SUMMERVILLE v. OETH
Federal Civil Lawsuit Indiana Southern District Court, Case No. 3:18-cv-00237
District Judge Richard L. Young, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 6, 2019 at 2:19 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo MARCUS SUMMERVILLE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel A. Moon +1 812 385 1843 danielmoonlaw@gmail.com
v.
No Logo GREGORY OETH, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by GREGORY OETH

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space GREGORY OETH
No Logo POSEY COUNTY, INDIANA, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by POSEY COUNTY, INDIANA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space POSEY COUNTY, INDIANA
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (3) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB) (Entered: 12/05/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Summons Issued as to GREGORY OETH, POSEY COUNTY, INDIANA. (JRB) (Entered: 12/05/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5183377) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Proposed Summons)(Moon, Daniel) (Entered: 12/04/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF

        Statistics

        This case has been viewed 3 times.

        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
        Space
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
         
        PlainSite
        Sign Up
        Need Password Help?