Laballe v. Louisiana Crane & Construction, LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Western District Court, Case No. 2:16-cv-00009
District Judge Alia Moses, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 19, 2019 at 10:43 AM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Julio C. Pena Laballe, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Thomas A. Laucius +1 713 952 9840 +1 713 952 9897 courtfilings@lauciuslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephanie M. Stodghill Harp +1 713 952 9840 sharp@lauciuslaw.com
v.
No Logo Edward Viesca, Defendant
No Logo Louisiana Crane & Construction, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Kent Morrison Adams +1 713 353 2000 +1 713 785 7780 kent.adams@wilsonelser.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Jacobellis +1 713 353 2015 +1 713 785 7780 michael.jacobellis@wilsonelser.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 350 - Motor Vehicle Personal Injury
  Entries (63) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CLERK'S JUDGMENT (ss) (Entered: 08/15/2017)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER DENYING 52 Motion for Leave to File; GRANTING 56 Motion to Dismiss. Terminated party Edward Viesca, Julio C. Pena Laballe (Individually) and Louisiana Crane & Construction, LLC. Signed by Judge Alia Moses. (ss) (Entered: 08/15/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Louisiana Crane & Construction, LLC, Edward Viesca. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Victor R. Garcia. (Adams, Kent) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re 54 Notice of Filing ***Pleading is not file the appropriate way. This pleading will not be forwarded to the judge for consideration. (ccr) (Entered: 08/04/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          NOTICE of Filing Final Judgment by Louisiana Crane & Construction, LLC, Edward Viesca (Adams, Kent) (Entered: 08/02/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            NOTICE of Disclosure by Louisiana Crane & Construction, LLC (Adams, Kent) (Entered: 05/26/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              MOTION for Leave to File Opposed Motion for Leave to Designate Jose R. Blanco d/b/a Babalu Alle Trucking as a Responsible Third Party by Louisiana Crane & Construction, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Victor R. Garcia. (Adams, Kent) (Entered: 05/26/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Pretrial Disclosures by Julio C. Pena Laballe. (Stodghill Harp, Stephanie) (Entered: 05/01/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Certificate of Interested Parties by Julio C. Pena Laballe. (Stodghill Harp, Stephanie) (Entered: 05/01/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 10/15/2018 01:30 PM before Judge Victor R. Garcia, ADR Report Deadline due by 1/19/2018, Amended Pleadings due by 3/15/2018, Discovery due by 6/4/2018, Joinder of Parties due by 3/15/2018, Motions due by 6/25/2018,. Signed by Judge Victor R. Garcia. (ss) (Entered: 04/25/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Proposed Scheduling Order by Louisiana Crane & Construction, LLC. (Adams, Kent) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        Order for Scheduling Proposed Scheduling Order. The parties shall submit a proposed scheduling order within 14 days of the date of this order. In drafting the scheduling proposal, the parties shall employ the form found in Appendix B of the Local Civil Rules.. Signed by Judge Victor R. Garcia. (ss) (Entered: 04/12/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          ORDER DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE 37 42 Motion for Service by Publication. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs time period to serve Viesca is extended anadditional 90 days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge Victor R. Garcia. (ss) (Entered: 04/12/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Case No Longer Stayed (jj2)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              ORDER DENYING AS MOOT 37 Motion for Service by Publication; GRANTING 39 Motion to Reopen Case; GRANTING 43 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Leave File Bankruptcy. Signed by Judge Alia Moses. (ss) Modified on 3/27/2017 (ss). (Entered: 03/22/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Louisiana Crane & Construction, LLC, re 43 MOTION for Leave to File Ptl.Motion for Leave to Late File Bankruptcy Order filed by Plaintiff Julio C. Pena Laballe (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Leave for late Filing of the Bankrupcy Order Lifting Stay)(Jacobellis, Michael) (Entered: 03/01/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  MOTION for Leave to File Ptl.Motion for Leave to Late File Bankruptcy Order by Julio C. Pena Laballe. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Victor R. Garcia. (Stodghill Harp, Stephanie) (Entered: 02/28/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    Second MOTION for Service by Publication by Julio C. Pena Laballe. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Email discussing accepting service, # 2 Exhibit Email soliciting demand within primary limits, # 3 Affidavit Affidavit to support Publication). Motions referred to Judge Victor R. Garcia. (Stodghill Harp, Stephanie) (Entered: 02/23/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Louisiana Crane & Construction, LLC, re 37 MOTION for Service by Publication of Edward Viesca filed by Plaintiff Julio C. Pena Laballe (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Substitute Service)(Jacobellis, Michael) (Entered: 02/17/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Louisiana Crane & Construction, LLC, re 38 MOTION to Reopen Case filed by Plaintiff Julio C. Pena Laballe (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Reopen the Case)(Jacobellis, Michael) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          NOTICE to Mr. Thomas A. Laucius re 39 Amended MOTION to Reopen Case *** Please be advised that the Motion has been accepted. PLEASE SUBMIT A 'PROPOSED ORDER' FOR THIS MOTION. PLEASE SUBMIT BY USING THE 'ATTACHMENT ' EVENT LOCATED UNDER THE 'OTHER DOCUMENTS' MENU IN OUR ECF SYSTEM.