Brown v. Kemp
Federal Civil Lawsuit Georgia Northern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-05121
District Judge William M. Ray II, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 19, 2019 at 11:04 AM ST (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Candace Fowler, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pope, McGlamry, Kilpatrick, Morrison & Norwood, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Caroline G. McGlamry +1 404 523 7706 +1 404 524 1648 carolinemcglamry@pmkm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Michael Lee McGlamry +1 404 523 7706 +1 404 524 1648 efile@pmkm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Michael J. Moore +1 404 523 7706 +1 404 524 1648 michaelmoore@pmkm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Law Office of Bryan L. Sells, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Bryan Sells +1 404 480 4212 +1 404 480 4212 bryan@bryansellslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Walker Hulbert Gray Byrd & Christy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Charles W. Byrd +1 912 987 1415
No Logo Chalis Montgomery, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pope, McGlamry, Kilpatrick, Morrison & Norwood, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Caroline G. McGlamry +1 404 523 7706 +1 404 524 1648 carolinemcglamry@pmkm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Michael Lee McGlamry +1 404 523 7706 +1 404 524 1648 efile@pmkm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Michael J. Moore +1 404 523 7706 +1 404 524 1648 michaelmoore@pmkm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Law Office of Bryan L. Sells, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Bryan Sells +1 404 480 4212 +1 404 480 4212 bryan@bryansellslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Walker Hulbert Gray Byrd & Christy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Charles W. Byrd +1 912 987 1415
No Logo Jennifer Ide, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pope, McGlamry, Kilpatrick, Morrison & Norwood, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Caroline G. McGlamry +1 404 523 7706 +1 404 524 1648 carolinemcglamry@pmkm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Michael Lee McGlamry +1 404 523 7706 +1 404 524 1648 efile@pmkm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Michael J. Moore +1 404 523 7706 +1 404 524 1648 michaelmoore@pmkm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Law Office of Bryan L. Sells, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Bryan Sells +1 404 480 4212 +1 404 480 4212 bryan@bryansellslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Walker Hulbert Gray Byrd & Christy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Charles W. Byrd +1 912 987 1415
No Logo Katharine Wilkinson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pope, McGlamry, Kilpatrick, Morrison & Norwood, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Caroline G. McGlamry +1 404 523 7706 +1 404 524 1648 carolinemcglamry@pmkm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Michael Lee McGlamry +1 404 523 7706 +1 404 524 1648 efile@pmkm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Michael J. Moore +1 404 523 7706 +1 404 524 1648 michaelmoore@pmkm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Law Office of Bryan L. Sells, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Bryan Sells +1 404 480 4212 +1 404 480 4212 bryan@bryansellslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Walker Hulbert Gray Byrd & Christy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Charles W. Byrd +1 912 987 1415
No Logo LaTosha Brown, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pope, McGlamry, Kilpatrick, Morrison & Norwood, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Caroline G. McGlamry +1 404 523 7706 +1 404 524 1648 carolinemcglamry@pmkm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Michael Lee McGlamry +1 404 523 7706 +1 404 524 1648 efile@pmkm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Michael J. Moore +1 404 523 7706 +1 404 524 1648 michaelmoore@pmkm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Law Office of Bryan L. Sells, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Bryan Sells +1 404 480 4212 +1 404 480 4212 bryan@bryansellslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Walker Hulbert Gray Byrd & Christy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Charles W. Byrd +1 912 987 1415
v.
Kemp, Brian P. Kemp, Brian P., Defendant
Officially listed as "Hon. Brian Kemp"

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of RONALD J STAY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roger A. Chalmers +1 404 873 8500 rchalmers@law.ga.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cristina Correia +1 404 656 6676 ccorreia@law.ga.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Angela Ellen Cusimano +1 404 657 4355 ecusimano@law.ga.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Russell D. Willard +1 404 656 3300 rwillard@law.ga.gov
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 441 - Civil Rights: Voting
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: None Motion HearingCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William M. Ray, II: Motion Hearing held on 11/8/2018. After discussions in Chambers with counsel for both parties, the Court recognized counsel for Defendant and accepted a copy of Mr. Kemp's letter of resignation to Governor Deal. Counsel for Plaintiffs acknowledged that this would resolve the case. The Court will direct a dismissal of this case tomorrow morning. (Attachments: # 1 Letter of Resignation) (Court Reporter Wynette Blathers)(btql) (Entered: 11/08/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document 14 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: None response in opposition to motion
    RESPONSE in Opposition re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Brian Kemp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Chris Harvey)(Correia, Cristina) (Entered: 11/08/2018)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
      NOTICE of Appearance by Russell D. Willard on behalf of Brian Kemp (Willard, Russell) (Entered: 11/07/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
        NOTICE of Appearance by Cristina Correia on behalf of Brian Kemp (Correia, Cristina) (Entered: 11/07/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
          NOTICE of Appearance by Angela Ellen Cusimano on behalf of Brian Kemp (Cusimano, Angela) (Entered: 11/07/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None waiver of service executed
            WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Katharine Wilkinson, LaTosha Brown, Candace Fowler, Chalis Montgomery, Jennifer Ide. Brian Kemp waiver mailed on 11/7/2018, answer due 1/7/2019. (Sells, Bryan) (Entered: 11/07/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
              NOTICE of Appearance by Roger A. Chalmers on behalf of Brian Kemp (Chalmers, Roger) (Entered: 11/07/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
                NOTICE by LaTosha Brown, Candace Fowler, Jennifer Ide, Chalis Montgomery, Katharine Wilkinson Of Related Case (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moore, Michael) (Entered: 11/07/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Order on Application for Admission PHVCourt Filing
                  ORDER granting 5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by Laurence Schwartztol. Signed by Judge William M Ray, II on 11/7/18. (ddm) (Entered: 11/07/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Order on Application for Admission PHVCourt Filing
                    ORDER granting 4 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by Jessica Marsden. Signed by Judge William M Ray, II on 11/7/18. (ddm) (Entered: 11/07/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                      APPLICATION for Admission of Laurence Schwartztol Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8259114)by LaTosha Brown, Candace Fowler, Jennifer Ide, Chalis Montgomery, Katharine Wilkinson. (Moore, Michael) (Entered: 11/07/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                        APPLICATION for Admission of Jessica Marsden Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8259090)by LaTosha Brown, Candace Fowler, Jennifer Ide, Chalis Montgomery, Katharine Wilkinson. (Moore, Michael) (Entered: 11/07/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER scheduling a hearing regarding the 2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order for Thursday, November 8, 2018, at 9:45 am, in Courtroom 1705. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to serve this Order upon Defendant. Signed by Judge William M Ray, II on 11/7/18. (ddm) (Entered: 11/07/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Submission of 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, to District Judge William M Ray II. (ddm)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Submission to District Judge
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: None Motion for TRO
                                MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by LaTosha Brown, Candace Fowler, Jennifer Ide, Chalis Montgomery, Katharine Wilkinson. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, # 2 Declaration of Jessica Marsden, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(ddm) (Entered: 11/07/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                COMPLAINT, with Jury Demand, filed by Katharine Wilkinson, LaTosha Brown, Candace Fowler, Chalis Montgomery, Jennifer Ide. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8257658) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ddm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 11/07/2018)
                                  LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 7 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?