Carol Blanchard v. Arrow Sweeping, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-10137
Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 2, 2019 at 5:22 PM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Carol Blanchard, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Feinberg, Campbell & Zack, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Catherine M. Campbell +1 617 338 1976 +1 617 338 7070 cmc@fczlaw.com
v.
No Logo Arrow Sweeping, Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 1001
Nature of Suit 791 - Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Carol Blanchard (Campbell, Catherine) (Entered: 01/29/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Summons Issued as to Arrow Sweeping, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry) (Entered: 01/25/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Coppola, Katelyn) (Entered: 01/25/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        COMPLAINT against Arrow Sweeping, Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-6978649 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Carol Blanchard, Executive Director of the Teamsters Union 25 Health Services and Insurance Plan. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Covery Sheet, # 2 Category Form)(Campbell, Catherine) (Entered: 01/24/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 2 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?