*** (bb)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            Amended MOTION to Reopen Case by Julio C. Pena Laballe.. Motions referred to Judge Victor R. Garcia. (Stodghill Harp, Stephanie) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              MOTION to Reopen Case by Julio C. Pena Laballe. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Order Reopening Case). Motions referred to Judge Victor R. Garcia. (Stodghill Harp, Stephanie) (Entered: 02/09/2017)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                MOTION for Service by Publication of Edward Viesca by Julio C. Pena Laballe. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Victor R. Garcia. (Stodghill Harp, Stephanie) (Entered: 02/03/2017)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  NOTICE OF ORDER LIFTING STAY by Julio C. Pena Laballe (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Order Lifting Stay)(Stodghill Harp, Stephanie) (Entered: 02/03/2017)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Victor R. Garcia. (jj2) (Entered: 10/27/2016)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      MOTION for Protective Order by Louisiana Crane & Construction, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Protection). Motions referred to Judge Victor R. Garcia. (Adams, Kent) (Entered: 10/19/2016)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re 32 MOTION for Protective Order (jaw) (Entered: 10/19/2016)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                          MOTION for Protective Order by Louisiana Crane & Construction, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Protection). Motions referred to Judge Victor R. Garcia. (Adams, Kent) (Entered: 10/18/2016)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            Certified Mail Receipt of 30 Order on Motion to Transfer Case, Order on Motion to Remand to State Court (ef) (Entered: 07/11/2016)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                              IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the above-captioned action is STAYED pending the resolution of the bankruptcy proceeding in the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Western District of Louisiana numbered and styled cause no. 4:1 6-BK-50876 In re: Louisiana Crane & Construction or until the ?? 362 automatic stay applicable to Defendant Louisiana Crane is lifted by the Bankruptcy Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall administratively close this cause. The parties shall have 30 days following the Bankruptcy Court'sresolution of the above-referenced Chapter 11 proceeding involving Defendant Louisiana Crane, or lift of the automatic stay pertaining to Defendant Louisiana Crane, within which to move this Court to re-open the above-captioned cause. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Louisiana Crane's Opposed Motion to Transfer Case (ECF No. 9) and Plaintiffs Motion to Remand (ECF No. 12) are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. These motions may be re-asserted following any re-opening of this action. All deadlines and settings established in the scheduling order and any amendments thereto are VACATED. The hearing on the motion to remand set for July 15, 2016, is VACATED. Signed by Judge Alia Moses. (jj2) (Entered: 07/07/2016)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                NOTICE Suggestion Of Bankruptcy by Louisiana Crane & Construction, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Jacobellis, Michael) (Entered: 07/06/2016)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER GRANTING 17 Motion to Extend Time to Serve Signed by Judge Victor R. Garcia. (ef) (Entered: 06/08/2016)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER SETTING HEARING, Motion Hearing set for 7/15/2016 01:00 PM before Judge Victor R. Garcia. Signed by Judge Victor R. Garcia. (jj2) (Entered: 06/07/2016)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      Agreed Selection of Susan Soussan as Neutral, filed by Louisiana Crane & Construction, LLC.(Adams, Kent) (Entered: 05/20/2016)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        NOTICE of Initial Disclosure by Louisiana Crane & Construction, LLC (Adams, Kent) (Entered: 05/09/2016)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          Certificate of Interested Parties by Louisiana Crane & Construction, LLC. (Adams, Kent) (Entered: 04/12/2016)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            ANSWER to 15 Amended Complaint by Louisiana Crane & Construction, LLC.(Adams, Kent) (Entered: 04/12/2016)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              Summons Issued as to Edward Viesca. (jaw) (Entered: 04/11/2016)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER: ADR Report Deadline due by 5/20/2016, Amended Pleadings due by 7/15/2016, Discovery due by 10/3/2016, Joinder of Parties due by 7/15/2016, Motions due by 10/24/2016. Signed by Judge Victor R. Garcia. (jj2) (Entered: 04/05/2016)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  Certificate of Interested Parties by Louisiana Crane & Construction, LLC. (Adams, Kent) (Entered: 04/04/2016)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    Proposed Scheduling Order Proposed Agreed Scheduling Order by Louisiana Crane & Construction, LLC. (Jacobellis, Michael) (Entered: 04/01/2016)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Louisiana Crane & Construction, LLC, re 17 Opposed MOTION to Extend Time to Serve filed by Plaintiff Julio C. Pena Laballe (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Adams, Kent) (Entered: 03/29/2016)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                        Opposed MOTION to Extend Time to Serve by Julio C. Pena Laballe. