PARRA v. FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Northern District Court, Case No. 4:11-cv-00347
District Judge RICHARD SMOAK, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 23, 2019 at 12:12 AM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo NICOLE PARRA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan & Hogan, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Daniel A. Perez +1 407 422 2188 +1 407 422 3291 dperez@hoganlegal.com
No Logo SALINDA THOMPSON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan & Hogan, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Daniel A. Perez +1 407 422 2188 +1 407 422 3291 dperez@hoganlegal.com
v.
No Logo Florida Department of Corrections, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Messer Caparello, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JOSEPH BRENNAN DONNELLY +1 850 222 0720 +1 850 558 0653 bdonnelly@lawfla.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MELANIE ROSE LEITMAN +1 850 222 0720 +1 850 558 0663 mleitman@lawfla.com
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 203
Nature of Suit 790 - Labor: Other
  Entries (50) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORDER DISMISSING CASE entered pursuant to 39 Mediation Report-Settled. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 3/30/2012. (jem) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK notified that action is needed Re: 39 Mediation Report - Settled (jem)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    MEDIATION REPORT - Settled. (ANTON, GARY) (Entered: 03/29/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/19/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      ORDER granting 35 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 3/19/2012. (jem) (Entered: 03/19/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/19/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        ORDER granting 34 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Discovery shall be completed not later than 3/29/2012. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 3/19/2012. (jem) (Entered: 03/19/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/19/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK notified that action is needed Re: 35 MOTION to Amend Answer (jem)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/16/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS. (LEITMAN, MELANIE) (Entered: 03/16/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/16/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Defendant's Motion to Amend ANSWER to 1 Complaint by FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS. (LEITMAN, MELANIE) Modified on 3/19/2012 to correct pleading type (jem). (Entered: 03/16/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/16/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK notified that action is needed Re: 34 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (jcw)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/16/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by NICOLE PARRA, SALINDA THOMPSON. (PEREZ, DANIEL) (Entered: 03/16/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by NICOLE PARRA, SALINDA THOMPSON. (PEREZ, DANIEL) (Entered: 03/09/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by NICOLE PARRA, SALINDA THOMPSON. (PEREZ, DANIEL) (Entered: 03/09/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/8/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by NICOLE PARRA, SALINDA THOMPSON. (PEREZ, DANIEL) (Entered: 02/08/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/8/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by NICOLE PARRA, SALINDA THOMPSON. (PEREZ, DANIEL) (Entered: 02/08/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/10/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            NOTICE of Intention to Use Summary by FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS (DONNELLY, JOSEPH) (Entered: 01/10/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by NICOLE PARRA, SALINDA THOMPSON. (PEREZ, DANIEL) (Entered: 01/06/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by NICOLE PARRA, SALINDA THOMPSON. (PEREZ, DANIEL) (Entered: 01/06/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  ORDER granting 25 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Defendant shall respond to Plaintiffs First Interrogatories and Request for Production not later than 1/17/2012. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 1/3/2012. (jem) (Entered: 01/03/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK notified that action is needed Re: 25 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (jem)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      JOINT MOTION to Extend Discovery Deadline (DONNELLY, JOSEPH) Modified on 1/3/2012 (pll). (Entered: 01/03/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/19/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        PRETRIAL ORDER: Pretrial Stipulation due by 6/8/2012. Pretrial Conference set for 6/20/2012 03:30 PM in U.S. Courthouse Panama City before JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK. Jury Trial set for 6/25/2012 08:30 AM in U.S. Courthouse Panama City before JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 12/19/2011. (jem) (Entered: 12/19/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/19/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK notified that action is needed Re: 21 Scheduling Order. (Pretrial Order placed in Q drive) Set/Reset Deadlines: (Pretrial Order due by 12/27/2011) (kgc)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by NICOLE PARRA, SALINDA THOMPSON. (PEREZ, DANIEL) (Entered: 12/07/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by NICOLE PARRA, SALINDA THOMPSON. (PEREZ, DANIEL) (Entered: 12/07/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/2/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                SCHEDULING AND MEDIATION ORDER Re: 17 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting :( Jury Trial set for 6/25/2012 08:30 AM in U.S. Courthouse Panama City before JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK., Mediation Report due by 4/23/2012., Discovery due by 3/21/2012.), Case referred to mediation. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 12/2/2011. (jcw) (Entered: 12/02/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/2/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  ORDER granting 18 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint. Salinda Thompson shall be added as a co-Plaintiff. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 12/2/2011. (jcw) (Entered: 12/02/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/2/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK notified that action is needed Re: 18 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint & Demand For Jury Trial, 19 Amended Document (jem)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/2/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK notified that action is needed Re: 17 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Scheduling and Mediation Order needed)(Clerk to check status by 12/9/2011) (jem)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/2/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        AMENDED DOCUMENT by NICOLE PARRA. Amendment to 18 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint & Demand For Jury Trial Exhibits. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2) (PEREZ, DANIEL) (Entered: 12/02/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/2/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint & Demand For Jury Trial by NICOLE PARRA. (Attachments: # 1 Amended Complaint & Demand for Jury Trial) (PEREZ, DANIEL) (Entered: 12/02/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/2/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (PEREZ, DANIEL) (Entered: 12/02/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              ORDER entered re 15 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Discovery Deadline set for 3/31/2012. Amended Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/6/2011. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 11/22/2011. (jem) (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK notified that action is needed Re: 15 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Scheduling and Mediation Order needed) (jem)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/16/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (PEREZ, DANIEL) (Entered: 11/16/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by NICOLE PARRA. (PEREZ, DANIEL) (Entered: 11/14/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by NICOLE PARRA. (PEREZ, DANIEL) (Entered: 11/14/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/5/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by NICOLE PARRA. (PEREZ, DANIEL) (Entered: 10/05/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/5/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by NICOLE PARRA. (PEREZ, DANIEL) (Entered: 10/05/2011)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/19/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/2/2011. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 9/19/2011. (jcw) (Entered: 09/19/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/19/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK notified that action is needed Re: 1 Complaint - Initial Scheduling Order placed in Q. Clerk to check status on 9/26/2011. (jcw)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/16/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                ANSWER to Complaint by FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS. (DONNELLY, JOSEPH) (Entered: 09/16/2011)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/16/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  Set/Reset Deadlines: FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS answer due 9/13/2011. (jcw)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Flroida Department of Corrections on August 23, 2011, filed by NICOLE PARRA. (PEREZ, DANIEL) (Entered: 09/15/2011)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/8/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by NICOLE PARRA. (PEREZ, DANIEL) (Entered: 09/08/2011)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/8/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by NICOLE PARRA. (PEREZ, DANIEL) (Entered: 09/08/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/24/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by NICOLE PARRA. (PEREZ, DANIEL) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/24/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by NICOLE PARRA. (PEREZ, DANIEL) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              Summons Issued as to FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS. (jcw) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/21/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                CIVIL COVER SHEET. (jcw) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/21/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  COMPLAINT against FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS (Filing fee $350, Receipt #FLN4-13463.), filed by NICOLE PARRA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1) (jcw) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 1 time.

                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                     
                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                    Need Password Help?