United States v. Cotto
Federal Court Proceeding New York Southern District Court, Case No. 7:14-mj-00390

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 19, 2019 at 11:14 PM ST (2.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Mathew Andrews +1 212 637 2665 mathew.andrews@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott Andrew Hartman +1 212 637 2357 +1 212 637 2527 scott.hartman@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Joshua Cotto, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by FEDERAL DEFENDERS OF THE MD GA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Susanne Brody +1 914 428 7124 +1 914 997 6872 susanne_brody@fd.org
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy: Initial Appearance as to Joshua Cotto held on 11/21/2018. Appearances entered by AUSA Mathew Andrews for the Government, Attorney Susanne Brody on behalf of the defendant. Detention on consent w/o prejudice. The defendant is advised of his rights and the charges against him. Public reading of the complaint is waived. Financial affidavit approved. Susanne Brody is appointed to represent the defendant. The defendant is detained on consent without prejudice. The Court Orders the case unsealed. Preliminary Hearing 12/4/18. (Court Reporter Courtflow) (ap) (Entered: 11/21/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Arrest of Joshua Cotto. (ap)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      COMPLAINT UNSEALED as to Joshua Cotto. (ap)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        Order to Unseal Case as to Sealed Defendant 1. The Court Orders the case unsealed. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy on 11/20/2018) (ap) (Entered: 11/21/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Sealed Legal Document 2 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          SEALED COMPLAINT as to Sealed Defendant 1 (1). (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy) (Previously filed under seal on 2/26/2014) (ap) (Entered: 11/21/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Sealed Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.11957 (jty) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF

              Space Space

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 0 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?