SEA SALT LLC v. BELLEROSE
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maine District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-00413
District Judge JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 20, 2021 at 5:21 PM DT (2.2 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Seasalt LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by BERGEN & PARKINSON, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY LAURA H. WHITE +1 207 985 7000 lwhite@bergenparkinson.com
v.
No Logo AMANDA F BELLEROSE, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by RICHARDSON, WHITMAN, LARGE & BADGER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY JOHN S. WHITMAN +1 207 774 7474 jwhitman@rwlb.com
No Logo ANTHONY J MASTROPASQUA, Defendant
No Logo EAST END TRANSPORT LLC, Defendant
No Logo MATTHEW R BELLEROSE, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by NORMAN, HANSON & DETROY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JOSHUA D. HADIARIS +1 207 774 7000 jhadiaris@nhdlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED THOMAS S. MARJERISON tmarjerison@nhdlaw.com
No Logo United Parcel Service, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Gregory B Koltun +1 213 892 5551 +1 213 892 5454 gkoltun@mofo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Verrill & Dana, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rachel M. Wertheimer +1 207 253 4620 rwertheimer@verrilldana.com
No Logo VINCENT J MASTROPASQUA, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by LIBBY O'BRIEN KINGSLEY & CHAMPION, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY GENE R. LIBBY +1 207 985 1815 glibby@lokllc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY TYLER J. SMITH +1 207 985 1815 tsmith@lokllc.com
No Logo Bank of America NA, Movant
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1961
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
  Entries (68) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 4/20/2021, Entered: None Scheduling Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 4/15/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 2/3/2021, Entered: None Order on Report and Recommendations
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 2/2/2021, Entered: None Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 1/26/2021, Entered: None Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 10/28/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Attachment & Trustee Process
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 10/28/2020, Entered: None Procedural Order Re: Local Rule 56(h)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 10/13/2020, Entered: None Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 8/27/2020, Entered: None Writ Issued
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 8/25/2020, Entered: None Order
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 7/14/2020, Entered: None Order
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 5/14/2020, Entered: None Order
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 5/13/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 5/13/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 5/4/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Compel
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 2/6/2020, Entered: None Order
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 1/29/2020, Entered: None Order
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 12/4/2019, Entered: None Order on Objection
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 11/4/2019, Entered: None Order
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 10/28/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 10/3/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 8/28/2019, Entered: None Judgment - Default
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 8/27/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Default Judgment
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by UNITED PARCEL SERVICE INC. (WERTHEIMER, RACHEL) (Entered: 01/14/2019)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 1/22/2019 from UNITED PARCEL SERVICE INC. (sfw)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    ANSWER to Complaint (Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint) by MATTHEW R BELLEROSE.(HADIARIS, JOSHUA) (Entered: 01/14/2019)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      Set Deadlines : Attorney GREGORY B KOLTUN shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 1/18/2019. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. (sfw)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Gregory B. Koltun filed by RACHEL M. WERTHEIMER on behalf of UNITED PARCEL SERVICE INC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1957765.) (WERTHEIMER, RACHEL) (Entered: 01/14/2019)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/11/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Stay by UNITED PARCEL SERVICE INC Responses due by 2/1/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Robert Klingenberg, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I)(WERTHEIMER, RACHEL). Added MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Stay on 1/14/2019 (sfw). (Entered: 01/11/2019)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/11/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            ANSWER to Complaint Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by AMANDA F BELLEROSE.