United States v. Wilson
Federal Court Proceeding Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:18-mj-01317
Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 18, 2019 at 1:35 PM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY S. Theodore Merritt +1 617 748 3123 +1 617 748 3954 theodore.merritt@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Jesse Wilson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by FEDERAL DEFENDERS OF THE MD GA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Julie-Ann Olson +1 617 223 8061 Julie-Ann_Olson@fd.org
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: Initial Appearance as to Jesse Wilson held on 11/21/2018. The court informs the def't of the charges against him and his rights. The gov't states the maximum penalties. Upon review of the financial affidavit the court finds the def't unable to afford counsel and will appoint FD Olson. Gov't moves for detention and the court sets a detention and preliminary hearing for 11/26/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 23 before Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. Def't remanded to the custody of the USM. (Attorneys present: Merritt, Olson. )Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: Digital Recording. To order a copy of this Digital Recording, please go to http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/Magistrate-Audio.htm . For a transcript of this proceeding, contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 11/21/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF HEARING for Initial Appearance as to Jesse Wilson. Initial Appearance set for 11/21/2018 03:00 PM in Courtroom 23 before Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 11/21/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Arrest of Jesse Wilson (Russo, Noreen)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Order to Unseal Case as to Jesse Wilson. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 11/21/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment as to Jesse Wilson; Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell assigned to case. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 11/08/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            Arrest Warrant Issued by Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell as to Jesse Wilson. (Alves-Baptista, Antonia) (Entered: 11/07/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 2 Motion to Seal Case as to Jesse Wilson (1) (Alves-Baptista, Antonia) (Entered: 11/07/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                MOTION to Seal Case as to Jesse Wilson by USA. (Alves-Baptista, Antonia) (Entered: 11/07/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Sealed Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  SEALED COMPLAINT as to Jesse Wilson (1). (Attachments: # 1 JS45, # 2 Affidavit)(Alves-Baptista, Antonia) (Entered: 11/07/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 3 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?