SCALE MANAGEMENT v. RELIANCE ELECTRIC, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 1:91-cv-00027-JFG

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo SCALE MANAGEMENT SYSTEMS, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JOSEPH BENNIE +60928020 609 928 0200
v.
No Logo Reliance Electric Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JOHN L WHITE +1 215 575 4342
No Logo Toledo Scale Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JOHN L WHITE +1 215 575 4342
No Logo TOLEDO SCALE DIVISION, Defendant
Office Camden
Filed 1/10/1991
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Camden
Terminated 5/16/1991
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case {}
Def Custody Status
Flags 12BG, CLOSED
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 15 Filed: 8/16/1991, Entered: 8/27/1991 Minutes-Miscellaneous
Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: none; Minutes of: 8/16/91; The following actions were taken, withdrawing [12-1] motion to enforce settlement. By Magistrate Joel B. Rosen. (lc)
    LREF
    Blank 14 Filed: 8/12/1991, Entered: 8/16/1991 Order
    ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT "UNDER SEAL" ( signed by Magistrate Joel B. Rosen ) (lc) Modified on 08/16/1991
      LREF
      Blank 13 Filed: 8/7/1991, Entered: 8/12/1991 Stipulation of Dismissal
      STIPULATION of dismissal with prejudice and without costs. (lc)
        LREF
        Blank 12 Filed: 7/2/1991, Entered: 7/2/1991, Terminated: 8/16/1991 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
        Notice of MOTION to enforce settlement by SCALE MANAGEMENT [12-1] motion referred to Magistrate Joel B. Rosen,--SUBMITTED WITH CERT. OF SERVICE, BRIEF AND AFFIDVIT.-- Motion hearing set for 9:30 8/2/91 on [12-1] motion . ORAL ARGUEMNT REQUESTED (dt)
          LREF
          Blank 11 Filed: 5/17/1991, Entered: 5/20/1991 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
          Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: none; Minutes of: 5/17/91; The following actions were taken, withdrawing [8-1] motion to dismiss By Chief Judge John F. Gerry. ACTION REPORTED SETTLED. (lc)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 5/16/1991, Entered: 5/16/1991 Terminated Case
            Case closed (Settled) (lc)
              LREF
              Blank 10 Filed: 5/15/1991, Entered: 5/16/1991 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER, dismissing action without prejudice and without costs ( signed by Chief Judge John F. Gerry ) (lc)
                LREF
                Blank 9 Filed: 3/28/1991, Entered: 4/1/1991 Transcript
                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings taken on 1/23/91 before Hon. John F. Gerry. (lc)
                  LREF
                  Blank 8 Filed: 2/22/1991, Entered: 2/25/1991 Motion to Dismiss
                  Notice of MOTION by SCALE MANAGEMENT to dismiss , Motion hearing set for 9:30 4/5/91 on [8-1] motion (Certificate of Service attached thereto) (MEMO). (lc)
                    LREF
                    Blank 7 Filed: 1/31/1991, Entered: 1/31/1991 Order
                    ORDER, set scheduling conference for 11:15 3/6/91 ( signed by Magistrate Joel B. Rosen ) (lc)
                      LREF
                      Blank 6 Filed: 1/28/1991, Entered: 1/31/1991 Answer
                      ANSWER to Complaint by defts. RELIANCE ELECTRIC, TOLEDO SCALE CORP. (lc)
                        LREF
                        Blank 5 Filed: 1/23/1991, Entered: 1/25/1991 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                        Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: Ted Formaroli; Minutes of: 1/23/91; The following actions were taken, [3-1] order to show cause why an order for a P.I. should not isssue and Motion by deft. to dismiss Order to Show Cause for a Preliminary Injunction taken under advisement(DECISION RESERVED) Findings of Facts & Conclusions of Law to be submitted in 3 weeks after receipt of Transcript. (Gerry) (lc)
                          LREF
                          Blank 4 Filed: 1/14/1991, Entered: 1/14/1991 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                          NOTICE of Allocation and Assignment filed. Magistrate Joel B. Rosen (CAMDEN-GERRY). (dv) Modified on 01/16/1991
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 1/14/1991, Entered: 1/14/1991 Summons Issued
                            SUMMONS(ES) issued for RELIANCE ELECTRIC, TOLEDO SCALE DIV, TOLEDO SCALE CORp., thirty five days, andreturned to counsel for service. (dv)
                              LREF
                              Blank 3 Filed: 1/11/1991, Entered: 1/16/1991 Order to Show Cause Court Filing
                              ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Show Cause Hearing why an order should not be issued, set for 10:00 on 1/23/91 ( signed by Chief Judge John F. Gerry ) (lc) Modified on 01/16/1991
                                LREF
                                Blank 2 Filed: 1/10/1991, Entered: 1/14/1991 Affidavit
                                AFFIDAVIT by SCALE MANAGEMENT Re: [1-1] complaint (dv) Modified on 01/16/1991
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 1 Filed: 1/10/1991, Entered: 1/14/1991 Complaint
                                  COMPLAINT filed; jury demand FILING FEE $ 120.00 RECEIPT # 126255 (dv)
                                    LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 28 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?