(WHITMAN, JOHN) (Entered: 01/11/2019)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              Reset Deadlines Per Order #29: Service of Process Deadline 3/4/2019 (sfw)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                ORDER granting 28 Motion to Extend Time to Complete Service of Process. Time is extended to March 4, 2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN) (Entered: 01/04/2019)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/3/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  MOTION to Extend Time to Complete Service of Process by SEA SALT LLC Responses due by 1/24/2019. (WHITE, LAURA) (Entered: 01/03/2019)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    Set Answer Deadline for UNITED PARCEL SERVICE INC : Answer due by 1/14/2019. (mtm)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC. Waiver sent on 11/14/2018. (WHITE, LAURA) Modified on 12/27/2018 (mtm) to clarify docket text. (Entered: 12/27/2018)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend
                                                                        ORDER granting 20 Motion for Clarification and Amendment of Memorandum of Decision. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS) (Entered: 11/27/2018)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 20 Joint MOTION for Clarification and Amendment of 18 Memorandum of Decision on Motion to Vacate or Modify Attachment filed by AMANDA F BELLEROSE. (WHITMAN, JOHN) (Entered: 11/26/2018)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            Set Answer Deadline for AMANDA BELLEROSE : Answer due by 1/14/2019. (mlm)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed . (WHITE, LAURA) (Entered: 11/19/2018)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                Set Answer Deadline Regarding Notice of Removal for MATTHEW R BELLEROSE: Answer due by 1/14/2019. (mtm)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to MATTHEW R. BELLEROSE. Waiver sent on 11/14/2018. (WHITE, LAURA) Modified on 11/19/2018 to clarify docket text (mtm). (Entered: 11/16/2018)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    Set Answer Deadline Regarding Notice of Removal for VINCENT J MASTROPASQUA : Answer due by 1/14/2019. (sfw)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to VINCENT J MASTROPASQUA. Waiver sent on 11/14/2018 . (WHITE, LAURA) Modified on 11/16/2018 to clarify docket text (lrc). (Entered: 11/16/2018)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion re 20 Joint MOTION for Clarification and Amendment of 18 Memorandum of Decision on Motion to Vacate or Modify Attachment filed by SEA SALT LLC. Reply due by 11/30/2018. (WHITE, LAURA) (Entered: 11/16/2018)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          Joint MOTION for Clarification and Amendment of 18 Memorandum of Decision on Motion to Vacate or Modify Attachment by AMANDA F BELLEROSE Responses due by 12/6/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order (Exhibit 1))(WHITMAN, JOHN) Modified on 11/15/2018 to clarify docket text (sfw).(sfw). (Entered: 11/15/2018)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            Summons Issued as to AMANDA F BELLEROSE, MATTHEW R BELLEROSE, EAST END TRANSPORT LLC, ANTHONY J MASTROPASQUA, VINCENT J MASTROPASQUA, UNITED PARCEL SERVICE INC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: # 1 Summons Issued as to Vincent J. Mastropasqua, # 2 Summons Issued as to Anthony J. Mastropasqua, # 3 Summons Issued as to United Parcel Service, Inc., # 4 Summons Issued as to Amanda F. Bellerose, # 5 Summons Issued as to East End Transport, LLC)(sfw) (Entered: 11/14/2018)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: None order on motion to vacate
                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF DECISION granting in part 6 Motion to Vacate or Modify Attachment. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS) (Entered: 10/29/2018)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON: Oral Argument held re 6 MOTION to Vacate Attachment or MOTION to Modify Attachment filed by AMANDA F BELLEROSE. (Court Reporter: Dennis Ford) (jib) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Hearing on 6 MOTION to Vacate Attachment or MOTION to Modify Attachment: Oral Argument set for 10/23/2018 at 2:15 PM in Portland Courtroom 3 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS) (Entered: 10/16/2018)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON: Telephone Conference held. (Court Reporter: FTR) (MFS) (Entered: 10/16/2018)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by SEA SALT LLC. (WHITE, LAURA) (Entered: 10/15/2018)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by LAURA H. WHITE on behalf of SEA SALT LLC (WHITE, LAURA) (Entered: 10/15/2018)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding 11 Notice of Appearance : This docket entry was modified to indicate it is a duplicate entry of Docket Entry No. 10. (sfw) (Entered: 10/15/2018)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            *DUPLICATE ENTRY* NOTICE of Appearance by JOSHUA D. HADIARIS on behalf of MATTHEW R BELLEROSE (HADIARIS, JOSHUA) Modified on 10/15/2018 to indicate duplicate entry (sfw). (Entered: 10/15/2018)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS S. MARJERISON, JOSHUA D HADIARIS on behalf of MATTHEW R BELLEROSE (MARJERISON, THOMAS) Modified on 10/15/2018 to add "Joshua D Hadiaris" text to this docket entry as his name is included on the notice (sfw). (Entered: 10/15/2018)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                ANSWER to Complaint (First Amended) by VINCENT J MASTROPASQUA.