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Victor R. Garcia. (Laucius, Thomas) (Entered: 03/22/2016)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Julio C. Pena Laballe. for Viesca, Edward (Laucius, Thomas) (Entered: 03/22/2016)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants amending, filed by Julio C. Pena Laballe.(Laucius, Thomas) (Entered: 03/22/2016)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Louisiana Crane & Construction, LLC, re 12 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff Julio C. Pena Laballe (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Proposed Order)(Jacobellis, Michael) (Entered: 03/11/2016)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING 11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Thomas A. Laucius for Julio C. Pena Laballe. IT IS ORDERED that within 10 days of the date of this order, Mr. Laucius shall tender the applicable fee by check for $100 made payable to Clerk, U.S. District Court and shall obtain his own CM/ECF account if he does not already have one. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Mr. Laucius is permitted to appear before this Court pro hac vice once, for proceedings in this matter only. Signed by Judge Victor R. Garcia. (jj2) (Entered: 03/07/2016)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  Text Order TERMINATING 10 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Wrong event selected. Clerk shall enter Ms. Harp's appearance on docket. Entered by Judge Victor R. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ek)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                    MOTION to Remand to State Court by Julio C. Pena Laballe. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Victor R. Garcia. (Stodghill Harp, Stephanie) (Entered: 03/04/2016)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                      MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Stephanie M. Stodghill Harp ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-8262983) by on behalf of Julio C. Pena Laballe. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Victor R. Garcia. (Stodghill Harp, Stephanie) (Entered: 03/04/2016)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                        MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Julio C. Pena Laballe.. Motions referred to Judge Victor R. Garcia. (Stodghill Harp, Stephanie) (Entered: 03/04/2016)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                          Opposed MOTION to Transfer Case by Louisiana Crane & Construction, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Transfer). Motions referred to Judge Victor R. Garcia. (Adams, Kent) (Entered: 02/10/2016)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            Certified Mail Receipt of 3 Order,, 4 Notice of Right to Consent to Magistrate Trial, 7 Order, 5 Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order, 6 Order, mailed to Attorney Thomas A. Laucius. (jj2) (Entered: 02/10/2016)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have 45 days from the date of this Order within which to file proof of service upon Defendant Edward Viesca as specified in Rule 4(l), or show good cause why service has not been attempted or made. Absent a showing of service or good cause, the undersigned may recommend that the claims against Defendant Edward Viesca be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Victor R. Garcia. (jj2) (Entered: 02/09/2016)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER TO AMEND. Plaintiff shall amend complaint within 45 days of the date of this order to bring it in conformity with federal pleading standards and is given leave to make other adjustments. Defendants amended answer or other response shall be due as provided in the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Victor R. Garcia. (jj2) (Entered: 02/09/2016)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  Order. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall submit a proposed scheduling order(s) on or before April 1, 2016, and shall confer as provided in Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) on or before March 11, 2016. Signed by Judge Victor R. Garcia. (jj2) (Entered: 02/09/2016)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGES AVAILABILITY by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Victor R. Garcia. (jj2) (Entered: 02/09/2016)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that, within 21 days of the date of this order, Mr. Thomas A. Laucius shall: (1) Move for pro hac vice status, with co-counsel admitted to practice in the Western District of Texas, and tender the applicable fee; or (2) Move for admission to practice in the United States District Court for the Western District of Texas and tender the applicable fee; or (3) Obtain substitute counsel admitted to practice in the Western District of Texas to represent his client in this proceeding and file a motion to substitute counsel. Signed by Judge Victor R. Garcia. (jj2) (Entered: 02/09/2016)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        Correspondence to Attorney Thomas A. Laucius regarding admission to practice within the Western District of Texas. (jj2) (Entered: 02/08/2016)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Victor R. Garcia. (jj2)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            Case Assigned to Judge Alia Moses. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (jj2)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Louisiana Crane & Construction, LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-8177007), filed by Louisiana Crane & Construction, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit Notice of Removal to State Court, # 3 Exhibit Index of Matters being filed, # 4 Exhibit List of Counsel of Record, # 5 Exhibit Index of State Court Filings, # 6 Exhibit Court's Record - Pleadings)(Adams, Kent) (Entered: 02/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 1 time.

                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?