the purposes of coordinated and consolidated pretrial proceedings under the MDL#864 (Signed by JOHN F. NANGLE, Chairman of the Panel on Multi-District Litigation) ATTACHEMENTS INCLUDE: letter to the Clerk, MDL Rule #19 "transfer of files," Rules of Procedure of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, Guide to Multidistrict Litigation, Attorney service list. (femp) Modified on 03/05/1991 (dd).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 428 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?