(SMITH, TYLER) (Entered: 10/12/2018)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 10/16/2018 at 10:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. The parties have been provided with the Court's call-in information.(MFS) (Entered: 10/10/2018)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    ORDER mooting 6 Motion to Intervene. The movant has been joined as a defendant in the matter. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN) (Entered: 10/10/2018)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      Set Answer Deadline for VINCENT J MASTROPASQUA per F.R.Civ.P. 81(c): Answer due by 10/12/2018. (jwr)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        MOTION to Intervene, MOTION to Vacate Attachment or MOTION to Modify Attachment filed in State Court (No PDF Attached. See ECF [5-27] for Motion and ECF [5-28] for Response to Motion) by AMANDA F BELLEROSE (jwr) (Entered: 10/10/2018)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          STATE COURT RECORD with Affidavit by VINCENT J MASTROPASQUA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Docket Record, # 2 2018.08.03 State Court Ex Parte Motion for Order of Attachment & Affidavits, # 3 2018.08.03 State Court Ex Parte Motion for Order of Attachment & Affidavits (Part 1), # 4 2018.08.03 State Court Ex Parte Motion for Order of Attachment & Affidavits (Part 2), # 5 2018.08.03 State Court Ex Parte Motion for Order of Attachment & Affidavits (Part 3), # 6 2018.08.03 State Court Ex Parte Motion for Order of Attachment & Affidavits (Part 4), # 7 2018.08.03 State Court Ex Parte Motion for Order of Attachment & Affidavits (Part 5), # 8 2018.08.03 State Court Ex Parte Motion for Order of Attachment & Affidavits (Part 6), # 9 2018.08.03 State Court Ex Parte Motion for Order of Attachment & Affidavits (Part 7), # 10 2018.08.03 State Court Ex Parte Motion for Order of Attachment & Affidavits (Part 8), # 11 2018.08.03 State Court Ex Parte Motion for Order of Attachment & Affidavits (Part 9), # 12 2018.08.14 State Court Trustee Stmt Under Oath - Town & Country FCU, # 13 2018.08.14 State Court Trustee Stmt Under Oath - Norway Savings Bank, # 14 2018.08.14 State Court Trustee Stmt Under Oath - Saco & Bidd Savings Bank, # 15 2018.08.14 State Court Trustee Stmt Under Oath - cPort CU, # 16 2018.08.14 State Court Trustee Stmt Under Oath - Coast Line CU, # 17 2018.08.14 State Court Trustee Stmt Under Oath - Gorham SB, # 18 2018.08.14 State Court Trustee Stmt Under Oath - Machia Savings Bank, # 19 2018.08.14 State Court EOA (G. Libby & T. Smith) & Motion to Dissolve - DF Vincent Mastropasqua, # 20 2018.08.15 State Court NOH - Motion to Dissolve 8-17-18, # 21 2018.08.17 State Court PL's Opp to Motion to Dissolve Attachment, # 22 2018.08.23 State Court Trustee Stmt Under Oath - Bangor Savings Bank, # 23 2018.08.23 State Court Trustee Stmt Under Oath - Key Bank, # 24 2018.08.23 State Court Trustee Stmt Under Oath - People's United, # 25 2018.08.23 State Court Trustee Stmt Under Oath - Camden National Bank, # 26 2018.08.27 State Court Trustee Stmt Under Oath - Bank of America, # 27 2018.08.28 State Court A. Bellerose Mtn to Intervene, Vacate or Modify Attachment, # 28 2018.08.28 State Court V. Mastropasqua No Opp to A. Bellerose Motion to Intervene, etc., # 29 2018.09.10 State Court ORDER Dissolving Trustee Attachment as to Vincent Mastropasqua, # 30 2018.09.10 State Court Trustee Stmt Under Oath - PayPal, # 31 2018.09.18 State Court Trustee Stmt Under Oath - TD Bank, # 32 2018.09.24 State Court PL's Mtn to Extend DL to Oppose M to Intervene, # 33 2018.09.26 State Court PL's Opp to A. Bellerose Mtn to Intervene, # 34 2018.09.26 State Court ORDER Granting PL's Mtn to Extend, # 35 2018.09.26 State Court NOH - Mtn to Intervene set for 10-24-18, # 36 2018.10.02 State Court A. Bellerose Mtn to extend DL to Reply to PL Opposition, # 37 2018.10.03 State Court ORDER Granting Motion to Extend)(LIBBY, GENE) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 6 MOTION to Intervene, MOTION to Vacate or MOTION to Modify filed by AMANDA F BELLEROSE. . (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Amanda Bellerose, # 2 Exhibit A - Excerpts from exhibits to Mr. McEwen's affidavit)(WHITMAN, JOHN) Modified on 10/10/2018 to link to ECF 6 (jwr). (Entered: 10/09/2018)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1910902.), filed by VINCENT J MASTROPASQUA.(LIBBY, GENE)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 10/12/2018 from plaintiff SEA SALT, LLC. (sfw)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: REMOVAL: State Court Record due by 10/12/2018. By DEPUTY CLERK: Susan Way. (sfw) (Entered: 10/05/2018)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    CIVIL COVER SHEET. (sfw) (Entered: 10/05/2018)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Pleadings Complaint, First Amended Complaint from York County Superior Court, case number CV-18-144. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by VINCENT J MASTROPASQUA. (Service of Process Deadline 1/3/2019) Fee due by 10/9/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Complaint filed in CV-18-144, # 2 Exhibit B: First Amended Complaint, # 3 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal to Federal Court, # 4 Exhibit D: Ex Parte Order Approving Attachment and Attachment by Trustee Process, # 5 Exhibit E: Order Dissolving Attachment and Trustee Process As To Defendant Vincent J Mastropasqua)(sfw) (Entered: 10/05/2018)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 45 times.

                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?